USA v. Tassone
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cr-10023-MEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan F. Mitchell +1 617 748 3274 +1 617 748 3960 jonathan.mitchell@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 1/28/2004
County Middlesex
Terminated 2/23/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail Fraud; ;182 Aiding and Abetting
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered granting [23] Motion to Amend Conditions of Release as to Bruce A. Tassone (1) (Howarth, George)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Motion to Amend
    ASSENT TO MOTION to Amend CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Bruce A. Tassone. (Howarth, George)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Statement of Reasons +Court Filing
      Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered. STATEMENT OF REASONS as to Bruce A. Tassone (Howarth, George)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
        Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Bruce A. Tassone (1), Count(s) 1, The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United Staters Bureau of Prisons for a term of 18 months.The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: That the defendant participate in mental health treatment, including Gramblers Anonymous meetings, if available, at the designated Bureau of Prisons facility.That the Bureau of prisons conduct an evaluation for the defendant's admission into a pathological gambling treatment program. The defendant shall surrender at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2A:00 p.m. on 3/16/05/.Supervised Release: Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 3 years. The defendant shall comply with the standard conditions of release, plus the following special conditions:The defendant shall submit to the collection of a DNA sample as directed by the Probation Officer. The defendant shall notify the United States Attorney for the district within 30 days of any change of mailing or residence address that occurs while any portion of the restitution remains unpaid.The defendant is prohibited from possessing a firearm or other dangerous weapon.The defendant is to pay the balance of the restitution according to the court-ordered repayment schedule.The defendant is prohibited from incurring new credit charges or opening additional lines of credit without the approval of the Probation officer.The defenant is to provide the Probation officer with access to any requested financial information. And the financial information provided by the defendant may be shared with the United States Attorney's office.The defendant is to participate in a mental health treatment program as directed by the United States Probaiton Office and be required to contribute to the cost of services for such treatment based on the ability to pay or availability of third-party payment.The defendant is to participate in gambler addiction therapy and attend Gamblers Anonymous meetings as directed by the United States probation office. The defendant shall be required to contribute to the cost of services for such treatment based on the availability to pay or the availability of third-party payment.The defendant is prohibited from participating in any form of gambling, including, but not limited to, casinos, off-track betting, gambling on sporting events,state lotteries and gambling by the Internet.Assessment in the amount of: $100.00 to be paid immediately.Restitution in the amount of:$658,979.00 to be paid in accordance with court order payment schedule. To be paid thru the court office to: Bright Horizons Family Solutions in the amount of$549,979.00; Bank of America in the amount of: $14,000.00;American International recovery in the amount of $50,000.00. Defendant informed of his rights of appeal. (Howarth, George)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
          EXCERPT TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing (Judge's Findings) as to Bruce A. Tassone held on February 22, 2005 before Judge Lasker. Court Reporter: Richard H. Romanow. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-0370 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Sentencing
            Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Morris E. Lasker :Sentencing held on 2/22/2005 for Bruce A. Tassone (1), Count(s) 1, The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United Staters Bureau of Prisons for a term of 18 months.The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: That the defendant participate in mental health treatment, including Gramblers Anonymous meetings, if available, at the designated Bureau of Prisons facility.That the Bureau of prisons conduct an evaluation for the defendant's admission into a pathological gambling treatment program. The defendant shall surrender at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2A:00 p.m. on 3/16/05/.Supervised Release: Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 3 years. The defendant shall comply with the standard conditions of release, plus the following special conditions:The defendant shall submit to the collection of a DNA sample as directed by the Probation Officer. The defendant shall notify the United States Attorney for the district within 30 days of any change of mailing or residence address that occurs while any portion of the restitution remains unpaid.The defendant is prohibited from possessing a firearm or other dangerous weapon.The defendant is to pay the balance of the restitution according to the court-ordered repayment schedule.The defendant is prohibited from incurring new credit charges or opening additional lines of credit without the approval of the Probation officer.The defenant is to provide the Probation officer with access to any requested financial information. And the financial information provided by the defendant may be shared with the United States Attorney's office.The defendant is to participate in a mental health treatment program as directed by the United States Probaiton Office and be required to contribute to the cost of services for such treatment based on the ability to pay or availability of third-party payment.The defendant is to participate in gambler addiction therapy and attend Gamblers Anonymous meetings as directed by the United States probation office. The defendant shall be required to contribute to the cost of services for such treatment based on the availability to pay or the availability of third-party payment.The defendant is prohibited from participating in any form of gambling, including, but not limited to, casinos, off-track betting, gambling on sporting events,state lotteries and gambling by the Internet.Assessment in the amount of: $100.00 to be paid immediately.Restitution in the amount of:$658,979.00 to be paid in accordance with court order payment schedule. To be paid thru the court office to: Bright Horizons Family Solutions in the amount of$549,979.00; Bank of America in the amount of: $14,000.00;American International recovery in the amount of $50,000.00. Defendant informed of his rights of appeal.. (Court Reporter Richard Romanow.) (Howarth, George)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Letter (non-motion)
              Cover Letter regarding Letters of Support on behalf of Bruce A. Tassone as to Bruce A. Tassone (Howarth, George)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005, Terminated: 2/16/2005 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Bruce A. Tassone. (Howarth, George)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                  Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered granting [18]ASSENTED TO Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Bruce A. Tassone (1)To travel to Rhode Island on February 17, 2005. To attend and participate in lecturing on gambling and treatment. (Howarth, George)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Opposition to Motion
                    Opposition by USA as to Bruce A. Tassone re [11] MOTION for Downward Departure (Howarth, George)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Notice of Rescheduling
                      NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Bruce A. Tassone Sentencing set for 2/22/2005 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Order on Motion to Continue
                        Judge Morris E. Lasker : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [16] Motion to Continue as to Bruce A. Tassone (1)Disposition is rescheduled for February 22, 2005. Court has hearing regarding motion to contiue the sentence. Deft's consel to notify the Court has soon as he has the expert report. The new date for sentencing as noted. (Howarth, George)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Bruce A. Tassone Status Conference set for 12/6/2004 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004, Terminated: 12/6/2004 Motion to Continue
                            MOTION to Continue the sentence to January 3, 2005 to Disposition as to Bruce A. Tassone . (Howarth, George)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Order on Motion to Amend
                              Judge Morris E. Lasker : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [15] Motion to Amend Conditions of Release as to Bruce A. Tassone (1) (Howarth, George)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Motion to Amend
                                MOTION to Amend Conditions of Release. as to Bruce A. Tassone . (Howarth, George)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Order on Motion to Continue
                                  Judge Morris E. Lasker : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [14] Motion to Continue as to Bruce A. Tassone (1); granting [14] Motion to Produce as to Bruce A. Tassone (1). AUSA shall advise George Howarth,Clerk of this session when he receives a copy of the report, so the clerk can set a new sentencing date. (Howarth, George) Modified on 9/29/2004 (Howarth, George).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Motion to Continue
                                    MOTION to Continue to 45 days after the production of expert report for sentencing, MOTION to Produce an expert report as to Bruce A. Tassone by USA. (Howarth, George)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Sentencing Memorandum
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Bruce A. Tassone (Howarth, George)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Order on Motion to Continue
                                        Judge Morris E. Lasker : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [12] Motion to Continue as to Bruce A. Tassone (1)Sentencing rescheduled for August 31, 2004 at 2:30p.m. (Howarth, George)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Motion to Continue
                                          JOINT MOTION to Continue to 08/31/04 to Disposition as to Bruce A. Tassone by USA, Bruce A. Tassone. (Howarth, George)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Motion for Departure
                                            MOTION for Downward Departure as to Bruce A. Tassone . (Howarth, George)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                              Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered AMENDED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Bruce A. Tassone (1) Personal Recognizance (Howarth, George) Modified on 5/12/2004 (Howarth, George). Modified on 9/29/2004 (Howarth, George).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Order on Motion to Amend
                                                Judge Morris E. Lasker : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Motion Denied as moot as of this date.(5/7/04) [9] Motion to Amend as to Bruce A. Tassone (1) (Howarth, George)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Motion to Amend
                                                  MOTION to Amend Conditions of Release as to Bruce A. Tassone . (Howarth, George)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING sentencing scheduled on May 25, 2004 at 2:15 p.m as to Bruce A. Tassone Sentencing now set for 6/23/2004 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                      Judge Morris E. Lasker : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [8] Motion to Continue as to Bruce A. Tassone (1)New Disposition date is June 23, 2004 at 2:15 p.m. (Howarth, George)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Motion to Continue
                                                        MOTION to Continue sentencing hearing currently scheduled for 5/22/2004 as to Bruce A. Tassone . (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea as to Bruce A. Tassone held on February 23, 2004 before Judge Lasker. Court Reporter: Richard H. Romanow. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-0370 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 3/8/2004 (Scalfani, Deborah).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Bruce A. Tassone Disposition Hearing set for 5/25/2004 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George) Modified on 9/29/2004 (Howarth, George).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Waiver of Indictment
                                                              WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Bruce A. Tassone (Howarth, George)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Bruce A. Tassone (1) Personal Recognizance. Deft to report to U.S.Pretrial Services in Springfield,(Weekly).Surrender any passport. Obtain no new passport.Refrain from possessing a firarm,destructive device, or other dangerous weapon. The defendant shall appear at the U.S.DISTRICT COURT in Boston on May 25, 2004 at 2:15 p.m to Courtroom No.8 on the 3rd floor for disposition.To the Marshal: The defendant is ORDERED released after processing. (Howarth, George) Modified on 9/29/2004 (Howarth, George).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William H. Keefe appearing for Bruce A. Tassone (Howarth, George)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Plea Agreement
                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Bruce A. Tassone (Howarth, George)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Plea and Sentence
                                                                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Morris E. Lasker :Plea to an information held on 2/23/2004 Bruce A. Tassone (1) Plea of guilty.Court questions deft's atty regarding representation of deft.Court hears from the gov't's atty regarding what evidence they would present if the case had gone to trial. Court questions the deft and informs him of his rights. The Court finds factual basis to accept the plea of guilty to Count I,deft pleas guilty to Count I and Court accepts plea.Court sets Disposition to May 25, 2004 at 2:15 p.m.; Court sets conditions of Release. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Richard Romanow.) (Howarth, George) Modified on 9/29/2004 (Howarth, George).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Bruce A. Tassone Arraignment set for 2/23/2004 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Morris E. Lasker. Plea set for 2/23/2004 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Morris E. Lasker. cc/cl(Howarth, George)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Information - Felony
                                                                          INFORMATION (Felony) as to Bruce A. Tassone (1) count(s) 1. (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 477 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?