Philip McFarland v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2126

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2016 at 11:51 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405364191
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-2126] (SLW)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee U. S. Bank National Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999468388] [14-2126] Jason Manning
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999468387] [14-2126] Jason Manning
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jason E. Manning for U. S. Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..[999468386] [14-2126] Jason Manning
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John C. Lynch for U. S. Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..[999468385] [14-2126] John Lynch
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                      DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Philip McFarland. [14-2126] Jennifer Wagner
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Philip McFarland. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999468364] [14-2126] Jennifer Wagner
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jennifer S. Wagner for Philip McFarland.[999468362] [14-2126] Jennifer Wagner
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                            BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/01/2014. Response Brief due 01/02/2015 [14-2126] (JHM)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-07997.. [14-2126] (JHM)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:12-cv-07997. Case manager: JMoore. [14-2126] (JHM)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?