In re: Pre-Filled Propane Tank Antitrust Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:14-md-02567

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2021 at 4:34 PM DT (4.9 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo 33 and a Third, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Alan Rockwell, Plaintiff
No Logo Alex Chernavsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore H. Chase +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 tchase@audetlaw.com
No Logo AQ Investments, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Radice Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN D. RADICE +1 646 245 8502 +1 646 722 8501 jradice@radicelawfirm.com
No Logo Arthur Hull, Plaintiff
No Logo Ashville General Store, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Bryce Mander, Plaintiff
No Logo Butch's Central Coastal, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven A. Kanner +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4521 skanner@fklmlaw.com
Space William H. London +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4521 wlondon@fklmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David McLafferty - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David P. McLafferty +1 610 940 4000 dmclafferty@mclaffertylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Caldes - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 bcaldes@srkw-law.com
Space Eugene A. Spector +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 espector@srkw-law.com
Space Jeffrey L. Spector - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 jspector@srkw-law.com
No Logo CCLAS, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein, Mitchell & Mezines, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David U. Fierst +1 202 737 7777 +1 202 296 8312 dfierst@steinmitchell.com
Space Glenn A. Mitchell +1 202 737 7777 +1 202 296 8312 gamitchell@steinmitchell.com
No Logo Conti's Service Center, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur N Bailey +1 415 633 1939 +1 716 716 2983 artlaw@windstream.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jayne Ann Peeters +1 415 421 3400 +1 415 421 2234 jpeeters@steyerlaw.com
Space Allan Steyer +1 415 421 3400 +1 415 421 2234 asteyer@steyerlaw.com
No Logo East Airline LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Glenville Shell LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Randall L. Kallinen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Isaac L. Diel +1 913 661 9931 +1 913 661 9935 dslawkc@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaffer Lombardo Shurin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard F. Lombardo +1 816 931 0500 +1 816 931 5775 rlombardo@sls-law.com
Space Jennifer J. Price +1 816 931 0500 +1 816 931 5775 jprice@sls-law.com
Space Anne Elizabeth Smith +1 816 931 0500 +1 816 931 5775 asmith@sls-law.com
Space Kathleen Kopach Woods +1 816 931 0500 +1 816 931 5775 kwoods@sls-law.com
No Logo Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Gregory Ludvigsen, Plaintiff
No Logo Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com
Space Michael David Hausfeld +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 MHausfeld@hausfeld.com
Space Brent W. Landau +1 215 985 3273 +1 215 985 3271 blandau@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray, Frank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Frank +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 gfrank@frankandbianco.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas V Bender +1 816 421 6620 +1 816 421 4747 tbender@wbsvlaw.com
No Logo Highway 182 LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Hopewell Exxon, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GROWE AND EISEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason A. Charpentier +1 314 721 1228 +1 314 261 7326 jason@groweeisen.com
No Logo J & V Management, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GUIN STOKES & EVANS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J Guin +1 205 226 2282 +1 205 226 2357 davidg@gseattorneys.com
Space Rex Slate +1 205 226 2282 +1 205 226 2357 rexs@gseattorneys.com
Space Tammy McClendon Stokes +1 205 226 2282 +1 205 226 2357 tammys@gseattorneys.com
Space Charles R. Watkins +1 312 878 8391 +1 205 226 2282 charlesw@gseattorneys.com
No Logo James Halgerson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Betsy Carol Manifold +1 619 239 4599 manifold@whafh.com
No Logo Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berkowitz Oliver Williams Shaw & Eisenbrandt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tim J. Riemann +1 816 627 0232 +1 816 561 1888 triemann@berkowitzoliver.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Issacson +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 wisaacson@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan Shaw +1 202 274 1123 +1 202 237 6131 jshaw@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
No Logo LJax Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Horn Alyward & Bandy LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A Horn +1 816 421 0700 +1 816 421 0899 rhorn@hab-law.com
Space Joseph Kronawitter +1 816 421 0700 +1 816 421 0899 jkronawitter@hab-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mindee Jill Reuben , +1 215 545 7200 +1 215 545 6535 reuben@wka-law.com
Space Jeremy S. Spiegel +1 215 545 7200 +1 215 545 6535 spiegel@wka-law.com
No Logo Mario Ortiz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonard W. Aragon +1 602 840 5900 +1 602 840 3012 leonard@hbsslaw.com
Space Robert Bruce Carey +1 602 840 5900 +1 602 840 3012 rob@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by paynterlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara C Willingham +1 501 413 0836 +1 866 734 0622 swillingham@paynterlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman E. Siegel +1 816 714 7112 +1 816 714 7101 siegel@stuevesiegel.com
Space Barrett J. Vahle +1 816 714 7100 +1 816 714 7101 vahle@stuevesiegel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Paynter Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stuart McKinley Paynter +1 202 626 4486 +1 866 734 0622 stuart@smplegal.com
No Logo Michael S. Harvey, Plaintiff
No Logo Morgan-Larson, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cook, Barkett, et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Michael Ponder +1 573 335 6651 +1 573 335 6182 mponder@cbpw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stuart H. McCluer ,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stuart Halkett McCluer +1 662 236 1401 +1 662 368 1506 smccluer@mcculleymccluer.com
Space R. Bryant McCulley , +1 904 482 4073 +1 904 239 5388 bmcculley@mcculleymccluer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vineet Bhatia +1 713 653 7855 +1 713 654 3344 vbhatia@susmangodfrey.com
Space Richard W. Hess +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 rhess@susmangodfrey.com
Space Alexander Lyle Kaplan +1 713 653 7835 +1 713 654 6121 akaplan@susmangodfrey.com
Space Stephen E Morrissey +1 310 789 3100 +1 310 789 3150 smorrissey@susmangodfrey.com
Space Stephen D. Susman +1 713 653 7801 +1 713 654 6666 ssusman@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee Albert +1 212 682 5340 +1 212 884 0988 lalbert@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Dirks, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lee Dameron +1 816 876 2600 +1 816 221 8763 matt@williamsdirks.com
Space Eric L. Dirks +1 816 876 2600 +1 816 221 8763 dirks@williamsdirks.com
No Logo Roth's Country Corner, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Route 49 Gas & Go, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Anthony Barile, III +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 pbarile@gelaw.com
Space Robert G. Eisler +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100 reisler@gelaw.com
Space Linda P. Nussbaum +1 646 722 8500 +1 212 687 7714 lnussbaum@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SHAFFER & GAIER LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL D. SHAFFER +1 215 751 0100 +1 215 751 0723 mshaffer@shaffergaier.com
No Logo Sean Venezia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukas, Nace, Gutierrez & Sachs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooks Elliott Harlow +1 703 584 8680 +1 703 584 8696 brooks.harlow@fcclaw.com
No Logo Stephen Morrison, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Tseffos, Plaintiff
No Logo Surinder Kaur, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas R. Clark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis M Gregorek +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 gregorek@whafh.com
Space Fred Taylor Isquith +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 jsquith@whafh.com
Space Rachele R. Rickert +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 rickert@whafh.com
No Logo Tuban 610 LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Tuban Petroleum LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lemmon Law Firm (Hahnville)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Allen Lemmon +1 985 783 6789 +1 985 783 1333 andrew@lemmonlawfirm.com
Space Irma L. Netting +1 985 783 6789 +1 985 783 1333 irma@lemmonlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Burke +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 cburke@scott-scott.com
Space Joseph Peter Guglielmo +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jguglielmo@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy Marcel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Marcel +1 985 785 6620 tim@marcellaw.com
No Logo West Main Street LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Zarco USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric D. Barton +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 ebarton@wcllp.com
Space Thomas Phillip Cartmell +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tcartmell@wagstaffcartmell.net
Space Tyler W. Hudson +1 816 701 1177 thudson@wcllp.com
No Logo Zerka's Party Store, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonsignore & Brewer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Bonsignore +1 781 391 9400 +1 781 391 9496 rbonsignore@bandblaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Nils Hammarskjold +1 415 217 6810 carl@saveri.com
Space Travis Luke Manfredi +1 415 271 6810 travis@saveri.com
Space Richard Alexander Saveri +1 415 217 6810 +1 415 217 6813 rick@saveri.com
Space Cadio R. Zirpoli +1 415 217 6810 +1 415 217 6813 zirpoli@saveri.com
v.
No Logo AmeriGas Partners, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BRANDON J.B. BOULWARE +1 816 471 2221 +1 816 471 2221 brandonb@rhgm.com
Space Jeremy M. Suhr +1 816 471 7700 +1 816 471 2221 jeremys@rhgm.com
No Logo Amerigas Propane, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Amerigas Partners Lp
Officer/Director, Petrolane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ugi Corp /new/
Officer/Director, Amerigas, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tammy H. Boggs +1 858 847 6739 +1 858 792 6773 tboggs@foley.com
No Logo Amerigas Propane, LP, Defendant
No Logo Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracy R Hancock +1 816 374 3317 +1 816 374 3300 tracy.hancock@bryancave.com
Space Peter W. Herzog, III +1 314 259 2000 pwherzog@bryancave.com
Space Catesby Ann Major +1 816 374 3200 +1 816 374 3300 catesby.major@bclplaw.com
Space Craig S O'Dear +1 816 374 3207 csodear@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Niall E Lynch +1 415 391 0600 +1 415 395 8095 niall.lynch@lw.com
No Logo Ferrellgas, LP, Defendant
No Logo Ugi Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (239) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None order on motion to join
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Join
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Strike
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order (Sealed)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Join
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/20/2018, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Electronic Transcript
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/6/2018, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUGGESTIONS in support re 176 Joint MOTION to stay Discovery filed by Jay N. Varon on behalf of Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests, # 2 Exhibit B - Rule 45 Non-Party Subpoena)(Related document(s) 176 ) (Varon, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to stay Discovery filed by Jay N. Varon on behalf of AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Varon, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUGGESTIONS in support re 174 Joint MOTION for judgment on the pleadings filed by Jay N. Varon on behalf of Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - AmeriGas FTC Consent Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Ferrellgas FTC Consent Order)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Varon, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for judgment on the pleadings filed by Jay N. Varon on behalf of AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Varon, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUGGESTIONS in support re 172 MOTION for leave to file Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Barrett J. Vahle on behalf of Plaintiff Mario Ortiz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 172 ) (Vahle, Barrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to file Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Barrett J. Vahle on behalf of Mario Ortiz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Vahle, Barrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit Court of Appeals is 15-2789 for 167 Notice of Appeal, filed by Yocum Oil Company, Inc., Johnson Auto Electric, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC, Speed Stop 32, Inc.. Briefing schedule entered by the Court of Appeals is attached. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule)(Crespo, Wil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AmeriGas Defendants' ANSWER to (105 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) Amended Complaint,,, of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs on behalf of Amerigas Partners, L.P., AmeriGas Propane, Inc., Amerigas Propane, L.P., AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, LP, Amerigas Partners, L.P..Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Varon, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to (105 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) Amended Complaint,,, Blue Rhino Defendants' Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P..Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Lynch, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document 167 Notice of Appeal, (Houston, Kiambu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 162 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 165 Clerk's Judgment by Johnson Auto Electric, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC, Speed Stop 32, Inc., Yocum Oil Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0866-4472496. (Lombardo, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mario Ortiz filed by Barrett J. Vahle on behalf of Plaintiff Mario Ortiz.(Vahle, Barrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' (Hartig Drug Company, Inc.; Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C.; Glenville Shell LLC; AQ Investments, LLC; LJax Enterprises, Inc.; J & V Management, LLC; Butch's Central Coastal, Inc.; Zerka's Party Store, Inc.; OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc.; CCLAS, Inc.; Hopewell Exxon, LLC; Tuban Petroleum LLC; 33 and a Third, LLC; Tuban 610 LLC; Highway 182 LLC; West Main Street LLC; Roth's Country Corner, Inc; 1919 Airline Hwy LLC; East Airline LLC; Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC; Conti's Service Center, Inc.; Route 49 Gas & Go, Inc.; Morgan-Larson, LLC; Surinder Kaur, Inc.; Ashville General Store, Inc.; Birdie's, Inc.; Lochraven Sunoco, Inc.; Arrow Hardware, LLC; American Auto Repair; Johnson Auto Electric, Inc.; Cedar Holly Investments, LLC; CEFO Enterprise Corp.; Tuckerton Lumber Company; Ace High Auto Repair & Propane; JonWall, Inc.; RC Gasoline, Speed Stop 32; Inc., Zarco USA, Inc.; Dunmore Oil Co., Inc.; JoJo Oil Co.,Inc.; Ekonomy Enterprises, Inc.; and Yocum Oil Company, Inc.) Consolidated Class Action Complaint (CAC) (Doc. #137) is GRANTED. (Moore, Terri) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting extension of time to serve answer to Count I of the Indirect Complaint re (163 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) Joint MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by AmeriGas Propane, Inc., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Amerigas Partners, L.P., Amerigas Propane, L.P., UGI Corporation, Ferrellgas Partners L.P., AmeriGas Propane, LP, AmeriGas Partners, LP. All defendants' answer due on or before 8/3/15. Signed on 7/15/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by Jay N. Varon on behalf of Amerigas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., Amerigas Propane, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation, Amerigas Partners, L.P.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Varon, Jay) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting (98) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; granting (90) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; granting (89) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; granting (90) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; granting (80) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; granting (90) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; granting (93) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; granting (98) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; granting (80) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (87) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; granting (75) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; granting (99) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; granting (82) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; granting (83) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (135) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC; granting (137) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (98) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; granting (95) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; granting (69) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (84) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (67) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (85) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; granting (76) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; granting (74) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; granting (68) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; granting (64) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; granting (64) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; granting (62) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; granting (70) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; granting (64) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; granting (97) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; granting (65) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; granting (66) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; granting (63) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; granting (68) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; granting (63) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; granting (64) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; granting (62) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (81) motion to dismiss indirect purchaser plaintiffs' CACto dismiss direct purchaser plaintiffs' CAC in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF Signed on 7/2/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Electronic Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by Daniel C. Hedlund on behalf of JonWall, Inc., Yocum Oil Company, Inc. (Attorney Daniel C. Hedlund added to party JonWall, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Hedlund added to party Yocum Oil Company, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hedlund, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying (35) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (37) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (41) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; denying (32) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (34) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (38) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; denying (31) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (33) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (37) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; denying (29) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (31) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (32) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (37) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; denying (13) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (15) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (20) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; denying (32) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (34) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (38) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; denying (35) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (37) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (41) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; denying (34) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (36) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (40) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; denying (22) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (24) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (28) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (31) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (35) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (29) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; denying (9) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (11) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (15) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; denying (41) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (43) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (47) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; denying (30) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (24) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (26) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; denying (17) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (19) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (23) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; denying (14) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (16) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (17) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (21) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (25) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; denying (38) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (40) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (44) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; denying (30) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (22) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (24) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (25) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; denying (4) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (6) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (10) motion to appoint counsel in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; denying (19) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (21) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (25) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; denying (6) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (8) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (12) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; denying (24) motion to appoint counsel ; granting (26) motion to appoint counsel ; denying (30) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; denying (15) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; denying (20) motion to appoint counsel in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF Signed on 12/15/14 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Gary A. Fenner: MOTION HEARING held on 12/15/2014 re (34 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 31 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 35 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 32 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 38 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 24 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 14 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 9 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 22 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 13 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 6 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 19 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 17 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 24 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 29 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 32 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 29 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 35 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 41 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 4 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 22 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel Missouri Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Hausfeld LLP and Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Co-Lead Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C. as Liaison Counsel filed by 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, 33 and a Third, LLC, Ashville General Store, Inc., Route 49 Gas & Go, Inc., East Airline LLC, J & V Management, LLC, OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc., Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Highway 182 LLC, Tuban 610 LLC, Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C., Surinder Kaur, Inc., LJax Enterprises, Inc., AQ Investments, LLC, Conti's Service Center, Inc., Tuban Petroleum LLC, Zerka's Party Store, Inc., Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Butch's Central Coastal, Inc., Roth's Country Corner, Inc., West Main Street LLC, Hopewell Exxon, LLC, (43 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 26 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 31 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 15 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 24 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 34 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 21 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 26 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 24 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 37 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 34 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 36 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 16 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 40 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 6 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 8 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 37 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 11 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 33 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 31 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 19 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel Motion for Appointment of Leadership Structure and Suggestions in Support filed by Mario Ortiz, Stephen Morrison, Steven Tseffos, (25 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 32 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 17 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel of Interim Co-Lead & Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class filed by Morgan-Larson, LLC, Glenville Shell LLC, Zarco USA, Inc., (10 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 25 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 40 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 30 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 37 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 28 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 30 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 38 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 23 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 38 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 30 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 41 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 15 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 12 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 15 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 25 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 37 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 47 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 41 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 20 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 20 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 35 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 44 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Arthur Hull, Alan Rockwell, Michael S. Harvey, Sean Venezia, Gregory Ludvigsen, (21 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel for the Indirect/Consumer Subclass filed by Alex Chernavsky. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Kathy Calvert, 816-512-5741. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF et al.(Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/13/2014, Entered: 12/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Thomas K. Boardman on behalf of 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, 33 and a Third, LLC, East Airline LLC, Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Highway 182 LLC, Roth's Country Corner, Inc., Tuban 610 LLC, Tuban Petroleum LLC, West Main Street LLC (Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party 1919 Airline Hwy LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party 33 and a Third, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party East Airline LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party Highway 182 LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party Roth's Country Corner, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party Tuban 610 LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party Tuban Petroleum LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas K. Boardman added to party West Main Street LLC(pty:pla))(Boardman, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance by Walter D Kelley on behalf of Hartig Drug Company, Inc. (Attorney Walter D Kelley added to party Hartig Drug Company, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kelley, Walter) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance by Jayne Arnold Goldstein on behalf of Cedar Holly Investments, LLC (Attorney Jayne Arnold Goldstein added to party Cedar Holly Investments, LLC(pty:pla))(Goldstein, Jayne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by Ruthanne Gordon on behalf of Lochraven Sunoco, Inc. (Attorney Ruthanne Gordon added to party Lochraven Sunoco, Inc.(pty:pla))(Gordon, Ruthanne) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance by Eric Cramer on behalf of Lochraven Sunoco, Inc. (Attorney Eric Cramer added to party Lochraven Sunoco, Inc.(pty:pla))(Cramer, Eric) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by H Laddie Montague, Jr on behalf of Lochraven Sunoco, Inc. (Attorney H Laddie Montague, Jr added to party Lochraven Sunoco, Inc.(pty:pla))(Montague, H) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance by Leland M. Shurin on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Attorney Leland M. Shurin added to party Glenville Shell LLC(pty:pla))(Shurin, Leland)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing Communication to Court by Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C. (Bender, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to File Declaration (Doc. 66) by Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C. re (66 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) MOTION for leave to file Declaration (Bender, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUGGESTIONS in support re (27 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 50 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 37 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 52 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 53 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 55 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 26 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 46 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 43 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 62 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 27 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 45 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 60 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 61 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 56 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 39 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 47 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 26 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 43 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 38 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 31 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 53 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 32 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 43 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 30 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 25 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 24 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 27 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 53 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 33 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 66 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 29 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 48 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 25 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 27 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 26 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF) MOTION for leave to file Declaration filed by Thomas V Bender on behalf of Plaintiffs Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C.. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Bender, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to file Declaration filed by Thomas V Bender on behalf of Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/15/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Bender, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by Craig S. O'Dear on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas L.P. (Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S. O'Dear added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft))(O'Dear, Craig) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance by Catesby Ann Major on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners L.P. and Ferrellgas, L.P. (Attorney Catesby Ann Major added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft))(Major, Catesby) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by Jennie Lee Anderson on behalf of Ashville General Store, Inc. (Anderson, Jennie) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL. Signed on 11/25/14 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Ashville General Store, Inc. Waiver sent to Amerigas Partners, L.P. and UGI Corporation on 10/31/2014, answer due 12/30/2014.(Jones, Robin) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Ashville General Store, Inc. Waiver sent to Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. and Ferrellgas, L.P. on 10/31/2014, answer due 12/30/2014. (Jones, Robin) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance by Thomas C Bright on behalf of Ace High Auto Repair & Propane, Johnson Auto Electric, Inc. (Attorney Thomas C Bright added to party Ace High Auto Repair & Propane and Johnson Auto Electric, Inc.(pty:pla))(McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance by Beth Seltzer on behalf of RC Gasoline (Attorney Beth Seltzer added to party RC Gasoline(pty:pla))(Seltzer, Beth) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by Jeffrey B Gittleman on behalf of RC Gasoline (Attorney Jeffrey B Gittleman added to party RC Gasoline(pty:pla))(Gittleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance by Brooks Elliott Harlow on behalf of Michael S. Harvey, Arthur Hull, Gregory Ludvigsen, Alan Rockwell, Sean Venezia (Harlow, Brooks) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by Jay N. Varon on behalf of Amerigas Propane, L.P. (Attorney Jay N. Varon added to party Amerigas Propane, L.P.(pty:dft)) (Varon, Jay) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance by Jay N. Varon on behalf of AmeriGas Propane, Inc. (Attorney Jay N. Varon added to party AmeriGas Propane, Inc.(pty:dft))(Varon, Jay) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance by Jay N. Varon on behalf of UGI Corporation (Attorney Jay N. Varon added to party UGI Corporation(pty:dft))(Varon, Jay) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Jay N. Varon on behalf of Amerigas Partners, L.P. (Attorney Jay N. Varon added to party Amerigas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft))(Varon, Jay) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth A.N. Haas on behalf of Amerigas Propane, L.P. (Attorney Elizabeth A.N. Haas added to party Amerigas Propane, L.P.(pty:dft))(Haas, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth A.N. Haas on behalf of AmeriGas Propane, Inc. (Attorney Elizabeth A.N. Haas added to party AmeriGas Propane, Inc.(pty:dft))(Haas, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth A.N. Haas on behalf of UGI Corporation (Attorney Elizabeth A.N. Haas added to party UGI Corporation(pty:dft)) (Haas, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth A.N. Haas on behalf of Amerigas Partners, L.P. (Attorney Elizabeth A.N. Haas added to party Amerigas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft))(Haas, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by Kate Gehl on behalf of Amerigas Propane, L.P. (Attorney Kate Gehl added to party Amerigas Propane, L.P.(pty:dft))(Gehl, Kate) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance by Kate Gehl on behalf of AmeriGas Propane, Inc. (Attorney Kate Gehl added to party AmeriGas Propane, Inc.(pty:dft) (Gehl, Kate) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance by Kate Gehl on behalf of UGI Corporation(Attorney Kate Gehl added to party UGI Corporation(pty:dft))(Gehl, Kate) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Kate Gehl on behalf of Amerigas Partners, L.P. (Attorney Kate Gehl added to party Amerigas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft))(Gehl, Kate) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (22 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 29 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 14 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF)MOTION to appoint counsel Missouri Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Hausfeld LLP and Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Co-Lead Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C. as Liaison Counsel filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Plaintiffs Dunmore Oil Co., Inc., JoJo Oil Co., Inc., Speed Stop 32, Inc., Yocum Oil Company, Inc., Johnson Auto Electric, Inc., Ekonomy Enterprises, Inc., CEFO Enterprise Corp., Zarco USA, Inc., Ace High Auto Repair & Propane, American Auto Repair, RC Gasoline, Morgan-Larson, LLC, Arrow Hardware, LLC, Cedar Holly Investments, LLC, Ace High Auto Repair & Propane, American Auto Repair, Arrow Hardware, LLC, Glenville Shell LLC, JonWall, Inc., Lochraven Sunoco, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC, Tuckerton Lumber Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF (Attorney Richard F. Lombardo added to party Dunmore Oil Co., Inc. (pty:pla), JoJo Oil Co., Inc. (pty:pla), Speed Stop 32, Inc.(pty:pla), Yocum Oil Company, Inc.(pty:pla), Johnson Auto Electric, Inc.(pty:pla), Ekonomy Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla), CEFO Enterprise Corp.(pty:pla), Zarco USA, Inc.(pty:pla), Ace High Auto Repair & Propane(pty:pla), American Auto Repair(pty:pla), RC Gasoline(pty:pla), Arrow Hardware, LLC(pty:pla), Cedar Holly Investments, LLC(pty:pla), Lochraven Sunoco, Inc.(pty:pla), JonWall, Inc.(pty:pla), Tuckerton Lumber Company(pty:pla))(Lombardo, Richard) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text, correct event text and correct related document numbers (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 14 MOTION to appoint counsel Missouri Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Hausfeld LLP and Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Co-Lead Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C. as Liaison Counsel filed by Thomas V Bender on behalf of Plaintiffs 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, 33 and a Third, LLC, AQ Investments, LLC, Ashville General Store, Inc., Birdie's, Inc., Butch's Central Coastal, Inc., CCLAS, Inc., Conti's Service Center, Inc., East Airline LLC, Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Highway 182 LLC, Hopewell Exxon, LLC, J & V Management, LLC, Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C., LJax Enterprises, Inc., OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc., Route 49 Gas & Go, Inc., Tuban 610 LLC, Tuban Petroleum LLC, West Main Street LLC, Zerka's Party Store, Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Attorney Thomas V Bender added to Birdie's, Inc.(pty:pla), CCLAS, Inc.(pty:pla), Hopewell Exxon, LLC(pty:pla), J & V Management, LLC(pty:pla), LJax Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla) and OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc.(pty:pla))(Bender, Thomas) Modified on 11/26/2014 to clean up docket text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (21 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel for the Indirect/Consumer Subclass filed by William M Audet on behalf of Plaintiff Alex Chernavsky. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Attorney William M Audet added to party Alex Chernavsky(pty:pla))(Audet, William) Modified on 11/26/2014 to correct event text (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (10 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 25 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 40 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 30 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 37 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 28 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 30 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 38 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 23 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 38 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 30 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 41 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 15 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 12 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 15 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 25 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 37 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 47 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 41 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 20 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 20 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 35 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 44 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel , (21 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel for the Indirect/Consumer Subclass filed by Barrett J. Vahle on behalf of Plaintiffs Stephen Morrison, Mario Ortiz, Steven Tseffos. Reply suggestions due by 12/8/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Vahle, Barrett) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (43 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 26 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 31 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 15 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 24 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 34 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 21 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 26 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 24 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 37 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 34 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 36 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 16 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 40 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 6 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 8 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 37 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 11 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 33 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 31 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 19 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel Motion for Appointment of Leadership Structure and Suggestions in Support, (21 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel for the Indirect/Consumer Subclass filed by Brooks Elliott Harlow on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael S. Harvey, Arthur Hull, Gregory Ludvigsen, Alan Rockwell, Sean Venezia. Reply suggestions due by 12/8/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Harlow, Brooks) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance by Daniel M. Wall on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P. (Attorney Daniel M. Wall added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Wall added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft)) ECF Attorney Registration form emailed to counsel for completion. (McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Jesse B. McKeithen on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P. (Attorney Jesse B. McKeithen added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse B. McKeithen added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft)) ECF Attorney Registration Form emailed to counsel for completion.(McDowell, Shelly) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance by Kate M. Baxter-Kauf on behalf of CEFO Enterprise Corp., CEFO Enterprise Corp. (Baxter-Kauf, Kate) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance by Heidi M. Silton on behalf of CEFO Enterprise Corp., CEFO Enterprise Corp. (Silton, Heidi) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by W. Joseph Bruckner on behalf of CEFO Enterprise Corp., CEFO Enterprise Corp. (Bruckner, W.) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance by Kit A Pierson on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Pierson, Kit) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by Richard A Koffman on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Koffman, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance by Emmy Levens on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Levens, Emmy) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER striking notices of appearance entered by Kit A. Pierson, Richard A. Koffman, and Emmy Levens for non-compliance with case ORDER filed at 2 in main MDL case. Parties are reminded that when filing any document or pleading, filing should be made in the main MDL case (14-2567) and then spread ONLY to the applicable individual case(s) by selecting "spread docket entry." For other information, refer to the case ORDER at 2 in the main MDL case. Signed on November 13, 2014 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Emmy Levens on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Attorney Emmy Levens added to party Glenville Shell LLC(pty:pla))(Levens, Emmy) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance by Richard A Koffman on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Attorney Richard A Koffman added to party Glenville Shell LLC(pty:pla))(Koffman, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance by Kit A Pierson on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Attorney Kit A Pierson added to party Glenville Shell LLC(pty:pla))(Pierson, Kit) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Brooks Elliott Harlow on behalf of Michael S. Harvey, Arthur Hull, Gregory Ludvigsen, Alan Rockwell, Sean Venezia. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/24/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Harlow, Brooks) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 12/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 8 motion to amend/correct. Hearing on motions for appointment of counsel set for 12/15/14 at 10:00 am. Signed on 11/6/14 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Niall Edmund Lynch on behalf of Defendants Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P..Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Lynch, Niall) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to appoint counsel for the Indirect/Consumer Subclass filed by Theordore Chase on behalf of Alex Chernavsky. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/24/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of William M. Audet)(Chase, Theordore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DESIGNATION Notification of Lead Counsel by Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP, Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Lynch, Niall) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance by Niall Edmund Lynch on behalf of Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP, Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. (Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Niall Edmund Lynch added to party Ferrellgas, L.P.(pty:dft))(Lynch, Niall) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUGGESTIONS in support re (25 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 32 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 17 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel of Interim Co-Lead & Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Plaintiffs Glenville Shell LLC, Glenville Shell LLC, Morgan-Larson, LLC, Zarco USA, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF(Lombardo, Richard) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to appoint counsel of Interim Co-Lead & Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC, Glenville Shell LLC, Morgan-Larson, LLC, Zarco USA, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/24/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF(Attorney Richard F. Lombardo added to party Morgan-Larson, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Richard F. Lombardo added to party Zarco USA, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Richard F. Lombardo added to party Morgan-Larson, LLC(pty:pla))(Lombardo, Richard) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to appoint counsel Motion for Appointment of Leadership Structure and Suggestions in Support filed by Norman Eli Siegel on behalf of Stephen Morrison, Mario Ortiz, Steven Tseffos. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/24/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Siegel, Norman) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUGGESTIONS in support re (34 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 31 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 35 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 32 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 38 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 24 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 14 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 9 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 22 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 13 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 6 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 19 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 17 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 24 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 29 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 32 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 29 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 35 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 41 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 4 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 22 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF) MOTION to appoint counsel Missouri Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Hausfeld LLP and Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Co-Lead Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C. as Liaison Counsel filed by Thomas V Bender on behalf of Plaintiffs Ashville General Store, Inc., Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C., CCLAS, Inc., Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Route 49 Gas & Go, Inc., Surinder Kaur, Inc., J & V Management, LLC, Hopewell Exxon, LLC, Butch's Central Coastal, Inc., OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc., Zerka's Party Store, Inc., 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, 33 and a Third, LLC, East Airline LLC, Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Highway 182 LLC, Roth's Country Corner, Inc., Tuban 610 LLC, Tuban Petroleum LLC, West Main Street LLC, Conti's Service Center, Inc., AQ Investments, LLC, 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, 33 and a Third, LLC, AQ Investments, LLC, Ashville General Store, Inc., Butch's Central Coastal, Inc., CCLAS, Inc., Conti's Service Center, Inc., East Airline LLC, Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Highway 182 LLC, Hopewell Exxon, LLC, J & V Management, LLC, Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C., LJax Enterprises, Inc., OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc., Roth's Country Corner, Inc., Route 49 Gas & Go, Inc., Surinder Kaur, Inc., Tuban 610 LLC, Tuban Petroleum LLC, West Main Street LLC, Zerka's Party Store, Inc., LJax Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Hausfeld LLP Firm Summary, # 2 Exhibit 2 - M. Hausfeld Bio, # 3 Exhibit 3 - W. Kelley Bio, # 4 Exhibit 4 - B. Laudau Bio, # 5 Exhibit 5 - M. Coolidge Bio, # 6 Exhibit 6 - BSF Firm Bio, # 7 Exhibit 7 - W. Isaacson Bio, # 8 Exhibit 8 - J. Shaw Bio)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Bender, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to appoint counsel Missouri Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Hausfeld LLP and Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Co-Lead Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C. as Liaison Counsel filed by Thomas V Bender on behalf of Ashville General Store, Inc., Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C., Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Surinder Kaur, Inc., J & V Management, LLC, Hopewell Exxon, LLC, Butch's Central Coastal, Inc., OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc., Zerka's Party Store, Inc., 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, 33 and a Third, LLC, East Airline LLC, Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Highway 182 LLC, Roth's Country Corner, Inc., Tuban 610 LLC, Tuban Petroleum LLC, West Main Street LLC, Conti's Service Center, Inc., AQ Investments, LLC, 1919 Airline Hwy LLC, 33 and a Third, LLC, AQ Investments, LLC, Ashville General Store, Inc., Butch's Central Coastal, Inc., Conti's Service Center, Inc., East Airline LLC, Gramercy Cheap Smokes LLC, Hartig Drug Company, Inc., Highway 182 LLC, Hopewell Exxon, LLC, J & V Management, LLC, Jason Moore's Texaco, L.L.C., LJax Enterprises, Inc., OM Commercial Neenah Oil, Inc., Roth's Country Corner, Inc., Route 49 Gas & Go, Inc., Surinder Kaur, Inc., Tuban 610 LLC, Tuban Petroleum LLC, West Main Street LLC, Zerka's Party Store, Inc., LJax Enterprises, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/24/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF(Bender, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance by Theordore Chase on behalf of Alex Chernavsky (Attorney Theordore Chase added to party Alex Chernavsky(pty:pla))(Chase, Theordore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, UGI Corporation.(Boulware, Brandon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION (Notification) of Lead Counsel by AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, UGI Corporation. (Boulware, Brandon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of appearance by Brooks Elliott Harlow on behalf of Plaintiffs Sean Venezia, Arthur Hull, Michael Harvey, Alan Rockwell and Gregory Ludvigsen (Harlow, Brooks) Modified on 11/4/2014 to correct pary representation (Anderson, Christy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) filed and certified by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on October 31, 2014, transferring 20 tag-along actions to the Western District of Missouri. (Jones, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to amend/correct (2 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF) Order, Set Hearings,,,,,,,, Unopposed Motion to Modify Order of October 22, 2014 filed by Norman Eli Siegel on behalf of Stephen Morrison, Mario Ortiz, Steven Tseffos. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/17/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF(Siegel, Norman) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by Tyler Hudson on behalf of ZARCO USA, INC. (Attorney Tyler Hudson added to party ZARCO USA, INC.(pty:pla))(Hudson, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance by Eric D. Barton on behalf of ZARCO USA, INC. (Attorney Eric D. Barton added to party ZARCO USA, INC.(pty:pla))(Barton, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of ZARCO USA, INC. (Attorney Thomas P. Cartmell added to party ZARCO USA, INC.(pty:pla))(Cartmell, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Kathleen K. Woods on behalf of Glenville Shell LLC (Attorney Kathleen K. Woods added to party Glenville Shell LLC(pty:pla))(Woods, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 14-MD-2567 has been opened and assigned to Judge Gary A. Fenner. All documents filed with the Court must be filed electronically via the ECF system. Information on electronic filing procedures is available on the Court's website at www.mow.uscourts.gov or at http://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov. Attorneys are directed to refer to the CM/ECF Civil and Administrative Procedures Manual for instructions regarding the handling of exhibits. You may also contact Tracy Diefenbach, Operations Manager, at (816) 512-5055 or Robin Jones, Case Processing Team Lead, at 816-512-5062 with questions related to obtaining a CM/ECF account and/or for instructions on electronic filing. (Moore, Terri) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - Parties shall file submissions formally notifying the Court of their suggestions for selection of lead counsel, members of committees of counsel, etc. Any submission as to the organization of such counsel shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after receipt of this Order, and any submissions responding thereto shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after the notification is filed. The Court will subsequently rule on selection of lead counsel. Parties directed to meet and confer to develop a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan, which shall be filed with the Court on or before December 8, 2014. If the parties cannot agree on particular aspects of the Proposed Plan, they should file a statement indicating the aspects upon which they disagree and setting forth their respective positions. An initial Scheduling Hearing will be held on December 15, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Signed on October 22, 2014 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Moore, Terri) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2014: # 1 Amended Order of 11-6-14) (Moore, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSFER ORDER from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: MDL 2567. The case is assigned to the Honorable Gary A. Fenner. (Jones, Robin) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 384 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?