Doe v. Miami-Dade County
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-23933

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 6, 2019 at 12:45 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Florida Action Committee, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2017 Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2017 Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Florida, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Boaz Tilley +1 786 363 2711 dtilley@aclufl.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2017 Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Buskey +1 212 284 7364 bbuskey@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2017 Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
No Logo John Doe #2, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2017 Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/05/2017 Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
No Logo JOHN DOE 3, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space VALERIE JONAS +1 305 527 6465 valeriejonas77@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Services of Greater Miami

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Martin Hearne +1 305 438 2403 +5735 573 573 5800 jhearne@legalservicesmiami.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
No Logo John Doe #4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VALERIE JONAS +1 305 527 6465 valeriejonas77@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Florida, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Boaz Tilley +1 786 363 2711 dtilley@aclufl.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Buskey +1 212 284 7364 bbuskey@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Services of Greater Miami

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Martin Hearne +1 305 438 2403 +5735 573 573 5800 jhearne@legalservicesmiami.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
No Logo John Doe #5, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VALERIE JONAS +1 305 527 6465 valeriejonas77@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Florida, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Boaz Tilley +1 786 363 2711 dtilley@aclufl.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Buskey +1 212 284 7364 bbuskey@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Services of Greater Miami

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Martin Hearne +1 305 438 2403 +5735 573 573 5800 jhearne@legalservicesmiami.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
No Logo John Doe #6, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VALERIE JONAS +1 305 527 6465 valeriejonas77@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Florida, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Boaz Tilley +1 786 363 2711 dtilley@aclufl.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Buskey +1 212 284 7364 bbuskey@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Services of Greater Miami

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Martin Hearne +1 305 438 2403 +5735 573 573 5800 jhearne@legalservicesmiami.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
No Logo John Doe #7, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VALERIE JONAS +1 305 527 6465 valeriejonas77@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Florida, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Boaz Tilley +1 786 363 2711 dtilley@aclufl.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Buskey +1 212 284 7364 bbuskey@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezekiel Reifler Edwards +1 212 549 2610 +1 212 549 2651 eedwards@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Services of Greater Miami

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Martin Hearne +1 305 438 2403 +5735 573 573 5800 jhearne@legalservicesmiami.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 340

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Gbana Abudu +1 786 363 2707 nabudu@aclufl.org
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bajger John.Bajger@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Miami Dade County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dade County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Beny Valdes +1 305 375 5620 michael.valdes@miamidade.gov
No Logo Sunny Ukenye, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (220) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 184 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 175 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail, 174 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. US Mail returned for: Danielle Marie Contini. Updated address found and document resent to new address. Law Offices of D D Archer P APO Box 2186Minneola, FL 34755-2186 (pgz) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Statement of: Response by Miami-Dade County re 178 Memorandum (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephone Conference held on 11/29/2018. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes. (ac00) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MEMORANDUM in Support by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting in part 176 Motion for Extension of Time. Both parties' post-trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are due Tuesday, 11/27/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Valdes, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 166 Bench Trial - Held, 165 Bench Trial - Held, 162 Bench Trial - Begun,. US Mail returned for: Daniel Rowinsky Quintian. Updated address found and document resent to new address. Legal Services of Greater Miami, Inc.Legal Services of Greater Miami4343 W Flagler St Ste 100Miami, FL 33134-1585 (pgz) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 172 Motion for Extension of Time to File Post-Trial findings of fact ad Conclusions of Law. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            TRIAL EXHIBITS A, B, D-M, O-AAA by Miami-Dade County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - MDPD Herald Insert (Aug 2006), # 2 Exhibit B - MDPD Offense Incident Report Re: Doe #5, # 3 Exhibit D - FDLE Registration Form (Jan 22, 2006), # 4 Exhibit E - Composite of FDLE Printout, # 5 Exhibit G - FDOC Probation Affidavit (Oct 19, 2004), # 6 Exhibit H - FDOC Violation Report (Oct 19, 2004), # 7 Exhibit I - Probation Warrant (Oct 28, 2004), # 8 Exhibit J - FDOC Amended Probation Affidavit (Dec 1, 2004), # 9 Exhibit K - FDOC Amended Violation Report (Dec 1, 2004), # 10 Exhibit L - FDOC 2nd Amended Probation Affidavit (Dec 7, 2006), # 11 Exhibit M - FDOC 2nd Amended Violation Report (Dec 7, 2006), # 12 Exhibit O - Judgment and Sentence F06-036668, # 13 Exhibit P - Handwritten Arithmetic and Chart of Housing, # 14 Exhibit Q - Listing of DOR Codes, # 15 Exhibit R - Miami Herald Article (Sept. 25, 2018), # 16 Exhibit S - Socia (2012), # 17 Exhibit T - DSM-5 Excerpt, # 18 Exhibit U - Walker (2001), # 19 Exhibit V - List Shown to Robert Berman, # 20 Exhibit W - E-mail from Martinez to Mallette (Mar 8, 2018), # 21 Exhibit X - Hanson Declaration in N.D. Ca. Case, # 22 Exhibit Y - Excerpt from Hanson (2002), # 23 Exhibit EE - Transcript (Jun 21, 2005), # 24 Exhibit FF - Transcript (Aug 17, 2005), # 25 Exhibit GG - Transcript (Nov 15, 2005), # 26 Exhibit HH - Transcript (Dec 10, 2009), # 27 Exhibit II - Transcript (Jan 21, 2010))(Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 11/21/2018 (Valdes, Michael)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                TRIAL EXHIBITS (Plaintiffs') 1-9, 14-18, 21-35 by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 omitted, # 11 omitted, # 12 omitted, # 13 omitted, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 omitted, # 20 omitted, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35)(Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying 168 Motion to Conform the Pleadings to the Evidence. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Bench Trial completed on 10/26/2018. Total time in court: 6 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Daniel Rowinsky Quintian, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION to conform pleading with the evidence by explicitly referencing an as-applied claim by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Tilley, Daniel)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Bench Trial held on 10/25/2018. Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Daniel Rowinsky Quintian, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Bench Trial held on 10/24/2018. Total time in court: 6 hour(s) : 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Daniel Rowinsky Quintian, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Bench Trial held on 10/23/2018. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 50 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Daniel Rowinsky Quintian, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 163 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Expert Witness Kelly Socia by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Hearne, Jeffrey)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Bench Trial held on 10/22/2018. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 55 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 10/22/2018. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 20 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Rowinsky Quintian, Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Attorney added: Daniel Rowinsky Quintian for John Doe #4, Daniel Rowinsky Quintian for John Doe #5 Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice of Supplemental Authority re Statute of Limitations by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM of Law on Statute of Limitations by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            TRIAL BRIEF by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephone Conference held on 10/19/2018. Total time in court: 7 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 154 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Bring Electronic Equipment
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 11/1/2018 (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Calendar Call held on 10/18/2018. Total time in court: 1 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 of filing Doe #7 Trial Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Trial Declaration of Doe #7) (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              PRETRIAL STIPULATION by Miami-Dade County (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Trial Exhibits)(Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2018 re 122 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Miami-Dade County. Total time in court: 25 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Bernard Pastor, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ac00) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  REPORT REGARDING Proposed Procedures for Bench Trial by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bernard Pastor on behalf of Miami-Dade County. Attorney Bernard Pastor added to party Miami-Dade County(pty:dft). (Pastor, Bernard) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re 122 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2018 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 9/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephone Conference held on 9/13/2018. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (la00) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by George Knox. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Knox, George) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Statement of: in Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Material Facts by Miami-Dade County re 137 Statement (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Miami-Dade County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Minutes from Committee Meeting, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Memo on Animal Service Unit, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Resolution No. R-893-05)(Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion. Responses due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 9/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 138 Response in Opposition to Motion by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. Replies due by 9/5/2018. (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Statement of: Material Facts and Response to Defendant's Statement of Material Facts by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 re 123 Statement,,,, (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 of Filing Exhibits for Response to Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert Report - Greer, # 2 Exhibit Expert Report - Harris, # 3 Exhibit Expert Report - Harris Rebuttal, # 4 Exhibit Expert Report - Levenson, # 5 Exhibit Expert Report - Levenson Rebuttal, # 6 Exhibit Expert Report - Socia Amended, # 7 Exhibit Expert Report - Socia Rebuttal, # 8 Affidavit Berman Declaration, # 9 Affidavit Noriega Declaration, # 10 Transcripts Imbrone Deposition, # 11 Transcripts Mallette Deposition, # 12 Transcripts Poveda Deposition, # 13 Transcripts Sarria Deposition, # 14 Exhibit NYT article, # 15 Exhibit Ellman article, # 16 Exhibit HAND Spreadsheet, # 17 Exhibit Poveda / Mallette emails, # 18 Transcripts Commission Hearing Transcript, # 19 Transcripts Book Deposition) (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 134 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment may be 27 pages. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/28/2018. (la00) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 File Excess Pages
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Summary Judgment by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hearne, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER striking 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/15/2018. (la00) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 122 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 8/29/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/15/2018. (la00) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 122 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hearne, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Striking by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                        STRICKEN per DE# 129, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 122 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hearne, Jeffrey) Modified text on 8/14/2018 (jas).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 121 Unopposed Motion to Seal Accompanying Exhibits to Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Material Facts. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (nc)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Statement of: Material Facts (CORRECTED) by Miami-Dade County (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 120 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Statement of Material Facts. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Statement of: Material Facts by Miami-Dade County (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Ordinance 05-206, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Greenfield 1997, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Snyder 2000, # 4 Exhibit 4 - NCVS 2016, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Dr. Harris, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Youth Victimization, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Abel 1987, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Beck 1990, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Prentky 1997, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Prentky Research Report, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Expert Report of Dr. McCleary, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Bynum 2001, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Langevin 2004, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Walker 2001, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Page 2001, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Deposition of Dr. Levenson, # 17 Exhibit 17 - MDCPS Transportation Handbook, # 18 Exhibit 18 - SRTS Resolution, # 19 Exhibit 19 - SRTS 2017 Plan, # 20 Exhibit 20 - SRTS 2014 Plan, # 21 Exhibit 21 - SRTS 2015 Plan, # 22 Exhibit 22 - 2008 SPOU Report, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Ordinance 10-01, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Declaration of Josh Brashears, # 25 Exhibit 25 - 2010 Census Information (Miami-Dade))(Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 8/22/2018 (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Motion to Seal (Public)
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Seal Accompanying Exhibits to Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Material Facts per Local Rule 5.4 by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Statement of Material Facts by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 112 Motion for Leave to Expand the Number of Interrogatories. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 7/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 7/19/2018. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Jeffrey Martin Hearne, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Diane Peede, 305-523-5048 / Diane_Peede@flsd.uscourts.gov. (la00) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 re 115 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Filing of Proposed Interrogatories) (Attachments: # 1 First Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Proposed Additional Interrogatories) (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 112 MOTION for Leave to Expand the Number of Interrogatories filed by Miami-Dade County. Replies due by 7/23/2018. (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on 112 MOTION for Leave to Expand the Number of Interrogatories :. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2018 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 7/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Expand the Number of Interrogatories previously set for July 18, 2018 is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/13/2018. (nsy) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court will a hold a telephonic hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Expand the Number of Interrogatories [DE 112] on July 18, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. Counsel should use the following dial-in information: telephone number: 1-888-684-8852; access code: 9675400 and security code: 5890. Defendant Miami-Dade County may file a response to the Motion, not to exceed two (2) pages in length, no later than July 16, 2018. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2018 04:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/12/2018. (nsy) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Expand the Number of Interrogatories by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Hearne, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to MediateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 110 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Continue Mediation And Extend The Deadline For Mediator To File A Report. Mediation Deadline 8/17/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 6/25/2018. (vmz) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hearne, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephone Conference held on 6/13/2018. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Boaz Tilley, Brandon Buskey, Michael Beny Valdes (la00) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 107 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 5/7/2018. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/5/2018, Entered: 5/5/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Miami-Dade County. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to MediateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate. The deadline for mediator to file a report has been extended to 6/22/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/30/2018. (la00) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/21/2018, Entered: 4/21/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate
                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hearne, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re-Setting Trial and Calendar Call and denying 103 Motion for Extension of Time. Bench Trial set for 10/22/2018 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Calendar Call set for 10/17/2018 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/9/2018. (la00)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 4/20/2018 (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Scheduling Mediation before George Knox. Mediation Hearing set for 4/19/2018 09:30 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/16/2018. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): George F. Knox. (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re 99 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties/mediator. (jas) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 of Proposed Mediation Order (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE-SETTING TRIAL AND CALENDAR CALL: Bench Trial set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Calendar Call set for 6/20/2018 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 2/9/2018. (kpe) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified text on 2/9/2018 (kpe).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Mediation and Dispositive Motions ( Responses due by 2/22/2018) by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 95 Motion to Drop Plaintiff John Doe #3. ORDERED that Plaintiff John Doe //3 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to restyle the caption to read: John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, and John Doe #7, Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/25/2018. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Motion to Drop Plaintiff John Doe #3 by John Doe #3. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abudu, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE-SETTING TRIAL AND CALENDAR CALL: (Jury Trial set for 4/30/2018 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 4/25/2018 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.). Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/28/2017. (jas) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Trial ( Responses due by 12/6/2017), Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Other Corresponding Deadlines by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie Jonas on behalf of John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7. Attorney Valerie Jonas added to party John Doe #3(pty:pla), Attorney Valerie Jonas added to party John Doe #4(pty:pla), Attorney Valerie Jonas added to party John Doe #5(pty:pla), Attorney Valerie Jonas added to party John Doe #6(pty:pla), Attorney Valerie Jonas added to party John Doe #7(pty:pla). (Jonas, Valerie) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Miami-Dade County filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7.(mc) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 88 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Join Additional Parties. The Second Amended Complaint attached to the Motion shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. Defendants shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint by October 26, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/5/2017. (mc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abudu, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Miami-Dade County (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by John Doe #1, John Doe #3 (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Martin Hearne on behalf of John Doe #3. Attorney Jeffrey Martin Hearne added to party John Doe #3(pty:pla). (Hearne, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Bench Trial set for 3/19/2018 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 3/14/2018 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Discovery Matters Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 5/19/2017. (yha) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified text to reflect correct Trial Date on 5/22/2017 (yha). (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Miami-Dade County (Valdes, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Status Conference held on 5/1/2017. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Brandon Buskey, Michael Beny Valdes, Oren Rosenthal. Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards, 305-523-5499 / Lisa_Edwards@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ah01) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA. AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, AND REMANDED. We reverse the district courts grant of the County's motion to dismiss as to Doe #1 and Doe #3's ex post facto challenges and remand for further proceedings re 68 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Doe #1, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #2, John Doe #3; Date Issued: 4/27/2017; USCA Case Number: 15-14336-BB. (apz) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Status Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/1/2017 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/28/2017. (ah01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 68 Notice of Appeal,, Appeal No. 15-14336-BB. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (amb) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA. This appeal is hereby DISMISSED as to June 23, 2015order denying the Rule 60(b) motion but MAY PROCEED as to the April 3, 2015 order dismissing the amended complaint with prejudice re 68 Notice of Appeal,, filed by John Doe #1, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #2, John Doe #3. USCA #15-14336-BB (amb) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 10-16-15 by Daniel B. Tilley, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov re 74 Transcript Information Form, 68 Notice of Appeal, 75 Court Reporter Acknowledgment. (gpz) (Entered: 11/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion For Relief From Court's Order held on 06-12-15 before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck, 1-30 pages, re: 68 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. USCA Case Number: 15-14336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/29/2016. (gpz) (Entered: 11/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 74 Transcript Information Form, 68 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript 11-29-15. USCA number 15-14336. (gpz) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc. re 68 Notice of Appeal,,. Hearing transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by Daniel B. Tilley. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript(s) ordered on: 10-5-2015 by Daniel Tilley, Esq. has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Dawn Whitmarsh, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Whitmarsh@flsd.uscourts.gov re 71 Court Reporter Acknowledgment. (dwh) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of motion to dismiss held on 3-31-2015 before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck, 1-62 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Whitmarsh, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Whitmarsh@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2016. (dwh) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 70 Transcript Information Form,. Court Reporter: Dawn Whitmarsh, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Whitmarsh@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript 10-16-2015. USCA number 15-14336. (dwh) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc. re 68 Notice of Appeal,,. Hearing transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by Daniel B. Tilley. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 68 Notice of Appeal,, filed by John Doe #1, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #2, John Doe #3. Date received by USCA: 9/25/15. USCA Case Number: 15-14336-B. (hh) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appeal as to 67 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 60 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,, by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-8111055. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 61 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 6/23/2015. (swe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2015 re 61 MOTION for relief from Court's Order filed by John Doe #1, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #2, John Doe #3. Order to follow. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov (swe) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS NOTICE of courtroom change. The hearing set for Friday, June 12, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Paul C. Huck 63 will be held in Courtroom 13-3, 400 N. Miami Ave., Miami, FL 33128, and not courtroom 13-2, as previously noticed. All other details of the hearing remain unchanged. (swe) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION for relief from Court's Order 60 dismissing this action with prejudice re 60 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,, filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc.. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 61 MOTION for relief from Court's Order 60 dismissing this action with prejudice re 60 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,, : Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2015 09:20 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 5/21/2015. (mle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion For Relief From Judgment re 61 MOTION for relief from Court's Order 60 dismissing this action with prejudice re 60 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,, filed by Miami-Dade County. Replies due by 5/21/2015. (Valdes, Michael) Modified text on 5/12/2015 (yar). (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for relief from Court's Order 60 dismissing this action with prejudice re 60 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,, by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit County facilities enforced as "schools", # 2 Exhibit 300 transient individuals, # 3 Exhibit Returned River Park evictees)(Tilley, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Miami-Dade County, 39 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/3/2015. (asl) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Supplemental Authority by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #3 (Abudu, Nancy) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2015 re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Miami-Dade County, 39 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Order to follow. Court Reporter: Dawn Whitmarsh, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Whitmarsh@flsd.uscourts.gov (swe) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of RESCHEDULING Hearing on 39 MOTION TO DISMISS and 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 . The Hearing previously set for 12 p.m. HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO BEGIN AT 11:45 a.m., Tuesday, March 31, 2015, in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Attorneys calling in to the hearing may refer to the prior notice of hearing 53 for call-in instructions. (swe) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental MEMORANDUM to re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) Modified text on 3/31/2015 (yar). (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Requiring Response: Defendant Miami-Dade County shall file a supplemental memorandum as directed in the attached order. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/27/2015. (swe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of RESCHEDULING Hearing on 39 MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint and 29 MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint. The hearing previously set for 10:30 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED for 3/31/2015 12:00 PM (NOON) in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Attorneys calling in to the hearing may refer to the prior notice of hearing 53 for call-in instructions. (swe) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on 39 MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 29 MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Argument set for 3/31/2015 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/25/2015. (swe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of Motion re 46 First MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time , specifically Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. (Bajger, John) Modified text on 3/18/2015 (yar). (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of Its Motion re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) Modified text on 3/9/2015 (yar). (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Florida Department of Corrections' and Sunny Ukenye's Reply Memorandum in support of their Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before March 16, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/6/2015. (swe) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re 46 First MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time by Florida Department of Corrections. Responses due by 3/23/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bajger, John) Modified text on 3/6/2015 (yar).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting 46 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Out of Time. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/3/2015. (mle) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss 29 Reply due by 3/6/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/3/2015. (mle) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion to DismissOut of Time by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc.. Attorney Nancy Gbana Abudu added to party John Doe #1(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy Gbana Abudu added to party John Doe #2(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy Gbana Abudu added to party John Doe #3(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy Gbana Abudu added to party Florida Action Committee, Inc.(pty:pla). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Ukenye and FDOC Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Abudu, Nancy) Modified text on 3/2/2015 (yar).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER lifting stay regarding Plaintiffs' vagueness claim, as suggested in Parties' Joint Status Report. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 2/24/2015. (mle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Paperless ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion 39 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Replies due by 3/2/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 2/24/2015. (mle) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT on Additional Discussions and Partial Stay by Miami-Dade County (Valdes, Michael) Modified text on 2/23/2015 (yar). (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Reply in Support of 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael) Modified text on 2/23/2015 (yar).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc.. Replies due by 2/23/2015. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Responses due by 2/23/2015 (Bajger, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion for Partial Stay and Briefing Schedule. Re: 29 MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Miami-Dade County. Status Report due by 2/20/2015. Responses due by 2/16/2015. Response to Amended Complaint due 2/6/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 2/2/2015. (ls) (Main Document 38 replaced on 2/3/2015) (ls). (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice to Filer re 36 Status Report. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events.Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (dgj) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Joint Motion for Partial Stay and Briefing Schedule by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #3 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilley, Daniel) Modified event type on 2/2/2015 (dgj). (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; 32 Motion to Stay. Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 01/15/2015. (yar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by Miami-Dade County (See image at DE 32 ).(yar) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerks Notice to Filer re 32 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Joint Status Report. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (yar) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Joint Status Report by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 2/2/2015 (Valdes, Michael) Modified to add missing event DE 33 Joint Status Report on 1/15/2015 (yar).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Status Conference held on 1/7/2015. Parties shall notify the Court by January 14 as to whether they wish to proceed with a mediator or arbitrator. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov (mle) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/7/2015. (mle) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS 25 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 1/23/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ordinance 05-206, # 2 Exhibit B - Ordinance 10-01, # 3 Exhibit C - Ordinance 10-67)(Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 1/15/2015 Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/31/2014. (mle) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: 12/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re 25 Amended Complaint by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Responses due by 1/16/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bajger, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/7/2015 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel from out of Miami-Dade County may appear telephonically. Call instructions are in the attached notice. (mle) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #3.(Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Stay Briefing Pending Plaintiffs' Filing of An Amended Complaint 23 . Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 21 22 are denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/15/2014. (mle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to stay consideration of pending motions to dismiss 21 22 until Plaintiffs file their amended complaint re 21 MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 22 MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Florida Action Committee, Inc.. (Tilley, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: 11/28/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Responses due by 12/15/2014 (Bajger, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Miami-Dade County. Responses due by 12/15/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ordinance No. 05-206, # 2 Exhibit B - Ordinance No. 10-01, # 3 Exhibit C - Ordinance No. 10-67)(Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Paperless ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Miami-Dade County shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before November 26, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/25/2014. (mle) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, by Miami-Dade County. (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Paperless ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer RE: Complaints. Miami-Dade County answer due 11/24/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/14/2014. (mle) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, by Miami-Dade County. Attorney Michael Beny Valdes added to party Miami-Dade County(pty:dft). (Valdes, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Paperless ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' responses or answers are due on or before November 28, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/12/2014. (mle) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiffs' complaint re 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, by Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Attorney John Bajger added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft), Attorney John Bajger added to party Sunny Ukenye(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bajger, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #3. Miami-Dade County served on 10/23/2014, answer due 11/13/2014. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/05/2014. (yar) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/05/2014. (yar) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ezekiel Edwards. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 89333. (ksa) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brandon Buskey. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 89334. (ksa) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #3. Sunny Ukenye served on 10/28/2014, answer due 11/18/2014. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe #3. Florida Department of Corrections served on 10/23/2014, answer due 11/13/2014. (Tilley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 10/23/2014 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS 1000 88762. (gp) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983, filed by John Doe, Florida Action Committee, Inc., 3 MOTION for Leave to File filed by John Doe,Florida Action Committee, Inc., 4 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by John Doe, Florida Action Committee, Inc., Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (jas) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Florida Department of Corrections, Miami-Dade County, Sunny Ukenye. (jas) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983, by John Doe(No. 1), John Doe(No. 2), Florida Action Committee, Inc., John Doe(No. 3) (jas) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously by John Doe(No. 1), John Doe(No. 2), John Doe(No. 3), Florida Action Committee, Inc.. (jas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck (jas) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Miami-Dade County, Florida Department of Corrections, Sunny Ukenye. Filing fee $ 400.00, filed by John Doe(No. 1), John Doe(No. 2),John Doe(No. 3), Florida Action Committee, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter)(jas) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Paperless Notice to Reset Hearing **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:45 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for both parties are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled hearing time so that the telephonic hearing may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign. State your name and enter the conference. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. (ac00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS NOTICE to Set Hearing Re. ECF No. 178 Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for both parties are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled hearing time so that the telephonic hearing may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign. State your name and enter the conference. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. (ac00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS NOTICE to Reset Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Bench Trial set for 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in **Courtroom 13-4** in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. (ac00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS NOTICE to Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for both parties are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled hearing time so that the telephonic hearing may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign. State your name and enter the conference. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. (ac00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS NOTICE Re. D.E. 104 **LOCATION CHANGE ONLY** Calendar Call set for 10/18/2018 at 10:30 AM and Bench Trial set for 10/22/2018 at 09:00 AM in **Courtroom 13-4** in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. (ac00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS NOTICE to Reset Hearings **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Calendar Call reset for 10/18/2018 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. For out-of-state counsel appearing by telephone, please take the following steps shortly before the scheduled hearing time so that the hearing may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852; Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign; Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign; State your name and enter the conference. (ac00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS NOTICE Re: D.E. 145 **LOCATION CHANGE ONLY** Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 9/21/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13-4 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. (ac00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS NOTICE to Set Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for both parties are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled conference time so that the telephonic conference may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852; Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign; Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign; State your name and enter the conference. (la00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS NOTICE to Reset Hearings: Calendar Call reset for 10/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. (la00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 128 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1241056)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 124 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1241056)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS NOTICE Set/Reset Hearings Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/13/2018 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for both parties are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled conference time so that the telephonic conference may begin promptly:Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign. State your name and enter the conference. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. (la00)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Answer Due Deadline: Miami-Dade County response due 10/26/2017 per DE 89 . (mc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Hearings Bench Trial reset for 3/19/2018 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. (yha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 68 Notice of Appeal,, Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reset Answer Due Deadline: Florida Department of Corrections response due 2/6/2015; Sunny Ukenye response due 2/6/2015. (ls) (per DE # 38 )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Responses due by 1/20/2015 Deadline is being extended as per hearing held on January 7, 2015. (mle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?