FDIC v. Richard Rippy
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2078

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 3:31 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 1380 - Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405270121
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                          ORDER filed [999473017] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/17/2014. Response brief due 01/30/2015 Copies to all parties. [14-2078] (AW)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-2078] (SLW)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant FDIC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999462328] [14-2078] Douglas Black
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Steven C. Morrison for FDIC.[999462255] [14-2078] Steven Morrison
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/03/2014. Response Brief due 01/05/2015 [14-2078] (AW)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant FDIC. [14-2078] Douglas Black
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ronald R. Glancz for Richard Allen Rippy.[999460644] [14-2078] Ronald Glancz
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Camden R. Webb for Dickson B. Bridger, Otto C. Buddy Burrell, Jr., Paul G. Burton, Frances Peter Fensel, Jr., James D. Hundley, Horace Thompson King, III, Richard Allen Rippy, Fredrick Willetts, III and Ottis Richard Wright, Jr..[999460318] [14-2078] Camden Webb
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James Scott Watson for FDIC.[999459670] [14-2078] James Watson
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Douglas A. Black for FDIC.[999459576] [14-2078] Douglas Black
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mary L. Wolff for FDIC.[999459573] [14-2078] Mary Wolff
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Dickson B. Bridger, Otto C. Buddy Burrell, Jr., Paul G. Burton, Frances Peter Fensel, Jr., James D. Hundley, Horace Thompson King, III, Richard Allen Rippy, Fredrick Willetts, III and Ottis Richard Wright, Jr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999453139] [14-2078] Thomas Gilbertsen
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Thomas E. Gilbertsen for Dickson B. Bridger, Otto C. Buddy Burrell, Jr., Paul G. Burton, Frances Peter Fensel, Jr., James D. Hundley, Horace Thompson King, III, Richard Allen Rippy, Fredrick Willetts, III and Ottis Richard Wright, Jr..[999453128] [14-2078] Thomas Gilbertsen
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 7:11-cv-00165-BO. Mailed to: Douglas A. Black, Mary L. Wolff, Ruth M. Allen, David W. Goewey, Kacy Lynn Hunt, Meredith L. Boylan, Ronald R. Glancz. [14-2078] (AW)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:11-cv-00165-BO. Case manager: AshleyWebb. [14-2078] (AW)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 331 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?