Madore v. Carrier
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10289-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:35 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Theresa Madore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas D. Kennedy +1 978 323 4644 +1 978 970 0521 tkennedyesq@yahoo.com
Space Michael G. Zaim +1 508 459 2598
No Logo Ohio State Life Insurance Company,, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Ohio State Life Insurance Company,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
Space William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
No Logo Robert N. Carrier, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Hatem, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Hatem +1 617 406 4500 dhatem@donovanhatem.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClairRyan-VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy M. Reimer +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 nancy.reimer@leclairryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
Space William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
No Logo Theresa Madore, Counter-Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 2/11/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 3/19/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Greenberg, Rebecca)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Robert N. Carrier Jr., Theresa Madore, Ohio State Life Insurance Company. (Abaid, Kim)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 state court record
      STATE COURT Record. (Rynne, Michelle)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] STIPULTION/MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/3/04 to File Answer by Robert N. Carrier Jr., Theresa Madore. (Greenberg, Rebecca)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
          STIPULTION/MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/3/04 to File Answer by Robert N. Carrier Jr., Theresa Madore.(Rynne, Michelle)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Theresa Madore by Ohio State Life Insurance Company.(Rynne, Michelle)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2004 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Greenberg, Rebecca)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Notice of Removal
                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Middlesex Superior Court, case number 04-0210. $ 150, receipt number 53774, filed by Robert N. Carrier Jr., Ohio State Life Insurance Company.(Rynne, Michelle)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Rynne, Michelle)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 68 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?