Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00467

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 11:53 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/27/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 10/27/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/27/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/04/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/27/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 10/27/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/27/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/04/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline A Bader +1 913 777 5618 +1 913 777 5601 carrie.bader@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Steven Wayne Hartsell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER STAYING CASE. This matter is hereby STAYED pending further motion of any party demonstrating good cause to lift the stay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case, and this action is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. All pending motions are denied as moot without prejudice to re-filing once the stay is lifted. Any party may request the Court lift the stay for good cause, and the Court will do so only upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/06/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 17 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv462 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. A uniform Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order shall govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and, if necessary, file objections to the previously agreed to Docket Control and Discovery Orders filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. (PR 3-4(a)) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. (PR 3-3 and 3-4(b)) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. (PR 3-3 and 3-4) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. (PR 3-1 and 3-2) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: None
                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 17 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/13. cc:attys 1-17-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                      International Return of Service Executed as to Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. on 10/22/2012, by personal service through the Hague Convention process. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Markman Hearing set for 1-30-2014 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/12. cc:attys 12-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 19 Joint Motion to modify briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2014. Jury Selection set for 5/4/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation Completion due by 7/26/2013. Markman Hearing set for 1/20/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. David Folsom added as mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER entered. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. The Deadline to Submit Discovery Order and Docket Control Order is extended to 12-05-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File DISCOVERY ORDER and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/14/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/12. cc:attys 10-18-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent None for Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd..(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caroline A Bader for Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric A Buresh for Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Megan J Redmond for Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft shall have to 10-15-2012 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/12. cc:attys 8-22-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3690151.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,857,067)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?