District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Texas Western District Court Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit United States Supreme Court

WickFire, LLC v. TriMax Media, LLC, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00034-SS
District Judge Sam Sparks, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 3, 2021 at 5:26 PM DT (2.3 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wickfire, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Lee Bernell +1 512 494 3644 +1 800 494 3970 ben.bernell@bgllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Andrew Cavazos +1 512 494 3633 +1 512 479 3933 ed.cavazos@bgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Christopher Nash +1 512 472 7800 +1 512 479 3910 brian.nash@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Denko Coburn & Lauff LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Dalton Coburn +1 512 906 2074 coburn@dcllegal.com
v.
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by cbsattorneys.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwen E. Bhella +1 214 981 9200 +1 214 981 9203 gbhella@cbsattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Ann Brown +1 214 999 4887 sabrown@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry M. Golden +1 214 999 4746 +1 214 999 4667 bgolden@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Lawrence Loh +1 214 999 4391 +1 214 999 3391 ploh@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S Vogel +1 214 999 4422 +1 214 999 3422 pvogel@gardere.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John A. Price

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Aley Price +1 972 556 0541 +1 972 432 8729 japrice@travelhost.com
No Logo Wickfire, LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo TriMax Media, Inc., Counter Plaintiff
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (427) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Telephone Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Order Lifting Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Release of Funds
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018
            ORDER DISMISSING 409 Motion to Disqualify Counsel without prejudice to refiling. This Court has no jurisdiction in this case as the case is pending in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (lt)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 412 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [409] Opposed MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Katharine Atlas) filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Josh West)(Golden, Barry)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None USCA Judgment/Mandate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 response in opposition to motion
                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [409] Opposed MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Katharine Atlas) filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Attachment
                        ATTACHMENT to [409] Opposed MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Katharine Atlas) by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Golden, Barry)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 409 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                          Opposed MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Katharine Atlas) by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Golden, Barry)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 408 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
                          Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (klw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 USCA Order (NOT Judgment/Mandate)
                            ORDER of USCA re Notice of Appeal: ORDER that appellants opposed motion to vacate the District Court judgment is CARRIED with the case; ORDER that appellants opposed motion dismiss the appeal for subject matter jurisdiction is CARRIED with the case; ORDER that appellants opposed motion to beawarded costs on the appeal is CARRIED with the case; ORDER that appellants opposed motion to be awarded fees and costs in the District Court on remand is CARRIED with the case. (klw)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically
                              CORRECTED Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions here (klw)(Clerk note that CD Exhibits A-2, A-3 and LL-3 are on file in the clerk's office.)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically
                                CORRECTED Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions here (klw)(Clerk note that CD Exhibits A-2, A-3 and LL-3 are on file in the clerk's office.)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Transcript Filed
                                  CORRECTED Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 2, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 4 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2018, Appeal Record due by 10/20/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Transcript Filed
                                    CORRECTED Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 1, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 3 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2018, Appeal Record due by 10/20/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Transcript Filed
                                      CORRECTED Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 31, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 2 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2018, Appeal Record due by 10/20/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Transcript Filed
                                        CORRECTED Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 30, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 1 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2018, Appeal Record due by 10/20/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 USCA Order (NOT Judgment/Mandate)
                                          ORDER of USCA (certified copy) GRANTING motion to supplement the record on appeal with corrected transcripts; GRANTING motion to withdraw preliminary copies of transcripts from the record on appeal re Notice of Appeal (jf)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 response
                                            RESPONSE to [399] Notice (Other) by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Laura Woodruff, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration of Josh West)(Golden, Barry)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Notice - other
                                              NOTICE of Supplemental Information Regarding Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Order on Motion to RedactTranscriptCourt Filing
                                                ORDER DENYING [398] Motion to Redact re [389], [390], [392], [391] Transcript. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017, Terminated: 9/5/2017 Motion to Redact Transcript
                                                  MOTION to Redact re [389], [390], [392], [391] Transcript by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Redaction Request, # (2) Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 Redaction Request - Transcript
                                                    Transcript Redaction Request re [389], [390], [392], [391] Transcript by attorney Barry M. Golden. (Golden, Barry)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER GRANTING TriMax's Unopposed [395] Motion to Defer Attorney's Fees issues. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017, Terminated: 7/31/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Defer Attorneys' Fees Issues re [382] Reply to Response to Motion, [374] Bill of Costs, [381] Response in Opposition to Motion, [375] Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Powell, Sidney)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time re TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER GRANTING Trimax's [393] Motion to Extend Deadlines. The new deadline for parties to submit requests for redactions or corrections to the transcripts of February 5, 2016 (Dkt 388), January 30, 2017 (Dkt 389), January 31, 2017 (Dkt 390), February 1, 2017 (Dkt 391), and February 2, 2017 (Dkt 392) is August 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/20/2017 Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file redaction request re [389], [390], [392], [391], [388] Transcript by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically
                                                              Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions here (klw) (Clerk note that CD Exhibits A-2, A-3 and LL-3 are on file in the clerk's office.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 2, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 4 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/20/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017, Appeal Record due by 7/14/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                  Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 1, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 3 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/20/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017, Appeal Record due by 7/14/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                    Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 31, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 2 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/20/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017, Appeal Record due by 7/14/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                      Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 30, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Trial On The Merits, Volume 1 of 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/20/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017, Appeal Record due by 7/14/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                        Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 5, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/20/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017, Appeal Record due by 7/14/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff for dates of 02/05/16 and 01/30/17-02/02/17. Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference and Trial. (klw)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Order on Motion for BondCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING TriMax's Unopposed [384] Motion to Approve Supersedes Bond and Extend Stay of Execution Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                              Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 27, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Docket Call. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/2/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2017, Appeal Record due by 5/30/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017, Terminated: 5/18/2017 Motion for Bond
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Bond to Approve Supersedeas Bond and Extend Stay of Execution Pending Appeal by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Powell, Sidney)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [375] Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [375] Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [375] Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed)
                                                                                        Appeal of Final Judgment [372] by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-9517738) (Powell, Sidney)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Powell on behalf of TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. Attorney Sidney Powell added to party TriMax Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party WREI, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party WREI, Inc.(pty:3pp), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party WREI, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party Josh West(pty:3pp), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party Josh West(pty:cc), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party Josh West(pty:dft), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party Laura Woodruff(pty:3pp), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party Laura Woodruff(pty:cc), Attorney Sidney Powell added to party Laura Woodruff(pty:dft) (Powell, Sidney)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Notice of appeal
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL following [380] Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by TriMax Media, Inc., TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0542-9517738. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (jf)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Trimax's Unopposed [377] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages to 20 and GRANTING their Motion for Extension of Time to File to Wickfire's [375] Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until 04/27/17. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017, Terminated: 4/17/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Extend Deadline by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File on 4/17/2017 (klw).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Joint [373] Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 - Settlement Correspondence, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Katharine Atlas, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Supporting Documentation, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Expert Invoices, # (5) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                      BILL OF COSTS by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Itemized Costs and Documentation)(Atlas, Katharine) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/7/2017 as originl attachment errored when trying to open it) (klw).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017, Terminated: 4/7/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Wickfire against Defendants. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [344] Unoppsed Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's [363] Motion for Entry of Final Judgment; DENYING Defendants TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, and Laura Woodruff's [364] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [364] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Suggestion of Remittitur, and New Trial filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [363] Opposed MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [364] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Suggestion of Remittitur, and New Trial filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [363] Opposed MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Attachment
                                                                                                                      ATTACHMENT (Proposed Order) to [364] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Suggestion of Remittitur, and New Trial by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West. (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                        DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Barry Golden: re [364] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Suggestion of Remittitur, and New Trial. Proposed Orders are Required when a non-dispositive Motion (Motion for New Trial) is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (klw)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 364 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017, Terminated: 3/23/2017 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Suggestion of Remittitur, and New Trial by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017, Terminated: 3/23/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                              Transcript filed of Proceedings held on October 3, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 2/27/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2017, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Exhibit List for [351], [352], [353] and [354] Jury Trial. (Attachments: # (1) Offfered/Admitted Exhibit List, # (2) Demonstrative Exhibit Lists)(klw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2017: # (3) Pltfs Exhibits 1-28, 44-46, # (4) Pltfs Exhibits 47, 55-57, 62-68, 78, 104-105, # (5) Pltfs Exhibit 121, # (6) Pltfs Exhibit 122, # (7) Pltfs Exhibits 125-126, # (8) Pltfs Exhibits 127-128, 133, 135-136, 142, 186, 202, 208-212, 228, 236, 238, 244-248, 250, 254, 263, # (9) Pltfs Exhibits 264-270a, # (10) Pltfs Exhibits 270b, 281, 292, 294, 295, # (11) Defts Exhibits 5-7, 11, 14, 31, # (12) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 1, # (13) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 2, # (14) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 3, # (15) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 4, # (16) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 5, # (17) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 6, # (18) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 7, # (19) Defts Exhibit 33 Part 8, # (20) Defts Exhibit 38, # (21) Defts Exhibits 40-42, 45-47, 52, 57, 62, 78, 110, 120, 142, # (22) Defts Exhibit 144, # (23) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 1, # (24) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 2, # (25) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 3, # (26) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 4, # (27) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 5, # (28) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 6, # (29) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 7, # (30) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 8, # (31) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 9, # (32) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 10, # (33) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 11, # (34) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 12, # (35) Defts Exhibit 145 Part 13, # (36) Defts Exhibits 146-160, 162-163, 165-166, 171, 175, # (37) Defts Exhibit 196, # (38) Defts Exhibits 202, 205, 208-209, 211, 217, 220, 224, 234-235, 246, 259, 273-275, # (39) Defts Exhibits 280, 282-283, 286, # (40) Defts Exhibit 11 Part 1, # (41) Defts Exhibit 11 Part 2, # (42) Defts Exhibit 11 Part 3, # (43) Defts Exhibits 290, 292, 298, 304-305, 309, 349, 346-350, # (44) Defts Exhibits 351-354, 364, 368, 370, 372-373, 378, 380, 384, # (45) Plaintiffs Demonstrative Exhibits, # (46) Defendants Demonstrative Exhibits) (klw).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 witness list
                                                                                                                                  Witness List for [351], [352], [353] and [354] Jury Trial.(klw)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 jury verdict
                                                                                                                                    JURY VERDICT (Redacted Version) filed. Unredacted Jury Verdict Sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002.(klw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # (1) Unredacted Verdict Form) (klw).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Jury Note (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                      JURY NOTE 3 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (klw)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Jury Note (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                        JURY NOTE 2 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (klw)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Jury Note (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                          JURY NOTE 1 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (klw)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Court's Charge/Instructions to Jury
                                                                                                                                            Charge of the Court for [351], [352], [353] and [354] Jury Trial.(klw)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Jury Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Jury Trial completed on 2/2/2017. Verdicte rendered. Jury dismissed. Proposed Findings of Fact due 02/14/17. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Jury Trial held on 2/1/2017. Evidence presented. Jury trial continued to 02/02/07 at 8:30; Jury to return at 1:30 p.m. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Jury Trial held on 1/31/2017. Evidence presented. Continued to 02/01/17 at 8:30 a.m. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Jury Trial BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Jury Trial begun on 1/30/2017. Evidence presented. Trial continued to 01/31/17 at 8:30 a.m. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF Re Lanham Act Jury Instruction by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Docket CallCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Docket Call held on 1/27/2017. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Objections to TriMax Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit Amended Jury Instructions, # (3) Exhibit Amended Verdict Form, # (4) Exhibit Agreed Voir Dire Statement, # (5) Exhibit Amended Deposition Designations & Objections, # (6) Exhibit Amended and Supplemental Exhibit List)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Voir Dire by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - One Paragraph Summary for Voir Dire, # (2) Exhibit B - Exhibit List, # (3) Exhibit C - Witness List, # (4) Exhibit D - Objections to Wickfire's Exhibit List, # (5) Exhibit E - Objections to Wickfire's Witnesses, # (6) Exhibit F - Verdict Form, # (7) Exhibit G - Jury Instructions, # (8) Exhibit H - Voir Dire Quesions, # (9) Exhibit I - Rebuttal Deposition Designations)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [343] Motion for Alejandra Salinas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brown, Hall and Wickfire, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017, Terminated: 3/23/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017, Terminated: 1/25/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexie G. White for Alejandra Salinas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9225514) by on behalf of Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(White, Lexie)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Objections to Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit Objections to Deposition Designations, # (3) Exhibit Amended and Supplemental Exhibit List)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - TriMax's Amended Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit - TriMax's Objections to Wickfire's Exhibits, # (3) Exhibit - TriMax's Objections to Wickfire's Witnesses and Depo Designations, # (4) Exhibit - TriMax's Supplemental Designation)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/14/2017, Entered: 1/14/2017 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - Proposed Voir Dire Questions, # (2) Exhibit - Proposed Jury Instructions, # (3) Exhibit - Proposed Verdict Form, # (4) Exhibit - Exhibit List, # (5) Exhibit - Witness List, # (6) Exhibit - Deposition Designations of Tiffany Jordan, # (7) Exhibit - Deposition Designations of Jennifer Jenkins, # (8) Exhibit - Deposition Designations of Chris Stroud, # (9) Exhibit - One Paragraph Contentions)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Trial Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit Deposition Designations, # (3) Exhibit Proposed Jury Instructions, # (4) Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form for Wickfire Claims, # (5) Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form for TriMax Claims)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DISMISSING Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC's [334] Motion in Limine (Omnibus). ORDER reminding the parties to make timely objections to the tender of physical evidence and to oral testimony. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff's [285] Motion for Adverse Jury Instruction; DENYING without prejudice Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC's [290] Motion to exclude Testimony of Dr. Michael Shamos; DENYING without prejudice TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff's [296] Motion in Limine Regarding Testimony of Mary Walker; DISMISSING TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff's [297] Motion in Limine for Exclusion of AMEX Documents; DISMISSING TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff's [299] Motion in Limine to Exclude Google Emails; DISMISSING TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff's [300] Motion in Limine for Exclusion of AT&T Documents; DISMISSING Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC's [304] Motion for Scheduling Order re Motions in Limine; DISMISSING TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff's [308] Motion in Limine to Exclude 1QM Evidence; DISMISSING TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff's [322] Motion in Limine for Exclusion of Miscellaneous Items; DENYING without prejudice Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC's [330] Motion to exclude Testimony of Brent Bersin. The Court will simply not entertain any further motions in this case. Theparties are ORDERED to comply with this Court's order regarding docket call with the required filings. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant WickFire LLC and Third Party Defendants Chester Hall and Jonathan Browns Unopposed [331] Motion for Leave to Seal Exhibit in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of Brent Bersin. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [322] Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of Miscellaneous Items filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [332] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017, Terminated: 1/10/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document, # (2) Sealed Document, # (3) Sealed Document, # (4) Sealed Document, # (5) Sealed Document, # (6) Proposed Order) (Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Brent Bersin by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2017: # (2) SEALED Exhibits) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff WickFire and Third Party Defendants Chet Halland Jon Brown's Unopposed [319] Motion to Seal Exhibits in Support of their Response to TriMax's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [300] Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of AT&T Documents filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [299] Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude Google Emails filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [308] Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude 1QM Evidence filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (CORRECTED) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Golden, Barry) Modified on 1/6/2017 to modify text (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff WickFire and Third Party Defendants Chet Halland Jon Brown's Unopposed [324] Motion to Seal Exhibits in Support of their Response to TriMax's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/5/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3 - AdWords Logins, # (2) Proposed Order) (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 323 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [300] Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of AT&T Documents filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - AT&T Production, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Fraudulent Account Change History Excerpt, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Change History Logins (Sealed), # (4) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2017: # (5) Sealed Exhibit 3) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of Miscellaneous Items by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) A)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [308] Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude 1QM Evidence filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [299] Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude Google Emails filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Excerpts from Dr. Shamos 4-1 Report, # (2) Exhibit B - Excerpts from Dr. Shamos 7-1 Report, # (3) Exhibit C - Excerpts from Dr. Shamos Depo Transcript - previously filed under seal at ECF No. 291-1, # (4) Exhibit D - Google Declaration, # (5) Exhibit E - Support Ticket Email, # (6) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017, Terminated: 1/9/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Jenkins Email, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Jordan Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Kenkins Deposition Excerpts, # (4) Proposed Order) (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [308] Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude 1QM Evidence filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 (Filed Under Seal), # (2) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2017: # (3) Sealed Exhibits) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [297] Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of AMEX Documents filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [302] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document; GRANTING [309] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [291] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [303] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [304] Opposed MOTION for Scheduling Order re Motions in Limine filed by Counter Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Counter Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [297] Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of AMEX Documents filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC (Amended) [302] Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Sealed documents are not served by CM/ECF and require service to parties by other means. File an amended Certificate of Service as a complete pleading, stating the alternative method of service utilized to notify other parties re [309] Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 12/28/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Jordan Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit Jenkins-Cope Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Proposed Order) (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude 1QM Evidence by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [296] Opposed MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony of Mary Walker filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/26/2016, Entered: 12/26/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [290] MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Michael Shamos filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Sealed documents are not served by CM/ECF and require service to parties by other means. File an amended Certificate of Service as separate pleading, stating the alternate means of service used to other parties re [302] Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION for Scheduling Order re Motions in Limine by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order for Motions in Limine)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 12/28/2016 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions in Limine by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Response Deadlines)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 12/28/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Jordan Transcript Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit Jenkins-Cope Transcript Excerpts, # (3) Proposed Order) (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [296] Opposed MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony of Mary Walker filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit TriMax Witness List, # (2) Exhibit TriMax Rule 26 Disclosures, # (3) Exhibit Jordan Deposition Excerpts, # (4) Exhibit Jenkins-Cope Deposition Excerpts, # (5) Exhibit Woodruff Deposition Excerpts, # (6) Exhibit TriMax Interrogatory Responses, # (7) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine) (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/28/2016) (jf). (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/28/2016) (jf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of AT&T Documents by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude Google Emails by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [290] MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Michael Shamos filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION in Limine for Exclusion of AMEX Documents by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony of Mary Walker by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [292] Response in Opposition to Motion, by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Barry Golden: re [292] Response in Opposition to Motion. Pursuant to the Administrative Policies and Procedures, Proposed Orders are Required when a Response to a Non-Dispositive Motion is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Response. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 293 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX to [292] Response in Opposition to Motion, by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Part 2, # (3) Appendix Part 3, # (4) Appendix Part 4, # (5) Appendix Part 5)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [290] MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Michael Shamos filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016, Terminated: 12/28/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Exhibit 1 to dkt 290, # (2) Proposed Order) (Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Michael Shamos by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Filed Separately Under Seal, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Shamos CV, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Shamos 4.1 Report, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Shamos 6.1 Report, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Shamos 7.1 Report, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Shamos 11.11 Report, # (7) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/28/2016) (jf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Wickfire's [288] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Michael Shamos of up to 20 pages,and Defendants may have up to 20 pages to respond. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016, Terminated: 11/29/2016 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [285] MOTION filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sean O'Reilly)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [285] MOTION filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jonathan Brown, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION for Adverse Jury Instruction by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F)(Golden, Barry) Modified on 11/14/2016 to correct motion type and docket text (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [282] Motion for Ryan Caughey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf Hall, Brown & Wickfire. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lexie G. White on behalf of Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC (White, Lexie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016, Terminated: 10/26/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexie G. White Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ryan V. Caughey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8971713) by on behalf of Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (White, Lexie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING Defendant TriMax's [233] Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and to Preclude Testimony at Trial About the New Opinions. Hearing settings remain. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) Modified on 10/6/2016 to correct 'filed' date. (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING TriMax's [277] Unopposed Motion for Goldfarb, PLLC to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List by WickFire, LLC. for [278] Motion Hearing.(klw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2016: # (1) Plaintiffs Exhibits) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2016 re [277] Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw and [233] Opposed MOTION to Strike. Written order to follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016, Terminated: 10/4/2016 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw of Goldfarb PLLC by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Keith L. Koshkin (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Potential Scheduling Issue Regarding Trial by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - Declaration of Dr. Michael Shamos)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Consent to Trial by US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Koshkin, Keith) (Main Document 274 replaced on 9/28/2016) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 273 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [272] Motion to Withdraw Attorneys Edward Cavazos, Brian Nash, and Benjamin Bernell. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 272 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016, Terminated: 9/23/2016 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 271 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting a Motion Hearing for [233] Opposed Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and to Preclude Testimony at Trial about the New Opinions. ORDER DENYING [236] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and [240] Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED all other pending motions are DISMISSED (dkt [234] and [248]). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion Hearing set for [233] Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and to Preclude Testimony at Trial About the New Opinions. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 270 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit Index, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Exhibit 14, # (17) Exhibit 15, # (18) Exhibit 16)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX to [268] Reply to Response to Motion, by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Part 2, # (3) Appendix Part 3, # (4) Appendix Part 4, # (5) Appendix Part 5, # (6) Appendix Part 6, # (7) Appendix Part 7, # (8) Appendix Part 8, # (9) Appendix Part 9, # (10) Appendix Part 10, # (11) Appendix Part 11, # (12) Appendix Part 12, # (13) Appendix Part 13, # (14) Appendix Part 14, # (15) Appendix Part 15, # (16) Appendix Part 16, # (17) Appendix Part 17, # (18) Appendix Part 18, # (19) Appendix Part 19, # (20) Appendix Part 20, # (21) Appendix Part 21)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Koshkin, Keith) Modified on 9/8/2016 to add text (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 267 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 SEALED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Order Granting TriMax's [257] Second Amended Opposed Motion to Seal Exhibits in Support of its Response to Wickfires Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC' [260] Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in support of their (corrected) [240] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY in Support, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Atlas, Katharine) Modified on 8/30/2016 to update text (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC re [260] Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC re [257] Amended Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [257] Amended Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016, Terminated: 8/31/2016 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - WickFire's Sur-Reply, # (2) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [257] Amended Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Denying TriMax's Motion, # (2) Proposed Order Granting TriMax's Motion in Part and Denying In Part)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX to [246] Response to Motion, [255] Response in Opposition to Motion, by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Part 2, # (3) Appendix Part 3, # (4) Appendix Part 4, # (5) Appendix Part 5, # (6) Appendix Part 6, # (7) Appendix Part 7, # (8) Appendix Part 8, # (9) Appendix Part 9, # (10) Appendix Part 10, # (11) Appendix Part 11, # (12) Appendix Part 12, # (13) Appendix Part 13, # (14) Appendix Part 14, # (15) Appendix Part 15, # (16) Appendix Part 16, # (17) Appendix Part 17, # (18) Appendix Part 18, # (19) Appendix Part 19, # (20) Appendix Part 20, # (21) Appendix Part 21, # (22) Appendix Part 21, # (23) Appendix Part 23, # (24) Appendix Part 24, # (25) Appendix Part 25, # (26) Appendix Part 26, # (27) Appendix Part 27, # (28) Appendix Part 28, # (29) Appendix Part 29, # (30) Appendix Part 30, # (31) Appendix Part 31, # (32) Appendix Part 32, # (33) Appendix Part 33, # (34) Appendix Part 34, # (35) Appendix Part 35)(Koshkin, Keith) Modified on 8/18/2016 to note that CD Exhibits A-2, A-3 and LL-3 have been placed on the shelf in the clerk's office.( klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016, Terminated: 9/6/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Appendix Index, # (4) Sealed Document Appendix) (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [248] Opposed MOTION to Strike [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Koshkin, Keith) Modified on 9/7/2016 (Clerk notes SEALED Exhibits contained in [257] Motion for Leave to File under Seal are considered filed as part of this Response pursuant to [267] Order but are voluminous and will not be duplicated.)(klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DISMISSING Trimax's Amended Opposed [249] Motion for Leave to Seal Exhibits in Support of Its Response to Wickfire's Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Response to Cease and Desist, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Google Production Documents, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Woodruff Affidavit Excerpts)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [248] Opposed MOTION to Strike [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Defendant TriMax Media, LLC, Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/3/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff [249] Amended Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX to [246] Response to Motion, by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Part 2, # (3) Appendix Part 3, # (4) Appendix Part 4, # (5) Appendix Part 5, # (6) Appendix Part 6, # (7) Appendix Part 7, # (8) Appendix Part 8, # (9) Appendix Part 9, # (10) Appendix Part 10, # (11) Appendix Part 11, # (12) Appendix Part 12, # (13) Appendix Part 13, # (14) Appendix Part 14, # (15) Appendix Part 15, # (16) Appendix Part 16, # (17) Appendix Part 17, # (18) Appendix Part 18, # (19) Appendix Part 19, # (20) Appendix Part 20, # (21) Appendix Part 21, # (22) Appendix Part 22, # (23) Appendix Part 23, # (24) Appendix Part 24, # (25) Appendix Part 25, # (26) Appendix Part 26, # (27) Appendix Part 27, # (28) Appendix Part 28, # (29) Appendix Part 29, # (30) Appendix Part 30, # (31) Appendix Part 31, # (32) Appendix Part 32, # (33) Appendix Part 33)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016, Terminated: 8/9/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Appendix Index, # (3) Sealed Document Appendix Part 1, # (4) Sealed Document Appendix Part 2, # (5) Sealed Document Appendix Part 3, # (6) Sealed Document Appendix Part 4, # (7) Sealed Document Appendix Part 5, # (8) Sealed Document Appendix Part 6) (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/30/2016, Entered: 7/30/2016, Terminated: 9/9/2016 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Strike [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/30/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Appendix) (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 246 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [240] CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [234] Opposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [233] Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and to Preclude Testimony at Trial About the New Opinions filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [239] Motion for Leave to File Exhibits under Seal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [234] Opposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [233] Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and to Preclude Testimony at Trial About the New Opinions filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Woodruff Deposition Testimony, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Email from B. Golden, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Letter from S. Brown to Google, # (4) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016, Terminated: 9/9/2016 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index, # (2) Affidavit Witness Declarations, # (3) Affidavit Atlas Declaration, # (4) Appendix A, # (5) Appendix B (Part 1), # (6) Appendix B (Part 2), # (7) Appendix B (Part 3), # (8) Exhibit 1 (Hammond v. Uriegas), # (9) Proposed Order) (SEALED Exhibits in [239] Motion are considered 'filed' pursuant to [243] Order but are voluminous and will not be duplicated in this entry.)) (Atlas, Katharine) Modified on 7/21/2016 (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016, Terminated: 7/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A - Sealed, # (2) Appendix B - Sealed, # (3) Proposed Order) (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Katharine Atlas: re [237] MOTION for Summary Judgment Appendix (Exhibit 41). Pleading is deficient because it lacks a signature block from an admitted attorney and a certificate of service. Please resubmit a CORRECTED or AMENDED document in full in proper pleading form pursuant to FRCP 11. Please re-file and use the ATTACHMENT event and link to the underlying motion. DO NOT use the MOTION event. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Appendix (Exhibit 41) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exhibit B-41 (Part 1), # (2) Appendix Exhibit B-41 (Part 2))(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix Index, # (2) Affidavit Witness Declarations, # (3) Affidavit Atlas Declaration, # (4) Appendix A (Unsealed), # (5) Appendix B (Unsealed), # (6) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016, Terminated: 7/15/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A - Sealed, # (2) Appendix B - Sealed, # (3) Proposed Order) (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016, Terminated: 9/9/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit G, # (7) Exhibit N, # (8) Exhibit P, # (9) Exhibit R, # (10) Exhibit S) (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016, Terminated: 10/6/2016 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and to Preclude Testimony at Trial About the New Opinions by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit F, # (4) Exhibit H, # (5) Exhibit I, # (6) Exhibit J, # (7) Exhibit K, # (8) Exhibit L, # (9) Exhibit M, # (10) Exhibit O, # (11) Exhibit Q)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that Parties' [208], [209], [212], [213], [222] and [223] Motions regarding Discovery are DISMISSED; ORDER GRANTING TriMax's [224] Motion for Leave to Seal Exhibits in Support of its Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript filed of Proceedings held on April 7, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/7/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2016, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION AND ORDER regarding the conclusion of Discovery. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [222] Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [12] Protective Order and De-Designate filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Updated Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [224] Opposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [223] Opposed MOTION to Clarify Agreed Protective Order filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence, # (2) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [222] Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [12] Protective Order and De-Designate filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [213] CORRECTED MOTION to Compel [Opposed] filed by Plaintiff WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Expert Report, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Deposition Excerpt, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016, Terminated: 6/17/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document - Exhibit B, # (3) Sealed Document - Exhibit C, # (4) Sealed Document - Exhibit D, # (5) Sealed Document - Exhibit J, # (6) Sealed Document - Exhibit L, # (7) Sealed Document - Exhibit M, # (8) Sealed Document - Exhibit N, # (9) Sealed Document - Exhibit O, # (10) Sealed Document - Exhibit Q, # (11) Sealed Document - Exhibit R, # (12) Sealed Document - Exhibit S) (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016, Terminated: 6/17/2016 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Clarify Agreed Protective Order by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit E, # (4) Exhibit F, # (5) Exhibit G, # (6) Exhibit H, # (7) Exhibit I, # (8) Exhibit K, # (9) Exhibit P)(Koshkin, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2016: # (10) Sealed Exhibits) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016, Terminated: 6/17/2016 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [12] Protective Order and De-Designate by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Email Correspondence, # (3) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [213] CORRECTED MOTION to Compel [Opposed] filed by Plaintiff WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed [214] Motion for to leave to file Exhibits C and D under SEAL as to [213] Corrected Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting All Pending Matters Hearing for 6/10/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Unopposed [217] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [213] Corrected Motion to Compel. Response is due 06/03/16. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016, Terminated: 5/31/2016 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [213] CORRECTED MOTION to Compel [Opposed] by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [208] Opposed MOTION to Compel Review of Source Code filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 215 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [209] Opposed MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Deposition of Jon Brown filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016, Terminated: 5/31/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document, # (2) Sealed Document, # (3) Sealed Document) (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016, Terminated: 6/17/2016 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED MOTION to Compel [Opposed] by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2016: # (4) SEALED Exhibit C, # (5) SEALED Exhbit D) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [208] Opposed MOTION to Compel Review of Source Code filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - AdWords Record, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Mailing List, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Registration, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Redacted Change History Excerpt, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Redacted Ad Report, # (6) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, WickFire, LLC, re [209] Opposed MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Deposition of Jon Brown filed by Defendant TriMax Media, Inc., Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016, Terminated: 6/17/2016 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Deposition of Jon Brown by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016, Terminated: 6/17/2016 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Compel Review of Source Code by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's [182] Opposed Motion to Compel and Plaintiff's [197] Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff's ORDER GRANTING [183] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Documents. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2016 re [197] Opposed MOTION for Protective Order, [183] Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document, [182] Opposed MOTION to Compel. Written Order to follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Status of Issue Raised in WickFire's February 11, 2016 Motion to Compel [DKT. 182] by WickFire, LLC re [182] Opposed MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [197] Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [201] Response in Opposition to Motion by TriMax Media, LLC. (Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFICIENCY NOTICE Keith Koshkin: re [201] Response in Opposition to Motion. Pursuant to the Administrative Policies and Procedures, Proposed Orders are Required when a Response to a Motion is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Response. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, re [197] Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Koshkin, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [199] Motion for Jennifer Tara Barall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016, Terminated: 3/31/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Goldfarb for Jennifer Barall ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8330618) by on behalf of TriMax Media, LLC. (Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016, Terminated: 4/7/2016 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - TriMax Response Brief, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Email Communication, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Settlement Agreement, # (4) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting All Pending Matters Hearing for 4/7/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 12, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/13/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2016, (Reznik, Lily) (Main Document 195 replaced on 3/28/2016) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [182] Opposed MOTION to Compel filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Second Declaration of Sean O'Reilly)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING WickFire's [190] Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to their [189] REPLY under SEAL. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC re [190] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016, Terminated: 2/26/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [182] Opposed MOTION to Compel filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Coburn, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2016: # (2) SEALED Exhibits 1-5) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [182] Opposed MOTION to Compel filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Sean O"Reilly, # (2) Exhibit Wickfire's Second Requests for Production, # (3) Exhibit Wickfire's First Requests for Production)(Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [181] Motion for Keith Koshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [180] Motion for Jeffrey Goldfarb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [170] Motion for Peter S. Vogel, Esq., Sara Ann Brown, Esq., Peter L. Loh, Esq., and the law firm of Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP, towithdraw as counsel for defendants and counter-plaintiffs TriMax Media, LLC,Laura Woodruff, Josh West, and WREI, Inc. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Status Conference held on 2/12/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(os)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016, Terminated: 4/7/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit O, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit P, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit Q, # (8) Proposed Order Order) (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016, Terminated: 4/7/2016 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Compel by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Proposed Order Order)(Coburn, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2016: # (19) Sealed Exhibits) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016, Terminated: 2/12/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry M. Golden for Keith Koshkin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8196146) by on behalf of TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016, Terminated: 2/12/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry M. Golden for Jeffrey Goldfarb ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8196003) by on behalf of TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Letter - Correspondence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/Correspondence to Keith Koshkin re: non-admitted status. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Letter - Correspondence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/Correspondence to Jeffrey Goldfarb re: non-admitted status. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry M. Golden on behalf of TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. Attorney Barry M. Golden added to party TriMax Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Barry M. Golden added to party TriMax Media, LLC(pty:3pp) (Golden, Barry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IT IS ORDERED that Defendants obtain substitute counsel by 1:00 P.M. on 02/11/16; ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/12/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Defendants Laura Woodruff and Josh West are ORDERED to appear in person at this hearing. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Status Conference held on 2/5/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(os)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [170] Opposed MOTION to Withdraw filed by Third Party Plaintiff TriMax Media, LLC, Counter Plaintiff WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Order)(Dietz, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Schaerdel Dietz on behalf of Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. Attorney Mary Schaerdel Dietz added to party Jonathan Curtis Brown(pty:3pd), Attorney Mary Schaerdel Dietz added to party Chester Lee Hall(pty:3pd), Attorney Mary Schaerdel Dietz added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Schaerdel Dietz added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:3pd) (Dietz, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Mary Schaerdel Dietz by Bradley Dalton Coburn on behalf of Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC (Coburn, Bradley) Modified on 2/4/2016 to add new atty's name (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [165] MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' claims for attempted monopolization and unfair competition filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016, Terminated: 2/12/2016 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION to Withdraw by TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [165] MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' claims for attempted monopolization and unfair competition filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown CORRECTED (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., re [165] MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' claims for attempted monopolization and unfair competition filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Vogel, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradley Dalton Coburn (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 Answer to Amended Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [164] Amended Counterclaim by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC.(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016, Terminated: 3/25/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' claims for attempted monopolization and unfair competition by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 164 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Amended Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM Second against All Plaintiffs amending, filed by Laura Woodruff, Josh West, WREI, Inc., TriMax Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [161] Motion for Sherri Wilson to Withdraw as Attorney for Wickfire, Hall and Brown. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding TriMax Parties' proposed filing of their Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016, Terminated: 1/6/2016 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 SEALED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. * Clerk notes that the order directs that all counsel shall be provided a copy of this order by hand delivery at the clerk's office. A copy of this order will not be mailed.* (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/5/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [153] MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' Amended Counterclaim (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [153] MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' Amended Counterclaim (Partial) filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/23/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [152] Opposed MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 20.5, 20.10, and the Declaration of Jo Ann Ramsaur from the TriMax Parties' Amended Counterclaim filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [152] Opposed MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 20.5, 20.10, and the Declaration of Jo Ann Ramsaur from the TriMax Parties' Amended Counterclaim filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Plaintiff WickFire, LLC, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Answer to Amended Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [151] Amended Counterclaim, by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC.(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015, Terminated: 1/7/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' Amended Counterclaim (Partial) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015, Terminated: 1/5/2016 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 20.5, 20.10, and the Declaration of Jo Ann Ramsaur from the TriMax Parties' Amended Counterclaim by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 151 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Amended Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              * SEALED BY ORDER OF THE COURT (dkt 160) * AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC amending [133] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Laura Woodruff, Josh West, WREI, Inc., TriMax Media, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Brown, Sara) Modified on 1/5/2016 to seal document (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 150 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., TriMax Media, LLC, WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [148] MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 of the TriMax Parties' Reasserted Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff WickFire, LLC (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to [147] Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC.(Atlas, Katharine) Modified on 11/3/2015 to modify text and create link (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015, Terminated: 12/1/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 of the TriMax Parties' Reasserted Counterclaim by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 147 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COUNTERCLAIM against Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, filed by TriMax Media, LLC, Laura Woodruff, WREI, Inc., Josh West. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 146 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TriMax's ANSWER to [143] Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Sara Ann Brown added to party TriMax Media, LLC(pty:dft) by TriMax Media, LLC.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 145 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        West Parties' ANSWER to [143] Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by WREI, Inc., Josh West.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 144 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Laura Woodruff's ANSWER to [143] Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Laura Woodruff.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff amending, filed by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [140] Amended MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 of the TriMax Parties' Omnibus Counterclaim filed by Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, Jonathan Curtis Brown (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [140] Amended MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 of the TriMax Parties' Omnibus Counterclaim filed by Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Ex. 1 - Excerpts from Deposition of Chet Hall, # (2) Ex. 2 - Declaration of Jo Ann Ramsaur)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015, Terminated: 12/1/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 of the TriMax Parties' Omnibus Counterclaim by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [135] MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 of the TriMax Parties Omnibus Counterclaim filed by Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, Jonathan Curtis Brown (Attachments: # (1) Ex. 1 - Declaration of Sara Ann Brown, # (2) Ex. 2 - Redline of Motion to Dismiss, # (3) Ex. 3 - Transcript Excerpts from the Deposition of Chet Hall, # (4) Ex. 4 - Declaration of Jo Ann Ramsaur)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 ADR Report - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Report Filed - Joint ADR Report by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, TriMax, WREI, West and Woodruff (Coburn, Bradley) Modified on 8/4/2015 to add filers (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 136 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 10, 2015, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 8/17/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015, Terminated: 8/11/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 of the TriMax Parties Omnibus Counterclaim by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Google Partners, # (2) Exhibit 2 - IM Wave Website, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Texas Google Partners, # (4) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WICKFIRE, HALL, AND BROWN ANSWER to [133] Amended Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, TRIMAX PARTIES OMNIBUS COUNTERCLAIMS DOCKET NO. 133 Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party Jonathan Curtis Brown(pty:cd), Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party Chester Lee Hall(pty:cd) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC.(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 133 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Omnibus COUNTERCLAIM against Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC by Laura Woodruff, WREI, Inc., TriMax Media, Inc., Josh West. (klw) (Clerk notes exhibits to this Counterclaim are included in [127] Motion for Leave to File. They are voluminous and will not be duplicated but are considered filed as part of this document. Clerk additionally notes that the Tri-Max Group filed this pleading in a manner that would not allow the clerk to remove the Exhibit A stamp when filing the document pursuant to Court order. Future filings should either not be locked or should not contain the exhibit stamp.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DISMISSING "TriMax Group"'s [127] Motion for Leave to amend their pleading as the pleading was admitted as a matter of right under the scheduling order. The clerk is authorized to file said pleading. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC, re [127] MOTION for Leave to File The TriMax Parties' Omnibus Counterclaims Against the Wickfire Parties filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - U.S. Google Partners, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Texas Google Partners, # (3) Exhibit 3 - IMWave Website, # (4) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to [127] MOTION for Leave to File The TriMax Parties' Omnibus Counterclaims Against the Wickfire Parties Amended Cert. of Conference by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corrected ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended by Laura Woodruff.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corrected ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended by WREI, Inc., Josh West.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015, Terminated: 7/8/2015 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File The TriMax Parties' Omnibus Counterclaims Against the Wickfire Parties by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1 - Proposed Omnibus Counterclaims, # (2) Exhibit A-2 - Appendix Part 1, # (3) Exhibit A-3 - Appendix Part 2, # (4) Exhibit B - Redline, # (5) Exhibit C - Expert Report, # (6) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 Answer to Amended Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WICKFIRE, HALL, AND BROWN ANSWER to [90] Amended Third Party Complaint,, Amended Counterclaim, . Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party Jonathan Curtis Brown(pty:3pd), Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party Chester Lee Hall(pty:3pd), WICKFIRE, HALL, AND BROWN ANSWER to [90] Amended Third Party Complaint,, Amended Counterclaim, . Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party Jonathan Curtis Brown(pty:3pd), Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party Chester Lee Hall(pty:3pd) by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, WickFire, LLC.(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 125 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 8/4/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2015, Discovery due by 10/3/2016, Joinder of Parties due by 10/5/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2016. Docket Call set for 1/27/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks, followed by Trial in February, 2017. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the Third Party Plaintiffs shall file within fifteen (15) days ofthis Order a RICO case statement. ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's [101] Motion to Dismiss Amended Third Party Claims and Brown and Hall's [107] Motion to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' Third Party Claims without prejudice to refiling after Third Party Plaintiffs have filed their response to this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER VACATING [13] Scheduling Order and [40] Order Granting Scheduling Order Deadlines. ORDER DISMISSING Defendants' [114] Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines; ORDER DISMISSING Defendants' [115] Motion to Expedite Consideration of the [114] Motion to Extend Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Woodruff, WREI, Inc., and West's RICO and Sherman Act claims, Claims 4, 5, 6, and 7 of the TriMax Parties' [90] Amended Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that in the event Woodruff, WREI, Inc., and West wish to continue prosecuting their RICO and Sherman Act claims, they file an amended third-party complaint contemporaneously with their RICO case statement. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff TriMax Media, Inc.'s [117] Motion for Gwen E. Bhella, John A. Price, and the law firm of Calhoun, Bhella & Sechrest, LLP to Withdraw as Counsel of record for TriMax Media, Inc. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2015 re [101] MOTION to Dismiss, [107] MOTION to Dismiss, [114] MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines, [115] MOTION to Expedite and [117] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motions taken under advisement. Written Order to follow.(documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript filed of Proceedings held on April 10, 2015, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/30/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2015, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting all pending Motions Hearing by Telephone for 6/10/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 118 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [114] MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, [115] MOTION to Expedite the Motion to Amend Scheduling filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-5)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015, Terminated: 6/11/2015 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TriMax Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bhella, Gwen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [114] MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 115 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015, Terminated: 6/11/2015 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite the Motion to Amend Scheduling by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 114 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015, Terminated: 6/11/2015 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [111] Motion to Withdraw [105] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Appendix. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX to [103] Response to Motion by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015, Terminated: 5/15/2015 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw [105] CORRECTED Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall, re [107] MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' Third Party Claims filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [107] MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' Third Party Claims filed by Third Party Defendant Chester Lee Hall, Third Party Defendant Jonathan Curtis Brown (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [101] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Claims filed by WickFire, LLC (Wilson, Sherri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015, Terminated: 6/11/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the TriMax Parties' Third Party Claims by Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DISMISSING [88] Motion to Remove Improper Designations and Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015, Terminated: 5/15/2015 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      * WITHDRAWN by [113] Order of the Court * CORRECTED Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Corrected, # (2) Sealed Document Corrected) (Brown, Sara) Modified on 5/15/2015 (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document) (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion, filed by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [101] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Claims filed by WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2015 re [101] MOTION to Dismiss and [88] MOTION to Remove Improper Designations. Written order to follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015, Terminated: 6/11/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Claims by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katharine M. Atlas on behalf of WickFire, LLC. Attorney Katharine M. Atlas added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Katharine M. Atlas added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katharine M. Atlas added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:cd) (Atlas, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [88] MOTION to Remove Improper Designations filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 98 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on [88] MOTION to Remove Improper Designations: Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2015 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed [93] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Exhibits as to [91] Response in Opposition to [88] Motion to Remove Improper Designations. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Third-Party Summons Issued as to Jonathan Curtis Brown, Chester Lee Hall. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. AMENDED (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Request for Issuance of Summons)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015, Terminated: 3/23/2015 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 9) (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [88] MOTION to Remove Improper Designations filed by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 6, # (6) Exhibit 7, # (7) Exhibit 8, # (8) Exhibit 10)(Coburn, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2015: # (9) Sealed Exhibit 4, # (10) Sealed Exhibit 5, # (11) Sealed Exhibit 9) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Amended Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Chester Lee Hall, Jonathan Brown, WickFire, LLC amending, AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Chester Lee Hall, Jonathan Brown, WickFire, LLC amending, filed by Laura Woodruff, WREI, Inc., Josh West. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Part 2)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WickFire's ANSWER to [82] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of TriMax by WickFire, LLC.(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015, Terminated: 4/17/2015 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remove Improper Designations by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 29, 2015, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/26/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2015, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's unopposed [81] Motion to SEAL the unredacted main document and replace with a redacted main document. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM against WickFire, LLC, Chester Lee Hall, Jonathan Brown, filed by Laura Woodruff, Josh West, WREI, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to [78] Amended Complaint, by Laura Woodruff.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [78] Amended Complaint, by WREI, Inc., Josh West.(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [78] Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against WickFire, LLC by TriMax Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A, # (2) Ex. B, # (3) Ex. C)(Brown, Sara) (
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015, Terminated: 3/2/2015 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION TO SEAL by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTE PLEADING by WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff amending, filed by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Coburn, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2015: # (7) Unredacted Main Document) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward A. Cavazos (Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' [62] Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint within 14 days. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2015 re [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. Motion taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [71] Response to Motion, [68] Response to Motion, by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Deficiency Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff [CORRECTED] (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion, filed by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff, re [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Pending Matters Hearing for 1/29/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant WREI, Inc., Defendant Josh West, Defendant Laura Woodruff (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFF WICKFIRE, LLC'S ANSWER to [63] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WickFire, LLC.(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Plaintiff's [64] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Response due 01/15/2015. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' [62] Motion to Dismiss. All further extensions in futuro are DENIED. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014, Terminated: 12/23/2014 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TriMax's ANSWER to [50] Amended Complaint, , Reurged COUNTERCLAIM against WickFire, LLC by TriMax Media, Inc..(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014, Terminated: 1/29/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [60] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; TriMax Media, Inc. answer due 12/18/2014; WREI, Inc. answer due 12/18/2014; Josh West answer due 12/18/2014; Laura Woodruff answer due 12/18/2014. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014, Terminated: 12/17/2014 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [50] Amended Complaint, by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [56] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [50] Amended Complaint; TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West and Laura Woodruff answer due 12/16/2014. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Letter - Correspondence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to James C. McFall re: non-admitted status. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Letter - Correspondence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND NOTICE to Brian A. Calhoun re: non-admitted status.(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014, Terminated: 11/25/2014 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [50] Amended Complaint, by TriMax Media, Inc., WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript filed of Proceedings held on November 12, 2014, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/12/2014, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2015, (Reznik, Lily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by WickFire, LLC. WREI, Inc. served on 11/18/2014, answer due 12/9/2014; Josh West served on 11/18/2014, answer due 12/9/2014; Laura Woodruff served on 11/18/2014, answer due 12/9/2014. (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to WREI, Inc., Josh West, Laura Woodruff. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WickFire, LLC. FOR LAURA WOODRUFF, WREI, INC., AND JOSH WEST (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sherri A. Wilson on behalf of WickFire, LLC. Attorney Sherri A. Wilson added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:pla) (Wilson, Sherri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against TriMax Media, Inc., Laura Woodruff, WREI, Inc., Josh West, One or More John Doe(s) amending [1] Complaint, filed by WickFire, LLC.(klw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2014: # (1) SEALED Exhibit B, # (2) SEALED Exhibit C) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTE EXHIBIT A: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF WICKFIRES OCTOBER 23, 2014 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by WickFire, LLC re [48] Order on Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [39] Motion for Leave to File their Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 11/12/2014 re [39] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by WickFire, LLC. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Wickfire's Unopposed [45] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Exhibts to [39] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014, Terminated: 11/7/2014 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document, # (3) Sealed Document) (Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [39] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Pending Matters Hearing for 11/12/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Letter - Correspondence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/Correspondence to Brian A. Calhoun re: non-admission status. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TriMax Media, Inc., re [39] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Brown, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [38] Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014, Terminated: 11/13/2014 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Previously filed First Amended Complaint showing Modifications, # (3) Proposed Order)(klw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2014: # (4) Sealed ExhibitB, # (5) Sealed Exhibit C) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014, Terminated: 10/27/2014 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Wickfire, LLC and TriMax Media, Inc. by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter L. Loh on behalf of TriMax Media, Inc.. Attorney Peter L. Loh added to party TriMax Media, Inc.(pty:dft) (Loh, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Order on Motion to Stay CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Joint [35] Motion to Stay all upcoming deadlines in the Scheduling Order with the exception of the docket call and trail setting. Revised proposed scheduling order due 10/22/14. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014, Terminated: 9/24/2014 Motion to Stay Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay Case by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to John Doe. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WickFire, LLC. for John Doe (Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OVERRULING and DENYING Doe's [18] Motion to Quash Subpoena and Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's SURREPLY to Defendant Doe's [18] Amended MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [24] Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Doe's [18] Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena to Gogle, Inc. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe(s), TriMax Media, Inc. amending [1] Complaint, filed by WickFire, LLC.(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [26] Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin L. Bernell on behalf of WickFire, LLC. Attorney Benjamin L. Bernell added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:pla) (Bernell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014, Terminated: 8/27/2014 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed First Amended Complaint, # (2) Modified Complaint, # (3) Proposed Order)(klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [22] Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion to Quash; the hearing currently scheduled for 8/1/2014 is CANCELLED until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/24/2014, Terminated: 8/27/2014 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to John Does Motion to Quash Wickfires Google Subpoena by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by John Doe, re [18] Amended MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. filed by Movant John Doe (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Vogel, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014, Terminated: 7/30/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Quash by John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Vogel, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on [18] Amended MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. : Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Pending Negotiations Regarding Google Subpoena by John Doe re [19] Response in Opposition to Motion, [18] Amended MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. (Vogel, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WickFire, LLC, re [16] MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. filed by Movant John Doe, [18] Amended MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. filed by Movant John Doe (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Proposed Order)(Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014, Terminated: 8/27/2014 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. by John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Vogel, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 ADR Report - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Report Filed - by WickFire, LLC(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014, Terminated: 7/9/2014 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Google, Inc. by John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Vogel, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by WickFire, LLC (Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Dalton Coburn on behalf of WickFire, LLC. Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Dalton Coburn added to party WickFire, LLC(pty:cd) (Coburn, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 7/3/2014, Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2014, Discovery due by 10/31/2014, Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2014, Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2015 11:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks, followed by Trial in October, 2015. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by WickFire, LLC re [9] Notice (Other) (Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014, Terminated: 4/2/2014 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Wickfire, LLC and Defendant TriMax Media, Inc. by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Protective Order, # (2) Appendix A and B)(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joint Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by WickFire, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WickFire, LLC's ANSWER to [6] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim TriMax Media, Inc.'s Counterclaims by WickFire, LLC.(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/11/2014. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Original ANSWER to [1] Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against WickFire, LLC by TriMax Media, Inc..(Bhella, Gwen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to TriMax Media, Inc. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WickFire, LLC. (Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WickFire, LLC. (Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6158143), filed by WickFire, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Cavazos, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (klw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 2,479 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?