Jennings v. Stratford
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01664

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 13, 2019 at 12:28 PM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo William Jennings, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Town of Stratford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Florek +1 203 377 5090 +1 203 378 6756 jaflorek@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Berchem Moses P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Buturla +1 203 783 1200 +1 203 878 4912 rbuturla@berchemmoses.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warren L. Holcomb +1 203 783 1200 +1 203 882 0045 wholcomb@berchemmoses.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 621
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (138) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Instrument Returned
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Return of Property
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Notice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Instrument Returned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER. The emergency motion for turnover order of improperly seized funds (Doc. # 114 ) is DENIED without prejudice in light of the representations of plaintiff that he has not received such funds. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/1/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE re 114 Emergency MOTION for Turnover of Improperly Seized Funds Order filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    Emergency MOTION for Turnover of Improperly Seized Funds Order by Town of Stratford. (Buturla, Richard)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO VACATE. Because the Court is satisfied that defendant timely filed its supersedeas bond, defendant's emergency motions to vacate the writ of property execution (Doc. # 109 ) and writ of financial institution execution (Doc. # 110 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/31/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/29/2017, Entered: 7/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT of Bryan L. LeClerc filed by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/29/2017, Entered: 7/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          Memorandum in Opposition re 110 Emergency MOTION to Vacate Writ of Execution Financial Institution, 109 Emergency MOTION to Vacate Writ of Property Execution filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            Emergency MOTION to Vacate Writ of Execution Financial Institution by Town of Stratford. (Buturla, Richard)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              Emergency MOTION to Vacate Writ of Property Execution by Town of Stratford. (Buturla, Richard)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Buturla on behalf of Town of Stratford (Buturla, Richard)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Bond
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Supersedeas BOND in the amount of $ 2,000,000.00 posted by Town of Stratford Receipt Number 9884 (Peterson, M) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      WRIT of Financial Institution execution issued. (Potter, A.)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        APPLICATION for and Writ of Execution Financial Institution by William Jennings. (Potter, A.)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ORDER granting 101 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server. Signed by Clerk on 7/28/17. (Potter, A.) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            WRIT of Properly Execution issued. (Potter, A.)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              APPLICATION for Property Execution by William Jennings. (Potter, A.)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Appointment of Person to Serve Process (Potter, A.)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER. The 96 motion to stay execution of the judgment is GRANTED until July 27, 2017, and pending defendant's posting of an adequate supersedeas bond pending appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/17/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/15/2017, Entered: 7/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    RESPONSE re 96 MOTION to Stay re 95 Judgment,, 98 Order, filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF RESPONSE. In view of defendant's request for expedited consideration of the motion to stay (Doc. # 96 ), plaintiff is requested to file a response by Tuesday, July 18, 2017, and to state whether plaintiff objects to defendant's request that the Court enter a 10-day stay of execution on the judgment to allow defendant time to post a supersedeas bond. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/14/2017. (Black, R.) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER lifting the stay of appeal and directing appellant to file a scheduling order re: 73 Notice of Appeal filed by Town of Stratford USCA Case Number 16-3584 (Potter, A.) Modified on 7/13/2017 (Potter, A.). (Entered: 07/13/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Stay re 95 Judgment, by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 8/2/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion For Stay of Execution of The Judgment Pending Appeal Seeking Emergency Relief)(Holcomb, Warren)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of William Jennings against Town of Stratford.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/7/2017.(Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 93 Motion MOTION Correct Judgment re 92 Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/7/2017. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION Correct Judgment re 92 Judgment, by William Jennings.Responses due by 7/21/2017 (Williams, John)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of William Jennings against Town of Stratford.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 6/29/2017.(Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE by William Jennings re 90 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, OF ACCEPTANCE OF REMITTITUR (Williams, John)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        RULING ON POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. For the reasons stated in the attached ruling, defendant's motions for judgment as a matter of law and for a new trial (Doc. # 70 ) and to alter or amend the judgment (Doc. # 71 ) are DENIED, subject to the Court's remittitur of the punitive damages award to an amount of $500,000. Plaintiff shall file a statement by July 14, 2017, whether he accepts the Court's remittitur of the punitive damages award or whether he wishes the Court instead to grant a new trial. Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees (Doc. # 74 ) is GRANTED in part in the amount of $500,000, subject to plaintiff's acceptance of the Courts remittitur of the punitive damages award. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/27/2017. (Black, R.)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE re 87 Order,,,, Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum of Law filed by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RESPONSE re 87 Order,,,, filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. The Court has concerns about the validity of the jury's award of punitive damages as well as the basis for plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees in light of the fact that the complaint did not allege a violation of Conn. Gen. Stat. § 31-51q, which statute served as the predicate for the Court's issuance of a punitive damages instruction and also serves as the sole basis for plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees. During summary judgment briefing defendant highlighted the absence of an allegation under Conn. Gen. Stat. § 31-51q (Doc. #28-1 at 24), and plaintiff did not dispute this in his response (Doc. #30). The parties are requested on or before June 20, 2017, to submit any supplemental briefing they wish on this issue. Plaintiff is additionally requested to address in his supplemental briefing the basis for an attorney fee award under 42 U.S.C. § 1988 in the event that the Court declines to conclude that the jury's verdict was permissibly based on Conn. Gen. Stat. § 31-51q. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/29/2017. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 05/29/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Partial Assignment of Judgment and Acknowledgment by William Jennings (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on November 22, 2016 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2017. (Huntington, D.)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Motion Hearing held on 11/22/2016; finding as moot 68 Motion to Stay; taking under advisement 70 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; taking under advisement 71 Motion to Alter Judgment; taking under advisement 74 Motion for Attorney Fees; Total Time: 43 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 74 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by William Jennings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, John)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 74 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: 11/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Index to Record on Appeal by Town of Stratford re 73 Notice of Appeal, 70 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 74 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 64 Judgment, 61 Jury Instructions/Charge, 75 Response, 57 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 56 Notice (Other), 1 Complaint, 80 Reply to Response to Motion, 66 Transcript,,,, 65 Transcript,,,, 21 Answer to Complaint, 77 Calendar Entry,, Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings, 60 Jury Verdict, 63 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 72 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 32 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing, 71 MOTION to Alter Judgment, 76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 67 Transcript,,,, 62 Exhibit List, Witness List. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: 11/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 70 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or For a New Trial filed by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time until November 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/10/2016. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/11/16to file a Reply MOL in Support of Defendant's Motion For Judgment As a Matter of Law or For a New Trial 70 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE: Motion Hearing re: 68 MOTION to Stay re 64 Judgment , 74 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 71 MOTION to Alter Judgment , 70 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law .( Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 70 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 72 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion s To Alter or Amend Judgment and to Consider Plain Error In The Jury Instructions Pursuant to Rules 51(d)(2) and Rule 59(3) F.R.Civ.P. filed by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees by William Jennings.Responses due by 11/14/2016 (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 64 Judgment by Town of Stratford. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0205-4171372. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION to Alter Judgment by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 11/3/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Rule 59(e) Motion To Alter or Amend Judgment and Rule 51(d)(2) Motion To Consider Plain Error in The Jury Instructions)(Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 11/3/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter of Law and In Support of Alternative Motion For A New Trial)(Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 68 MOTION to Stay re 64 Judgment filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay re 64 Judgment by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment)(Holcomb, Warren) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume III. Held on September 14, 2016 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/25/2016. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume II. Held on September 13, 2016 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/25/2016. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial, Volume I. Held on September 12, 2016 before Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer. Court Reporter: Diana Huntington. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/25/2016. (Huntington, D.) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT entered in favor of William Jennings against Town of Stratford.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2016.(Caffrey, A.)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice 57 Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/15/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    COURT Marked Exhibit & Witness List. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Jury Instructions/Charge
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Jury Instructions. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            JURY VERDICT For William Jennings Against Town of Stratford in the Amount of $2,500,000.00. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial completed & Motion Hearing on 9/14/2016; granting 51 MOTION Take Judicial Notice of Plaintiff's Life Expectancy filed by William Jennings. Total Time: 3 hours and 51 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial, Motion Hearing and Charged Conference held on 9/13/2016; taking under advisement 57 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Town of Stratford.Jury Trial Continued Until 9/14/2016 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 5 hours and 56 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Town of Stratford. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Town of Stratford Constructive Discharge Brief (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Trial held on 9/12/2016. Jury Trial Continued Until 9/13/2016 at 8:30 AM. Total Time: 6 hours and 39 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Verdict Form by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/10/2016, Entered: 9/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by William Jennings of Authority re Admissibility of Exhibit 13 (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/10/2016, Entered: 9/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Take Judicial Notice of Plaintiff's Life Expectancy by William Jennings.Responses due by 10/1/2016 (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/10/2016, Entered: 9/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Verdict Form by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Jury Selection held on 9/8/2016. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2016 - 9/16/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Total Time: 5 hours and 30 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Pretrial Conference & Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2016; denying 42 MOTION in Limine filed by Town of Stratford. Total Time: 18 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 42 MOTION in Limine filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Plaintiff shall file any response to the motion in limine (Doc. # 42 ) by August 24, 2016. Defendant shall file any reply by August 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/15/2016. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL MEMO by William Jennings Estimated trial time 3 - 4 days. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Proposed Voir Dire Questions, # 2 Plaintiff's Requests to Charge)(Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 9/2/2016 (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by Town of Stratford. (Holcomb, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference on 8/29/2016 has been changed from 4:00 p.m to 03:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE TRIAL MEMORANDUM, MOTIONS IN LIMINE, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND JURY SELECTION/TRIAL. The parties shall file their joint trial memorandum and any motions in limine by August 12, 2016; a pre-trial conference will be held on August 29, 2016, at 4:00pm; and this case shall proceed to jury selection on September 8, 2016, with evidence to begin on September 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/29/2016. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Warren L. Holcomb on behalf of Town of Stratford (Holcomb, Warren) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: A Settlement Conference was held on 3/30/2016. Total Time: 1 hour and 20 minutes. (Malone, A.) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of William Jennings (Longo-McLean, Rose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/30/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Parties/party representatives must attend the conference unless excused by the Court. (Malone, A.) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Settlement Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/13/2016.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2015, granted as to Counts 1 & 2 and denied as to Count 3 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Town of Stratford.Total Time: 1 hours and 11 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment .( Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/18/2015, Entered: 4/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Jennings. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Arbitration Award, # 3 Plaintiff's Sworn CHRO Complaint, # 4 News Reports)(Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT by Town of Stratford re 28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Affidavit)(Florek, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 4/20/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts)(Florek, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/2/2015. Dispositive motions due by 4/2/2015. Joint trial memorandum due by 4/2/2015 or 30 days after Court's ruling on dispositive motions. Trial Ready Date 5/4/2015 or 30 days after the filing of joint trial memorandum. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2014. (Ramesh, S) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time. All discovery shall be completed by March 2, 2015. Dispositive motions shall be filed by April 2, 2015. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed by April 2, 2015, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. This case will be ready for trial by May 4, 2015, or within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum, whichever date is later. No further extensions will be granted for the close of discovery and for the filing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2014. (Ramesh, S) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2015, to complete discovery by William Jennings. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 23 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 8, 2014 To Respond to Defendants' First Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Signed by Clerk on 7/15/2014. (Lynch, K.) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until September 8, 2014 To Respond to Defendants' First Interrogatories and Requests for Production by William Jennings. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Doc. 20 ) is hereby adopted as modified herein. The deadlines are as follows. Defendant's response to the complaint is due by 5/15/2014. Damages analysis and expert reports regarding damages due by 8/1/2014. Discovery due by 12/1/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2015. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by 3/1/2015 or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive motions, whichever is later. The parties shall be ready for trial by 3/31/2015 or 30 days after filing the joint trial memorandum, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/13/2014. (Steinfeld, Sarah) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Special Defenses by Town of Stratford.(Florek, John) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Florek, John) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 3/24/14.(Walker, J.) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2014 re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Town of Stratford, 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Town of Stratford. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2014 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Jennings. (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Town of Stratford. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 1/30/2014 (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by Town of Stratford.Responses due by 1/24/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Florek, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2014: # 2 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF) (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/2/2014 to plead to 1 Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2013. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Florek on behalf of Town of Stratford (Florek, John) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/02/2014 plead to 1 Complaint by Town of Stratford. (Florek, John) Modified on 12/17/2013 TO LINK TO DOC #1 (Oliver, T.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2013: # 1 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF") (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Jennings. Town of Stratford served on 11/15/2013, answer due 12/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Town of Stratford* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510* (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 5 Electronic Filing Order, 6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, 4 Standing Protective Order, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of William Jennings, 1 Complaint filed by William Jennings Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/11/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/11/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 2/11/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2014. Discovery due by 5/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/2014 Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of William Jennings (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Town of Stratford ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3060986.), filed by William Jennings.(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Caffrey, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Trial Memdorandum due by 8/12/2016; Trial Ready Date 9/12/2016; Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2016 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer; Jury Selection set for 9/8/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Trial Ready Date 3/31/2015 (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer deadline updated for Town of Stratford to 1/2/2014. (Oliver, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Town of Stratford. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Malone, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 303 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?