Byrnes v. Chase Manhattan Automotive Finance Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10340-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Vincent J Byrnes, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Giarrusso, Norton, Cooley & McGlone, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W. Norton +1 617 770 2900 +1 617 773 6934 rnorton@gncm.net
v.
No Logo Chase Manhattan Automotive Finance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey M. Coan +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 geoffrey.coan@wilsonelser.com
Space Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
Office Boston
Filed 2/19/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/28/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Vincent J Byrnes Jr., Chase Manhattan Automotive Finance Corporation. (Patch, Christine)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered 30 Day SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Patch, Christine)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Patch, Christine)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
        REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Program. The case was settled after referral to the ADR Program, but prior to ADR. The clerk should enter a 30-day order of dismissal. (Nee, Amy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact Discovery due by 1/10/2005. Plaintiff's expert designation deadline: 9/31/04. Defendant's expert designation deadline: 10/29/04. Expert discovery deadline: 1/10/05. Summary Judgment Motion due by 2/1/2005; opposition due by 2/15/05. Hearing on Summary Judgment or Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Case to be referred to Mediation program: Summer, 2004.(Patch, Christine)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
            Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation in Summer, 2004.(Patch, Christine)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Scheduling Conference
              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/2004. Court sets discovery and motion filing schedule. Case referred to Mediation. Scheduling Order to issue. (Alba, Robert)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Chase Manhattan Automotive Finance Corporation.(Patch, Christine)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                  JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Patch, Christine)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 state court record
                    STATE COURT Record Chase Manhattan Automotive Finance Corporation served on 2/18/2004, answer due 3/9/2004. (Patch, Christine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                      Electronic NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2004 03:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Patti B. Saris. cc/cl(Patch, Christine) Modified on 2/25/2004 (Patch, Christine).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Chase Manhattan Automotive Finance Corporation.(Patch, Christine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Notice of Removal
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chase Manhattan Automotive Finance Corporation from Superior Court of Norfolk County, case number 04-00110. $ 150, receipt number 53954. (Patch, Christine)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Patch, Christine)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 47 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?