Ross v. Bachand et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-14122

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 11:24 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo R. L. Ross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rhonda L. Ross +1 248 721 9760 rhondaross@g.harvard.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by R. L. Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. L. Ross +1 248 721 9760
v.
No Logo BROOKS BYAM, Defendant
No Logo CATHY FERGUSON, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Surfield, Defendant
No Logo DAVID ABBS, Defendant
No Logo DAVID GAMEZ, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Bishop, Defendant
No Logo DEBORAH HUNTLEY, Defendant
No Logo Donald Bachand, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Corey David Grandmaison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie H. Nisidis +1 989 498 2100 jamnis@bkf-law.com
No Logo ERIC GILBERTSON, Defendant
No Logo Trump, Eric, Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIK TRUMP"
No Logo GRETCHEN OWOCKI, Defendant
No Logo Hong, Park, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey, Martin, Defendant
No Logo JENEE VELASQUEZ, Defendant
No Logo JEROME YANTZ, Defendant
No Logo Jill Wetmore, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo JOHN MOONINGHAM, Defendant
No Logo LEOLA WILSON, Defendant
No Logo MARCIA SHANNON, Defendant
No Logo MARK MCCARTNEY, Defendant
No Logo PATRICIA CAVANAUGH, Defendant
No Logo Robert Lane, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT TUTTLE, Defendant
No Logo Saginaw Valley State University, Defendant
No Logo Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association, Defendant
No Logo Saun Strobel, Defendant
No Logo SCOTT CARMONA, Defendant
No Logo Shaun Bangert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by INVALID ADDRESS Kalniz, Iorio & Reardon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fillipe S. Iorio +1 616 940 1911 +1 616 940 1942 groffice@kiflaw.com
No Logo Stewart French, Defendant
No Logo SURENDER REDDY, Defendant
No Logo SUSIE EMOND, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM WILLIAMSON, Defendant
  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion - Free
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Vacate
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                  Renewed MOTION to Vacate 90 Order on Motion for Sanctions, 91 Order PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS by R. L. Ross. (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                    EXHIBIT SVSUFA Defendants Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, Or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel With Sanctions and Payment of Expenses re 95 Reply to Response to Motion,, by BROOKS BYAM, Shaun Bangert, Deborah Bishop, PATRICIA CAVANAUGH, Stewart French, Robert Lane, MARK MCCARTNEY, JOHN MOONINGHAM, GRETCHEN OWOCKI, HONG PARK, SURENDER REDDY, MARCIA SHANNON, Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association, Saun Strobel, Christopher Surfield, ERIK TRUMP, ROBERT TUTTLE, WILLIAM WILLIAMSON (Iorio, Fillipe) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                            BILL OF COSTS Incurred in Making Motion for Sanctions by DAVID ABBS, Donald Bachand, SCOTT CARMONA, SUSIE EMOND, CATHY FERGUSON, DAVID GAMEZ, ERIC GILBERTSON, DEBORAH HUNTLEY, JEFFREY MARTIN, Saginaw Valley State University, JENEE VELASQUEZ, LEOLA WILSON, Jill Wetmore, JEROME YANTZ (Nisidis, Jamie) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to 81 MOTION for Sanctions and Payment of Expenses Opposition filed by R. L. Ross. (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument*
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion held on 12/3/2015. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Harrison) (Number of Pages: 33) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 1/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2016. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (CHar) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                OBJECTION and motion to vacate 76 order, with motion for protective order by R. L. Ross. (DPer) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    BILL OF COSTS by DAVID ABBS, Donald Bachand, SCOTT CARMONA, SUSIE EMOND, CATHY FERGUSON, DAVID GAMEZ, ERIC GILBERTSON, DEBORAH HUNTLEY, JEFFREY MARTIN, Saginaw Valley State University, JENEE VELASQUEZ, LEOLA WILSON, Jill Wetmore, JEROME YANTZ (KKra) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re 54 Notice of Appeal filed by R. L. Ross [Appeal Case Number 15-1537] (KCla) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE to 60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Brief In Support and Exhibit A Response in Opposition to Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion filed by R. L. Ross. (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 59 Amended Answer to Complaint, 60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Brief In Support and Exhibit A by BROOKS BYAM, Shaun Bangert, Deborah Bishop, PATRICIA CAVANAUGH, Stewart French, Robert Lane, MARK MCCARTNEY, JOHN MOONINGHAM, GRETCHEN OWOCKI, HONG PARK, SURENDER REDDY, MARCIA SHANNON, Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association, Saun Strobel, Christopher Surfield, ERIK TRUMP, ROBERT TUTTLE, WILLIAM WILLIAMSON Proof of Service (Iorio, Fillipe) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fillipe S. Iorio appearing on behalf of BROOKS BYAM, MARK MCCARTNEY, HONG PARK, ROBERT TUTTLE, WILLIAM WILLIAMSON (Iorio, Fillipe) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion - Free
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued for *BROOKS BYAM, MARK MCCARTNEY, HONG PARK, ROBERT TUTTLE, WILLIAM WILLIAMSON* (DAll) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. DAVID ABBS waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; SCOTT CARMONA waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; SUSIE EMOND waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; CATHY FERGUSON waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; DAVID GAMEZ waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; ERIC GILBERTSON waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; DEBORAH HUNTLEY waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; JEFFREY MARTIN waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; JENEE VELASQUEZ waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; LEOLA WILSON waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; JEROME YANTZ waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. PATRICIA CAVANAUGH waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; SURENDER REDDY waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. R. L. Ross waiver sent on 2/3/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Erik Trump Waiver of Service, # 2 Exhibit Marcia Ellen Shannon Waiver of Service, # 3 Exhibit Gretchen Owocki Waiver of Service, # 4 Exhibit John Mooningham Waiver of Service) (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fillipe S. Iorio appearing on behalf of PATRICIA CAVANAUGH (Iorio, Fillipe) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fillipe S. Iorio appearing on behalf of JOHN MOONINGHAM, GRETCHEN OWOCKI, SURENDER REDDY, MARCIA SHANNON, ERIK TRUMP (Iorio, Fillipe) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Saginaw Valley State University (Nisidis, Jamie) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie H. Nisidis appearing on behalf of DAVID ABBS, SCOTT CARMONA, SUSIE EMOND, CATHY FERGUSON, DAVID GAMEZ, ERIC GILBERTSON, DEBORAH HUNTLEY, JEFFREY MARTIN, JENEE VELASQUEZ, LEOLA WILSON, JEROME YANTZ (Nisidis, Jamie) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued for * DAVID ABBAS, BROOKS BYAM, SCOTT CARMONA, PATRICIA CAVANAUGH, SUSIE EMOND, CATHY FERGUSON, DAVID GAMEZ, ERIC GILBERTSON, DEBORAH HUNTLEY, JEFFREY MARTIN, MARK MCCARTNEY, JOHN MOONINGHAM, GRETCHEN OWOCKI, HONG PARK, SURENDER REDDY, MARCIA SHANNON, ERIK TRUMP, ROBERT TUTTLE, JENEE VELASQUEZ, WILLIAM WILLIAMSON, LEOLA WILSON, JEROME YANTZ* (TMcg) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by R. L. Ross [APPROVED PENDING COMPLETION OF ON-LINE TRAINING] (KCla) Modified on 1/22/2015 (KCla). [DISREGARD: APPLICANT IS AN E-FILING ATTORNEY] (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Reassignment/Disqualification
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (SSch) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore (Nisidis, Jamie) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/1/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Donald Bachand waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Saginaw Valley State University waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Jill Wetmore waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Shaun Bangert waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Deborah Bishop waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Stewart French waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Robert Lane waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Saun Strobel waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014; Christopher Surfield waiver sent on 10/27/2014, answer due 12/26/2014. (Ross, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Change Venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Fillipe S. Iorio appearing on behalf of Shaun Bangert, Deborah Bishop, Stewart French, Robert Lane, Saginaw Valley State University Faculty Association, Saun Strobel, Christopher Surfield Appearance (Iorio, Fillipe) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 2 Attorney Appearance by Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore (Nisidis, Jamie) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie H. Nisidis appearing on behalf of Donald Bachand, Saginaw Valley State University, Jill Wetmore (Nisidis, Jamie) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by R. L. Ross against All Defendants Receipt No: 072923 - Fee: $ 400. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 975 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?