Prolitec, Inc. v. ScentAir Technologies, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 15-1017

Tags
Tag
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 8:23 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
APPENDIX FILED for Prolitec, Inc. [29]. Number of Pages: 441. Service: 03/23/2015 by clerk. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/30/2015. [226873]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
    TENDERED from Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 03/23/2015 by email. [226472]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
      REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellant Prolitec, Inc. [26]. Number of Pages: 12. Service: 03/16/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/23/2015. Appendix is due 03/26/2015. [224875]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
        TENDERED from Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 03/16/2015 by email. [224684]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
          BRIEF FILED for Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc. [23]. Number of Pages: 39. Service: 02/26/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 03/09/2015. Appellant Prolitec, Inc. reply brief is due 03/16/2015. [220739]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
            TENDERED from Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 02/26/2015 by email. [220348]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
              BRIEF FILED for Appellant Prolitec, Inc. [20]. Number of Pages: 36. Service: 01/14/2015 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 01/20/2015. Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc. brief is due 02/26/2015. [210019]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                TENDERED from Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 01/14/2015 by email. [209926]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                  ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant/petitioner principal brief [16] filed by Appellant Prolitec, Inc. Brief due 01/14/2015.. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [200121]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION of Appellant Prolitec, Inc. to extend the time to 01/14/2015 at 11:59 pm to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition is due 12/08/2014 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 11/24/2014 by email. [199801]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                      Entry of appearance for Cory C. Bell as of counsel for Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Service: 11/10/2014 by email. [196586]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                        Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191141]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                          Entry of appearance for Tiffany L. Williams as of counsel for Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191059]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                            Entry of appearance for Adam H. Charnes as of counsel for Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191053]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                              Entry of appearance for Joshua B. Pond as principal counsel for Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191051]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                Entry of appearance for J. Derek McCorquindale as of counsel for Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191043]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                  Docketing Statement for the Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191038]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Interest for the Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191035]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                      Entry of appearance for D. Clay Holloway as of counsel for Appellee ScentAir Technologies, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191032]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                        Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191026]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                          Docketing Statement for the Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191020]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                            Entry of appearance for Erika H. Arner as principal counsel for Appellant Prolitec, Inc.. Service: 10/20/2014 by email. [191018]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                              Corrected Notice of Docketing issued [To include originating agency information ]. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [187948]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                Appeal docketed. Date received: 08/25/2014. [187876] Entry of Appearance due 10/20/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/20/2014. Docketing Statement due 10/20/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 12/05/2014.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?