Olsen v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Southern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cv-00370
District Judge Robert W. Pratt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 3:38 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carl E. Olsen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sam C. Mitchell and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl E. Olsen carl-olsen@mchsi.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
United States Secretary of State
TERMINATED: 04/02/2009 Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
United States Secretary of State
TERMINATED: 04/02/2009 Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Clinton"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
United States Secretary of State per response filed 1/26/09 Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
United States Secretary of State per response filed 1/26/09 Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mark Filip, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Acting Attorney General added per response filed 01/26/09 Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
Acting Attorney General added per response filed 01/26/09 Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Attorney General of the United States
TERMINATED: 04/02/2009 Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Attorney General of the United States
TERMINATED: 04/02/2009 Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michele Leonhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Acting Administrator, United States Drug Enforcement Administration
TERMINATED: 04/02/2009 Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov
Acting Administrator United States Drug Enforcement Administration per response filed 01/26/09 Gary L Hayward - +1 515 473 9300 +1 515 473 9282 usaias.nefcivil@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Acting Administrator United States Drug Enforcement Administration per response filed 01/26/09 Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
Acting Administrator, United States Drug Enforcement Administration
TERMINATED: 04/02/2009 Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
JUDGMENT in favor of Hillary Clinton, Mark Filip, Michele Leonhart against Carl E. Olsen. Signed by Clerk Marjorie Krahn on 4/27/2009. (gk, ) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 19 Motion ; denying 25 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge Robert W. Pratt on 4/27/09. (mlm, ) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Carl E. Olsen re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Notice of Review in U.S. Supreme Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit United States Supreme Court)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
        REPLY to Defendants' Opposition re 25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Carl E. Olsen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1, # 2 Exhibit #2, # 3 Exhibit #3, # 4 Exhibit #4, # 5 Exhibit #5, # 6 Exhibit #6, # 7 Exhibit #7, # 8 Exhibit #8, # 9 Exhibit #9, # 10 Exhibit #10, # 11 Exhibit #11, # 12 Exhibit #12, # 13 Exhibit #13, # 14 Exhibit #14, # 15 Exhibit #15, # 16 Exhibit #16, # 17 Exhibit #17, # 18 Exhibit #18)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice. Replies due by 2/5/2009.(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
            REPLY - SECOND AMENDED re 27 Supplemental Response Brief, re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Carl E. Olsen. (Clerks Note: First Amended Reply not filed - deemed moot by this filing). (gk, ) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
              Errata Added digital signature to document re 28 Notice (Other) filed by Carl E. Olsen. (Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 30 plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended reply to defendants' supplemental brief. The case manager shall detach and separately file plaintiff's Second Amended Reply [30-3] attached to the motion. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended reply 29 is moot. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 1/20/2009. (klw) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2009, Entered: None
                  Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Brief/Other Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Brief Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. by Carl E. Olsen. Responses due by 2/5/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Re: Second Amended Reply, # 2 Brief in Support Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Brief)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/19/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/18/2009, Entered: None
                    First MOTION to Amend/Correct 24 Reply to Response Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. by Carl E. Olsen. Responses due by 2/4/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Brief in Support Amended Reply Brief)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/18/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Carl E. Olsen Judicial Notice - Fed. R. Evid. 201 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Petition for Review - U.S. Court of Appeals)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/17/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in support of the Defendants motion to dismiss 6 . (don) Modified link on 1/20/2009 (ljf, ). (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 23 defendants' motion for leave to file supplemental brief in support of motion to dismiss. The case manager shall detach and separately file "Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss." Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to file a response to defendants' supplemental brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 1/14/2009. (nsr) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Carl E. Olsen. Responses due by 2/2/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support Memorandum of Law)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                              REPLY re 23 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Carl E. Olsen. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Brief in Support Proposed Brief)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. by Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice. Responses due by 1/30/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by Carl E. Olsen Judical Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DEA Rejection of Petition)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to Defendants' Response re 19 MOTION filed by Carl E. Olsen.(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION filed by Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice. Replies due by 1/15/2009.(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Carl E. Olsen of U.S. Supreme Court docketing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Petition for Writ of Certiorari)(Olsen, Carl) Modified on 1/5/2009 (kb, ). Modified on 1/5/2009 (kb) changed to Motion for Judicial Notice Purs. to F.R.Evid. 201. (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                          REPLY to Defendants' Opposition re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl E. Olsen. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice. Replies due by 12/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/14/2008, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to Defendants' Opposition re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carl E. Olsen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Civil Complaint, # 2 Exhibit State Incorporation Documents)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 12/14/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice. Replies due by 12/22/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara L. Ulrich on behalf of all defendants (Ulrich, Tamara) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Carl E. Olsen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Court Decision)(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Errata Corrected Page Numbering re 9 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carl E. Olsen. (Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTIONS REFERRAL - NO DOCUMENT - 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motions referred to Robert W. Pratt. (sc) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. by Carl E. Olsen. Responses due by 12/11/2008 (Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Carl E. Olsen. Responses due by 12/17/2008 (Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 11/23/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Carl E. Olsen. Replies due by 12/4/2008.(Olsen, Carl) (Entered: 11/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting [6-1] defendants' application for permission to file brief in excess of 20 pages. The brief may stand in the record as filed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 11/19/2008. (klw) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice. Responses due by 12/4/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Application for permission to File Brief in Excess of 20 pages, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hagen, Christopher) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 3 plaintiff's Motion access to ECF system. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 9/29/2008. (klw) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in support of proof of service by pro se pltf Carl Olsen. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of service by certified mail, # 2 certified mail receipt to Secretary of State, # 3 certified mail receipt to Mukasey, Attorney General, # 4 certified mail receipt to Michele Leonhart, DEA, # 5 certified mail receipt to Matthew Whitaker US Attorney IASD) (ljf, ) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for access to electronic case filing Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. by pro se pltf Carl Olsen. Responses due by 10/6/2008 (ljf, ) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Summons Issued as to Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (don) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT against Michael B. Mukasey, Michele Leonhart, Condoleezza Rice, filed by Carl Olsen. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/13/2009. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Monerandum in support, # 2 Exhibits 1-7, # 3 Exhibits 8-11, # 4 Exhibit 12, # 5 Exhibits 13-22, # 6 Exhibits 23-31) (don) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?