William Wagner v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-2107

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 4:48 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405329092
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405207684 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
    (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by William Wagner for. [14-2107]--[Edited 10/30/2014 by SAW] Margaret Jernigan
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James M. Sullivan. AUSA for US.[999466068] [14-2107] James Sullivan
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                    Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-2107] (SLW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Laura Andersen. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 3/24/14 - Opening Statements; 3/25/14 - Closing Arguments. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: William Wagner.. Originating case number: 3:12-cv-00130-GCM. Transcript due from Laura Andersen, Official Court Reporter on 01/05/2015. [14-2107] (SAW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                        Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by William Wagner for. [14-2107] Margaret Jernigan
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                          Docket correction requested from Mr. Gary Walker Jackson, Esq. for William Wagner, Leonard Thell Jernigan, Jr. for William Wagner and Margaret Hayes Jernigan for William Wagner. [14-2107] (SAW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Amy E. Ray for US.[999465602] [14-2107] Amy Ray
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant William Wagner. [14-2107] Margaret Jernigan
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant William Wagner. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999465442] [14-2107] Margaret Jernigan
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Leonard T. Jernigan, Jr.; Gary W. Jackson; M. Hayes Jernigan for William Wagner.[999465439] [14-2107] Margaret Jernigan
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [2] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:12-cv-00130-GCM. Mailed to: L. Jernigan. [14-2107] (SAW)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:12-cv-00130-GCM. Case manager: SWiley. [14-2107] (SAW)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?