LaserDynamics, LLC v. Craig Electronics, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-05113

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 10:38 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laserdynamics, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush, Irene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaston Kroub +1 917 702 9135 gkroub@kskiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sergey Kolmykov +1 917 702 9135 skolmykov@kskiplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@kskiplaw.com
v.
No Logo Craig Electronics, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Craig Electronics, Inc.. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: granting 11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. Craig Electronics, Inc. answer due 9/12/2014. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/8/2014) (djc) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Gaston Kroub dated 9/04/2014. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/8/2014 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/3/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Craig Electronics, Inc. answer due 9/5/2014. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/6/2014) (ft) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Gaston Kroub dated 8/04/2014. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
              STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-01704. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Craig Electronics, Inc. served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. Service was accepted by Joel Newman, President. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                  STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-cv-5112. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kamatani Technologies, LLC for LaserDynamics, LLC. Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (moh) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against Craig Electronics, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1099737)Document filed by LaserDynamics, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Part 2, # 2 Complaint Part 3)(moh) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?