Al-asaad v. Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10689
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 11:09 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mrs. Dheyaa A.E. Al-asaad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DALY CAVANAUGH LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY J. DALY +1 781 237 0600 tjd@dalylaw.com
v.
No Logo Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClairRyan-VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L. Messenger +1 617 772 8300 +1 617 772 8333 james.messenger@leclairryan.com
No Logo Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund VI, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Thomas H. Lee Partners, LP, Defendant
No Logo Judge Morris E. Lasker, Mediator
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Dheyaa A.E. Al-asaad. (Daly, Timothy) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
    REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Clarke, Barbara) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
      REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re 9 JOINT STATEMENT is SO ORDER AS MODIFIED as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE April 4, 2008 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE April 18, 2008.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund VI, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P..(Messenger, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund VI, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P.. (Messenger, James) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
              JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference and [Proposed] Scheduling Order. (Daly, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceScheduling Conference set for 9/10/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                  AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund VI, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P.. (Messenger, James) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P. waiver sent on 4/24/2007, answer due 6/25/2007. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2007, answer due 6/25/2007. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund VI, L.P. waiver sent on 4/24/2007, answer due 6/25/2007. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund VI, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P..(Messenger, James) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2007 to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund VI, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P..(Messenger, James) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1477882, filed by Dheyaa A.E. Al-asaad. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category Sheet# 3 Summons# 4 Summons# 5)(Daly, Timothy) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?