Cohen v. Trump
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG
District Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 20, 2017 at 12:24 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Art Cohen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber Lee Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 ambere@zhlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878 aarono@zhlaw.com
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin James Morris +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 bmorris@foley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy L. Stagg +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 nstagg@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shumener, Odson & Oh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/12/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Betty Malka Shumener +1 213 344 4201 bshumener@soollp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity HN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Ann Martin +1 310 303 3225 +1 310 265 5522 jmartin@trumpnational.com
No Logo ABC, Inc., Miscellaneous Party
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, ABC Holding CO Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
No Logo Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN"), Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
CBS Interactive, Inc. CBS Interactive, Inc., Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
No Logo NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
No Logo Tribune Publishing Company, Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
No Logo WP Company LLC dba The Washington Post, Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli L. Sager +1 213 633 6821 +1 213 633 6899 kellisager@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alonzo B Wickers, IV +1 213 633 6800 +1 213 633 6899 alonzowickers@dwt.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (327) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 335 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER of USCA as to 332 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Leeland O. White. A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with the USCA to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the USDC as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to the USCA; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. Any motion to proceed in forma pauperis must include a financial declaration such as the attached Form 4. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. (akr) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document 334 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    USCA Time Schedule Order as to 332 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Leeland O. White. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 8/21/2017 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 9/19/2017.) (cc: Court Reporter). (akr) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
      LREF
      Legal Document 333 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      USCA Case Number 17-56051 for 332 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Leeland O. White. (akr) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document 332 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to 330 Order denying Leeland O. White's "Amended Motion to Set Aside Judgment" and "Amended Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene," filed by Leeland O. White. Fee not paid. (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
          LREF
          Legal Document 331 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Notice of Attending Court Hearing by Leeland White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1(h) Filer not a party to case. No provisions for acceptance. The July 14, 2017 hearing was vacated per the Courts June 27, 2017 Order and will not be held. See Dkt. No. 330. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (Discrepancy sent via US Mail to filer) (dlg). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
            LREF
            Legal Document 330 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER denying Leeland O. White's "Amended Motion to Set Aside Judgment" and "Amended Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene (ECF 311 , 315 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/27/2017. (fth) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
              LREF
              Legal Document 329 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 318 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Simpson is directed to post an appeal bond of $500 to cover taxable costs within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (dlg) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                LREF
                Legal Document 328 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY to Response to Motion re 315 MOTION to Vacate, 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Leeland O. White. Nunc pro tunc 6/16/17 (dlg) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 327 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Petitioner Leeland O. White's Reply to Defendant's Response. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/16/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (document sent via U.S. Mail to filer)(dlg) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 318 MOTION for Appeal Bond re 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 16-18 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Helen I. Zeldes by Art Cohen (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Eck, Amber) (dlg). (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Art Cohen (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Eck, Amber) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re 322 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Friedman, Gary) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 318 MOTION for Appeal Bond re 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, Memorandum of Law filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gary B. Friedman, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Friedman, Gary) QC EMAIL - missing certificate of service (fth). (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER of USCA as to 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. The plaintiffs-appellees' unopposed motion to expedite is granted in part. This case is expedited and shall be calendared as soon as possible upon completion of briefing. Briefing schedule issued. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) regarding streamlined extensions shall not apply to this case, and any motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b) is strongly disfavored and must be supported by a showing of compelling circumstances. (akr) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Joinder by Art Cohen re 319 Response in Opposition to Motion [Plaintiff's Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Opposition to Leeland White's Motion to Set Aside Judgment] (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Appeal Bond re 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-15 to Jensen Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in support thereof, # 5 Declaration of Charles Marr in support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel)(dlg). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment and 315 MOTION to Vacate : Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by June 2, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by June 16, 2017. The hearing set for July 14, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. currently remains on calendar. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/23/17.(dlg) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amended Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene by Leeland White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Duplicate filing as to Dkt. No. 315. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/23/17.(Discrepancy mailed to filer) (dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 315 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Amended MOTION to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene filed by Leeland O. White. (dlg) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            USCA Time Schedule Order as to 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court (see attached), provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 5/31/2017 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 6/30/2017.) (cc: Court Reporter). (Attachments: # 1 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form). (akr) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              USCA Case Number 17-55635 for 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (akr) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment : A hearing has been scheduled for July 14, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. The Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule. Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by May 26, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/17.(Mr. White served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Leeland O. White. Nunc pro tunc 5/1/17.(dlg) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Motion to Set Aside Judgment by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Missing table of contents and/or table of authorities;. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/1/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/17.(dlg) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to 306 Final Judgment, 305 Order, by Sherri B. Simpson. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-10035995.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Eng, Kevin). (Modified on 5/1/2017: Edited docket text re linked Judgment and Order.) (akr). (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/30/2017, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter (Ex Parte). Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication prohibited. Case closed. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/3/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 306 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            FINAL JUDGMENT. Effective as of the date of the Final Approval Order, this Judgment is binding on all Parties and all Class Members and extinguishes all Released Claims of Releasing Plaintiffs and Class Members and Releasing Defendants that were released pursuant to the Agreement. The Actions, including the individual claims of Plaintiffs and Class claims resolved in them, are hereby dismissed on the merits and with prejudice without fees or costs to any Party, except as provided in the Agreement. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017.(jao) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 305 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER (1) Granting 294 Joint Motion For Final Approval of The Proposed Class Action Settlement; and (2) Granting 295 Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval of Class Representative Awards. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017. (jao) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Final Approval Hearing held on 3/30/2017; Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2017 re 294 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Art Cohen, - taken under submission 295 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards filed by Art Cohen - taken under submission. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Eck, Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum and Jeffrey Stein).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin).(Gary Friedman for Objector Sherri Simpson and IIann Maazel). (no document attached) (ksr) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 303 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER Denying 287 Leeland O. White's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/27/17. (dlg) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Joinder by Donald J. Trump re 301 Reply to Response to Motion, (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 294 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement , 295 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support, # 2 Reply Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support, # 3 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support, # 4 Declaration of Charles Marr, Esq. in Support, # 5 Declaration of Robert Guillo)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amended Motion and Memoranda Determine Concerning Conspiracy by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: not a party to the case, no provision for acceptance. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/17.(Discrepancy served via U.S. mail to filer)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 299 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Letter Objecting to Settlement from Harold Doe. Nunc pro tunc 2/23/17 (dlg) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 298 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Settlement Objection Letter by Harold Doe. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Settlement objection letter does not fully comply with the requirements for written objections set forth in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/23/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/17.(dlg) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Leeland O. White's Amended REPLY to Response to Motion re 287 MOTION to Intervene. Nunc pro tunc 2/17/17. (dlg) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Amended Reply by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Document exceeds 10 pages without court order. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/17/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/17.(dlg) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 3 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Leave of Court to File Motion by Leeland O. White.. Non-compliance with local rule(s) OTHER:Reply brief was prematurely sent on February 3, 2017, prior to the response by the existing parties in the case filed on February 6, 2017. See the Courts January 24, 2017 Order Setting Briefing Schedule re: motion to intervene (Dkt. No. 288) (Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by February 6, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by February 21, 2017. (emphasis added)). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/7/2017.(fth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (fth). (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder by Art Cohen re 291 Response to Motion Plaintiff's Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Opposition to Leeland White's Motion to Intervene and to Object to Class Action Settlement (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (fth). (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 287 MOTION to Intervene / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Leeland White's Motion to Intervene and to object to Class Action Settlement filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (fth). (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Motion to Determine Possible Conspiracy by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: not a party to the case, no provision for acceptance. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/3/17. (Discrepancy sent via U.S. Mail to Leeland O. White. dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg). (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Request for Claim Form or Docket Reflecting Counsel's Address filed by Gary A. Niswonger. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication; filer not a party to the case; no provisions for acceptance. Information pertaining to Settlement Claim Forms is set forth in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/17.Document sent via U.S. Mail to filer. (dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2017: # 1 rejected document) (dlg). (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 287 MOTION to Intervene : Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by February 6, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by February 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/17. Leeland O. White served via U.S. Mail(dlg) (dlg). (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  AMENDED Ex Parte MOTION in Right to Intervene and Object. Nunc pro tunc 1/19/17. Filed by Leeland O. White. (dlg) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Amended Ex Parte Motion in Right to Intervene filed by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Incorrect format. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/19/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/17.Filer served via U.S. Mail. (dlg) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form filed by DeWitt Jackson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/18/17.(Filer served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2017: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg). (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amended Ex Parte Motion in Right to Intervene and to Object filed by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Missing certificate of service to demonstrate that the parties have been served as required by Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(c). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/11/17.(Discrepancy mailed to Leeland O. White)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1715(B) by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 281 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Directing Issuance of Notice; and Setting Final Approval Hearing. This Court shall hold a Final Approval Hearing on March 30, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. The motion for final approval and any application(s) for Service Awards shall be filed and served within sixty (60) calendar days of this Order. Any replies to any objections shall be filed and served at least seven (7) calendar days prior to the Final Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/20/16. (dlg) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 281 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Class Action Settlement)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Motion to Intervene. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/28/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2016: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg). (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Minute ORDER; Parties have entered into a Settlement Agreement. re 192 Motion for Decertification by Donald J. Trump. - Dismissed without prejudice; re 193 Motion to File Documents Under Seal - Dismissed without prejudice; re 256 Motion For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. - Dismissed without prejudice; All pending dates vacated. (no document attached) (ksr) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 277 Joint Motion to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/21/16. (dlg) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 order on motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 181 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Michael A. Kamins; Denying Defendant's 188 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Habibi; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 184 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Deforest McDuff, PH.D; Denying Plaintiff's Motions 187 , 189 to Exclude the Testimony of Alan D. Wallace, ESQ., and Joel Steckel, PH.D.; Granting Defendant's Motions to Seal 182 , 190 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/29/16. (dlg) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/26/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2016. (akr) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2016 re 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen, 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Donald J. Trump, 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi filed by Donald J. Trump, 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins filed by Donald J. Trump, 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. filed by Art Cohen, 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen, 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Donald J. Trump, Motions Submitted and the Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez, Daniel Pfefferbaum, Rachel Jensen). (Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli). (no document attached) (lsf) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              TENTATIVE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins. Denying Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi. Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Experts Deforest McDuff, Ph.D; Alan D. Wallace, Esq.; and Joel Steckel, Ph.D. Granting Defendant's Motions to Seal, ECF Nos. 182, 190. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 08/25/16.(jpm) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Notice of Lodgment
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Lodgment by Art Cohen re 269 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, Order on Motion to Intervene,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 220 Response in Opposition to Motion,, [Notice of Lodgment of Exhibit L to the Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] (Forge, Jason) (aef). (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 269 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 238 Defendant's Motion to Amend Protective Order; Denying 233 Media Intervenors' Motion to Intervene and for An Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 230 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16. (dlg) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 268 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER Denying Defendant's 180 Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16. (dlg) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Joint 266 Motion to Continue Pretrial Disclosures and Proceedings Until Resolution of Pending Motions. All of the dates in the Second Amended Scheduling Order are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/26/16. (dlg) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Disclosures and Proceedings until Resolution of Pending Motions by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D., 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq., 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi, 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D., : Court schedules hearing, Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (ksr) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/22/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2016, re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald J. Trump, 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins filed by Donald J. Trump, 192 MOTION for Decertification filed by Donald J. Trump ; Motions Submitted and the Court will prepare written order. The Court will file a Notice of hearing re Motions to Exclude Experts testimony [184,187,188,189]. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, X. Jay Alvarez, amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 262 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/13/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2016 re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order filed by The New York Times Company, ABC, Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC, CBS Interactive Inc., Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN"), CBS Broadcasting Inc., WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post, Tribune Publishing Company, 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J. Trump, Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare a written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman). (Media Intervenor Attorney Dan Laidman).(no document attached) (lsf) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J. Trump re 259 Reply to Response to Motion, (Petrocelli, Daniel) (aef). (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 256 Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) QC email, missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 256 Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. filed by Art Cohen. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE [Notice of Plaintiff's Intent to Oppose Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Object to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Stekel, Ph.D.] by Art Cohen re 256 Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 254 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 253 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend Protective Order filed by ABC, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN"), Fox News Network, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, The New York Times Company, Tribune Publishing Company, WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Sager, Kelli) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Regarding 240 Joint Motion for Advancement of June 30, 2016 Hearing Date. The Court reschedules the hearing date related to Defendants' Motion to Amend Protective Order (ECF 238 ) and non-party Media Intervenors' motion to Intervene (ECF 233 ) to July 13, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/16. (dlg) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 251 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 250 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE [Plaintiff's Statement of Non-Opposition] by Art Cohen re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Defendant's Response in Support of Defendant's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY - Other re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Defendant Donald J. Trump's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY - Other re 192 MOTION for Decertification (Defendant Donald J. Trump's Reply in Support of Motion for Decertification) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY - Other re 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi (Defendant Donald J. Trump's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY - Other re 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins (Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY - Other re 186 Request for Judicial Notice, (Defendant's Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Further Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 4-16 to Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 17 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 18 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 19-27 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 28-30 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 31-33 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 34 part 1 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 34 part 2 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 34 part 3 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 35 and 36 part 1 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 36 part 2 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 37-38 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 39-42 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. filed by Art Cohen. (Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen. (Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue June 30, 2016 hearing date by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order: Any response is due on or before June 22, 2016. Any reply is due on or before June 27, 2016. A hearing is set for June 30, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/16.(dlg) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 237 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Joinder by Fox News Network, LLC re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 2 Proof of Service)(Sager, Kelli) (dlg). (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 236 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 230 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits [Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Electronic Exhibits] filed by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (dlg). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 235 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 230 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (ECF No. 233 ). Any response shall be due on or before June 20, 2016. Any reply shall be due on or before June 22, 2016. A hearing is set for June 30, 2016, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/10/2016.(knb) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post, Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN"), CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Tribune Publishing Company, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, ABC, Inc., The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order, # 2 Declaration of Diana Palacios In Support of Motion of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit A to Palacios Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Palacios Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Palacios Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Palacios Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Palacios Declaration, # 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Media Intervenors, # 9 Proof of Service)(Sager, Kelli)Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN")(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party CBS Broadcasting Inc.(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party CBS Interactive Inc.(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party Tribune Publishing Company(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party ABC, Inc.(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party The New York Times Company(pty:misc) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Seeking Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Electronic Exhibits by Donald J. Trump re 230 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 229 Joint Motion to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/9/2016. (knb) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A to Jensen Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION by Plaintiff and Defendant to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jensen, Rachel) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Returning Non-Electronic Lodgement of Videos in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion (ECF 220 ). Plaintiff's video submissions, ECF No. 220, Exs. D, L, M, shall not be filed as exhibits, but instead returned to Plaintiff. Plaintiff may seek to refile the exhibits in accordance with Section 2.k of the the Court's Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/8/16.(dlg) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 227 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List re 220 Response in Opposition to Motion [Amended Index of Electronic Submissions Lodged with the Court in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Jensen, Rachel) QC email re incorrect filer. Attorney should Withdraw and re-file with proper signature (dlg). (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 226 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Exhibit, NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Donald J. Trump re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 11-Part 2)(Petrocelli, Daniel) Modified on 6/9/2016 to add 'amended exhibit' to docket text (dlg). (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List re 220 Response in Opposition to Motion [Index of Electronic Video Submissions Lodged with the Court in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Forge, Jason) (dlg). (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 186 Request for Judicial Notice, [Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Donald J. Trump's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins] filed by Art Cohen. (Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-16 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 17-29 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 30-41 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian E. Cochran in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-24 to the Cochran Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 25-37 to the Cochran Declartion)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 192 MOTION for Decertification filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-17 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 220 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A through D Forge Declaration, # 3 Exhibit E part 1 to Forge Declaration, # 4 Exhibit E part 2 to Forge Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E part 3 to Forge Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E part 4 to Forge Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F through U to Forge Declaration, # 8 Exhibit V to Forge Declaration, # 9 Exhibit W through BB to Forge Declaration, # 10 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Separate Statement of Purported Undisputed "Facts")(Forge, Jason) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, # 2 Exhibit 1-13 to the Kirman Declaration, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Notice to the Court of Contemptuous Statements. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: ex parte communication; not a proper party to this action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/2/2016.(nbp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2016: # 1 Rejected Document) (nbp). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE (Defendant's Notice of Filing Redacted Versions of Exhibits 2, 25, 26, and 33 to the Stagg Declaration in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification) by Donald J. Trump re 213 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Jill) (dlg). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 214 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE [Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Redacted Versions of Exhibits 14-16 to the Forge Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification] by Art Cohen re 213 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 14), # 2 Exhibit B (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 15), # 3 Exhibit C (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 16))(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 213 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Re: Sealing Order. Plaintiff shall file redacted versions of Exhibits 14-16 to the Forge Declaration and, and Defendant shall file redacted versions of Exhibits 2, 25, 26, and 33 to the Stagg Declaration on or before June 2, 2016. The Court also unseals Exhibit 24 to the Forge Declaration as the parties agreed to unseal that document. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/31/16.(dlg) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 212 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE [Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Unsealed Versions of the Playbooks] by Art Cohen re 211 Order on Motion to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 6) part 1, # 2 Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 6) part 2, # 3 Exhibit B (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 21), # 4 Exhibit C (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 27), # 5 Exhibit D (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 28))(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 211 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 176 Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/27/2016. (rlu) (Documents #48-6, #48-7, #48-8, #48-9, #48-12, #48-13, #48-14 and #49-1, #49-2, #49-3, #49-4, #49-5 unsealed) (sjt). Modified to notate the documents being unsealed on 5/31/2016 (sjt). (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2016 re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records filed by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post, Motions Submitted, Court will prepare a written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Rachel Jensen, Jason Forge, Amber Eck). (Defendant Attorney Jill Martin). (Attorney Washington Post: Dan Laidman).(no document attached) (lsf) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 208 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Order Regarding Pretrial Conference; Second Amended Case Management Order. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before August 5, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel, United States District Judge, on August 24, 2016, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/26/16. (dlg) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 208 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Conference Order Regarding August 12, 2016 Pretrial Conference by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants 203 Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings: Amended Case Management Order. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before August 5, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel, United States District Judge, on August 12, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/24/16. (dlg) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/22/2016, Entered: 5/22/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 203 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 05/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 203 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A-C to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Plaintiff's Intent to Oppose Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Deadlines by Art Cohen re 203 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg). (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg). (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records filed by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wickers, Alonzo) (dlg). (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Irene Zeldes on behalf of Art Cohen (Zeldes, Helen)Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (dlg). (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Alreen Haeggquist on behalf of Art Cohen (Haeggquist, Alreen)Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (dlg). (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill A. Martin, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Jill) (dlg). (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Hearing on Motions: 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi, 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq., 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D., 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D., 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins, 192 MOTION for Decertification . Court reschedules Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2016 to 7/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NON-OPPOSITION, NOTICE [Plaintiff's Statement of Non-Opposition] by Art Cohen re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) QC email re incorrect event. Edited dockete text to reflect non-oppo. (dlg). (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Stein on behalf of Art Cohen (Stein, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (dlg). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (ECF NOs. 180 , 181 , 182 , 184 , 187 , 188 , 189 , 190 , 192 , 193 .) The Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule: Any responses shall be due on or before June 3, 2016. Any replies shall be due on or before June 17, 2016. A hearing is set for July 18, 2016, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/25/2016.(nbp) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Decertification by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-15, # 4 Exhibits 16-26, # 5 Exhibits 27-42, # 6 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-3 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-7, # 4 Exhibits 8-11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibits 13-28, # 7 Exhibits 29-36, # 8 Exhibits 37-41, # 9 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of X. Jay Alvarez in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-13 to Alvarez Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 14 part 1 to Alvarez Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 14 part 2 to Alvarez Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 14 part 3 to Alvarez Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 15 to Alvarez Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Donald J. Trump re 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Brian E. Cochran in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-6 to Cochran Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 7-8 to Cochran Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 9-13 to Cochran Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Jay Alvarez on behalf of Art Cohen (Alvarez, Xavier)Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-14, # 4 Exhibits 15-23, # 5 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-2, # 4 Exhibits 3-21, # 5 Exhibits 22-23, # 6 Exhibits 24-28, # 7 Exhibits 29-30, # 8 Exhibits 31-41, # 9 Exhibits 42-47, # 10 Statement of Facts, # 11 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records : Any response shall be due on or before May 6, 2016. Any reply shall be due on or before May 13, 2016. A hearing is set for May 27, 2016, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/20/16.(dlg) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post re 177 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records (Wickers, Alonzo) (dlg). (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 177 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post identifying Corporate Parent Nash Holdings LLC for WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post.. (Wickers, Alonzo) QC email missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records, # 2 Declaration of Dan Laidman In Support of Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 5 Exhibit C (Part 1) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 6 Exhibit C (Part 2) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 7 Exhibit C (Part 3) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 8 Exhibit C (Part 4) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 9 Exhibit C (Part 5) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 10 Exhibit C (Part 6) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 11 Exhibit D to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 12 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records)(Wickers, Alonzo)Attorney Alonzo Wickers, IV added to party WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post(pty:dft) QC email re attached proposed order and missing certificate of service (dlg). (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 3/29/2016(no document attached) (mcb) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 173 Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Excuse Daniel M. Petrocelli From Attending the Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/22/2016. (nbp) (jao). (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Daniel M. Petrocelli at Mandatory Settlement Conference, or, Alternatively, to Permit Mr. Petrocelli to Appear Telephonically by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 2 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re: Confidential Portions of Deposition Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/14/16.(dlg)(jao). (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 170 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Order. The Court grants the Joint Motion and continues the deadline for the completion of all expert discovery to April 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/10/16. (dlg) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Order Modifying Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kirman, David) (dlg). (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 2/25/2016(no document attached) (lms) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. The Court will convene a telephonic Discovery Conference on February 25, 2016, at 7:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel intending to appear shall provide their name and contact information to the Court no later than February 24, 2016, at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/19/2016.(nbp) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Coughlin on behalf of Art Cohen (Coughlin, Patrick)Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting [165] Joint Motion to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/2/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016, Terminated: 2/2/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference for 3/29/2016 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/1/2016.(srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Cochran on behalf of Art Cohen (Cochran, Brian)Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part [438] Joint Motion Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference. Plaintiff Art Cohen's request to attend the conference telephonically is denied. Counsel for the Makaeff case is ordered to report to Judge Gallo's Chambers whether the Makaeff Named Plaintiffs will be appearing no later than Monday, January 25, 2016, at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/21/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016, Terminated: 1/21/2016 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION re [149] Scheduling Order,, [160] Order on Motion for Order,, [Joint Motion Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting [159] Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference. The Court's November 15, 2015 Case Management Conference Order is modified to allow Mr. Alan Garten, defendant Donald Trump's General Counsel to attend the January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference in place of Mr. Trump. The Court further orders that Parties make arrangements for Honorable Daniel Weinstein (Ret.) to attend the Settlement Conference either telephonically or in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/5/16. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015, Terminated: 1/5/2016 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Order (Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference) by Donald J. Trump. (Kirman, David) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: 12/29/2015 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting [156] Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald Trump. Daniel M. Petrocelli and David L. Kirman of OMelveny & Myers LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/22/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: 12/24/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/24/2015.(lms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015, Terminated: 12/29/2015 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE RE NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald J. Trump (Stagg, Nancy) QC email sent re wrong event selected. Edited docket text. Attorney to email proposed order to Chambers(dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute: Telephonic Status Conference held 12/17/2015. Telephonic Attorneys only Status Conference set for 12/24/2015 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/18/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Art Cohen re [130] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), [Plaintiffs' Notice of Timely Requests for Exclusion from the Class] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Letter from Class Administrator with List of Opt Outs)(Jensen, Rachel) (aef).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Kirman on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Kirman, David)Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Petrocelli, Daniel)Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Order on Motion to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Denying [150] Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/20/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015, Terminated: 11/23/2015 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases [Joint Motion for Order Consolidating Cases for Trial and Aligning Pretrial Schedules] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Cohen Case Joint Discovery Plan)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on January 27, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., in the chambers of Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before June 10, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel, United States District Court Judge, on June 17, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/12/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Denying [141] Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/29/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. Telephonic Status Conference held 10/21/2015. Within two business days of Judge Curiel's ruling on Plaintiff's pending Motion for Reconsideration, Plaintiff's counsel shall contact this Court to reschedule another telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/22/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 10/21/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [141] MOTION for Reconsideration re [136] Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, [Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Jul filed by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Response in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [141] MOTION for Reconsideration re [136] Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, [Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Jul y 31, 2015 Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER [142] Setting Briefing Schedule re [141] Any response shall be due on or by October 19, 2015. Any reply shall be due on or by October 20, 2015. A hearing is set for November 6, 2015, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/14/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015, Terminated: 10/14/2015 Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015, Terminated: 10/29/2015 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [136] Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, [Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. Telephonic Counsel Only Status Conference Reset for 10/21/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. The Status Conference set for October 14, 2015, at 9:30 a.m., is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/13/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic, Counsel Only Status Conference set for 10/14/2015 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/9/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying [123] Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order granting [124], [134] Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/8/2015. (sjt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (Document filed s Sealed Document [138]) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [134] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 135 replaced on 10/9/2015) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 10/9/2015 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015, Terminated: 10/9/2015 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Reply - OtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY - Other re [123] Objection, [Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Further Support, # (2) Exhibit 16-19 [REDACTED])(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING Amended Return Postcard (Doc. [131]). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/23/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Art Cohen re [130] [Plaintiffs' Notice of Unopposed Filing of Amended Return Postcard for Inclusion in the Mailed Notice] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Amended Return Postcard)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' [61] Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures: The Proposed Class Notices are approved for dissemination of class notice. The parties are authorized to make non-substantive changes to the notice, as long as they are acceptable to both parties, to reflect deadlines, mailing addresses, and similar information or to format the notice for printing. Plaintiffs will submit an amended Return Postcard that is consistent with this Order within seven (7) days of the Order. Epiq Systems, Inc. is approved as "Notice Administrator" to supervise and carry out the notice procedure. The deadline for exclusion from the Class shall be forty-five (45) days after the Notice Date. The Notice Administrator is ordered to provide counsel for both parties with a list of all timely requests for exclusion within seven (7) business days after the Opt-Out Deadline. Plaintiffs are ordered to file such list with the Court within three (3) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/21/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Response - OtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [123] Objection, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support of Defendant's Response)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference on August 17, 2015 Related to Deposition of Mr. Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/19/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [123] Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order: The Court resets the hearing for 10/23/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Any response shall be due on or by 9/18/2015. Any reply shall be due on or by 10/2/2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/18/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 8/17/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Document filed s Sealed Document [137]) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [124] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 125 replaced on 10/9/2015) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 10/9/2015 (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015, Terminated: 10/9/2015 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 ObjectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION by Art Cohen re [110] Order [Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1-15 to Pfefferbaum Declaration [Public Version])(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Discovery Conference set for 8/17/2015 at 7:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/12/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [119] Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Expert Discovery and Other Pretrial Dates Pending Reset Deadline for Fact Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/7/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER VACATING DISCOVERY HEARING. The Court Vacates the Discovery Hearing set for August 7, 2015, at 7:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/6/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015, Terminated: 8/7/2015 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Vacate [110] Order, [58] Scheduling Order, [102] Order, [111] Order [Joint Motion to Vacate Expert Discovery and Other Pretrial Dates Pending Reset Deadline for Fact Discovery] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's [114] Motion to File Exhibits 3d-3f to the Declaration of Jason A. Forge Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/5/2015. (jah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference on July 29, 2015. Telephonic Discovery Conference held. Plaintiff's request to issue an amended subpoena to Mr. Harris is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/5/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/5/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [114] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 115 replaced on 8/5/2015) (jah). Modified on 8/5/2015 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015, Terminated: 8/5/2015 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015, Terminated: 8/14/2015 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION re [112] Order [Joint Statement of Determination of Discovery Dispute] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge, # (2) Exhibit 1-5 to Forge Declaration (public), # (3) Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris and Exhibits A-S thereto)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER to File Joint Statement and Setting Discovery Hearing. Joint Statement due by 8/5/2015 at 9:00AM. Discovery Hearing set for 8/7/2015 at 7:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 2A, Second Floor, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California. Counsel for both parties must be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/4/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER VACATING FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/31/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Ruling on Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/31/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting [108] Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Amend June 30, 2015 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/30/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015, Terminated: 7/30/2015 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct [102] Order,, [Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Amend June 30, 2015 Order] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 7/29/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Following Discovery Conference on July 10, 2015; Order to File Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Disputes. Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute due by July 16, 2015, at 12:00 p.m. The parties are Ordered to meet and confer in person in good faith before filing the Joint Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/15/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Parties' Joint Request to Extend Deadline to Depose Defendant. The Court grants the parties' joint request to depose Defendant on August 26, 2015. No other dates will be extended. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/14/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 7/10/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Discovery Conference set for 7/10/2015 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/9/2015. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Sustaining in Part and Overruling in Part Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order (EFC [76]). The Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to make a sufficient showing as to these non-party defendants and, therefore, overrules Plaintiff's objection. The Court also overrules Plaintiff's objection to the extent he seeks an order allowing any further written or document discovery or authorizing any further discovery of anykind in the Makaeff case. The fact discovery cut-off date shall be extended to August 10, 2015 for the limited purpose of completing these depositions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/30/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Plaintiff's [88] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/29/2015. (jah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 6/24/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/5/2015, before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Court Reporter/Transcriber: James C. Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 6/18/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Amber Lee Eck (Eck, Amber) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part [86] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. The Court orders that the depositions of Mr. Matejek and Mr. Sexton be reopened to fully explore the questions foreclosed by Defendant's objection to the source of payment for the witnesses' attorneys' fees. The Court orders that the deposition of Mr. Matejek be reopened for the purpose of inquiring about TU's business operations, performance, or finances. The depositions of Mr. Matejek and Mr. Sexton shall take place on or before July 9, 2015. The Court denies Plaintiff's request to re-open the Makaeff discovery regarding the litigation hold and document perseveration. Defendant is ordered to produce all documents pursuant to this compromise on or before June 12, 2015. The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as to the 2011 documents. Defendant is ordered to identify all previously disclosed documents of which Trump Organization was the source on or before June 12, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/9/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 6/5/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [86] MOTION to Compel filed by Non-Party The Trump Organization and filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support, # (2) Exhibit A-E to Morris Declaration in Support, # (3) Declaration of Daniel Borbet in Support)(Morris, Benjamin) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 5/22/2015, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2015. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/29/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [88] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 89 replaced on 6/29/2015) (jah). Modified on 6/29/2015 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015, Terminated: 6/29/2015 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Reply - OtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY - Other re [84] Response - Other, [Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit B-E to Forge Declaration [Public Version])(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015, Terminated: 6/9/2015 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit 1-26 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/30/2015, Entered: 5/30/2015 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery Hearing set for 6/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 05/30/15.(mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Response - OtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re [76] Objection, Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [76] : Plaintiff filed an objection to the magistrate judge's May 13, 2015 order. The Court set a hearing date of July 17, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Defendant shall file his opposition on or by May 29, 2015. Any reply shall be due by June 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/27/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2015. [61] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Art Cohen, [77] Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen ; Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare a written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen).(Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [77] Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit A to Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (ag).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Response in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [77] Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (mdc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Intention to Oppose Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order [Dkt No. 77] (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE THE TIME CHANGE for Hearing on Motion [61] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures : Court reschedules the Motion Hearing to 01:00 PM on 5/22/2015 in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015, Terminated: 5/22/2015 Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 ObjectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Art Cohen re [73] Order [Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit A to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/19/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting [72] Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Cut-Off Date by One Week to Complete Deposition of defendant Donald J. Trump: The fact discovery cut-off date will remain set at July 2, 2015, for all fact discovery, except for the completion of Defendant's deposition. Defendant's deposition shall be completed on or before July 9, 2015. No further extension requests will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/14/15. (dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discovery Order Ruling on Parties' Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/13/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015, Terminated: 5/14/2015 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Extend Fact Discovery Cut-Off Date by One Week to Complete Deposition of Defendant Donald J. Trump by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [61] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index of Exhibits and Exhibits A-D in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Cameron R. Azari, Esq. in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRO HAC APPROVED: Matthew R. Maron appearing for Defendant Donald J. Trump. (no document attached) (vam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8033875.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Maron, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [61] MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 4/14/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC APPROVED: Jeffrey L. Goldman appearing for Defendant Donald J. Trump (no document attached) (ag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Goldman, Jeffrey) (ag).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER On Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Deposition Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/27/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference Regarding Dispute Over Scheduling Depositions: On or before March 27, 2015, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall have met and conferred in good faith about the deposition schedule. On or before March 27, 2015, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall inform the Court that they have either agreed upon a set global schedule for the depositions in this case, or that they have not reached an agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/26/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [61]: The Court set a hearing date of May 22, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Defendant shall file his opposition on or by April 17, 2015. Any reply shall be due by May 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015, Terminated: 9/21/2015 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit 1-5 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Setting Combined Mandatory Settlement Conference: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on March 12, 2015, at 8:00 a.m., in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Gallo. Counsel shall submit settlement statements directly to chambers no later than March 5, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/9/15.(dlg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of USCA in USCA Case Number 14-80162. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the USDC's October 27, 2014 order granting class action certification. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings: Case Management Conference held on 11/19/2014. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2015 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2016 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/20/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014, Terminated: 2/2/2015 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Case Number 14-80162 for Petition for Permission to Appeal under 23(f) filed by Donald J. Trump. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. Mueller on behalf of Art Cohen (Mueller, Maureen)Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum on behalf of Art Cohen (Pfefferbaum, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference; Setting Case Management Conference. Telephonic, Counsel Only Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2014 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/30/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Order on Motion to Certify ClassCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [39] Motion For Class Certification; Appointing Class Representative; and Appointing Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 9/26/2014, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2015. (akr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [45] Response in Opposition to Motion, Supplemental Evidence in Support of Defendant's Opposition by Defendant Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dft's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative, and Appointment of Class Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, 3, 7-8, # 2 Exhibit 9-15, # 3 Exhibit 16-21, # 4 Exhibit 22, 24, # 5 Exhibit 27, 28, 34, 36, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 25, 26, # 8 Exhibit 33)(jah) Modified per 211 Order, on 5/27/2016 (rlu). Modified on to correct document description and Sealed Documents on 5/31/2016 (sjt). (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2014 re [39] MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Art Cohen, Motions Submitted. Court will prepare written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason A. Forge, Rachel Jensen, Amber Eck). (Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Jill Martin, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative and Appintment of Class Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 28, # 6 Exhibit 30, # 7 Exhibit 32, # 8 Exhibit 32, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 33, 34a, 36, 37, 38, 40, 44, # 10 Exhibit 27), # 11 Exhibit 12, 14, 15), # 12 Exhibit 29, 30, (13) Exhibit 17, 18, 19, 20, # 14 Exhibit 12 (jah) Modified to unseal, per 211 Order on 5/27/2016 (rlu). Modified on to update documents on 5/31/2016 (sjt). (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Order on Motion to File Documents Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [37] Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting [43] Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/22/2014. (jah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel [Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 45-49 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [39] MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1-30 ISO Stagg Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 31-40 ISO Stagg Declaration, # (4) Request for Judicial Notice in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/22/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [43] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Stagg, Nancy). (jah). (Main Document 44 replaced on 9/22/2014) (jah). Modified on 9/22/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014, Terminated: 9/22/2014 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Stagg, Nancy). (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [40] Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Enlarge Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. The Court grants Defendant five (5) additional pages of briefing for his opposition to Plaintiff's motion for class certification, for a total opposition brief length of thirty (30) pages. Plaintiff shall have leave to file a fifteen (15) page brief in reply. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [40] Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages; to Extend Page Limit of Opposition to Class Certification Motion [Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Page Limit of Opposition to Class Certification Motion] filed by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014, Terminated: 7/17/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Extend Page Limit of Opposition to Class Certification Motion by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support)(Morris, Benjamin)(srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014, Terminated: 10/27/2014 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # (2) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (3) Exhibit 1-17 [Redacted] to Forge Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 18 part 1 [Redacted] to Forge Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 18 [Redacted] Part 2 to Forge Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 19-44 [Redacted] to Forge Declaration, # (7) Appendix A - Class Cert Ex Equivalency Table)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/22/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: [37] MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (sjt). (Main Document 38 replaced on 9/22/2014) (jah). Modified on 9/22/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014, Terminated: 9/22/2014 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (sjt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting [35] Joint Motion to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of a Video as an Exhibit to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 06/16/2014. (ag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014, Terminated: 6/16/2014 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to File to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of a Video as an Exhibit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. Hearing hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification set for 9/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/23/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/23/2014(no document attached) (jmy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: 5/12/2014 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting [31] Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald J. Trump. It is Ordered that Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris of Foley & Lardner LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of Betty M. Shumener, John D. Spurling, and Staci M. Tomita. Jill A. Martin will remain as counsel of record for Donald J. Trump. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014, Terminated: 5/12/2014 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Donald J. Trump re Substitution of Counsel and [Proposed] Consent Order (Shumener, Betty) Modified on 4/29/2014, QC Mailer sent re proposed orders (srm). Modified on 5/12/2014 (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Morris on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Morris, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy L. Stagg on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Stagg, Nancy)Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/18/2014. (mdc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/17/2014(no document attached) (jmy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Order Following ENECourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/10/2014. Telephonic Counsel Only Status Conference set for 5/23/2014 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/10/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Early Neutral Evaluation ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/10/2014. Court to issue Order.(no document attached) (jmy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference reset for 4/10/2014 at 7:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 2A, Second Floor, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/28/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/10/2014 8:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/14/2014.(srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, with Jury Demand by Donald J. Trump.(Shumener, Betty)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: (1) Denying [9] Motion to Dismiss; (2) Denying [10] Motion to Strike. Defendant's request for judicial notice, (Dkt. No. 18-1), is Denied. Defendant shall file an answer to the Complaint within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/2014. (srm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Motions Submitted [9] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , [10] MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint and the Court will prepare a written Order. Motion hearing 2/21/2014 is vacated.(no document attached) (lsf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [10] MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump. (Shumener, Betty) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Request for Judicial Notice, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2)(Shumener, Betty)(srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [10] MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Plainitff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [9] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibit 1 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Ann Martin on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Martin, Jill)Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *US D652,407,*, *8,455,758* cc:USPTO (kcm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L Jensen on behalf of Art Cohen (Jensen, Rachel)Attorney Rachel L Jensen added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (ag).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Errata Re Hearing Date of Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint and Motion to Dismiss (Shumener, Betty) (ag).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Resetting Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule [9] and [10]. Due to an opening on the Court calendar, the Court hereby resets the hearing date to February 21, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file a response on or by December 20, 2013. Any reply shall be due by January 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/14/13.(dlg) (av1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013, Terminated: 2/21/2014 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Shumener, Betty) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013, Terminated: 2/21/2014 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Shumener, Betty)Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (dlg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art Cohen. Donald J. Trump served. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number RuleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. The Case has been reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are no longer assigned to this case. Create association to 3:10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG. The new case number is 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/18/2013. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/21/2013.(aef)(jrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Olsen on behalf of Art Cohen (Olsen, Aaron)Attorney Aaron M. Olsen added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Lee Eck on behalf of Art Cohen (Eck, Amber)Attorney Amber Lee Eck added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Notice of Party With Financial Interest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Art Cohen (Forge, Jason) (aef).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Art Cohen of case(s) 3:10-cv-0940-GPC(WVG) . (Forge, Jason) Modified on 10/21/2013-Low number order prepared (aef).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (av1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump (filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6411097), filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Case Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:13-cv-2519-DMS-RBB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Forge, Jason)(dls) (av1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 6,110 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?