Ira & Larry Goldberg Coins & Collectibles v. Paul et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10485-NG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ira & Larry Goldberg Coins & Collectibles, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
v.
No Logo Does 1 through 10, Defendant
No Logo Maria Paul, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 3/10/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $400000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/4/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Filo, Jennifer)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2004, Entered: 5/1/2004 Order
    Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered removing the instant case to Bankruptcy court, pursuant to the Motion (erroneously titled "Notice") by Maria Paul to Remove to Bankruptcy Court. That motion was unopposed. (Gertner, Nancy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE by Maria Paul to Remove to Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Complaint# (2) Exhibit Summons)(Romagnolo, Berin)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Summons Returned Executed
      SUMMONS Returned Executed Maria Paul served on 3/19/2004, answer due 4/8/2004. (Filo, Jennifer)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Complaint
        COMPLAINT for Breach of Guaranty against Does 1 through 10, Maria Paul Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 54437, filed by Ira & Larry Goldberg Coins & Collectibles.(Filo, Jennifer)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Maria Paul. (Filo, Jennifer)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Filo, Jennifer)
              LREF

              Space Space

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 29 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?