Comverse, Inc. et al v. BellSouth Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10545-MLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Comverse Technology, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William D. Belanger +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 wdbelanger@mintz.com
Space Dean Graham Bostock +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 dbostock@mintz.com
Space Anthony Jason Mirabito +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 ajmirabito@mintz.com
No Logo Comverse, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William D. Belanger +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 wdbelanger@mintz.com
Space Dean Graham Bostock +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 dbostock@mintz.com
Space Anthony Jason Mirabito +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 ajmirabito@mintz.com
v.
No Logo BellSouth Corporation, Defendant
No Logo BellSouth Intellectual Marketing Corporation, Defendant
No Logo BellSouth Intellectual Property Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "BellSouth Intellectual Property Management Corporation"
No Logo Bellsouth Intellectual Property Group, Inc., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 3/19/2004
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Middlesex
Terminated 3/26/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Comverse Technology, Inc., Comverse, Inc. (Abaid, Kim)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mark L. Wolf for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph L. Tauro no longer assigned to case Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing.(Abaid, Kim)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Abaid, Kim)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Abaid, Kim)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Comverse Technology, Inc., Comverse, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 54689, filed by Comverse Technology, Inc., Comverse, Inc..(Abaid, Kim)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to BellSouth Corporation, BellSouth Intellectual Marketing Corporation, BellSouth Intellectual Property Corporation, BellSouth Intellectual Property Group, Inc., BellSouth Intellectual Property Management Corporation. (Abaid, Kim)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 56 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?