The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Hale et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10586-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Prudential Insurance Company of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Prudential Insurance Company of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
Space William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
v.
No Logo Andrew M. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Bradford J. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Fournier, Defendant
No Logo James S. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Janice L. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Judith A. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly A. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Rochelle L. Hale, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 3/25/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Middlesex
Terminated 5/11/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Settlement Agreement
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Daniel J. Fournier, Andrew M. Hale, Bradford J. Hale, James S. Hale, Janice L. Hale, Judith A. Hale, Kimberly A. Hale, Michael J. Hale, Rochelle L. Hale, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Abaid, Kim)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Abaid, Kim)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Abaid, Kim)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Bradford J. Hale waiver sent on 4/7/2004, answer due 6/7/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Full Power of Attorney)(Bertrand, Carey)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Judith A. Hale waiver sent on 4/7/2004, answer due 6/7/2004. (Bertrand, Carey)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Andrew M. Hale waiver sent on 4/8/2004, answer due 6/7/2004. (Bertrand, Carey)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Edward P. O'Leary terminated. (Abaid, Kim)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Louise Bertrand, William T. Bogaert on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Abaid, Kim)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Kimberly A. Hale waiver sent on 3/29/2004, answer due 5/28/2004. (Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Daniel J. Fournier waiver sent on 3/29/2004, answer due 5/28/2004. (Abaid, Kim)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed James S. Hale waiver sent on 3/30/2004, answer due 5/31/2004. (Abaid, Kim)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Rochelle L. Hale waiver sent on 3/29/2004, answer due 5/28/2004. (Abaid, Kim)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Michael J. Hale waiver sent on 3/29/2004, answer due 5/28/2004. (Abaid, Kim)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Janice L. Hale waiver sent on 3/29/2004, answer due 5/28/2004. (Abaid, Kim)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Complaint
                            Interpleader COMPLAINT against Daniel J. Fournier, Andrew M. Hale, Bradford J. Hale, James S. Hale, Janice L. Hale, Judith A. Hale, Kimberly A. Hale, Michael J. Hale, Rochelle L. Hale Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 54840, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Abaid, Kim) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2004 (Abaid, Kim). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2004 (Abaid, Kim).
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Summons Issued
                              Summons Issued as to Daniel J. Fournier, Andrew M. Hale, Bradford J. Hale, James S. Hale, Janice L. Hale, Judith A. Hale, Kimberly A. Hale, Michael J. Hale, Rochelle L. Hale. (Abaid, Kim)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Cohen. (Abaid, Kim)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?