Karpowicz v. M.B.T.A. Police Department et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10602-MEL

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter Karpowicz, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
No Logo D.A. Thomas Reilly, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Hennessey, Defendant
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"
Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Defendant
Officially listed as "MBTA Police Officer Clark"
No Logo Mass. Bay Transportation Authority, Defendant
No Logo MBTA Police Officer Horton, Defendant
No Logo Thomas O'Loughlin, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Reilly, Defendant
No Logo Trial Courts of Massachusetts, Defendant
No Logo William Smith, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 3/29/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Plymouth
Terminated 1/13/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Howarth, George)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff to demonstrate good cause why this action should not be dismissed and why he should not be enjoined from further filings without leave of court in writing by 1/5/2005. (Morse, Barbara)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Morris E. Lasker : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered (1) plaintiff is directed to demonstrate good cause, in writing, within thirty-five (35) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2); and (2) plaintiff is directed to demonstrate good cause, in writing, within thirty-five (35) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, why he should not be enjoined from filing new civil actions absent leave of Court.(Morse, Barbara)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
        Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered granting [1] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall be dismissed pursuant to Section 1915(e)(2) without further notice after thirty-five days from the date of this Order, unless before that time plaintiff demonstrates good cause, in writing why this case should not be dismised for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum and Order. (Morse, Barbara)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Complaint
          COMPLAINT, filed by Peter Karpowicz.(Jenness, Susan)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2004 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter Karpowicz.(Jenness, Susan)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Jenness, Susan)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Remark
                Case undergoing preliminary screening (Jenness, Susan)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Jenness, Susan)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 458 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?