Humane Society of the United States (HSUS) et al v. Margaret A. Hamburg
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-04933

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2018 at 2:47 PM ST (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Animal Legal Defense Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Humane Society of the United States (HSUS), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Marcos Camacho Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mario Martinez +1 661 324 8100 +1 661 324 8103 mariomtz@mclawmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Humane Society of the United States

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Alfred Brandt +1 240 388 5023 +1 202 778 6132 pbrandt@hsus.org
Space Jonathan Russell Lovvorn +1 202 955 3669 +1 202 778 6132 jlovvorn@humanesociety.org
Space Hannah Mary Margaret Connor +1 202 676 2354 hconnor@humanesociety.org
No Logo United Farm Workers Of America, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Margaret A. Hamburg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Answer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Intervene
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?