Princiotta v. Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10628-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Princiotta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by scartylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sabina T. Carty +1 508 850 9088 +1 508 850 9086 stc@scartylaw.com
v.
No Logo Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacey L. DiJon +1 617 345 1226 +1 866 947 1908 sdijon@nixonpeabody.com
Space David S. Rosenthal +1 617 345 6183 +9511 951 951 1295 drosenthal@nixonpeabody.com
Office Boston
Filed 3/31/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Middlesex
Terminated 6/9/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Case file sent
Certified copy of docket, order of tranfer and Case file sent to Middlesex Superior Court. (Flaherty, Elaine)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Flaherty, Elaine)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Order on Motion to Remand
      Judge Richard G. Stearns : electronic ORDER entered granting [9] Motion to Remand (Flaherty, Elaine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Motion to Remand
        Assented to MOTION to Remand by Barbara Princiotta.(Flaherty, Elaine)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Certificate of Consultation
          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Stacey L. DiJon on behalf of Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated by on behalf of Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated.(Flaherty, Elaine)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Scheduling Conference
            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns : Scheduling Conference held on 5/17/2004. Attys. Carty and Forrucci present for the pltf. Atty. Rosenthal present for the deft. After conference with the Court, the Court directs defense counsel to provide a letter stating whether or not there were 50 employees employed at Tanager Financial Services, Inc. If there were not 50 employees, the case can be remanded back to State Court as this Court will have no jurisdiction. (Court Reporter None.) (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 6/9/2004 (Johnson, Mary).
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated.(DiJon, Stacey)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference entered. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2004 04:30 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 state court record
                    STATE COURT Record. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Statement of counsel
                        STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of defendant by Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Notice of Removal
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated from Middlesex, case number 04-00413F. $ 150, receipt number 54944, filed by Tanager Financial Services, Incoporated.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 670 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?