J and J Sports Productions Inc v. Adriana Villalobos
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:13-cv-00809

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 7:21 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Enforce
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Enforce
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller, in favor of J and J Sports Productions Inc against Adriana Villalobos, Ramon Villalobos Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 25 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pg)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?