In Re: Cadkey Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:04-cv-40045-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:49 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cadkey Corporation, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Wilton +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 jwilton@ropesgray.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com
No Logo Micro Control Systems, Inc., Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by flyingcloud.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William L. Androlia +1 213 443 3085 Livingston@flyingcloud.com
Office Worcester
Filed 4/2/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Worcester
Terminated 3/31/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [9] Notice of Appeal, filed by Micro Control Systems, Inc. Upon consideration of stipulation, It is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) with each party to bear its own costs. (Ramos, Jeanette)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
    Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [9] Notice of Appeal, copies of original electronic documents. (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [7] Memorandum & ORDER, by Micro Control Systems, Inc. $ 255, receipt number 404553 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 5/4/2005. (Hassett, Kathy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Nicewicz, Craig)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. In accordance with the foregoing, the Bankruptcy Court's denial of appellant's Motion for Reimbursement is AFFIRMED and this appeal is DISMISSED. So ordered.(Nicewicz, Craig)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Brief
            BRIEF by Cadkey Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volumes I-IV)(Hassett, Kathy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of transmittal of records on appeal by United States Bankruptcy Court. (Jones, Sherry)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Brief
                BRIEF by Micro Control Systems, Inc, c/s. (Attachments: # (1))(Hassett, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2004 (Hassett, Kathy).
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Transcript
                ADDENDUM to Record on Appeal (TRANSCRIPTS) received from Bankruptcy. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Hassett, Kathy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order
                  Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 4/19/2004. Appellee Brief due by 5/3/2004. Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/12/2004. (cc/cl)(Castles, Martin)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Bankruptcy Appeal
                    Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 03-44906. File received, filed by Micro Control Systems, Inc.(Hassett, Kathy)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 61 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?