Execware LLC v. PetSmart Store Support Group Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00560
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 2:31 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Execware, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D Kuyper +1 310 255 9080 +1 310 907 2080 bruce.kuyper@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredricka Ung

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fredricka Ung

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo Petsmart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Petsmart Store Support Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard D. Kirk, Esq. regarding Claim Construction Briefing schedule. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed the joint status report filed at D.I. 103 in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF, as well as the September 11, 2012 letter from Defendants in that action (D.I. 106) and from Defendants in related C.A. Nos. 12-380-LPS, 12-382-LPS, 12-383-LPS, 12-556-LPS, and 12-557-LPS, the Court has determined that it will likely either vacate the scheduling order entered in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF and enter a revised scheduling order to permit all of these related actions to proceed according to the same schedule, or retain the current schedule in C.A. No. 11-836-LPS-SRF and stay the remaining related cases until after the Court enters its claim construction ruling. All parties are directed to submit to the Court, no later than September 28, 2012, letters advising the Court as to their preference as to how these cases should proceed. Thereafter, if necessary, the Court will schedule a teleconference to discuss these issue with counsel. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00836-LPS-SRF et al.(rpg) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number 6,216,139. (ntl) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        SO ORDERED, re 9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Execware LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/12. (ntl) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of Dismissal /Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal by Execware LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to July 16, 2012 - filed by Execware LLC, PetSmart Inc., PetSmart Store Support Group Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to JUNE 25, 2012 - filed by Execware LLC, PetSmart Inc., PetSmart Store Support Group Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Esquire; Bruce D. Kuyper, Esquire and Fredricka Ung, Esquire - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, Esquire, # 2 Certification of Bruce D. Kuyper, Esquire, # 3 Certification of Fredricka Ung, Esquire)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. PetSmart Store Support Group Inc. served on 5/3/2012, answer due 5/24/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. PetSmart Inc. served on 5/3/2012, answer due 5/24/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139. (rwc) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against PetSmart Inc., PetSmart Store Support Group Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 0311-1067814.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 89 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?