Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. StorageCraft Technology Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00232
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 11:13 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wong Cabello Lutsch Rutherford & Brucculeri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edwards +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 sedwards@counselip.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Storagecraft Technology Corporation, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Storagecraft Technology Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
Space Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maschoff Brennan Laycock Gilmore Israelsen & Wright, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Rachel Jacques +1 435 252 1360 rjacques@mabr.com
PRO HAC VICE Charles J. Veverka +1 435 252 1360 cveverka@mabr.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo James Knowles, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Knowles Mediations

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Knowles +1 903 534 3800 +1 903 534 3806 jimk@knowlesmed.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by StorageCraft Technology Corporation Requesting Termination of Electronic Notices (Veverka, Charles) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims asserted in this suit between pltfs and deft StorageCraft Technology Corporation are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/16/13. cc:attys 1-17-13(mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv227 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 6/28/2013. James Knowles is appointed Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/26/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/12. cc:attys 8-27-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/12. cc:attys 8-23-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/12. cc:attys 8-23-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and E-Discovery Order by StorageCraft Technology Corporation, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 23 Motion to extend deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/12. cc:attys 8-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 08-20-2012. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 08-20-2012 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 08-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Certain Disclosure Deadlines by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 8/6/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                              APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rachel Jacques for StorageCraft Technology Corporation. (pkb, ) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles J Veverka for StorageCraft Technology Corporation,Charles J Veverka for StorageCraft Technology Corporation. (pkb, ) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant StorageCraft Technology Corporation by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/6/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-14-12(mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by StorageCraft Technology Corporation (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 2 Complaint for Patent Infringement and, COUNTERCLAIM of StorageCraft Technology Corporation against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by StorageCraft Technology Corporation.(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                            Return of Service Executed as to StorageCraft Technology Corporation on 4/18/2012, by personal service; answer due: 5/9/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Louis Germer on behalf of StorageCraft Technology Corporation (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re StorageCraft Technology Corporation.( Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to StorageCraft Technology Corporation, and emailed to pltf for storage. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Edwards, Stephen) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  COMPLAINT against StorageCraft Technology Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3522079.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,024,696, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***COMPLAINT against StorageCraft Technology Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3522006.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,024,696, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) Modified on 3/30/2012 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?