Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00089
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 1:40 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
No Logo United Parcel Service, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo United Parcel Service, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(nms) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 26 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC, United Parcel Service Inc. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/19/2012. (nms) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal, by Pragmatus Telecom LLC and United Parcel Service Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 7/19/2012 (nms). (Entered: 07/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (ii) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Granting Proposed Protective Order, filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, Liveperson Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Scottrade Inc., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, North Face Apparel Corp., E*Trade Financial Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Overstock.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
            Joint PROPOSED Protective Order, by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 6/12/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. by United Parcel Service Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) to June 11, 2012 - filed by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, North Face Apparel Corp., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER Setting Teleconference and Status Teleconference (Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Conference to discuss ADR and a Status Teleconference is set for 6/20/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/6/2012. (lih) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2012. All Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2013. A Status Conference is set for 5/2/2014, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2014. Answering Brief due 3/29/2014. Reply Brief due 4/12/2014. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/3/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/1/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/22/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 5 day Jury Trial is set to commence on 9/8/2014, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/1/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                          PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                            Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Pragmatus Telecom LLC, by United Parcel Service Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 5/14/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Holmes J. Hawkins, Natasha H. Moffitt and Benjamin J. Warlick - filed by United Parcel Service Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/29/2012, at 04:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                    Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service Inc.- filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION for Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint, by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 4/25/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service Inc.- filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by United Parcel Service Inc. identifying Corporate Parent none for United Parcel Service Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement and Enhanced Damages Claims - filed by United Parcel Service Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 3/23/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Adam G. Price, Chester J. Shiu, and James W. Coutu of DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to March 23, 2012 - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC, United Parcel Service Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. United Parcel Service Inc. served on 2/1/2012, answer due 2/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,311,231 B1; 6,668,286 B2; 7,159,043 B2;. (els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                        COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against United Parcel Service Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1013489.) - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?