Pragmatus Telecom LLC v. North Face Apparel Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00097
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 3:52 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
v.
No Logo North Face Apparel Corporation,, Defendant
Officially listed as "North Face Apparel Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary B. Graham +1 302 658 9200 mbgefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alexander Tigan +1 302 351 9106 jtigan@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,68,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice)(nms) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC, North Face Apparel Corp. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/16/2012. (nms) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by North Face Apparel Corp., Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Graham, Mary) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Setting Status Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiff's shall initiate the call. A Status Teleconference is set for 10/29/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/29/2012. (lih) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (ii) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Granting Proposed Protective Order, filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, Liveperson Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Scottrade Inc., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, North Face Apparel Corp., E*Trade Financial Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Overstock.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
              Joint PROPOSED Protective Order, by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 6/12/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant The North Face Apparel Corp.'s Initial Disclosures by North Face Apparel Corp..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) to June 11, 2012 - filed by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, North Face Apparel Corp., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Setting Teleconference and Status Teleconference (Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Conference to discuss ADR and a Status Teleconference is set for 6/20/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/6/2012. (lih) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2012. All Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2013. A Status Conference is set for 5/2/2014, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2014. Answering Brief due 3/29/2014. Reply Brief due 4/12/2014. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/3/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/1/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/22/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 5 day Jury Trial is set to commence on 9/8/2014, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/1/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                          PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce S. Sostek, Michael E. Schonberg and Sarah M. Paxson of Thompson & Knight LLP - filed by North Face Apparel Corp.. (Graham, Mary) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                              Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/29/2012, at 4:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by North Face Apparel Corp..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Adam G. Price, Chester J. Shiu, and James W. Coutu of DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which The North Face Apparel Corp. shall respond to the Complaint to March 23, 2012 - filed by North Face Apparel Corp.. (Graham, Mary) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. North Face Apparel Corp. served on 2/1/2012, answer due 2/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                              PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against North Face Apparel Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1013593.) - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?