District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Central District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 11-57187
    Filed 12/15/2011
  2. Case No. 14-56444
    Filed 9/4/2014
  3. Case No. 16-55977
    Filed 7/8/2016
United States Supreme Court

Courthouse News Service v. Michael Planet
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-56444

Tags
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 5:14 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 25 other news media organizations. Date of service: 11/07/2014. [9306642] [14-56444] (BDB) [Entered: 11/07/2014 05:53 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
    Filed clerk order: The opening brief [12] submitted by Courthouse News Service is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [12] submitted by Courthouse News Service. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9300137] (LA) [Entered: 11/03/2014 04:36 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
      Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Courthouse News Service. Date of service: 10/31/2014. [9297996] [14-56444]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 11/03/2014 by RY] (REM) [Entered: 10/31/2014 03:17 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
        Filed order (JOHN T. NOONAN, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW and MARY H. MURGUIA) The court has received appellant’s motion requesting assignment of this appeal to this panel, which decided Courthouse News Serv. v. Planet, 750 F.3d 776 (9th Cir. 2014). This panel will accept this appeal, and the motion is granted. Further, appellant’s motion to expedite the appeal is granted. The transcript is due October 25, 2014. Appellant’s opening brief and excerpts of the record are due October 31, 2014; appellee’s answering brief is due December 19, 2014; appellant’s optional reply brief is due January 16, 2015. [9281629] (DEV) [Entered: 10/17/2014 04:35 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service reply to response (). Date of service: 09/23/2014. [9251175] (REM) [Entered: 09/23/2014 05:03 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet response opposing motion (,motion to expedite case). Date of service: 09/15/2014. [9241373] (RAN) [Entered: 09/15/2014 06:12 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service reply to response (, ,motion to assign case to prior panel). Date of service: 09/11/2014. [9237157] (REM) [Entered: 09/11/2014 02:01 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet Correspondence: Letter responding to motion to assign case to prior panel. Date of service: 09/09/2014. [9233890]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 09/09/2014 by RY] (RAN) [Entered: 09/09/2014 02:10 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?