Chapman v. Florida Department of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-24140

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 12, 2018 at 12:56 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andre Chapman , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA - TAMPA FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Allen Boyer +1 850 488 9071 +1 850 488 8640 davidb@disabilityrightsflorida.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly Jean Paris +1 850 488 9071 +1 850 488 8640 mollyp@disabilityrightsflorida.org

Toggle Switch Represented by MIGRANT FARMWORKER JUSTICE PROJECT - LAKE WORTH FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Cooley Lentz +1 352 375 2494 +1 352 331 5202 kristen@floridalegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PETER PRESCOTT SLEASMAN +1 352 375 2494 +1 352 331 5202 peter@floridalegal.org
v.
No Logo CORIZON LLC., Defendant
No Logo Cornelius Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo Roland Clarke, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Richardson Sutton on behalf of Milton Grimes. Attorney John Richardson Sutton added to party Milton Grimes(pty:ip). (Sutton, John) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
    PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court strikes the 15 Mediation Report. On November 14, 2014, the Court 6 consolidated this case with Case No. 14-23323 and ordered that all future filings in both cases must be filed in Case No. 14-23323. Therefore, the filing of the Mediation Report in this matter is improper. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 1/11/2018. (jle) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Mediation Report
      FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by H. T. Smith. Disposition: Settled in full.(Smith, Harold) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
        Clerks Notice to Filer re 9 Notice (Other), 10 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#13]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
          NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added H. T. Smith. Mediation Hearing set for 1/10/18 at 10:00. See image at DE 9 (lk) Modified on 12/13/2017 (lk). (Entered: 12/13/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
            Clerks Notice to Filer re 9 Notice (Other), 10 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was not re-docketed by the Clerk. It is necessary to refile this document in the correct case and use the Mediation events instead of the Notice event. (cqs) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
              PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court strikes the Defendants' 9 Notice of Mediation and 10 Corrected Notice of Mediation. On November 14, 2014, the Court 6 consolidated this case with Case No. 14-23323 and ordered that all future filings in both cases must be filed in Case No. 14-23323. Therefore, the filing of the notices of mediation in this matter is improper. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 12/12/2017. (jle) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                NOTICE by Roland Clarke, Cornelius Thompson Corrected Notice of Mediation (Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                  NOTICE by Roland Clarke, Cornelius Thompson Notice of Mediation. Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party Roland Clarke(pty:dft), Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party Cornelius Thompson(pty:dft). (Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                    PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies as moot 7 Andre Chapman's Motion for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service of Process. In November 2014, the Court 6 consolidated this case with case number 14-23323 and directed that "[a]ll future filings in both actions must be filed in case number 14-23323." Chapman's motion for extension of time was also filed in case number 14-23323 and was granted by paperless order. Therefore, the motion in this case is moot. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/16/2016. (kbr) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to effectuate Service of Process on Defendant, Cornelius Thompson by Andre Chapman. Attorney Annette Newman added to party Andre Chapman (pty:pla). Responses due by 5/19/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Non Service - 11th Hr Investigations, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Non Service - James Barnes)(Newman, Annette) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/13/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-23323-RNS, 1:14-cv-24140-RNS (yar) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Order Reassigning/Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                            ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 11/13/2014. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/12/2014. (ar2)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andre Chapman. Florida Department of Corrections served on 11/7/2014, answer due 11/28/2014. (Sleasman, Peter) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                Summons Issued as to Roland Clarke, Corizon LLC, Florida Department of Corrections, and Cornelius Thompson. (ar2) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (ar2) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                    Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7214777, filed by Andrea Chapman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) FDOC, # 3 Summon(s) Corizon, LLC, # 4 Summon(s) Clarke, # 5 Summon(s) Thompson)(Sleasman, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?