Rozo v. Principal Life Insurance Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Southern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00463

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 21, 2021 at 10:49 AM DT (5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frederick Rozo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by feinbergjackson.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Todd F. Jackson +1 510 269 7998 +1 510 269 7994 todd@feinbergjackson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Nina Rachel Wasow +1 510 269 7998 +1 510 269 7994 nina@feinbergjackson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2015, PRO HAC VICE Jacob Avery Richards +1 510 463 3900 +1 510 463 3901 jrichards@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Wallace Cottrell Brayton Konecky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Mark Thomas Johnson +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 mjohnson@schneiderwallace.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Jason H Kim +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 jkim@schneiderwallace.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Michael Craig McKay +1 480 607 4367 +1 480 607 4366 mmckay@schneiderwallace.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Todd Michael Schneider +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 tschneider@schneiderwallace.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Garrett Webster Wotkyns +1 480 607 4368 +1 480 607 4366 gwotkyns@schneiderwallace.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shindler, Anderson, Goplerud & Weese, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon McCaull Bohlman +1 515 223 4567 +1 515 223 8887 bohlman@sagwlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Barton Goplerud +1 515 223 4567 +1 515 223 8887 goplerud@sagwlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Micheletti - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 415 693 0700 +1 415 693 0770 cmicheletti@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Heather T Rankie , +1 415 693 0700 +1 415 693 0770 hrankie@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
v.
No Logo Principal Financial Group, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Patient Infosystems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Caregroup, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Angel Anna West +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 aaw@nyemaster.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tara A. Amin +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 tamin@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Bruce Blocker +1 312 853 6097 +1 312 853 7036 mblocker@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel S. Feldman +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jfeldman@sidley.com
No Logo Principal Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin H Collins +1 319 286 7003 +1 319 286 7050 khcollins@nyemaster.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Angel Anna West +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 aaw@nyemaster.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tara A. Amin +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 tamin@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Bruce Blocker +1 312 853 6097 +1 312 853 7036 mblocker@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel S. Feldman +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 jfeldman@sidley.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (391) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Documents Sent
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None USCA Scheduling Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Notice - Other
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Costs Taxed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice - Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None USCA Case Number
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Notification of Appeal to USCA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None LR 83E Exhibits
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None LR 83E Exhibits
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript SEALED
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Bench Trial - Completed
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of Supreme Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Response/Resistance to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Response/Resistance to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Hearing/Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Supreme Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Brief /Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/11/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Trial/FPT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Hearing/Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None USCA Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Costs Taxed in amount of $ $42,500.00 against Plaintiff. (slg) (Main Document 251 replaced on 11/16/2018) (slg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 242 Bill of Costs (Joint Stipulation) by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Documents Sent re 244 Notice of Appeal : Entry 124 sent to 8th CCA. (vr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to re 243 Objection to Bill of costs, 242 Bill of Costs by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Scheduling Order as to 244 Notice of Appeal filed by Frederick Rozo. (vr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Case Number 18-3310 for 244 Notice of Appeal filed by Frederick Rozo. (vr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re 244 Notice of Appeal filed on 10/24/2018. (vr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 240 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,, 241 Judgment by Frederick Rozo. Fee paid in the amount of $505 receipt number 0863-3631398. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to Bill of Costs by Frederick Rozo re 242 Bill of Costs Plaintiff's Opposition to Principal Life Insurance Company's Bill of Costs. (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BILL OF COSTS by Principal Life Insurance Company. Deadline for Objections to Bill of Costs set for 10/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT in favor of Principal Life Insurance Company against Frederick Rozo. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 9/25/2018. (bp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 186 Sealed Motion to Exclude Opinions; granting 187 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 193 Sealed Motion to Exclude Opinions; denying 206 Sealed Motion to Decertify Class. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/25/2018. (mem)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order by Frederick Rozo. (Micheletti, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 238 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document Trial Brief by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 237 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document Trial Brief by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 235 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/21/2018. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Trial Brief by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/5/2018. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting 233 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/21/2018. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Trial Brief by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/5/2018. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin H Collins on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company (Collins, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document re 225 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Marilee Lau by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 226 SEALED MOTION In Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Mary Jo Hudson filed by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/26/2018.(West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 228 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/18/2018. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal its Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine - Expedited Relief Requested by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/2/2018. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Principal Life Insurance Company of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting 223 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff may file the Motion in Limine under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/5/2018. (krp) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unresisted MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 5(c) by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 9/19/2018. (Rankie, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE Requesting Status Conference with Judge by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina) Modified on 8/6/2018 changed to a motion (don).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 221 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document re 206 SEALED MOTION To Decertify The Class Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Decertify The Class by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting 219 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/28/2018. (mjk) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unresisted MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Decertify Class by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 7/12/2018. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude The Testimony And Opinions Of Craig Merrill 193 by Frederick Rozo. (vr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2018: # 1 Declaration) (vr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 216 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/25/2018. (mjk) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 215 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document re 206 SEALED MOTION To Decertify The Class [Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify the Class] by Frederick Rozo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina Wasow in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Decertify the Class)(Micheletti, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 213 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/22/2018. (mjk) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 7/6/2018. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Nina R. Wasow (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Errata re 208 Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 208 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendant's Motion to Decertify the Class. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/13/2018. (rmj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 208 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Decertify the Class and Motion to Exclude filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Replies due by 6/19/2018.(West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Decertify the Class and Motion to Exclude by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/25/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nina Wasow in Support of Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule)(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 207 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document re 187 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Brief by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Statement of Facts, # 2 Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts, # 3 Amin Declaration, # 4 Appendix)(Blocker, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document re 193 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Craig Merrill Defendant's Resistance to Plaintiff Motoin to Exclude Craig Merrill by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document re 186 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinoins and Testimony of Richard Kopcke by Principal Life Insurance Company. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting 202 Motion to File Under Seal and Motion to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/1/2018. (mjk) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unresisted MOTION to Seal, Unresisted MOTION to file overlength brief by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/15/2018. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UPSP letter and paperwork re 193 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Craig Merrill. The paper copy of the motion that was mailed to the court on 5/16/2018 was damaged and never received. Clerk's Office contacted counsel and they will resend the paperwork. (don) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting 199 unresisted Motion to Extend Deadlines. Principal's reply in support of the motion to exclude the opinions of Dr. Kopcke extended to June 4, 2018. Principal's opposition to the motion to exclude the opinions of Dr. Merrill extended to June 4, 2018. Plaintiff's reply in support of the motion to exclude the opinions of Dr. Merrill extended to June 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/22/2018. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unresisted MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule For Motions To Exclude Expert Opinions by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/5/2018. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***ERRATA*** Sealed Document re 193 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Craig Merrill, 191 Order on Motion to Seal Corrected Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Craig Merrill [191-1] including tables and updated Certificate of Service by Frederick Rozo. (Johnson, Mark) Modified on 5/17/2018 (vr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting 194 Sealed Motion to file Overlength Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/16/2018. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting 192 Sealed Motion to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/16/2018. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document ***Appendix to Resistance to Motion for Summary Judgment 187 *** re 194 Unresisted SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief Pursuant to Local Rule 7(h) Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Principal Life Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment Volume 1 of 3 (Exhibits 1 39) by Frederick Rozo. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Principal Life Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment Volume 2 of 3 (Exhibits 40 57), # 2 Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Principal Life Insurance Companys Motion for Summary Judgment Volume 3 of 3 (Exhibits 58 73))(Rankie, Heather) Modified on 5/18/2018 (kjw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 190 Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff may file the documents referenced in the first paragraph of the Motion under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/15/2018. (mjk) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unresisted MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 5(c) by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 5/29/2018. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rankie, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Errata Certificate of Service re 187 Sealed Motion, filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Errata Certificate of Service re 186 Sealed Motion, filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting in its entirety 184 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/20/2018. (mjk) Modified on 4/20/2018 to clarify scope of order. (mjk). (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Materials by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 5/4/2018. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting 182 Stipulated Motion for Extension of deadlines. Deadline to exchange disclosures of merits expert witnesses: March 7, 2018. Deadline to exchange rebuttal reports of merits experts: March 23, 2018. Close of merits expert discovery: April 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/28/2018. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***Motion for Extension of Time fir Scheduling Order/16 Deadlines***STIPULATION Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina) Modified on 2/28/2018 changed to a motion (don).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 1/25/2018. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (tae/mel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER SETTING NEXT STATUS CONFERENCE. By no later than 1/18/2018, parties shall meet and confer regarding the need to extend the discovery deadline. Next Status Conference set for 1/25/2018 03:00 PM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter access code 7013731 at the prompt. Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/11/2018. (kmh) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 1/11/2018. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (kmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT (Joint Agenda For January 11, 2018, Status Conference) by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 11:30 a.m. shall be via the Court's AT&T Conference Line and not the Meet-Me Conference Line. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter access code 7013731 at the prompt. Counsel are reminded to file a Joint Agenda for the Status Conference by 1/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/9/2018. (kmh) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Regarding Status Conference held on 12/20/2017. Parties have resolved the Motion to Compel 167, the motion is now moot. Next Status Conference set for 11:30 a.m. on 1/11/2018. Counsel shall file a joint agenda by 1/9/2018. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/22/2017. (kjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER: Status conference was held 12/20/2017. Parties have resolved 167 Motion to Compel filed by Frederick Rozo. Status conference set for 01/11/2018 at 11:30 am before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer via the Court's AT&T telephone conference line. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter access code 7013731 at the prompt. Counsel to file joint agenda by January 9, 2018. Order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/20/2017. (krn). (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 12/20/2017. (krn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint Agenda for December 20, 2017 Status Conference) by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 167 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Replies due by 12/15/2017.(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER: Status conference was held 11/29/2017. Defendant to file response to 167 Motion to Compel by 12/8/2017. Plaintiff's reply due by 12/15/2017. Status Conference set for 12/20/2017 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer via the Court's AT&T telephone conference line. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter access code 7013731 at the prompt. Counsel to file joint agenda by December 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/29/2017. (tae) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 11/29/2017. (tae)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (Joint Agenda for November 29, 2017 Status Conference) by Frederick Rozo. (Micheletti, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 12/6/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nina Wasow in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Frederick Rozo re 159 Declaration (kjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding Status Conference held on October 12, 2017. Bench trial remains set for 10/9/18 and Final Pretrial Conference remains set for 9/26/18. Discovery Deadline 2/1/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/20/2018. Opposition to Dispositive Motions: May 15, 2018. Reply to Dispositive Motion: June 4, 2018. Exchange Merits Expert Reports: February 28, 2018. Exchange Rebuttal Expert Reports: March 12, 2018. Close of Expert Discovery: March 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/24/2017. (kjw) Modified on 12/20/2017 to add additional deadlines (krn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 148 as detailed in Court order. Document production shall be completed by 11/30/2017. Plaintiff's request for targeted searches is denied, as is his request for sanctions. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/24/2017. (kjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting 160 Motion for Leave to File Response to Declaration of Angel West. Response attached to the Motion will be filed. Defendant has filed a Reply 161 . The matter is fully submitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/23/2017. (mjk) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Principal Life Insurance Company re 158 Order, - Response To Plaintiff's Scheduling Proposal (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 160 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Declaration of Angel West filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Replies due by 10/26/2017.(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to Declaration of Angel West by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/1/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response of Plaintiff Frederick Rozo to Declaration of Angel West)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Angel West re 158 Order, by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re Status Conference held on 10/12/2017. See Order for particulars. Next Status Conference is set for 11/29/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer via the Court's AT&T Conference Line. Parties shall dial 1-866-590-5055 and enter 7013731 at the prompt. Joint Agenda due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/12/2017. (sjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon McCaull Bohlman on behalf of Frederick Rozo (Bohlman, Brandon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER: A status conference was held on October 12, 2017. Defendant's affidavit regarding cost due by 10/16/2017. Defendant's response to proposed scheduling changes due by 10/20/2017. Next Status Conference is set for 11/29/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer via the Court's AT&T Conference Line. Parties shall dial 1-866-590-5055 and enter 7013731 at the prompt. Joint Agenda due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/12/2017. (sjc) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2017 re 148 SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Motion to Compel) filed by Frederick Rozo. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (sjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 154 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document REPLY in Support re 148 SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Motion to Compel) by Frederick Rozo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Reply, # 2 Exhibits 16-19 to Micheletti Declaration) (kjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting 152 Motion to file overlength reply brief. The Clerk shall detach and file the brief attached to the Motion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/3/2017. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document RESPONSE re 148 SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Motion to Compel) by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document re 149 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Frederick Rozo. (Micheletti, Christopher) Modified on 9/15/2017, linked to document 148 (kjw). (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Christopher T. Micheletti re 148 SEALED MOTION (Plaintiff's Motion to Compel) by Frederick Rozo. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 146 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/13/2017. (mlr) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 9/27/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rankie, Heather) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER: A status conference was held on September 7, 2017. Motion to Compel by Plaintiff is due by September 14, 2017. Response to Motion to Compel by Defendant is due by September 26, 2017. Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's response is due by October 2, 2017. A Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference are set for October 12, 2017 at 10:30 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer via the Court's AT&T Conference Line. Counsel shall dial 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/7/2017. (sjc) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 9/7/2017. (sjc) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER: Status Conference set for September 7, 2017 at 1:30 PM will now be held via the Court's AT&T Conference Line. Parties shall dial 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. PLEASE NOTE: This is a change in the phone number only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/7/2017. (sjc) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Joint Agenda for September 7, 2017 Status Conference) by Frederick Rozo. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER setting Status Conference, at the request of the parties, to discuss discovery issues. Status Conference set for 9/7/2017 01:30 PM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Parties shall call 515-284-6266, and enter 116266 at the prompt. Parties shall file a joint agenda by 9/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/31/2017. (mjk) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint 67 Amended Complaint by Mark B Blocker on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company. (kjw) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 138 Defendant's unresisted Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall detach and file the Amended Answer attached to the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/30/2017. (mlr) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 9/12/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blocker, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 136 Defendant's resisted Motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests. Defendant shall provide responses to discovery on or before August 2, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 7/26/2017. (CFB) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's discovery request by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 8/9/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Mandate from the 8th CCA. (vr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Judgment from the 8th CCA advising petition for permission to appeal has been considered by the court and is denied. Mandate shall issue forthwith. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter) (vr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Approving 132 Revised Stipulation. The law firms of Feinberg, Jackson, Worthman & Wasow LLP, Zelle LLP, Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP, and Shindler, Anderson, Goplerud & Weese P.C., are hereby appointed as class counsel in this action. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 6/14/2017. (mem)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Errata re 128 Stipulation filed by Frederick Rozo, 131 Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Approving 128 Stipulation filed by Frederick Rozo. The law firms of Feinberg, Jackson, Worthman & Wasow LLP, Zelle LLP, Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP, and Hudson, Mallaney, Shindler & Anderson, PC are hereby appointed as class counsel in this action. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 6/9/2017. (mem)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 127 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Frederick Rozo. The Court adopts the deadlines set forth in the Motion. Ten-day Bench Trial set for October 9, 2018, before the Honorable John A. Jarvey. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11:00 a.m. on September 26, 2018, before U.S. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. See Order for further particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/8/2017. (mlr) (Main Document 130 replaced on 6/8/2017) (mlr, ). Modified on 6/8/2017 (mlr, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Appointment of Class Counsel by Frederick Rozo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan to Set Case Deadlines by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina) Modified on 6/7/2017 (bp, Correct Pleading ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of case number [17-8022] for permission to appeal from the 8th CCA. (vr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 101 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 5/12/2017. (eae)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re 123 Motion Hearing held on 4-27-17 before Judge Jarvey. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Egbers, Telephone Number: 563-884-7737. Page No(s).: 1-74. Transcript may be viewed at court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through court reporter, Clerk's Office, or PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2017. (Egbers, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey: Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2017 re 101 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Frederick Rozo. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (mew) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on MOTION 101 to Certify Class for 4/27/2017 at 1:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 4/6/2017. (mem)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER denying 119 Sealed Motion to file sur-reply. Any issues identified can be raised at oral arguments, which will be set by the trial judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/24/2017. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Response/Resistance to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 119 SEALED MOTION For Leave To File A Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Class Certification filed by Frederick Rozo. Replies due by 3/1/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wasow, Nina) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document re 117 Declaration of Nina Wasow in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of 101 Motion for Class Certification by Frederick Rozo. (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Nina Wasow in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of 101 Motion for Class Certification re 116 Sealed Document by Frederick Rozo. (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document re 101 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Frederick Rozo. (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 114 unresisted Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/3/2017. (mlr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/16/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 111 Motion for Leave to File a corrected Declaration of Aaron Friedman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/10/2017. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document re 109 Declaration, 111 Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File A Corrected Declaration Of Aaron Friedman In Support Of Defendants Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification (Declaration Of Aaron Friedman) by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File A Corrected Declaration Of Aaron Friedman In Support Of Defendants Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/24/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document re 108 Sealed Document (Declaration Of Tara Amin In Support Of Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Class Certification by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Feldman, Joel) Modified on 1/10/2017 linked to motion 101 (don, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION of Aaron Friedman re 108 Sealed Document by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Feldman, Joel) Modified on 1/9/2017 sealed entry per counsel (don, ). Modified on 1/10/2017 linked to motion 101 (don, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document re 101 MOTION to Certify Class (Defendant's Memorandum In Opposition To Class Certification ) by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 106 Motion for extension of deadlines. Principal Life's resistance is due January 6, 2017. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by February 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/5/2017. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unresisted MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Certification Briefing Schedule By Two Days by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/18/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 104 Motion to file overlength brief; granting 104 Motion to extend date to file overlength briefs by one day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/27/2016. (ree, ) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unresisted MOTION to file overlength brief, MOTION Adjust Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/5/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document re 101 MOTION to Certify Class (Exhibits to Declaration of Nina Wasow in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification) by Frederick Rozo. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document re 101 MOTION to Certify Class (Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Class Certification) by Frederick Rozo. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Certify Class by Frederick Rozo. Responses due by 12/9/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nina Wasow, # 2 Declaration of Mark T. Johnson, # 3 Declaration of J. Barton Goplerud, # 4 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, # 5 Signatory Attestation and Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 99 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/21/2016. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Under Seal by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 12/5/2016 (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting 97 Joint Motion to Set Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's initial Motion and brief in support of class certification shall be filed on or before November 22, 2016; Principal Life's opposition to class certification shall be filed on or before January 3, 2017; and Plaintiff's reply brief shall be filed on or before January 31, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/16/2016. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION To Set Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 12/5/2016 (Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/30/2016. (sc) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part 89 Motion to Compel, and adjusting deadlines for completion of discovery relating to Class Certification issues. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/12/2016. (dmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2016 re 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy/FTR Gold.) (dv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY re 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Feldman, Joel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER re 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. This Motion will be taken up at the hearing currently set for 9/8/2016 at 02:30 PM by Phone before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel shall call the Court's AT&T conference line at 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/30/2016. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Frederick Rozo. Replies due by 9/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Micheletti, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Tara A. Amin re 89 MOTION to Compel by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 9/6/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Status Conference set for 9/8/2016 02:30 PM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/3/2016. (mlp, ) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 8/3/2016. (tae, ) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding items discussed at the status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 7/8/2016. (don, ) Modified on 7/8/2016 (rmj). (Main Document 86 replaced on 7/11/2016) (rmj, ). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 7/8/2016. Status Conference set for 8/3/2016 11:30 AM by Phone Hearing via the Courts AT&T conference line. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. (dv, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Joint Agenda by Principal Life Insurance Company, Frederick Rozo (dv, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rory Zamansky. Signed by Clerk of Court Marjorie Krahn on 6/17/2016. (ml) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2948638 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo. (Goplerud, J) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/11/2016. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/15/2016. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/31/2016. Status Conference set for 7/8/2016 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Discovery Deadline 11/4/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/8/2016. See Order for specifics. (mlp, ) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 6/8/2016. (Court Reporter Ann Moyna.) (tak, ) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER re 77 Status Report filed by Frederick Rozo. The status conference set for June 27, 2016, is rescheduled. Status Conference now set for June 8, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone conference call. Counsel shall call the Court's AT&T conference line at 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. By June 6, 2016, counsel shall provide the Court with a Joint Agenda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/2/2016. (mlr) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER re 77 Status Report filed by Frederick Rozo. A Status Conference is set for 6/27/2016 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel shall call the Court's AT&T conference line at 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. By June 23, 2016, counsel shall provide the Court with a Joint Agenda. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 6/1/2016. (mlr) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Requesting Status Conference with Magistrate Judge by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/29/2016. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Motion Hearing held on 2/29/2016 re 71 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (dv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Frederick Rozo of Firm Name Change (Micheletti, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER re 71 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Principal Life Insurance Company. Hearing on this Motion is set for 2/29/2016 at 11:00 AM (Central Time) in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel shall call the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-866-590-5055 and enter access code 7013731 at the prompt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/23/2016. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION for Protective Order - Request for Status Conference filed by Frederick Rozo. Replies due by 3/4/2016.(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/29/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Frederick Rozo --Notice of Withdrawal of Jacob Richards as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff-- (Richards, Jacob)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company.(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Nina R. Wasow (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Principal Financial Group, Inc. and Principal Life Insurance Company filed by Frederick Rozo. (rmj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 65 unresisted Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/27/15. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/12/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER finding as moot 52 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN; adopting 63 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Motions to Add Parties due by 7/15/2016. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/15/2016. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/12/2016. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/10/2016. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/21/2016. Deadline for completion of class certification expert discovery 10/31/2016. Deadline to file Motion for Class Certification November 21, 2016. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/30/2015. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Pretrial Order and Proposed Schedule by Frederick Rozo. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/21/2015. (ktw) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 9/15/2015. (dv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ORDER: Hearing was held in this matter on September 15, 2015, regarding scheduling. By September 25, 2015, the parties shall submit a Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 9/15/2015. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 8/4/2015. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Motion Hearing held on 8/4/2015 re 52 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN BY PLAINTIFF. (Court Reporter SueAnn Jones.) (dv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney, Jacob Richards. Signed by Clerk Marjorie E. Krahn on 07/30/15. (bp )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2684030 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo. (Richards, Jacob)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark T. Johnson (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER re 52 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN BY PLAINTIFF, 51 Status Report filed by Frederick Rozo. A hearing on these Motions is set for 8/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel for Defendant shall make the arrangements for the phone call. The Court may be reached at 515-284-6200. The Court will discuss the status report 51, the request to continue stay of discovery or phasing of discovery, and any proposed scheduling orders the parties are discussing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 7/16/2015. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN BY PLAINTIFF. (McKay, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Frederick Rozo. (McKay, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF Response To Plaintiffs Notice Of New Authority (DKT. 49) by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark) Modified on 6/8/2015 created link (ljf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Frederick Rozo re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) re NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - Teet MTD Order)(Wotkyns, Garrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Notice Of Withdrawal Of Statute Of Limitations Argument) (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Frederick Rozo re 40 Response to Motion (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/15/2015. (dv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Status Conference held on 5/15/2015. (dv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER: At the request of counsel, a Status Conference is set for 5/15/2015 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel for Plaintiff shall make arrangements for the conference call. The Court may be reached at 515-284-6200. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/12/2015. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Frederick Rozo of Firm Name Change (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Mark Blocker re 41 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6) by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Interest Calculation)(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY Memorandum in Support of re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company.(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Frederick Rozo. Replies due by 3/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 38 Defendants' unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to March 9, 2015 to File reply in support of motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/26/2015. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 35 Motion to file overlength brief. Plaintiff is granted permission to file 26-page brief in opposition; Defendants are granted permission to file a 10-page reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/24/2015. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Nina Wasow re 35 MOTION to file overlength brief by Frederick Rozo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to file overlength brief by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 3/12/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 2/23/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/29/2015. (pac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion to Extend Time to Resist Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Expedited Relief Requested by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/17/2015 (Goplerud, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/9/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Of Tara Amin In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration Of Tara Amin, # 4 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration Of Tara Amin)(Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd Jackson. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/18/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nina Wasow. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/17/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2486218 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Jackson, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2486210 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Wasow, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Principal Financial Group, Inc. answer due 1/23/2015; Principal Life Insurance Company answer due 1/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/16/2014. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise plead in response by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tara Amin. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/11/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark B. Blocker. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/11/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joel S. Feldman. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/11/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2480906 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2480905 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2480902 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Angel Anna West on behalf of Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company (West, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher T. Micheletti. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/8/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Heather T. Rankie. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/8/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark T. Johnson. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/4/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2474570 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Goplerud, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2474562 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Goplerud, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2473261 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Johnson, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Garrett W. Wotkyns. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 11/26/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael C. McKay. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 11/26/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Todd M. Schneider. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 11/26/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason H. Kim. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 11/26/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2466935 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Wotkyns, Garrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2466923 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (McKay, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2466877 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Schneider, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2466843 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Frederick Rozo.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Kim, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Errata re 1 Complaint, filed by Frederick Rozo. (Goplerud, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Errata re 1 Complaint, filed by Frederick Rozo. (Goplerud, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-2460410., filed by Frederick Rozo. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/16/2015. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/16/2015.(Goplerud, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/11/2018 11:30 AM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. (krn) Modified on 1/9/2018 changed to phone conference(don).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery Deadline 2/1/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/20/2018. (krn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines: Merits Fact Discovery Deadline 10/27/2017. Merits Expert Witness Disclosure due by 11/17/2017. Rebuttal Reports of Merits Experts due by 12/15/2017. Merits Expert Discovery due by 1/19/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/16/2018. Opposition to Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2018. Replies to Disposition Motions due by 4/6/2018. (dmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Hearings: 10-day Bench Trial set for 10/9/2018 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2018 11:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. (rmj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Bench Trial set for 10/9/2018 through 10/22/2018 A 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2018 11:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. (don, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/8/2016 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing using the AT&T conference line before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. (mlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/21/2015. Per order 61 (don, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadline: Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/25/2015. (dmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/15/2015 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/15/2015. (dv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to 32 Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 2/23/2015 (pac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters no longer assigned to case. (sk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge John A. Jarvey and Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters added. (don, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?