Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00090
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 11:50 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
E*TRADE Financial Corporation E*TRADE Financial Corporation, Counter-Claimant
v.
E*TRADE Financial Corporation E*TRADE Financial Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard V. de Bodo rich.debodo@bingham.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew V. Devkar andrew.devkar@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Biggs +1 302 468 5661 brian.biggs@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise Seastone Kraft +1 302 468 5645 +1 302 778 7917 denise.kraft@dlapiper.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick S. Park +1 310 595 3000 +1 310 595 3300 patrick.park@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New Castle County Law Dept.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aleine Michelle Porterfield +1 302 395 5143 +1 302 778 7935 amporterfield@nccde.org
No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Order of Dismissal)(nms) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED re 29 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/9/2013. (nms) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/26/2012. (nms) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          SO ORDERED Granting 26 Stipulation and Proposed Order Staying Proceedings Pending the Resolution of Related Proceedings, filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, E*Trade Financial Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/21/2012. (nms) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
            STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Proceedings Pending The Resolution of Related Proceedings, by ETrade Financial Corporation. (Porterfield, Aleine) Modified on 9/21/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/21/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF SERVICE of E*TRADE Financial Corporation's Core Technical Documents Bates-stamped ETRADE-0000001 through ETRADE-0000245, marked "Highly Confidential Information" by ETrade Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Biggs on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (ii) Plaintiff Pragmatus Telecom, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Service of E*Trade Financial Corporation's Initial Disclosure's by ETrade Financial Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Granting Proposed Protective Order, filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, Liveperson Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Scottrade Inc., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, North Face Apparel Corp., E*Trade Financial Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Overstock.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                        Joint PROPOSED Protective Order, by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) Modified on 6/12/2012 (nms). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) to June 11, 2012 - filed by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, Liveperson Inc., ETrade Financial Corporation, North Face Apparel Corp., Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., Scottrade Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Setting Teleconference and Status Teleconference (Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Conference to discuss ADR and a Status Teleconference is set for 6/20/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/6/2012. (lih) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2012. All Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2013. A Status Conference is set for 5/2/2014, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2014. Answering Brief due 3/29/2014. Reply Brief due 4/12/2014. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/3/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/1/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/22/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 5 day Jury Trial is set to commence on 9/8/2014, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/1/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00088-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                  PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                    Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Overstock.com Inc., Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Ford Motor Company, ETrade Financial Corporation, Advance Stores Company Incorporated, E-Advance LLC, United Parcel Service Inc., North Face Apparel Corp., Scottrade Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Monte T. Squire)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/29/2012, at 04:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Pragmatus Telecom LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard de Bodo, Andrew V. Devkar, Patrick S. Park - filed by ETrade Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Richard de Bodo, # 2 Certification of Andrew Devkar, # 3 Certification of Patrick Park, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by ETrade Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Trial Demanded and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Pragmatus Telecom LLC by ETrade Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/26/2012) (nms). (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Adam G. Price, Chester J. Shiu, and James W. Coutu of DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant E*TRADE Financial Corporation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to March 23, 2012 - filed by ETrade Financial Corporation. (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Aleine Michelle Porterfield on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of ETrade Financial Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. ETrade Financial Corporation served on 2/1/2012, answer due 2/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,311,231 B1; 6,668,286 B2; 7,159,043 B2;. (els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ETrade Financial Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1013499.) - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?