J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Rosa Garcia
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-07927

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 6:33 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge William D. Keller, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 20 . This dismissal is made pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Each Party referenced-above shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb) (Main Document 21 replaced on 6/22/2015) (shb).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?