Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. v. City of McKinney, Texas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cv-00434-ALM-AM

Tags
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 7:00 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The Inclusive Communities Project, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Inclusive Communities Project, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M Daniel +1 214 939 9230 + 214 939 9229 daniel.michael@att.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Beth Beshara +1 214 939 9230 + 214 939 9229 laurabeshara@swbell.net
v.
No Logo McKinney Housing Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coats & Rose (New Orleans)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William B Short, Jr +1 972 982 8450 +1 972 982 8451 wshort@coatsrose.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Grigsby, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Herbert Syme +1 412 297 4965 +1 412 209 1990 msyme@cohenlaw.com
No Logo Will Pryor, Mediator
Office Sherman
Filed 11/19/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Fair Housing Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Dallas
Terminated 7/11/2011
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CASREF,CLOSED,MEDIATION
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
ORDER granting [65] Motion to Vacate [64] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/16/15. (cm, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
    Case Reassigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. Judge Ron Clark no longer assigned to the case. (pad, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014, Terminated: 6/16/2015 Motion to Vacate
      Unopposed MOTION to Vacate [64] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Motion By The Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. To Vacate The Amended And Restated Modified Consent Decree Document 64 and Brief In Support Of The Motion by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Daniel, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
        ***VACATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** AMENDED AND RESTATED MODIFIED CONSENT DECREE granting [62] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/17/14. (cm, ) Modified on 6/16/2015 (cm, ).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Herbert Syme on behalf of McKinney Housing Authority (Syme, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
            Case Reassigned to Judge Ron Clark. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. (pad, )
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014, Terminated: 11/17/2014 Motion to Amend/Correct
              Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct [61] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief By The Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. To Approve The Amended And Restated Modified Consent Decree by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Amended And Restated Modified Consent Decree)(Daniel, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                MODIFIED CONSENT DECREE granting [60] Motion. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce this decree. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/15/12. (cm, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Unopposed MOTION Modify the Consent Decree by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Decree, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Decree with Signatures, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Decree red lined)(Daniel, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [58] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David John LaBrec; Katherine Elizabeth Anderson and Judith Reed Blakeway terminated. The law firm of COATS | ROSE, P.C., with William B. Short, Jr. designated as lead trial counsel, is hereby substituted as attorneys of record for Defendant, The Housing Authority of the City of McKinney, Texas, in this civil action. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/9/12. (cm, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012, Terminated: 2/9/2012 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney by McKinney Housing Authority. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Short, William)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF INCLUSIVE COMMUNITIES UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION AGAINST THE CITY OF MCKINNEY [56] Motion. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/17/10. (cm, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010, Terminated: 3/17/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Action Against the City of McKinney by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Daniel, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                            CONSENT DECREE granting [54] Motion to Approve Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/12/10. (cm, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010, Terminated: 3/15/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              Unopposed MOTION To Approve Consent Decree and Brief in Support of the Motion by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (2) Exhibit ICP Approval Letter)(Daniel, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # (3) Text of Proposed Order Consent Decree) (cm, ).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Notice (Other)
                                NOTICE by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. That HUD Has Approved The Proposed Consent Decree (Daniel, Michael)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Notice (Other)
                                  NOTICE by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. Supplemental Notice of Status of HUD Approval of Possible Settlement (Daniel, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Notice (Other)
                                    NOTICE by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. of Status of HUD Approval of Possible Settlement (Daniel, Michael)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re [48] Order on Motion to Stay,, ( Status Report due by 2/16/2010.) "It is therefore ORDERED that the stay is continued until February 12, 2010. Plaintiff is ordered to file a Status Report informing the Court of the status of this case no later than February 16, 2010." Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 1/15/10. (cm, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Notice (Other)
                                        NOTICE by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. re [48] Order on Motion to Stay, of Status of HUD Approval of Possible Settlement (Daniel, Michael)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                          ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ICPS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGSBASED ON POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT granting [47] Motion to Stay. "Once the third entity makes a decision, Inclusive Communities will immediately notify the Court of that decision. If there is no decision by January 12, 2010, Inclusive Communities will also notify the Court and provide what information it has about the status of the request for approval." Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/11/09. (cm, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009, Terminated: 11/12/2009 Motion to Stay
                                            Unopposed MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Based On Possible Settlement by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Daniel, Michael)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/11/2009, Entered: 10/11/2009 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by City of McKinney, Texas Supplemental Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony (Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by City of McKinney, Texas of Expert Testimony (Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                  Order Granting Defendant City of McKinneys Unopposed Motion to Modify Expert Witness Deadlines re: [43] Motion. "...the deadline for the City to produce the report of its expert be extended to October 9, 2009, and the deadline for ICP to designate rebuttal experts and provide reports be extended to 30 days after the City serves its experts report." Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/22/09. (cm, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009, Terminated: 9/22/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Unopposed MOTION Modify Expert Deadlines by City of McKinney, Texas. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Answer
                                                      Defendant City of McKinney's ANSWER to [1] Complaint by City of McKinney, Texas.(Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                        Order Granting Defendants Unopposed Motion to Modify Expert Witness and Discovery Deadlines granting [40] Motion for Extension of Time to File. "(1) the deadline for Defendants to designate expert witnesses and provide reports is extended to September 21, 2009; (2) the deadline for Plaintiff to designate rebuttal experts and provide reports is extended to October 21, 2009; and (3) if Plaintiff designates any rebuttal witnesses, the deadline to complete discovery is extended to November 30, 2009. The Scheduling Order is otherwise unaltered by this Order." Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/1/09. (cm, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009, Terminated: 9/1/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Designation of Expert Witnesses by City of McKinney, Texas, McKinney Housing Authority. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                            AMENDED MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for [32] Report and Recommendations, for [9] Motion to Dismiss filed by McKinney Housing Authority, [13] Motion to Dismiss filed by City of McKinney, Texas. "It is, therefore, ORDERED that Defendant McKinney Housing Authoritys Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #9) and Defendant City of McKinneys Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #13) are DENIED." Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/20/09. (cm, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS [32] Report and Recommendations, for [9] Motion to Dismiss filed by McKinney Housing Authority. "It is, therefore, ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #9) is DENIED." Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/18/09. (cm, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                INCLUSIVE COMMUNITIES BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE CITY OF MCKINNEYS OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE re: OBJECTION to [32] Report and Recommendations by City of McKinney, Texas. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Daniel, Michael) Modified on 8/19/2009 (cm, ).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO MCKINNEY HOUSING AUTHORITYS OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: OBJECTION to [32] Report and Recommendations by McKinney Housing Authority.(Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment 1, # (2) Exhibit Attachment 2)(Daniel, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2009: # (3) Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ). Modified on 8/19/2009 (cm, ).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                    OBJECTION to [32] Report and Recommendations by City of McKinney, Texas. (Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                      OBJECTION to [32] Report and Recommendations by McKinney Housing Authority. (Blakeway, Judith)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 33, Objections to Report and Recommendation. Document was incorrectly filed as a notice. Please refile using the correct event. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (pad, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Notice (Other)Court Filing
                                                                          ***FILED USING THE INCORRECT EVENT. PLEASE REFILE*** NOTICE by McKinney Housing Authority Objections to Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (Blakeway, Judith) Modified on 7/27/2009 (pad, ).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed by McKinney Housing Authority, [13] MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by City of McKinney, Texas. "Within ten (10) days after service of the magistrate judge's report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge." Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/15/09. (cm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2009: # (1) Main Document) (cm, ).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2009., Discovery due by 11/9/2009., Plaintiff Expert Witness List due by 8/4/2009., Defendant Expert Witness List due by 9/4/2009., Joinder of Parties due by 6/22/2009., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/1/2010., Motions to Dismiss due by 7/3/09., Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/09., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2009., ADR Completion due by 11/16/09., Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2010 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/20/09. (cm, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Order Referring Case to MediatorCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Will Pryor, Esq. added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/20/09. (cm, ) Modified on 5/21/2009 (cm, ).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( Mediation Completion due by 11/16/2009.) (cm, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Mediation packet mailed
                                                                                    Mediation packet mailed to mediator. Mediation Report deadline set for 11/16/2009 (cm, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Scheduling Conference
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant: Scheduling Conference held on 5/20/2009. (tls, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Daniel, Michael)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Notice of Hearing
                                                                                          Notice of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET before Judge Mazzant on Wednesday, May 20, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. at the U. S. Courthouse Annex, Chase Bank Building, Mezzanine Level, 200 N. Travis Street, Sherman, Texas 75090. (tls, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                            NOTICE by McKinney Housing Authority Certificate of Interested Parties (Blakeway, Judith)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/12/2009, Entered: 4/12/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                              NOTICE by City of McKinney, Texas Certificate of Interested Persons (Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2009, Entered: 4/11/2009 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. (Daniel, Michael)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amos L Mazzant. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/8/09. (cm, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                    Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Amos L Mazzant. Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush no longer assigned to the case. (cm, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/27/2009., Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2009 02:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.). Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/19/09. (cm, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE by McKinney Housing Authority to Substitute Lead Counsel (Blakeway, Judith)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by City of McKinney filed by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Daniel, Michael)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by City of McKinney, Texas. (Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Daniel, Michael)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed by McKinney Housing Authority. (LaBrec, David)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent Stanley Hofmeister on behalf of City of McKinney (Hofmeister, Kent)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Franklin Brown on behalf of City of McKinney, Texas (Brown, Robert)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Anderson on behalf of McKinney Housing Authority (Anderson, Katherine)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [13] MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Daniel, Michael) Modified on 1/8/2009 (mfr, ).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [9] MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant McKinney Housing Authority filed by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Daniel, Michael) Modified on 1/2/2009 (mfr, ).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by City of McKinney, Texas. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for City of McKinney, Texas to 12/22/2008. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mfr, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re City of McKinney, Texas.( Goldstucker, Mark)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura B Beshara on behalf of Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. (Beshara, Laura)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint Subject to Motion to Dismiss by McKinney Housing Authority.(LaBrec, David)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by McKinney Housing Authority. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(LaBrec, David)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Consent Form Electronically Mailed to McKinney Housing Authority (mfr, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                          SENT IN ERROR. Please ignore. Magistrate Consent Form electronically Mailed to City of McKinney, Texas (mfr, ) Modified on 12/12/2008 (mfr, ).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                            ***WRONG DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re City of McKinney, Texas. # ((2) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstucker, Mark). Modified on 12/12/2008 (mfr, ). Modified on 12/17/2008 (cm, ).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                              ***DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Maury Daniel on behalf of Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. (Daniel, Michael) Modified on 12/17/2008 (cm, ).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to McKinney Housing Authority. (cm, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to City of McKinney, Texas. (cm, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment Sent Electronically to Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Case Assignment) (cm, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush Pursuant to a Standing Order. (cm, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc. (Daniel, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001772682.), filed by Inclusive Communities Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Daniel, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                            Case Assigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider. (cm, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?