Cyberfone Systems LLC v. Lexmark International Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00110

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 2:23 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Lexmark International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Audra Carol Eidem Heinze +1 312 463 5000 aheinze@bannerwitcoff.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Harris +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 mharris@bannerwitcoff.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virgil Bryan Medlock, Jr. +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 bmedlock@bannerwitcoff.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C. Meece +1 312 463 5420 tmeece@bannerwitcoff.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S. Shull +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 jshull@bannerwitcoff.com
v.
No Logo Lexmark International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Audra Carol Eidem Heinze +1 312 463 5000 aheinze@bannerwitcoff.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Harris +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 mharris@bannerwitcoff.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virgil Bryan Medlock, Jr. +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 bmedlock@bannerwitcoff.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C. Meece +1 312 463 5420 tmeece@bannerwitcoff.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S. Shull +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 jshull@bannerwitcoff.com
No Logo Cyberfone Systems, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Transfer and Memorandum in Support filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:14-cv-109. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/28/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
        RESPONSE in Support re 16 MOTION to Transfer and Memorandum in Support filed by Lexmark International Inc. (Shull, Jason) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cyberfone Systems LLC.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
            RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Transfer and Memorandum in Support filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Cyberfone Systems LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                MOTION to Transfer and Memorandum in Support by Lexmark International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A - Excerpt from Marathon Patent Groups Website, # 2 Ex B - Assignment History for the 382 patent, # 3 Ex C - Cyberfones Disclosures in the District of Delaware Litigation, # 4 Ex D - Pacer Index for the Delaware of Delaware Litigation, # 5 Ex E - Judge Robinsons Claim Construction Order, # 6 Ex F - Judge Robinsons Order regarding the Invalidity of the 600 Patent, # 7 Ex G - Decision Affirming Judge Robinsons Order regarding Invalidity, # 8 Ex H - Declaration of Jason Wolf, # 9 Ex I - Text of Proposed Order)(Shull, Jason) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lexmark International Inc (Shull, Jason) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Cyberfone Systems LLC by Lexmark International Inc.(Shull, Jason) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy C Meece on behalf of Lexmark International Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4616211. (Meece, Timothy) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Audra Carol Eidem Heinze on behalf of Lexmark International Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4615989. (Eidem Heinze, Audra) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Harris on behalf of Lexmark International Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4604675. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jason S Shull on behalf of Lexmark International Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4604601. (Shull, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lexmark International Inc.( Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Virgil Bryan Medlock, Jr on behalf of Lexmark International Inc (Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. Lexmark International Inc served on 3/3/2014, answer due 3/24/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Raskin on behalf of Cyberfone Systems LLC (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Lexmark International Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Patent Group Inc. for Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lexmark International Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4534646.), filed by Cyberfone Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?