Hurlin v. Town of Rowley, Massachusetts
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10833-MBB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nicholas Hurlin, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Town of Rowley, Massachusetts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Jean Fitzgerald +1 802 241 2289 +1 617 880 7171
Office Boston
Filed 4/27/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Essex
Terminated 8/10/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
    Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice and without costs. (Feeney, Eileen)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment #11 is ALLOWED and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment #15 is DENIED. A final judgment shall issue with this opinion.(Feeney, Eileen)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Motion Hearing
        Electronic clerk's notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion hearing held on 4/5/2005; [11] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts; Nicholas Hurlin appearing for himself; Pamela Fitzgerald for the deft.; The court hears argument on the motion and takes the matter under advisement. (Tape #Digital.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Terminate Documents
          Documents terminated: [13] MOTION for Summary Judgment --Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support filed by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts; Documents filed incorrectly; Documents are not a separate motion for summary judgment. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
            Set/Reset Motion hearing; [11] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Motion hearing set for 4/5/2005 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
              Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [18] Motion to Continue. (Bowler, Marianne)
                LREF
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005, Terminated: 3/16/2005 Motion to Continue
                Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment to 4/5/05 by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts.(Fitzgerald, Pamela)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                  NOTICE of Hearing ; [11] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and [13] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment -Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support: Motion hearing set for 3/29/2005 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Memorandum of Law
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Nicholas Hurlin to [15] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # (1) exh 1-3# (2) Exh 4-6# (3) Exh 7-10# (4) exh 11-13# (5) exh 14-16)(Simeone, Maria)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Memorandum of Law
                      MEMORANDUM OF FACT IN SUPPORT by Nicholas Hurlin to [15] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Simeone, Maria)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicholas Hurlin. (Simeone, Maria)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005, Terminated: 3/2/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/8/05 to Plaintiff to File Opposition To Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts.(Fitzgerald, Pamela)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005, Terminated: 3/17/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION for Summary Judgment --Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit Exhibits 7-8# (8) Exhibit Exhibit 9# (9) Exhibit Exhibits 10-14# (10) Exhibit Exhibits 15A-15C)(Fitzgerald, Pamela)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              MEMORANDUM in Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment By Town of Rowley. (Fitzgerald, Pamela)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005, Terminated: 8/9/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts.(Fitzgerald, Pamela)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Status Conference
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status conference held on 11/16/2004; Parties address the status of the case; All discovery to be completed by 12/16/2004; No further extensions will be granted; Motion for summary judgment to be filed by 1/31/2005. (Tape #Digital.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Status conference reset for 11/16/2004 at 3:15 PM in Courtroom # 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: NOTE: Time change only. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Conference held on July 16, 2004 before Judge Bowler. Tape Number: Tape Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508-384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Status Conference
                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler : Status Conference held on 7/16/2004; Plaintiff Nicholas Hurlin representing himself; Atty. Fitzgerald for the defendant; Fact Discovery due by November 30, 2004; Dispositive motions due by January 31, 2005; Status conference set for November 16, 2004 at 2:15 PM. (Tape #Digital.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/16/2004 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Order case reassigned to Magistrate Judge for TriaCourt Filing
                                            Judge William G. Young : ORDER OF REFERENCE entered: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge William G. Young no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing.(Bell, Marie)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts.(Fitzgerald, Pamela)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Chief Judge William G. Young. cc/cl(Smith, Bonnie)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 state court record
                                                  STATE COURT Record. (Bell, Marie)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts.(Bell, Marie)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J. Fitzgerald on behalf of Town of Rowley, Massachusetts. c/s. (Bell, Marie)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Town of Rowley, Massachusetts , filed by Nicholas Hurlin (filed in Essex Superior Court).(Bell, Marie)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Notice of Removal
                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts from Essex Superior Court, case number 2004-00034. $ 150, receipt number 55544, filed by Town of Rowley, Massachusetts.(Bell, Marie)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Bell, Marie)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 505 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?