Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Parametric Technology Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00813
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 12:17 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Parametric Technology Corporation, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Parametric Technology Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Choate Hall & Stewart, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Murawski +1 617 248 4996 +1 617 502 4996 mmurawski@choate.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Winston +1 617 248 5000 +1 617 248 4000 DWinston@choate.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims between pltfs and deft are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be bore by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Parametric Technology Corporation (Notice of Name Change) (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv806 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit uniform Docket Control, Protective, and Discovery Orders which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Parametric Technology Corporation.(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael E Murawski on behalf of Parametric Technology Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3967489. (Murawski, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Winston on behalf of Parametric Technology Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3964207. (Winston, Daniel) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Parametric Technology Corporation.( Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. Parametric Technology Corporation served on 11/19/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Decker A Cammack on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Parametric Technology Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT against Parametric Technology Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3847490.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,579,222)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?