Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. v. President and Fellows of Harvard College
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-14176-ADB
District Judge Allison D. Burroughs, presiding

Tags
Last Updated March 9, 2021 at 7:27 AM ST (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Students for Fair Admissions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin C. Caldwell +1 401 831 8330 +1 401 831 8359 bcaldwell@burnslev.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul M. Sanford +1 401 831 8330 +1 401 831 8359 psanford@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Michael Connolly +1 703 243 9423 mike@consovoymccarthy.com
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Thomas R. McCarthy +1 703 243 9423 tom@consovoymccarthy.com
v.
President and Fellows of Harvard College President and Fellows of Harvard College, Defendant
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Korea Equity Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul M. Sanford +1 401 831 8330 +1 401 831 8359 psanford@burnslev.com
No Logo The Honorable and Reverend The Board of Overseers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul M. Sanford +1 401 831 8330 +1 401 831 8359 psanford@burnslev.com
No Logo AG-, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Arjini Kumari Nawal, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Fadhal Moore, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Ge, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Ig, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo JL-, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Kc, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Keyanna Wigglesworth, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo MB, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo R. H., Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo R, + S., Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Sarah Cole, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
No Logo Y. D., Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rahsaan D. Hall +1 617 988 0608 +1 617 482 4392 rhall@lawyerscom.org
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Office Boston
Filed 11/17/2014
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Suffolk
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (599) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Case Appealed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None USCA Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None USCA Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 673 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 judgmentCourt Filing
          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. Judgment for the Defendant President and Fellows of Harvard College (Harvard Corporation).(McDonagh, Christina)
            LREF
            Legal Document 672 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (McDonagh, Christina)
              LREF
              Legal Document 670 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 USCA Judgment
              USCA Judgment In Re: Lawrence L. Crawford. Appeal No. 18-8022. The petition is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction. All pending motions are DENIED. (Pacho, Arnold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 671 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Letter/request (non-motion)
                Letter. (McDonagh, Christina)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: 8/16/2019 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Andrew R. Varcoe (Varcoe, Andrew)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 668 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel Winik (Winik, Daniel)
                      LREF
                      Blank 667 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                        Transcript of Closing Arguments held on February 13, 2019, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 7/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 665 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [663] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher Lapinig. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                            LREF
                            Blank 664 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [662] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Laboni Hoq. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019, Terminated: 6/10/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Lapinig Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7721517 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Sellstrom, Oren)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019, Terminated: 6/10/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laboni Hoq Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7721447 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Sellstrom, Oren)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lawrence Culleen on behalf of Nicole K. Ochi (Culleen, Lawrence)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 660 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lawrence Culleen on behalf of Brenda Shum (Culleen, Lawrence)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michael H. Park (Park, Michael)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 658 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                          LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 657 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                          SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Fifteen held on November 2, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information:Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                            Transcript of Bench Trial Day Fifteen (Closing Arguments) held on November 2, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information:Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 655 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                              SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Fourteen held on November 1, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Fourteen held on November 1, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 653 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                  SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Thirteen held on October 31, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                    Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Thirteen held on October 31, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 651 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                      SEALED Transcript of Jury Trial - Day Twelve held on October 30, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                        Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Twelve held on October 30, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 649 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                          SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eleven held on October 29, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                            Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eleven held on October 29, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 647 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                              SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Ten held on October 26, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Ten held on October 26, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 645 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcript
                                                                  SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Nine held on October 25, 2018, before First. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                    Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Nine held on October 25, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 643 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                      SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eight held on October 24, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                        Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Eight held on October 24, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 641 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                          SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Seven held on October 23, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                            Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Seven held on October 23, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 639 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                              SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Six held on October 22, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Six held on October 22, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 637 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Five held on October 19, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Five held on October 19, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 4/18/2019 (Scalfani, Deborah).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Four held on October 18, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 634 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        SEALED Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Three held on October 17, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Three held on October 17, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019.(Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                            Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Two held on October 16, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                              Transcript of Bench Trial - Day One held on October 15, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 630 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Hearing (Other)Court Filing
                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing re on arguments in support of proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law held on 2/13/2019. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 629 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                  Hearing of arguments in support of proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law is rescheduled for February 13, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 17. This is a TIME change only. SFFA and Harvard may each have up to 60 minutes for argument. Amici groups "Students" and "Organizations" will each be allowed up to 15 minutes. See ECF No. [575].(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 628 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 response
                                                                                                    Response by President and Fellows of Harvard College to [620] Proposed Findings of Fact . (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 627 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                      Proposed Findings of Fact by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 626 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                        Proposed Findings of Fact by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. in Support of Defendant. (Rodriguez, Madeleine)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                            AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Clark, Randall)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 623 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Lee, Jin)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 622 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education AMICI CURIAE BRIEF OF THE ASIAN AMERICAN COALITION FOR EDUCATION AND THE ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL FOUNDATION, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Fauth, Gordon)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 621 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [618] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 620 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2018: # (2) Unredacted Version, # (3) Appendix Unredacted Version) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                      Proposed Findings of Fact by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Selected Exhibits)(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 618 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by President and Fellows of Harvard College Corrected Admitted Exhibit List (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 01)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 616 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [615] Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 615 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018, Terminated: 11/14/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 612 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing on Arguments in support of proposed findings set for 2/13/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Admitted Exhibit List (Mortara, Adam)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 610 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Adam K Mortara (Mortara, Adam)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 614 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Bench Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 15 completed on 11/2/2018. Closing arguments by the parties. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 613 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 14 held on 11/1/2018. Testimony of David Card resumes. Marlyn McGrath sworn and testifies. Plaintiff rests. Drew Faust sworn and testifies. Deposition testimony read into the record. Defense rests. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 608 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 13 held on 10/31/2018. Testimony of David Card resumes. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 607 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 12 held on 10/30/2018. Ruth Simmons and David Card sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 605 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                              Reply in Support of Admission of P438 and P588 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Mortara, Adam) Modified on 11/1/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 604 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to Dkt. 602. (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 603 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Offer of Proof of Deposition Designations (Mortara, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2018: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Filed under Seal), # (2) Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), # (3) Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 602 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. Bench Brief Regarding Exhibits D669 Through D730 (Mortara, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 606 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 11 held on 10/29/2018. Margaret Chin, Sarah Cole, Catherine Ho, Cecelia Nunez, Thang Diep, Madison Trice, and Sally Chen all sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite and Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 598 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [596] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 597 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: 10/27/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. of Deposition Designations Played in Court (Attachments: # (1) Script report)(Hacker, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: 10/27/2018, Terminated: 10/29/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Hacker, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                              Opposition to SFFA's Oral Motion to Admit P438 and P588 by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 601 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 10 held on 10/26/2018. Testimony of Peter Arcidiacono resumes. Deposition testimony read into the record. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 600 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 9 held on 10/25/2018. Peter Arcidiacono sworn and testifies. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 595 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Crawford re [591] Letter/request (non-motion) by Lawrence Crawford. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 599 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 8 held on 10/24/2018. Mark Hansen, Roger Banks, Charlene Kim, and Tia Ray sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 593 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot [588] Motion to Admit Exhibit P9 (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 594 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 7 held on 10/23/2018. Rakesh Khurana, Michael Smith, and Elizabeth Yong sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 592 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 6 held on 10/22/2018. Richard Kahlenberg sworn and testifies. Marlyn McGrath testimony resumes. Rakesh Khurana sworn and testifies. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 591 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Jahjah Al Mahdi. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 10/21/2018, Entered: 10/21/2018, Terminated: 10/24/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Admit Exhibit P9 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Mortara, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 590 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 5 held on 10/19/2018. Erica Bever testimony continues. Erin Driver-Linn and Marlyn McGrath sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 589 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 4 held on 10/18/2018. Dean Fitzsimmons testimony continues. Christopher Looby and Erica Bever sworn and testify. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 587 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 3 held on 10/17/2018. Testimony of William Fitzsimmons resumes. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 586 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 2 held on 10/16/2018. Testimony of William Fitzsimmons resumes. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 584 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 583 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Bench Trial - Day Two held on October 16, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Bench Trial - Day One held on October 15, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 585 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Bench Trial Day 1 held on 10/15/2018. Opening statements by the parties. Dean William Fitzsimmons sworn and testifies. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth re [575] Memorandum & ORDER REGARDING TRIAL WITNESSES, REQUEST FOR DATE CERTAIN FOR STUDENT TESTIMONY, AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PRESENT ORAL OPENING STATEMENT (Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 580 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Mueller on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Mueller, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 579 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College re [575] Memorandum & ORDER Regarding Witnesses and Opening Statement (Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 577 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit DX-13, # (2) Exhibit DX-40, # (3) Exhibit P500)(Mortara, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 578 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Crawford re [576] Exhibit, by Lawrence Crawford. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4) *Note this is envelop 1 of 2.(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 576 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT 1 by Lawrence Crawford. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2, # (2) Exhibit 3, # (3) Exhibit 4, # (4) Exhibit 5, # (5) Exhibit 6) *Note that the envelop of this filing states that it is being made as 2 of 2 but Clerk's Office never received envelop 1 of 2 so there is no motion to link this to on the docket*(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 575 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 574 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. As was more fully set forth during the October 3, 2018 pretrial conference, the parties motions in limine (MIL), see [ECF Nos. [546], [547]], are resolved as follows:SFFAs MIL No. 1 which sought to preclude Harvard from calling Edward Blum as a witness is denied as moot, see [ECF No. [571]].SFFAs MIL No. 2 which sought to preclude evidence or argument regarding portions of application files relevant to personal ratings is denied with leave to renew or object at trial.SFFAs MIL No. 3 concerning the expected testimony of Dean Khurana is resolved as follows: Dean Khurana was not noticed as an expert and, therefore, may not be called as an expert witness. He may, however, testify as a percipient witness and based on his personal knowledge.Harvards MIL No.1 to exclude evidence concerning its early twentieth-century discrimination against Jewish applicants is granted in part and denied in part. In the interests of developing a complete factual record, but also recognizing the somewhat attenuated relevance, the Court will allow a very limited presentation of this topic including through exhibits, stipulations and direct and cross examination.Harvards MIL No. 2 to preclude evidence regarding Harvards invocation of the attorney-client privilege is denied with leave to renew or object at trial in recognition of the fact that there are proper and improper uses for the documents at issue. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 573 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/3/2018. Colloquy re: pending motions, trial schedule and logistics. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 572 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/3/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. NOTICE IS FOR TIME CHANGE ONLY.(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 571 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [546] MOTION in Limine filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10)(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 570 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A1, # (2) Exhibit A2, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F)(Mortara, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2018: # (8) Exhibit A1 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 569 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [547] MOTION in Limine filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16)(Mortara, Adam) (Attachment 6 replaced on 10/1/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2018: # (17) Unredacted Memorandum in Opposition (FILED UNDER SEAL), # (18) Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 568 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [565] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 567 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Courts Summary Judgment Memorandum and Order ("Opinion") cites to several paragraphs in the parties submissions that were filed with redactions. The Court has concluded that two of these paragraphs must be filed without redactions. SFFA shall email the Court's docket clerk an updated version of its Statement of Material Fact [ECF No. [414]-2] with the redaction in 130 removed, and an updated version of its Counter Statement of Material Facts [ECF No. [452]] with the redaction in its response to 73 removed. The Court finds "good cause" to maintain under seal the remaining redacted statements cited by the Opinion, which consist primarily of individuals' names and other personally identifiable information. Bradford & Bigelow, Inc. v. Richardson, 109 F. Supp. 3d 445, 447 (D. Mass. 2015). The parties disagree about whether there is sufficient cause to maintain partial or complete sealing of approximately 100 exhibits and numerous statements in the parties' submissions. See [ECF No. [422] at 21-24]. Given that the court has not relied on these materials in its Opinion and some of this information may become public during trial, the Court will defer deciding the issues raised by the parties' memoranda on sealing [ECF Nos. [422], [427]] until the conclusion of trial.(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 566 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Accordingly, the cross-motions for summary judgment [ECF Nos. [412], [417]] are denied without prejudice. Consistent with this order, the parties may renew their arguments at trial. SO ORDERED. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 9/28/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to [532] MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Holmes, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 563 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [562] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018, Terminated: 9/27/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Holmes, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by President and Fellows of Harvard College to [497] Amicus brief filed, by the United States. (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 560 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [559] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 9/27/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Response to the United States' Statement of Interest by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Response)(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 558 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to [518] MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 555 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [551] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018, Terminated: 9/26/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File a Reply in regards to [518] MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Culleen, Lawrence) Modified on 9/25/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [532] MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 547 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/3/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/3/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Hughes, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 545 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [539] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John J. Park Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Jahjah T. Jishbite. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [518] MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 542 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [540] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [518] MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings , [532] MOTION To Participate In Trial filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018, Terminated: 9/14/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of Pre-Trial Motions by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018, Terminated: 9/17/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John J. Park, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7318306 by Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of John J. Park, Jr.)(Lawrence, Douglass)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Ara B. Gershengorn on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Gershengorn, Ara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 537 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [536] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Danielle Conley and Brittany Amadi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018, Terminated: 9/11/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Danielle Conley and Brittany Amadi Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7312062 by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Conley Certification in Support of Motion, # (2) Amadi Certification in Support of Motion)(Ellsworth, Felicia) Modified on 9/11/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Frazier on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Frazier, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Earl A. Kirkland, III on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Kirkland, Earl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Janai S. Nelson on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Nelson, Janai)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 532 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018, Terminated: 10/3/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION To Participate In Trial by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College.(Turnage Young, Michaele)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant. Amendment to [499] Amicus brief filed Amended Brief of Professors of Economics As Amici Curiae In Support of Defendant. (Ho, Derek)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 530 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [527] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 529 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [528] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J. Scott McBride, Katherine L.I. Hacker, Meg E. Fasulo, and Krista J. Perry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018, Terminated: 9/6/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Meg E. Fasulo, Katherine L.I. Hacker, J. Scott McBride, and Krista J. Perry Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7305513 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Fasulo Certification, # (2) Hacker Certificaton, # (3) McBride Certification, # (4) Perry Certification, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018, Terminated: 9/6/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amended Amicus Brief by Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Brief)(Ho, Derek)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Cara McClellan on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (McClellan, Cara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Holmes on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Holmes, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele N. Turnage Young on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Turnage Young, Michaele)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Kleinman on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Kleinman, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jin Hee Lee on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Lee, Jin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Spital on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Spital, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Sherrilyn A. Ifill on behalf of 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Ifill, Sherrilyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Sarah E. Harrington on behalf of Social Scientists and Scholars. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A: List of Amici)(Harrington, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 518 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018, Terminated: 10/3/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Participate in Trial Proceedings by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth.(Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMICUS BRIEF filed by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 516 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [503] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 515 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [507] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah Hinger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF filed by Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation, Southeastern Legal Foundation in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. (Lawrence, Douglass)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglass C. Lawrence on behalf of Southeastern Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation (Lawrence, Douglass)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [510] Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 286, # (2) Exhibit 287)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # (3) Exhibit 286 (Unredacted Version FILED UNDER SEAL), # (4) Exhibit 287 (UNREDACTED VERSION FILED UNDER SEAL)) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # (5) Unredacted Declaration of Michael Connolly) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # (1) Unredacted Response to Statement of Material Facts) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # (1) Unredacted Memorandum) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 509 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Student Record)(Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 508 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Massachusetts, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment. (Segal, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018, Terminated: 8/31/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah Hinger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7298403 by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Sarah Hinger in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Segal, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 506 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [501] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kenneth Kimerling. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 505 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [496] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF filed by 21 Colorful Crimson, Association of Black Harvard Women, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018, Terminated: 8/31/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae by Harvard Black Alumni Society, Harvard Asian American Alumni Alliance, Association of Black Harvard Women, 21 Colorful Crimson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Rodriguez, Madeleine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018, Terminated: 8/30/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kenneth Kimerling Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7297870 by Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Kenneth Kimerling)(Rodriguez, Madeleine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine K. Rodriguez on behalf of Amici Curiae the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. (Rodriguez, Madeleine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant . (Ho, Derek)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Tam Ho on behalf of Amici Curiae Professors of Economics Susan Dynarski, et al., in Support of Defendant (Ho, Derek)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMICUS BRIEF filed by United States in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [417]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fitzsimmons Dep., # (2) Exhibit Ortiz Dep., # (3) Exhibit Smith (2nd) Dep.)(Donnelly, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # (4) Unredacted Version of United States' Statement of Interest Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 496 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018, Terminated: 8/30/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Statement of Interest by United States.(Donnelly, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [493] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Earl A. Kirkland III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 494 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMICUS BRIEF filed by Social Scientists and Scholars in Support of Defendant. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix List of Amici)(Rosensweig, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018, Terminated: 8/30/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Earl A. Kirkland III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7296869 by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certification of Attorney Kirkland)(Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [485] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [490] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah E. Harrington. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018, Terminated: 8/29/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah E. Harrington Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7295782 by Social Scientists and Scholars. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, # (2) Exhibit List of Amici Curiae)(Rosensweig, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Rosensweig on behalf of Social Scientists and Scholars (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Rosensweig, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed in error. Please see docket entry ECF [489]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Felicia H. Ellsworth ISO Defendant's Reply ISO Its Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 159, # (2) Exhibit 160, # (3) Exhibit 161, # (4) Exhibit 162, # (5) Exhibit 163, # (6) Exhibit 164, # (7) Exhibit 165, # (8) Exhibit 166)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: # (9) Unredacted Memorandum, # (10) Exhibit 160 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # (11) Exhibit 161 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # (12) Exhibit 162 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # (13) Exhibit 163 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # (14) Exhibit 164 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL), # (15) Exhibit 165 Unredacted Version (FILED UNDER SEAL)) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [483] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018, Terminated: 8/29/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to [417] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018, Terminated: 8/28/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with Harvard's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to [455] MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae filed by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Kleinman, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [480] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018, Terminated: 8/16/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply to Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Amici Organizations' Motion to Participate as Amici Curiae)(Kleinman, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [455] MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hughes, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding the Submission of Trial Briefs. (Mortara, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [474] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Emma Katherine Dinan. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for all hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [473] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Genevieve Bonadies Torres. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for all hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [472] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brenda Shum. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for all hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Emma Dinan Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7261880 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Cregor, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Genevieve Bonadies Torres Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7261863 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Cregor, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brenda Shum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7261415 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Shum Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Cregor, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMICUS BRIEF filed by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 3 Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 4 Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 5 Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 6 Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 7 Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 8 Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 9 Declaration, # (9) Exhibit 10 Declaration, # (10) Exhibit 11 Declaration, # (11) Exhibit 12 Declaration, # (12) Exhibit 13 Declaration, # (13) Exhibit 14 Declaration, # (14) Exhibit 15 Declaration, # (15) Exhibit 16 Declaration, # (16) Exhibit 17 Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon M. Fauth, Jr on behalf of Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation (Fauth, Gordon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Asian American Legal Foundation NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LEE C. CHENG AS COUNSEL FOR AMICUS CURIAE THE ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL FOUNDATION (Fauth, Gordon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 468 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [457] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sherrilyn A. Ifill, Janai S. Nelson, Samuel Spital, Jin Hee Lee, Rachel M. Kleinman, Michaele N. Turnage Young, Jennifer A. Holmes, and Cara McClellan. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation . (Randazza, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 466 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [461] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 465 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [455] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Notice of Attorney Payment of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Amicus Parties Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-7253315. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Notice of Attorney Payment of Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to [457] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sherrilyn A. Ifill, Janai S. Nelson, Samuel Spital, Jin Hee Lee, Rachel M. Kleinman, Michaele N. Turnage Young, Jennifer A. Holmes, and Cara McClellan by Amicus Parties Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-7253250. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 462 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [459] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gordon M. Fauth Jr. and Lee Cheng. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/31/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae [460] Out of Time by Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Randazza, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education, Asian American Legal Foundation . (Randazza, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/31/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gordon M. Fauth, Jr. and Lee Cheng Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7252337 by Asian American Legal Foundation, Asian American Coalition for Education. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cheng Certification, # (2) Exhibit Fauth Certification, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Randazza, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Rebecca Cook on behalf of Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Cook, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/31/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sherrilyn A. Ifill, Janai S. Nelson, Samuel Spital, Jin Hee Lee, Rachel M. Kleinman, Michaele N. Turnage Young, Jennifer A. Holmes, and Cara McClellan by Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Attorney Ifill, # (2) Certification of Attorney Nelson, # (3) Certification of Attorney Spital, # (4) Certification of Attorney Lee, # (5) Certification of Attorney Kleinman, # (6) Certification of Attorney Turnage Young, # (7) Certification of Attorney Holmes, # (8) Certification of Attorney McClellan)(Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth N. Thayer on behalf of Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Islamic Society, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Native Americans At Harvard College, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College (Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/31/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae by Harvard-Radcliffe Black Students Association, Kuumba Singers of Harvard College, Fuerza Latina of Harvard, Native Americans At Harvard College, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Asian American Women's Association, Harvard Asian American Brotherhood, Harvard Vietnamese Association, Harvard-Radcliffe Chinese Students Association, Harvard Korean Association, Harvard Japan Society, Harvard South Asian Association, Harvard Islamic Society, Task Force on Asian and Pacific American Studies at Harvard College, Harvard Phillips Brooks House Association, Harvard Minority Association of Pre-Medical Students, Coalition for a Diverse Harvard, First Generation Harvard Alumni, Native American Alumni of Harvard University, Harvard University Muslim Alumni, Harvard Latino Alumni Alliance. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amicus Brief by Harvard Student and Alumni Organizations in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # (2) Exhibit Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Declaration, # (5) Exhibit Declaration, # (6) Exhibit Declaration, # (7) Exhibit Declaration, # (8) Exhibit Declaration, # (9) Exhibit Declaration, # (10) Exhibit Declaration, # (11) Exhibit Declaration, # (12) Exhibit Declaration, # (13) Exhibit Declaration, # (14) Exhibit Declaration, # (15) Exhibit Declaration, # (16) Exhibit Declaration, # (17) Exhibit Declaration)(Thayer, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael Connolly in Support of SFFA's Opposition to Harvard's Motion for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 262, # (2) Exhibit 263, # (3) Exhibit 264, # (4) Exhibit 265, # (5) Exhibit 266, # (6) Exhibit 267, # (7) Exhibit 268, # (8) Exhibit 269, # (9) Exhibit 270, # (10) Exhibit 271, # (11) Exhibit 272, # (12) Exhibit 273, # (13) Exhibit 274, # (14) Exhibit 275, # (15) Exhibit 276, # (16) Exhibit 277, # (17) Exhibit 278, # (18) Exhibit 279, # (19) Exhibit 280, # (20) Exhibit 281, # (21) Exhibit 282, # (22) Exhibit 283, # (23) Exhibit 284, # (24) Exhibit 285)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: # (25) Unredacted DECLARATION of Michael Connolly in Support of SFFA's Opposition to Harvard's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed Under Seal), # (26) Exhibit 262 (Filed Under Seal), # (27) Exhibit 263 (Filed Under Seal), # (28) Exhibit 264 (Filed Under Seal), # (29) Exhibit 265 (Filed Under Seal), # (30) Exhibit 266 (Filed Under Seal), # (31) Exhibit 267 (Filed Under Seal), # (32) Exhibit 268 (Filed Under Seal), # (33) Exhibit 269 (Filed Under Seal), # (34) Exhibit 270 (Filed Under Seal), # (35) Exhibit 271 (Filed Under Seal), # (36) Exhibit 272 (Filed Under Seal), # (37) Exhibit 273 (Filed Under Seal), # (38) Exhibit 274 (Filed Under Seal), # (39) Exhibit 275 (Filed Under Seal), # (40) Exhibit 276 (Filed Under Seal), # (41) Exhibit 277 (Filed Under Seal), # (42) Exhibit 278 (Filed Under Seal), # (43) Exhibit 279 (Filed Under Seal), # (44) Exhibit 280 (Filed Under Seal), # (45) Exhibit 281 (Filed Under Seal), # (46) Exhibit 282 (Filed Under Seal), # (47) Exhibit 283 (Filed Under Seal), # (48) Exhibit 284 (Filed Under Seal), # (49) Exhibit 285 (Filed Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [451] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James R. Conde, Adam R.F. Gustafson, C. Boyden Gray, Andrew R. Varcoe. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [417] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: # (1) Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Filed under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: # (2) Updated (10/3/2018) Redacted Response) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of C. Boyden Gray, Andrew R. Varcoe, Adam R.F. Gustafson, James R. Conde Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7251970 by Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions.(Clark, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Clark, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [417] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: # (1) Memorandum of Reasons in Opposition to Harvard's Motion For Summary Judgment (Unredacted and Sealed)) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Randall B. Clark on behalf of Amici Curiae Economists Michael Keane et al., in Support of Students for Fair Admissions. (Clark, Randall) Modified to correct docket text on 7/30/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by Walter Dellinger (Brief For Walter Dellinger As Amicus Curiae In Support Of Defendant On The Issue Of Standing). (Wisner, Joanne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [444] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew S. Hellman. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 445 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMICUS BRIEF filed by Brown University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, John Hopkins University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University in Support of Defendants. (Orkand, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew S. Hellman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7251217 by Brown University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, John Hopkins University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Matthew S. Hellman)(Orkand, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Seth B. Orkand on behalf of Brown University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, John Hopkins University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (Orkand, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF filed by American Council on Education and 36 Other Higher Education Organizations in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Tidwell, Natashia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Natashia Tidwell on behalf of American Council on Education. (Tidwell, Natashia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 440 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [417] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Student Declarations)(Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amicus brief filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMICUS BRIEF filed by National Association of Scholars . (Duncan, Dwight)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION Declaration of Felicia H. Ellsworth ISO Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 98, # (2) Exhibit 99, # (3) Exhibit 100, # (4) Exhibit 101, # (5) Exhibit 102, # (6) Exhibit 103, # (7) Exhibit 104, # (8) Exhibit 105, # (9) Exhibit 106, # (10) Exhibit 107, # (11) Exhibit 108, # (12) Exhibit 109, # (13) Exhibit 110, # (14) Exhibit 111, # (15) Exhibit 112, # (16) Exhibit 113, # (17) Exhibit 114, # (18) Exhibit 115, # (19) Exhibit 116, # (20) Exhibit 117, # (21) Exhibit 118, # (22) Exhibit 119, # (23) Exhibit 120, # (24) Exhibit 121, # (25) Exhibit 122, # (26) Exhibit 123, # (27) Exhibit 124, # (28) Exhibit 125, # (29) Exhibit 126, # (30) Exhibit 127, # (31) Exhibit 128, # (32) Exhibit 129, # (33) Exhibit 130, # (34) Exhibit 131, # (35) Exhibit 132, # (36) Exhibit 133, # (37) Exhibit 134, # (38) Exhibit 135, # (39) Exhibit 136, # (40) Exhibit 137, # (41) Exhibit 138, # (42) Exhibit 139, # (43) Exhibit 140, # (44) Exhibit 141, # (45) Exhibit 142, # (46) Exhibit 143, # (47) Exhibit 144, # (48) Exhibit 145, # (49) Exhibit 146, # (50) Exhibit 147, # (51) Exhibit 148, # (52) Exhibit 149, # (53) Exhibit 150, # (54) Exhibit 151, # (55) Exhibit 152, # (56) Exhibit 153, # (57) Exhibit 154, # (58) Exhibit 155, # (59) Exhibit 156, # (60) Exhibit 157, # (61) Exhibit 158)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # (62) SEALED Declaration of Felicia H. Ellsworth in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # (63) Exhibit 98 Unredacted Version, # (64) Exhibit 101 Unredacted Version, # (65) Exhibit 102 Unredacted Version) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # (66) Exhibit 105 Unredacted Version, # (67) Exhibit 119 Unredacted Version, # (68) Exhibit 128 Unredacted Version, # (69) Exhibit 151 Unredacted Version, # (70) Exhibit 158 Unredacted Version) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # (1) SEALED Response to Statement of Material Facts) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Dwight G. Duncan on behalf of National Association of Scholars. (Duncan, Dwight)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 435 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2018: # (1) SEALED Oppostion to Motion for Summary Judgment) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [433] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018, Terminated: 7/26/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In response to the parties' joint statement regarding the submission of amicus briefs [ECF No. 429], the Court hereby grants leave for any interested party to file an amicus brief on the pending dispositive motions, in accordance with the deadlines set forth in the Court's order dated May 23, 2018 [ECF No. 404]. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [430] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018, Terminated: 7/24/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with Harvard's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding the Submission of Amicus Briefs. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Order on Motion to unseal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [425] Motion to Unseal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [410] Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with the Parties' Summary Judgment Motions filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (1) SEALED Memorandum of Law (unredacted)) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [424] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 7/2/2018 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Document by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of SFFA's Opposition to Harvard's Motion to Seal by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Sean D. Reyes Utah Attorney General. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [410] Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with the Parties' Summary Judgment Motions filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robin Worth)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66, # (67) Exhibit 67, # (68) Exhibit 68, # (69) Exhibit 69, # (70) Exhibit 70, # (71) Exhibit 71, # (72) Exhibit 72, # (73) Exhibit 73, # (74) Exhibit 74, # (75) Exhibit 75, # (76) Exhibit 76, # (77) Exhibit 77, # (78) Exhibit 78, # (79) Exhibit 79, # (80) Exhibit 80, # (81) Exhibit 81, # (82) Exhibit 82, # (83) Exhibit 83, # (84) Exhibit 84, # (85) Exhibit 85, # (86) Exhibit 86, # (87) Exhibit 87, # (88) Exhibit 88, # (89) Exhibit 89, # (90) Exhibit 90, # (91) Exhibit 91, # (92) Exhibit 92, # (93) Exhibit 93, # (94) Exhibit 94, # (95) Exhibit 95, # (96) Exhibit 96, # (97) Exhibit 97, # (98) Exhibit 98, # (99) Exhibit 99, # (100) Exhibit 100, # (101) Exhibit 101, # (102) Exhibit 102, # (103) Exhibit 103, # (104) Exhibit 104, # (105) Exhibit 105, # (106) Exhibit 106, # (107) Exhibit 107, # (108) Exhibit 108, # (109) Exhibit 109, # (110) Exhibit 110, # (111) Exhibit 111, # (112) Exhibit 112, # (113) Exhibit 113, # (114) Exhibit 114, # (115) Exhibit 115, # (116) Exhibit 116, # (117) Exhibit 117, # (118) Exhibit 118, # (119) Exhibit 119, # (120) Exhibit 120, # (121) Exhibit 121, # (122) Exhibit 122, # (123) Exhibit 123, # (124) Exhibit 124, # (125) Exhibit 125, # (126) Exhibit 126, # (127) Exhibit 127, # (128) Exhibit 128, # (129) Exhibit 129, # (130) Exhibit 130, # (131) Exhibit 131, # (132) Exhibit 132, # (133) Exhibit 133, # (134) Exhibit 134, # (135) Exhibit 135, # (136) Exhibit 136, # (137) Exhibit 137, # (138) Exhibit 138, # (139) Exhibit 139, # (140) Exhibit 140, # (141) Exhibit 141, # (142) Exhibit 142, # (143) Exhibit 143, # (144) Exhibit 144, # (145) Exhibit 145, # (146) Exhibit 146, # (147) Exhibit 147, # (148) Exhibit 148, # (149) Exhibit 149, # (150) Exhibit 150, # (151) Exhibit 151, # (152) Exhibit 152, # (153) Exhibit 153, # (154) Exhibit 154, # (155) Exhibit 155, # (156) Exhibit 156, # (157) Exhibit 157, # (158) Exhibit 158, # (159) Exhibit 159, # (160) Exhibit 160, # (161) Exhibit 161, # (162) Exhibit 162, # (163) Exhibit 163, # (164) Exhibit 164, # (165) Exhibit 165, # (166) Exhibit 166, # (167) Exhibit 167, # (168) Exhibit 168, # (169) Exhibit 169, # (170) Exhibit 170, # (171) Exhibit 171, # (172) Exhibit 172, # (173) Exhibit 173, # (174) Exhibit 174, # (175) Exhibit 175, # (176) Exhibit 176, # (177) Exhibit 177, # (178) Exhibit 178, # (179) Exhibit 179, # (180) Exhibit 180, # (181) Exhibit 181, # (182) Exhibit 182, # (183) Exhibit 183, # (184) Exhibit 184, # (185) Exhibit 185, # (186) Exhibit 186, # (187) Exhibit 187, # (188) Exhibit 188, # (189) Exhibit 189, # (190) Exhibit 190, # (191) Exhibit 191, # (192) Exhibit 192, # (193) Exhibit 193, # (194) Exhibit 194, # (195) Exhibit 195, # (196) Exhibit 196, # (197) Exhibit 197, # (198) Exhibit 198, # (199) Exhibit 199, # (200) Exhibit 200, # (201) Exhibit 201, # (202) Exhibit 202, # (203) Exhibit 203, # (204) Exhibit 204, # (205) Exhibit 205, # (206) Exhibit 206, # (207) Exhibit 207, # (208) Exhibit 208, # (209) Exhibit 209, # (210) Exhibit 210, # (211) Exhibit 211, # (212) Exhibit 212, # (213) Exhibit 213, # (214) Exhibit 214, # (215) Exhibit 215, # (216) Exhibit 216, # (217) Exhibit 217, # (218) Exhibit 218, # (219) Exhibit 219, # (220) Exhibit 220, # (221) Exhibit 221, # (222) Exhibit 222, # (223) Exhibit 223, # (224) Exhibit 224, # (225) Exhibit 225, # (226) Exhibit 226, # (227) Exhibit 227, # (228) Exhibit 228, # (229) Exhibit 229, # (230) Exhibit 230, # (231) Exhibit 231, # (232) Exhibit 232, # (233) Exhibit 233, # (234) Exhibit 234, # (235) Exhibit 235, # (236) Exhibit 236, # (237) Exhibit 237, # (238) Exhibit 238, # (239) Exhibit 239, # (240) Exhibit 240, # (241) Exhibit 241, # (242) Exhibit 242, # (243) Exhibit 243, # (244) Exhibit 244, # (245) Exhibit 245, # (246) Exhibit 246, # (247) Exhibit 247, # (248) Exhibit 248, # (249) Exhibit 249, # (250) Exhibit 250, # (251) Exhibit 251, # (252) Exhibit 252, # (253) Exhibit 253, # (254) Exhibit 254, # (255) Exhibit 255, # (256) Exhibit 256, # (257) Exhibit 257, # (258) Exhibit 258, # (259) Exhibit 259, # (260) Exhibit 260, # (261) Exhibit 261)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # (262) Unredacted version of Declaration, # (263) Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), # (264) Exhibit 2 (filed under seal), # (265) Exhibit 5 (filed under seal), # (266) Exhibit 6 (filed under seal), # (267) Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), # (268) Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), # (269) Exhibit 9 (filed under seal), # (270) Exhibit 10 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # (271) Exhibit 11 (filed under seal), # (272) Exhibit 12(filed under seal), # (273) Exhibit 13 (filed under seal), # (274) Exhibit 14 (filed under seal), # (275) Exhibit 16 (filed under seal), # (276) Exhibit 17(filed under seal), # (277) Exhibit 18(filed under seal), # (278) Exhibit 19 (filed under seal), # (279) Exhibit 20 (filed under seal), # (280) Exhibit 22 (filed under seal), # (281) Exhibit 23 (filed under seal), # (282) Exhibit 24 (filed under seal), # (283) Exhibit 25(filed under seal), # (284) Exhibit 26 (filed under seal), # (285) Exhibit 28 (filed under seal), # (286) Exhibit 29 (filed under seal), # (287) Exhibit 31 (filed under seal), # (288) Exhibit 32 (filed under seal), # (289) Exhibit 33 (filed under seal), # (290) Exhibit 35 (filed under seal), # (291) Exhibit 36 (filed under seal), # (292) Exhibit 37 (filed under seal), # (293) Exhibit 38(filed under seal), # (294) Exhibit 39 (filed under seal), # (295) Exhibit 40 (filed under seal), # (296) Exhibit 41, # (297) Exhibit 42 (filed under seal), # (298) Exhibit 43 (filed under seal), # (299) Exhibit 44(filed under seal), # (300) Exhibit 45 (filed under seal), # (301) Exhibit 46 (filed under seal), # (302) Exhibit 47 (filed under seal), # (303) Exhibit 48 (filed under seal), # (304) Exhibit 51 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (305) Exhibit 52 (filed under seal), # (306) Exhibit 53 (filed under seal), # (307) Exhibit 54 (filed under seal), # (308) Exhibit 55 (filed under seal), # (309) Exhibit 56 (filed under seal), # (310) Exhibit 57 (filed under seal), # (311) Exhibit 58 (filed under seal), # (312) Exhibit 59 (filed under seal), # (313) Exhibit 60 (filed under seal), # (314) Exhibit 61 (filed under seal), # (315) Exhibit 62 (filed under seal), # (316) Exhibit 63 (filed under seal), # (317) Exhibit 64 (filed under seal), # (318) Exhibit 65 (filed under seal), # (319) Exhibit 66 (filed under seal), # (320) Exhibit 67 (filed under seal), # (321) Exhibit 68 (filed under seal), # (322) Exhibit 69 (filed under seal), # (323) Exhibit 70 (filed under seal), # (324) Exhibit 71 (filed under seal), # (325) Exhibit 72 (filed under seal), # (326) Exhibit 73 (filed under seal), # (327) Exhibit 74 (filed under seal), # (328) Exhibit 75 (filed under seal), # (329) Exhibit 76(filed under seal), # (330) Exhibit 77 (filed under seal), # (331) Exhibit 78 (filed under seal), # (332) Exhibit 79 (filed under seal), # (333) Exhibit 80 (filed under seal), # (334) Exhibit 81 (filed under seal), # (335) Exhibit 82 (filed under seal), # (336) Exhibit 83 (filed under seal), # (337) Exhibit 84 (filed under seal), # (338) Exhibit 85 (filed under seal), # (339) Exhibit 86 (filed under seal), # (340) Exhibit 87 (filed under seal), # (341) Exhibit 88 (filed under seal), # (342) Exhibit 89 (filed under seal), # (343) Exhibit 90 (filed under seal), # (344) Exhibit 91 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (345) Exhibit 92 (filed under seal), # (346) Exhibit 93 (filed under seal), # (347) Exhibit 95 (filed under seal), # (348) Exhibit 96 (filed under seal), # (349) Exhibit 97 (filed under seal), # (350) Exhibit 99 (filed under seal), # (351) Exhibit 100 (filed under seal), # (352) Exhibit 101 (filed under seal), # (353) Exhibit 103 (filed under seal), # (354) Exhibit 104 (filed under seal), # (356) Exhibit 108 (filed under seal), # (357) Exhibit 109 (filed under seal), # (358) Exhibit 110 (filed under seal), # (359) Exhibit 111 (filed under seal), # (360) Exhibit 113 (filed under seal), # (361) Exhibit 114 (filed under seal), # (362) Exhibit 117 (filed under seal), # (363) Exhibit 118 (filed under seal), # (364) Exhibit 119 (filed under seal), # (365) Exhibit 120 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (366) Exhibit 121 (filed under seal), # (367) Exhibit 122 (filed under seal), # (368) Exhibit 124 (filed under seal), # (369) Exhibit 125 (filed under seal), # (370) Exhibit 126 (filed under seal), # (371) Exhibit 127 (filed under seal), # (372) Exhibit 128 (filed under seal), # (373) Exhibit 129 (filed under seal), # (374) Exhibit 130 (filed under seal), # (375) Exhibit 131 (filed under seal), # (376) Exhibit 132 (filed under seal), # (377) Exhibit 134 (filed under seal), # (378) Exhibit 135 (filed under seal), # (379) Exhibit 136 (filed under seal), # (380) Exhibit 137 (filed under seal), # (381) Exhibit 138 (filed under seal), # (382) Exhibit 139 (filed under seal), # (383) Exhibit 140 (filed under seal), # (384) Exhibit 141 (filed under seal), # (385) Exhibit 142 (filed under seal), # (386) Exhibit 144 (filed under seal), # (387) Exhibit 146 (filed under seal), # (388) Exhibit 147 (filed under seal), # (389) Exhibit 151 (filed under seal), # (390) Exhibit 152 (filed under seal), # (391) Exhibit 153 (filed under seal), # (392) Exhibit 158 (filed under seal), # (393) Exhibit 159 (filed under seal), # (394) Exhibit 160 (filed under seal), # (395) Exhibit 161 (filed under seal), # (396) Exhibit 162 (filed under seal), # (397) Exhibit 163 (filed under seal), # (398) Exhibit 169 (filed under seal), # (399) Exhibit 170 (filed under seal), # (400) Exhibit 171 (filed under seal), # (401) Exhibit 172 (filed under seal), # (402) Exhibit 173 (filed under seal), # (403) Exhibit 174 (filed under seal), # (404) Exhibit 175 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (405) Exhibit 176 (filed under seal), # (406) Exhibit 177 (filed under seal), # (407) Exhibit 178 (filed under seal), # (408) Exhibit 179 (filed under seal), # (409) Exhibit 180 (filed under seal), # (410) Exhibit 181 (filed under seal), # (411) Exhibit 182 (filed under seal), # (412) Exhibit 183, # (413) Exhibit 184 (filed under seal), # (414) Exhibit 187 (filed under seal), # (415) Exhibit 188 (filed under seal), # (416) Exhibit 189 (filed under seal), # (417) Exhibit 192 (filed under seal), # (418) Exhibit 194 (filed under seal), # (419) Exhibit 195 (filed under seal), # (420) Exhibit 196 (filed under seal), # (421) Exhibit 197 (filed under seal), # (422) Exhibit 198 (filed under seal), # (423) Exhibit 199 (filed under seal), # (424) Exhibit 200 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (425) Exhibit 202 (filed under seal), # (426) Exhibit 205 (filed under seal), # (427) Exhibit 206 (filed under seal), # (428) Exhibit 207 (filed under seal), # (429) Exhibit 220 (filed under seal), # (430) Exhibit 223 (filed under seal), # (431) Exhibit 224 (filed under seal), # (432) Exhibit 225 (filed under seal), # (433) Exhibit 226 (filed under seal), # (434) Exhibit 227 (filed under seal), # (435) Exhibit 228 (filed under seal), # (436) Exhibit 229 (filed under seal), # (437) Exhibit 230 (filed under seal), # (438) Exhibit 231 (filed under seal), # (439) Exhibit 233 (filed under seal), # (440) Exhibit 234 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (441) Exhibit 236 (filed under seal), # (442) Exhibit 252 (filed under seal), # (443) Exhibit 253, # (444) Exhibit 254 (filed under seal), # (445) Exhibit 255 (filed under seal), # (446) Exhibit 256 (filed under seal), # (447) Exhibit 258 (filed under seal), # (448) Exhibit 259 (filed under seal), # (449) Exhibit 260 (filed under seal), # (450) Exhibit 261 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). Modified to fix docket text on 7/30/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [417] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (1) Unredacted version of Statement of Undisputed Material Facts) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [417] MOTION for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66, # (67) Exhibit 67, # (68) Exhibit 68, # (69) Exhibit 69, # (70) Exhibit 70, # (71) Exhibit 71, # (72) Exhibit 72, # (73) Exhibit 73, # (74) Exhibit 74, # (75) Exhibit 75, # (76) Exhibit 76, # (77) Exhibit 77, # (78) Exhibit 78, # (79) Exhibit 79, # (80) Exhibit 80, # (81) Exhibit 81, # (82) Exhibit 82, # (83) Exhibit 83, # (84) Exhibit 84, # (85) Exhibit 85, # (86) Exhibit 86, # (87) Exhibit 87, # (88) Exhibit 88, # (89) Exhibit 89, # (90) Exhibit 90, # (91) Exhibit 91, # (92) Exhibit 92, # (93) Exhibit 93, # (94) Exhibit 94, # (95) Exhibit 95, # (96) Exhibit 96, # (97) Exhibit 97)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (98) Unredacted version of Declaration) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (99) Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), # (100) Exhibit 3 (filed under seal), # (101) Exhibit 4 (filed under seal), # (102) Exhibit 5 (filed under seal), # (103) Exhibit 6 (filed under seal), # (104) Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), # (105) Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), # (106) Exhibit 9 (filed under seal), # (107) Exhibit 10 (filed under seal), # (108) Exhibit 11 (filed under seal), # (109) Exhibit 12 (filed under seal), # (110) Exhibit 13 (filed under seal), # (111) Exhibit 14 (filed under seal), # (112) Exhibit 15 (filed under seal), # (113) Exhibit 16 (filed under seal), # (114) Exhibit 17 (filed under seal), # (115) Exhibit 18 (filed under seal), # (116) Exhibit 19 (filed under seal), # (117) Exhibit 20 (filed under seal), # (118) Exhibit 21 (filed under seal), # (119) Exhibit 22 (filed under seal), # (120) Exhibit 23 (filed under seal), # (121) Exhibit 24 (filed under seal), # (122) Exhibit 25 (filed under seal), # (123) Exhibit 26 (filed under seal), # (124) Exhibit 27 (filed under seal), # (125) Exhibit 29 (filed under seal), # (126) Exhibit 30 (filed under seal), # (127) Exhibit 40 (filed under seal), # (128) Exhibit 43 (filed under seal), # (129) Exhibit 52 (filed under seal), # (130) Exhibit 53(filed under seal), # (131) Exhibit 54 (filed under seal), # (132) Exhibit 55 (filed under seal), # (133) Exhibit 56 (filed under seal), # (134) Exhibit 57 (filed under seal), # (135) Exhibit 61 (filed under seal), # (136) Exhibit 62 (filed under seal), # (137) Exhibit 63 (filed under seal), # (138) Exhibit 65 (filed under seal), # (139) Exhibit 93 (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 9 replaced on 7/10/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2018: # (140) Updated Redacted Version of Exhibit 31, # (141) Updated Redacted Version of Exhibit 33, # (142) Updated Redacted Version of Exhibit 35, # (143) Updated Redacted Version of Exhibit 37) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 418 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [417] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2018: # (1) Unredacted version of Memorandum in Support) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2018: # (2) Updated Redacted Version) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018, Terminated: 9/28/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Expert Report, # (2) Exhibit Rebuttal Expert Report, # (3) Exhibit Supplemental Report)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # (5) Exhibit A- unredacted version) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Expert Report, # (2) Exhibit Rebuttal Expert Report, # (3) Errata Errata)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # (4) Unredacted version of Declaration of P. Arcidiacono, # (5) Exhibit A- unredacted version, # (6) Exhibit B-unredacted version) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2018: # (7) Updated Redacted Version of Declaration of Peter Arcidiacono, # (8) Updated Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # (9) Updated Redacted Version of Exhibit 2) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # (1) Unredacted version of Statement of Material Facts) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2018: # (2) Updated Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: # (3) Updated(10/3/2018) Revised Redacted Statement) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 413 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [412] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # (1) Unredacted version of Memorandum in Support) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2018: # (2) Updated Redacted Version of Memorandum of Reasons in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) (McDonagh, Christina).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018, Terminated: 9/28/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [410] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/14/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Information Filed in Connection with the Parties' Summary Judgment Motions by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [408] JOINT scheduling motion. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 408 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [406] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Parties are nonetheless encouraged to adhere to the limits set forth in Local Rule 7.1(b)(4) to the extent possible and to limit repetition between the various briefs. Further, given the potential volume of the submissions and the impending trial date, the court further orders as follows: a summary judgment motion shall include a separately filed Statement of Undisputed Facts which details, in numbered paragraphs, the material facts that the moving party contends are undisputed and entitle the movant to judgment as a matter of law. Only those facts which bear on dispositive material issues shall be included in this statement. Oppositions shall include a separate filing of a statement of material facts, responding to each numbered paragraph in the movants Statement of Undisputed Facts, which the respondent contends present genuine issues for trial. The responding party shall also set forth, in separate numbered paragraphs, any additional facts which the respondent contends preclude the entry of summary judgment. Statements of material facts in support of or in opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall include specific references to the parts of the record that support each stated fact. Each stated fact shall cite the source relied upon, including the page of any document or line and page number of any deposition to which reference is made. If both parties are moving for summary judgment, the parties may also submit one joint Statement of Undisputed Facts or include a separate joint submission of facts that are truly undisputed to the extent that that may make sense. In light of the number of pages that are likely to be submitted and the scheduled trial date, the parties are encouraged to work together to find ways in which the information, particularly undisputed facts, can be presented to the court as efficiently as possible. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018, Terminated: 6/11/2018 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Bench Trial set for 10/15/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. As discussed at the hearing held on April 10, 2018 ECF No. [402], the Court orders the following:1. The deadlines for amicus briefing on dispositive motions ECF No. [387] are amended as follows. Amicus briefs in support of a dispositive motion shall be filed by July 30, 2018. Amicus briefs in opposition to a dispositive motion shall be filed by August 30, 2018. 2. Prior to June 15, 2018, the parties shall meet and confer and propose a procedure for the Court to determine whether any dispositive motion briefing and/or exhibits filed under seal should remain sealed.(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Status Conference held on April 10, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 5/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [400] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam K. Mortara & John M. Hughes. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018, Terminated: 4/12/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam K. Mortara and John M. Hughes Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7090675 by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Cert. of Attorney Mortara, # (2) Cert. of Attorney Hughes, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Benjamin C. Caldwell (Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Students, Amici Curiae Regarding Confidential Materials. (Greenbaum, Jon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Confidential Materials. (Lee, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. to [389] Letter/request (non-motion) . (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by United States of Interest in Public Access to Summary Judgment Briefing and Materials (Donnelly, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Leave to file granted on April 6, 2018 Letter/request (non-motion) from Amici Curiae . (Schutz, Sigmund)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [391] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Penley on behalf of New England First Amendment Coalition; Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press; Massachusetts Newspaper Publishers Association; GateHouse Media, LLC (Penley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018, Terminated: 4/6/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae by New England First Amendment Coalition; Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press; Massachusetts Newspaper Publishers Association; GateHouse Media, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Letter Brief)(Schutz, Sigmund)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Sigmund David Schutz on behalf of New England First Amendment Coalition; Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press; Massachusetts Newspaper Publishers Association; GateHouse Media, LLC. (Schutz, Sigmund)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Confidential Materials. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA re: Treatment of Materials Marked Confidential . (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Upon review of the parties' joint status report filed on March 9, 2018 ECF No. [386], the Court orders the following: 1. Dispositive motions shall be filed and briefed in accordance with the operative scheduling order ECF No. [363]. 2. Amicus briefs in support of a dispositive motion shall be filed by July 13, 2018. Amicus briefs in opposition to a dispositive motion shall be filed by August 17, 2018.3. The parties shall meet and confer regarding the treatment of confidential materials to narrow the areas of dispute. The parties shall file letter briefs on the outstanding issues by March 30, 2018, and a hearing is scheduled for April 10, 2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.4. By the agreement of the parties, the Court will bifurcate the issues of liability and remedies. Remedies will be addressed after the disposition of dispositive motions and/or trial on liability. 5. The Court is considering scheduling trial for four weeks beginning the week of January 2, 2019. The parties may address the trial schedule at the hearing on April 10, 2018.(McDonagh, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report on behalf of all parties) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Hearing held on February 7, 2018, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com Redaction Request due 3/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Hearing (Other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing held on 2/7/2018. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt of Defendant's unredacted documents for in camera review, pursuant to [377] Order. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [378] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Motion Hearing on Motion to compel set for 2/7/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Defendant to provide the court with unredacted copies of all documents at issue noting the proposed redactions 7 days prior to hearing.(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [375] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018, Terminated: 1/23/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [371] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018, Terminated: 1/17/2018 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Opposition to SFFA's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld or Redacted by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING [369] Stipulation to extend time to file opposition to motion to compel filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [365] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017, Terminated: 12/22/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Motion to Compel Regarding Harvard's Privilege Log by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 Order on Motion to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [363] Motion to Amend scheduling order (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017, Terminated: 9/22/2017 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend [335] Order on Motion to Amend,,, Scheduling Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court is in receipt of letters from both parties. [ECF Nos. 355, 359]. Despite the fact that discovery had closed and SFFA had used all of its allotted party depositions, the Court allowed one additional deposition to go forward with the understanding that SFFA would bear all of the reasonable associated expenses, including Harvard's attorneys' fees. [ECF No. 351]. SFFA has not presented compelling grounds to reconsider that decision. The estimate provided by Harvard is not unreasonable on its face. SFFA may challenge the reasonableness of the fees and costs after they have accrued or forego the deposition, which again appears to seek information that is marginal, duplicative, and disproportionate.(Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to Aug. 23, 2017 Letter from SFFA . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [357] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017, Terminated: 8/28/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply in Support of its Letter Motion Regarding Summary Sheets by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [353] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017, Terminated: 8/11/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response to SFFA's Letter Motion regarding Summary Sheets by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court is very reluctant to allow SFFA the additional deposition that it now seeks. [ECF No. 344]. The discovery period has ended. Further, the potential deponent clearly qualifies as a party, and SFFA has used all of its allotted party depositions. The testimony sought seems largely duplicative of information already obtained and of marginal utility. The Court would be well within its bounds to decline the request for the above reasons as well as other reasons set forth by Harvard in its opposition [ECF No. 347]. That being said, the Court is equally reluctant to force this case to go forward without a fully developed factual record, particularly where there is only one additional deposition sought and where Harvard arguably should have disclosed the name of the deponent earlier. Out of an abundance of caution and trying to fairly balance the interests of the parties, the Court will allow the deposition to go forward under the following conditions: the deposition will be limited to two (2) hours and will take place at a location and time convenient for the deponent and Harvard, with SFFA to bear all the costs of the deposition, including reasonable attorneys fees and costs incurred by Harvard. See San Francisco Health Plan v. McKesson Corp., 264 F.R.D. 20, 21 (D. Mass. 2010) (ordering party seeking additional depositions to pay associated costs because a balance must be struck between upholding the limitations of the rule and the reasons for those limitations on the one hand and counsel's judgment as to the needs of his or her case on the other). Alternatively, the parties can agree on a different format, including allowing the deponent to respond to written questions. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [349] Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Letter Motion Regarding Summary Sheets (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/7/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Letter Motion Regarding Summary Sheets by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [345] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017, Terminated: 8/3/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply in Support of its August 1, 2017 Request for Judicial Intervention and Relief by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [342] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017, Terminated: 8/2/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response to SFFA's August 1, 2017 Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [340] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 340 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017, Terminated: 8/2/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Request for Judicial Intervention and Relief by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On July 7, 2017, SFFA requested that the Court order certain witness depositions to be taken on a weekend or, alternatively, that those depositions be quashed. [ECF No. 338]. Although the Court strongly urges the parties to work to accommodate witness schedules, the Court will not require that depositions be taken on a weekend over the objection of either party. Further, an unwillingness to take depositions over a weekend does not justify quashing the depositions in their entirety.(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 338 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs (Emergency Request for Judicial Intervention and Relief re: scheduling dispute) . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Fact Discovery to be completed by 8/4/2017, Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2018, Oppositions due by 7/30/2018, Replies due by 8/30/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Order on Motion to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [334] Motion to Amend. In light of the Court's extension of the fact discovery deadline until August 4, 2017 [ECF No. 326], the September 1, 2016 Scheduling Order [ECF No. 180] is amended as follows. Plaintiffs experts shall be designated and the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be disclosed by October 3, 2017. Defendants experts shall be designated and the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be disclosed by December 2, 2017. Plaintiffs rebuttal expert reports shall be disclosed by January 16, 2018. Defendants rebuttal expert reports shall be disclosed by February 26, 2018. All expert discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed by May 1, 2018. All dispositive motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 shall be filed by June 15, 2018. Opposition briefs shall be filed by July 30, 2018. Reply briefs shall be filed by August 30, 2018. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017, Terminated: 6/27/2017 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend September 1, 2016 Amended Scheduling Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [331] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017, Terminated: 6/21/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Letter to the Court regarding June 6, 2017 Discovery Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [327] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017, Terminated: 6/16/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply Letter in support of its Letter Motion regarding Performance Reports by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "...Accordingly, Harvards motion for partial judgment on the pleadings as to Count IV and VI [ECF No. 185] is GRANTED. SO ORDERED."(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 324 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "...Accordingly, Harvards motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction [ECF No. 187] is DENIED. SO ORDERED."(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [322] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response Letter to SFFA's Letter Motion regarding Performance Reports by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered re [320] Stipulation, filed by Boston Public Schools, Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re [307] Order on Motion to Quash,,,,, (Joint Stipulation between SFFA and Boston Latin School re: SFFA's Subpoena for Documents and Testimony) by Boston Public Schools, Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA in response to Harvard's letter of May 23 regarding stay of discovery deadlines. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to the May 19, 2017 Letter [315] from SFFA. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [314] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA requesting stay of discovery deadlines. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017, Terminated: 5/22/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA'S Letter Motion Requesting Production of Performance Reports by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [311] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 311 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017, Terminated: 5/11/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Reply in Support of its Letter Motion Regarding Depositions and Custodians by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Boston Latin's motion to quash SFFA's subpoena to BLS [ECF No. 272] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. BLS will not be required to produce documents or information that were prepared by or shared with Harvard. However, BLS is hereby ordered to produce the following: (1) documents from the Relevant Period prepared by BLS concerning the racial composition of applicants, admitted persons, or enrollees to Harvard, excluding documents that merely aggregate statistical information; (2) all internal communications from the Relevant Period by or among BLS employees or agents regarding Harvard's use of race in the admissions process; (3) any documents from the Relevant Period that describe any alleged discrimination by Harvard against persons of Asian descent in the college admissions process; and (4) all non-privileged communications during the Relevant Period concerning SFFA or this litigation. Furthermore, SFFA may depose a BLS representative. The motion to quash is otherwise granted. This is meant to minimize the burden on non-party BLS, while also ensuring the availability of information and the integrity of the discovery process. (Montes, Mariliz) Modified on 5/9/2017 NEF Regenerated.(Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot [304] Motion to Seal. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. SFFAs motions to quash certain subpoenas [ECF Nos. 255, 260] are DENIED. SFFA failed to meet its burden under Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(d)(3). Because of the broad understanding of what constitutes relevant discovery, it is very unusual for a court to prohibit the taking of a deposition altogether. Green v. Cosby, 152 F. Supp. 3d 31, 35 (D. Mass. 2015), modified on reconsideration on other grounds, 160 F. Supp. 3d 431 (D. Mass. 2016) (quoting E.E.O.C. v. FreudenbergNOK Gen. P'ship, No. 07 Civ. 406, 2009 WL 909571, at *3 (D.N.H. Apr. 3, 2009)). Moreover, at this stage, the Court will not unduly fetter the parties ability to develop a complete factual record. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017, Terminated: 5/5/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Emergency Application by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs Requesting Status Conference This Week to Address Urgent Discovery Matters . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [300] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [299] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017, Terminated: 5/1/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Response Letter to SFFA's April 12, 2017 Letter Motion re Depositions and Custodians by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017, Terminated: 4/28/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [295] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017, Terminated: 4/27/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [272] First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to BLS filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Subpoena to Boston Latin School, # (2) Notice of Subpoena to Thomas Jefferson High School for Science and Technology, # (3) Notice of Subpoena to Stuyvesant High School, # (4) Notice of Subpoena to Monta Vista High School)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [292] Harvard's Assented- Motion to File Under Seal Harvard's Oppositions to SFFA's Motions to Compel (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017, Terminated: 4/19/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Oppositions to SFFA's Motions to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents and Application Files by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in Response to Letter from SFFA (Dkt. 288). (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs Requesting Conference. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [282] Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Letter Motion Regarding Depositions and Custodians. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017, Terminated: 4/11/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Letter Motion Regarding Depositions and Custodians by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [280] Plaintiff's Assented-to Motion to File Under Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [275] Assented-To Motion to Under Seal Two Motions to Compel; granting [278] Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket [272] corrected by detaching memorandum and it's exhibit and re-docketing as a separate docket entry. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of [272] First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to BLS filed by Boston Public Schools. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017, Terminated: 5/9/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to BLS by Boston Public Schools.(Seich, Jennifer) (Main Document 272 replaced on 4/10/2017) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [270] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Document SFFA's Reply in Support of its Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or for a Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [268] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Harvard's Opposition to SFFA's Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [265] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of SFFA's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or for a Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [263] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017, Terminated: 3/29/2017 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Opposition to SFFA's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or For a Protective Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [258] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017, Terminated: 3/21/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Motion for a Protective Order and to Quash Deposition Notices by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [253] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017, Terminated: 3/15/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices or for a Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered granting [251] Motion for Order. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017, Terminated: 3/13/2017 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Order to Produce Applicant Files by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Application Files)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C. Mooney on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Mooney, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Dulberg on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Dulberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [245] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017, Terminated: 2/3/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Seal Letters Regarding Production Of Reviewer Comments by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered [230] Motion for Leave to Participate As Amici Curiae is GRANTED. The students J.F. and M.A. are allowed to participate in this matter as amici curiae alongside the current amici curiae and under the same terms and conditions. [ECF No. 52]. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA regarding discovery matters. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [238] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [236] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016, Terminated: 12/22/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memoranda in Support of SFFA's Two Pending Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [231] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Oppositions to SFFA's Motions to Compel by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016, Terminated: 1/18/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File to Participate as Amici Curiae by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [228] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nicole K. Ochi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016, Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicole Gon Ochi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6410623 by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Exhibit Declaration)(Cregor, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [222] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016, Terminated: 12/5/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Motions to Compel by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to [187] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Redacted) filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: # (1) Sealed Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 219 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: # (6) Exhibit A (sealed)) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to [185] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [213] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [212] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [211] Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016, Terminated: 11/3/2016 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document Reply Memorandum and Exhibit in Support of Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016, Terminated: 11/3/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016, Terminated: 11/3/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [209] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016, Terminated: 11/1/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal SFFA's Unredacted Letter to J. Burroughs and accompanying documents by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [201] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [204] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Redacted) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Redacted), # (2) Exhibit B (Redacted), # (3) Exhibit C (Redacted), # (4) Exhibit D (Redacted), # (5) Exhibit E (Redacated), # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G (Redacted), # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J (Redacted), # (11) Exhibit K (Redacted), # (12) Exhibit L (Redacted), # (13) Exhibit M (Redacted), # (14) Exhibit N (Redacted), # (15) Exhibit O (Redacted), # (16) Exhibit P (Redacted), # (17) Exhibit Q (Redacted), # (18) Exhibit R (Redacted), # (19) Exhibit S (Redacted), # (20) Exhibit T (Redacted), # (21) Exhibit U)(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # (22) Sealed Version: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, # (23) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit A to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (24) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit B to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (25) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit C to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (26) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit D to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (27) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit E to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (28) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit F to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (29) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit G to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (30) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit H to Declaraiton of W. S. Convoy, # (31) Sealed Exhibit I to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (32) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit J to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (33) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit K to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (34) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit L to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (35) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit M to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (36) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit N to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (37) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit O to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (38) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit P to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (39) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit Q to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (40) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit R to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (41) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit S to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (42) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit T to Declaration of W. S. Convoy, # (43) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit U to Declaration of W. S. Convoy) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [187] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Redacted) filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # (1) Sealed MEMORANDUM in Opposition [187] MOTION to Dismiss) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [202] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Redacted))(Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # (2) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit to the Declaration of William S. Consovoy) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [185] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI (Redacted) filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Consovoy, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: # (1) Sealed- Memorandum in Opposition for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (Opposition Memorandums and Supporting Materials) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard regarding document production. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [185] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI filed by M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth. (Culleen, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING [196] Stipulation to Enlarge Time to File an Opposition, filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re [187] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , [185] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI (Stipulation to Enlarge Time to File an Opposition) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Status Conference held on September 6, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 10/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA in Response to Harvard's Letter of September 29, 2016. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard in response to SFFA's letter/request (Dkt. 189). (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [187] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Redacted) filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2016: # (1) (Unredacted) Memorandum in Supp.) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA in response to motions filed by Harvard. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [187] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2016: # (10) Exhibit A (unredacted), # (11) Exhibit B (unredacted), # (12) Exhibit C (unredacted), # (13) Exhibit E (unredcted), # (14) Exhibit F (unredacted), # (15) Exhibit G (unredacted)) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016, Terminated: 6/2/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [185] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016, Terminated: 6/2/2017 motion for judgment on the pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts IV and VI by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Waxman, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [183] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016, Terminated: 9/23/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Supporting Materials in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER on Various Discovery Disputes entered. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 9/6/2016. Colloquy re: pending motion, discovery issues, depositions, confidentiality designations. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2016; Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/20/2017 Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth (Sellstrom, Oren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [177] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel Winik. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016, Terminated: 8/31/2016 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel Winik Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6270154 by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 9/6/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Status Conference to address disputed issues with respect to Harvard's production of various databases.(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Status Conference held on July 20, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 8/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs responding to Harvard's 7.27.16 Letter . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard regarding Scope of Discovery. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 7/20/2016. Colloquy re: discovery. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: Consovoy, Ellsworth, Waxman, Strawbridge, Cregor) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [166] Motion to Seal SFFA's Unredacted Letter to J. Burroughs by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016, Terminated: 7/20/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal SFFA's Unredacted Letter to J. Burroughs by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [164] Motion to Seal. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016, Terminated: 7/19/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal Unredacted Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Cregor on behalf of M. B., K. C., Sarah Cole, Y. D., G. E., A. G., I. G., R. H., J. L., Fadhal Moore, Arjini Kumari Nawal, R. S., Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Keyanna Wigglesworth (Cregor, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [159] Motion to Seal Document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 159 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 7/8/2016 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's letter to Judge Burroughs dated 7.8.16) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [157] Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Unredacted Letter Regarding Implication of Fisher II for this Litigation. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 7/8/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 7/20/2016 03:15 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/17/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Lee on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Lee, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Discovery of SFFA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Yoga Source v. Choudhury, # (2) Exhibit SFFA Articles of Incorporation and Bylaws)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Status Conference held on April 29, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 5/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 4/29/2016. Parties will have two weeks after Fisher to file a letter to the court. Colloquy re: discovery dispute. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: various) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Students for Fair Admissions . (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Ex A, # (2) Exhibit Ex B, # (3) Affidavit Ex C, # (4) Affidavit Ex D, # (5) Affidavit Ex E)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: 4/22/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [148] Motion to Continue Status Conference set for 4/29/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016, Terminated: 4/22/2016 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Status Conference of April 25, 2016 to April 29, 2016 (UNOPPOSED) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard Regarding Discovery of SFFA . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: STAY ORDER entered. ( Status Conference set for 4/25/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.)(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Status Conference held on February 25, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 3/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [141] Motion to Seal Document (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016, Terminated: 3/3/2016 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's Reply to Harvard's February 29, 2016 Letter) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [138] Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal Harvard's February 29, 2016 letter (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016, Terminated: 3/1/2016 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document Feb. 29, 2016 Letter to Court regarding Database Fields by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 2/25/2016. Colloquy re: production of documents, protective order. (Further Status Conference set for 3/30/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.). (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: Park, Caldwell, Strawbridge, Ellsworth, Fox) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard regarding SFFA's February 1, 2016 Letter . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [134] Motion to Seal Document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016, Terminated: 2/10/2016 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's Reply to Harvard's February 5, 2016 Letter) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2016: # (1) Exhibit) (Folan, Karen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Dockets [65], [118] and [124] corrected: documents were replaced by counsel with identical documents, as he noticed the redacted material (from the original documents), was compromised as a result of hidden metadata. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [130] Motion to Seal (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016, Terminated: 2/8/2016 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Response to SFFA's Jan. 27, 2016 Letter by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Status Conference held on January 28, 2016, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com Redaction Request due 2/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [125] Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Document (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016, Terminated: 2/2/2016 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's letter to Judge Burroughs dated 2.1.16) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 124 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs . (Caldwell, Benjamin) (Main Document 124 replaced on 2/9/2016) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: 1/28/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 1/28/2016. Colloquy re: discovery. ( Further Status Conference set for 2/25/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.). (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com.)(Attorneys present: Park, Caldwell, Strawbridge, Waxman, Ellsworth) (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 121 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Harvard In Response to Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA . (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [119] Motion to Seal Document. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 119 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2016 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document (SFFA's Letter to Judge Burroughs) by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc..(Caldwell, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from SFFA to Judge Burroughs . (Caldwell, Benjamin) (Main Document 118 replaced on 2/9/2016) (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 1/4/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA as to [60] Notice of Appeal filed by G. E., K. C., R. S., Keyanna Wigglesworth, Sarah Cole, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Fadhal Moore, M. B., Y. D., Arjini Kumari Nawal, I. G., R. H., A. G., J. L.. Appeal [60] Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Judgment as to [60] Notice of Appeal filed by G. E., K. C., R. S., Keyanna Wigglesworth, Sarah Cole, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Fadhal Moore, M. B., Y. D., Arjini Kumari Nawal, I. G., R. H., A. G., J. L. AFFIRMED. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION of USCA as to [60] Notice of Appeal filed by G. E., K. C., R. S., Keyanna Wigglesworth, Sarah Cole, Itzel Vasquez-Rodriguez, Fadhal Moore, M. B., Y. D., Arjini Kumari Nawal, I. G., R. H., A. G., J. L.. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production (ECF No. 64) is DENIED as MOOT with leave to renew. The issue of whether a sample of alumni interviewers should be identified and/or deposed will be addressed at a status conference to be held shortly following the First Circuit's decision regarding intervention. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Response to Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. re [110] Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, . (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Response to Court Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by President and Fellows of Harvard College Regarding The Proposed Scope Of Discovery During A Stay Pending Resolution Of Fisher II. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered The Proposed Defendant-Intervenors Motion to Stay [ECF No. 90] is ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and Harvards Motion to Stay [ECF No. 58] is also ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth in the accompanying Order. And in light of the Court's ruling, Harvards Emergency Motion for a Protective Order and a Temporary Stay of Depositions [ECF No. 104] is DENIED AS MOOT. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [103] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael H. Park. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket [104] corrected by detaching Memorandum and re-filing it as a separate docket entry. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [105] Opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [104] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [104] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Montes, Mariliz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015, Terminated: 10/9/2015 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Motion, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Ellsworth Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Ellsworth Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Ellsworth Declaration)(Ellsworth, Felicia) Modified on 10/1/2015 (Montes, Mariliz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 508 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?