J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Mario D. Ruiz
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:14-cv-01433

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2019 at 8:24 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default by Judge
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              (In Chambers) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller. Response to Order to Show Cause is due by 11/25/2014. See order for details. (kss)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?