J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Patrick Pablico
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-07013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2021 at 6:09 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None For Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None Writ of Execution - Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Writ of Execution - Issued
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Writ of Execution - Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default by Judge
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                (In Chambers) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller. Response to Order to Show Cause due is by 11/25/2014. See order for details. (kss)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?