AMALGA TECHNOLOGIES INC v. USCIS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01961

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 9:46 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMALGA TECHNOLOGIES INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 242

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dehai Tao +1 734 930 7300 +73 734 734 4930 dehai@dehaitao.com
v.
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 51 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?