Osorio v. Wyndham International, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10901-MEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roger Osorio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald F. Blair +1 508 660 9599 gblairlaw@comcast.net
Space Corey C. Shaw +1 617 367 8325 +7252 725 725 2811 cshawlaw@comcast.net
No Logo Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Wyndham International, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
Space Edward B. McGrath +1 617 439 4758 +1 617 439 4148 mcgrath@burnsandfarrey.com
No Logo Wyndham International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
Space Edward B. McGrath +1 617 439 4758 +1 617 439 4148 mcgrath@burnsandfarrey.com
No Logo Roger Osorio, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Linezk Maduro, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Wyndham International, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
Office Boston
Filed 5/6/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 1/29/2007
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Sealed Document +
Sealed Document.(TRUST) (Howarth, George)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007, Terminated: 1/29/2007 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
    Petition for Approval of Minor Settlement. by Roger Osorio, Wyndham International, Inc., Patriot American Hospitality, Inc..(Howarth, George)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Settlement Conference
      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Morris E. Lasker : Settlement Conference held on 1/29/2007.After speaking with the parties involved, The Court approves the settlement agreement and the Trust (Court Reporter Catherine Handel.) (Howarth, George) Modified on 2/1/2007 (Howarth, George).
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
        Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Motion to Approve of minor settlement. Upon hearing( Telephonic) assertions of Roger Osorio affirming the plaintiff recovery and upon agreement of counsel the petition for approval is granted. (Howarth, George)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Hearing.
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2007 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Senior Judge Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald F. Blair on behalf of Roger Osorio (Howarth, George)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Status Conference
              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Morris E. Lasker : Status Conference held on 9/26/2006.Status of case is reveiwed;The parties will advise the Court regarding whether the case will be referred to mediation. (Court Reporter none.) (Howarth, George)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 9/26/2006 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Senior Judge Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Order on Motion for Modification
                  Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered granting [17] Motion for Modification Scheduling Order (Howarth, George)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Motion to Modify
                    JOINT MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order of June 30, 2004 by Roger Osorio, Wyndham International, Inc., Patriot American Hospitality, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 state court record
                      STATE COURT Record. (Howarth, George)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Order
                        Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered.Motion Granted on Consent re [14] MOTION to Compel filed by Wyndham International, Inc.,, Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., (Howarth, George)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Order
                          Judge Morris E. Lasker : Electronic ORDER entered.Motion granted on Consent re [13] MOTION to Compel filed by Wyndham International, Inc.,, Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., (Howarth, George)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Terminate Motions
                            Motions terminated: [13] MOTION to Compel filed by Wyndham International, Inc.,, Patriot American Hospitality, Inc.,, [14] MOTION to Compel filed by Wyndham International, Inc.,, Patriot American Hospitality, Inc.,. (Howarth, George)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Corey C. Shaw.Stating that pltf will not oppose the deft's motion to compel. (Howarth, George)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Motion to Compel
                                MOTION to Compel by Wyndham International, Inc., Patriot American Hospitality, Inc. c/s. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Roland, Lisa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Motion to Compel
                                  MOTION to Compel by Wyndham International, Inc., Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., c/s. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Roland, Lisa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Linezk Maduro served on 9/16/2004, answer due 10/6/2004. (Howarth, George)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Summons Issued
                                    Third Party Summons Issued as to Linezk Maduro. (Howarth, George)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Order on Motion to Amend
                                      Judge Morris E. Lasker : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [10] Motion to Amend Answer and add counterclaim. (Answer and counterclaim entered on May 14, 2004) (Howarth, George) Modified on 7/8/2004 (Howarth, George).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Roger Osorio, Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Scheduling Conference
                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Morris E. Lasker : Scheduling Conference held on 6/30/2004.Discovery Schedule adopted as proposed. (Court Reporter none.) (Howarth, George)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Roger Osorio.(Howarth, George)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Motion to Amend
                                              ASSENTED TO MOTION to Amend [3] Answer to Complaint. to add Counterclaim by Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Roger Osorio, Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim by Roger Osorio.(Howarth, George)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Answer
                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand,and COUNTERCLAIM against Roger Osorio by Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Third-Party Complaint
                                                      THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Linezk Maduro , filed by Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2004 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8 before Morris E. Lasker. (Howarth, George)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Answer
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Farrey III on behalf of Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc. (Howarth, George)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Notice of Removal
                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc. from Middlesex Superior Court, case number 04-994. $ 150, receipt number 55709, filed by Patriot American Hospitality, Inc., Wyndham International, Inc..(Howarth, George)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?