Kechi Township, et al v. Freightliner
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 12-3134

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 11:53 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 01009339932 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
[10223900] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Gorsuch and Holmes, authoring. Mandate to issue. [12-3118, 12-3134]
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009147792 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
[10119905] Notice of change of address filed by Mr. Alan Epstein for Freightliner, LLC in 12-3118, 12-3134. [12-3118, 12-3134] AE
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009131695 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    [10111316] Case argued by Jennifer Hill for the Appellant / Cross-Appellee; Alan Epstein for the Appellee / Cross-Appellant; and submitted to Judges Gorsuch, Holloway and Holmes. [12-3118, 12-3134]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009090276 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
      [10090563] Oral Argument Acknowledgment Form filed by Freightliner, LLC in 12-3118, 12-3134. Served on 07/12/2013. Manner of Service: email. [12-3118, 12-3134] AE
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009089593 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
        [10090234] Oral Argument Acknowledgment Form filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township in 12-3118, 12-3134. Served on 07/11/2013. Manner of Service: email. [12-3118, 12-3134] JMH
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009088571 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
          [10089732] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held on 09/25/2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom I, at the Byron White United States Courthouse, Denver, CO. Counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms. The calendar acknowledgment form must be completed and filed with the clerk via Electronic Case Filing within 10 days of today's date. [12-3118, 12-3134]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009011929 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
            [10050051] Cross-appeal reply brief filed by Freightliner, LLC in 12-3118, 12-3134. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 03/04/2013. Manner of service: ECF/NDA. [12-3118, 12-3134] AE
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009005095 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
              [10046684] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Appellant's motion to file supplemental appendix is granted. The plaintiffs will have on file with this court on or before February 27, 2013 two copies of a supplemental appendix. One copy will be served on the defendant at the same time. Counsel for the plaintiffs are reminded for future reference that all motions in this circuit require a statement of opposing counsel's position, which this motion lacked. See 10th Cir. R. 27.3(C). Served on 02/20/2013. [12-3118, 12-3134]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009004620 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                [10046454] Motion filed by Appellees Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township in 12-3134 to file supplemental appendix. Served on: 02/19/2013. Manner of service: ECF/NDA. [12-3134, 12-3118] JMH
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 01009003755 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                  [10046007] Third brief on cross-appeal filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township in 12-3134, 12-3118. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 02/15/2013. Manner of service: email. [12-3134, 12-3118] JMH
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008980343 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    [10034261] Order filed by Judges Kelly and Gorsuch granting appellant/cross-appellees' second motion for extension of time to file 3rd xap brief to 02/15/2013 for Kechi Township and Employers Mutual Casualty Company. No further extensions will be granted. Served on 01/09/2013. [12-3118, 12-3134]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008980300 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                      [10034240] Motion filed by Appellants Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township in 12-3118, Appellees Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township in 12-3134 to extend time to file third brief on cross-appeal until 02/15/2013. Served on: 01/09/2013. Manner of service: ECF/NDA. [12-3118, 12-3134] JMH
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008958387 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                        [10023098] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' motion for 30-day extension of time to file 3rd xap brief. Third brief on cross-appeal now due 01/16/2013 by Kechi Township and Employers Mutual Casualty Company. No further extension on the clerk's authority. Served on 11/28/2012. [12-3118, 12-3134]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008958199 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                          [10022953] Motion filed by Appellants Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township in 12-3118, Appellees Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township in 12-3134 to extend time to file third brief on cross-appeal until 01/17/2013. Served on: 11/28/2012. Manner of service: ECF/NDA. [12-3118, 12-3134] JMH
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 01008949322 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                            [10018511] Second brief on cross-appeal filed by Freightliner, LLC in 12-3118, 12-3134. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 11/13/2012. Manner of service: ECF/NDA. Oral argument requested? Yes. [12-3118, 12-3134] AE
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008930424 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                              [10009485] First brief on cross-appeal filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township. 7 copies. Served on: 10/09/2012. Manner of service: U.S. Mail. Oral argument requested? y. Second cross-appeal brief due 11/13/2012 by Freightliner, LLC. [12-3134]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008903357 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                [9996078] Cross-appeal schedule set. Issued on 08/27/2012. First brief on cross-appeal and appendix due on 10/09/2012 for Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township. [12-3118, 12-3134]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008903342 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                  [9996072] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/27/2012. [12-3118, 12-3134]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008903087 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                    [9995927] Transcript order form filed by Cindy Schwemmer indicating that the jury trial transcript has been filed in district court. Notice due that record is complete by 09/21/2012 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSwi), Clerk of Court [12-3118, 12-3134]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008903080 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                      [9995923] Notice filed that the transcript was filed by Cindy Schwemmer (Daubert hearing of 01/04/12) in district court on 08/25/2012. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. [12-3134]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008897396 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                        [9993032] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Transcripts not filed. Directing that transcript be filed by 08/27/2012 for Cindy Schwemmer. [12-3118, 12-3134]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008860489 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                          [9974765] Transcript order form filed by Cindy Schwemmer and Mr. Kenneth R. Lang for Freightliner, LLC Transcript due 08/13/2012 for Cindy Schwemmer. [12-3134]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008859951 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                            [9974490] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Jennifer M. Hill and Mr. Kevin M. McMaster for Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Kechi Township. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/11/2012. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA [12-3134]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008853397 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                              [9971212] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Matthew K. Holcomb and Mr. Kenneth R. Lang for Freightliner, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/30/2012. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA [12-3134]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008853174 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                [9971109] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Alan Epstein for Freightliner, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/30/2012. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. [12-3134]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008853012 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                  [9971035] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Entry of appearance has not been filed. Notice of appearance due on 06/11/2012 for Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Freightliner, LLC and Kechi Township [12-3134]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008851058 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                    [9970129] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Mr. Kenneth R. Lang for Freightliner, LLC in 12-3134. Transcript ordered: Opening Statements held 01/11/12 Trial Proceedings held 01/11/12 to 01/18/12 Instruction Conference held 01/17/12 Jury Instructions held 01/18/12 Closing Arguments held 01/18/12 Daubert Hearing held 01/04/12. Served on: 05/25/2012. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. [12-3134, 12-3118] KRL
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008851044 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                      [9970126] Docketing statement filed by Freightliner, LLC. Served on 05/25/2012. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. [12-3134] --[Edited 11/28/2012 by SLS to remove docket entry from 12-3118.] KRL
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01008843859 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                        [9966583] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/14/2012 Docketing statement due 05/29/2012 for Freightliner, LLC. Transcript order form due 05/29/2012 for Kenneth R. Lang. Notice of appearance due on 05/29/2012 for Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Freightliner, LLC and Kechi Township. [12-3134]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?