Stoute v. Van Meek et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10940-MEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donald Oliver Stoute, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Beatriz E. Van Meek, Defendant
No Logo Bryon Testa, Defendant
No Logo Felix Claxton, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
Officially listed as "State of Massachusetts"
No Logo Steven Kelly, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 5/11/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/20/2007
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Howarth, George)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Amended Complaint
    AMENDED COMPLAINT ainst Felix Claxton, Steven Kelly, State of Massachusetts, Bryon Testa, Beatriz E. Van Meek , filed by Donald Oliver Stoute Jr..(Howarth, George)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Affidavit
      AFFIDAVIT (UNSIGNED) of Donald Oliver Stoute Jr. re [9] Amended Complaint by Donald Oliver Stoute Jr.. (Howarth, George)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Amended Complaint
        AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNSIGNED)******* against Felix Claxton, Steven Kelly, State of Massachusetts, Bryon Testa, Beatriz E. Van Meek , filed by Donald Oliver Stoute Jr..(Howarth, George)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
          Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff is granted an additional thirty-five (35) days from the date of this Order to submit an amended complaint conforming to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 8(a) and setting forth those facts which, if proved, would entitle him to relief, or plaintiff?s complaint will be dismissed without prejudice.(Lanier, Marjorie)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered. The application to proceed without prepayment of fees is: GRANTED. The Clerk shall return the complaint to the undersigned for screening on the merits pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) and summonses shall NOT issue pending completion of screening on the merits.(Lanier, Marjorie)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2004. (Lanier, Marjorie)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 MDL Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                Case transferred in from District of Brooklyn New York; Case Number 04-cv-1749-(CBA)(LB)., filed by Donald Oliver Stoute Jr..(Howarth, George)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 666 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?