Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC v. Bonner County

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00287
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 21, 2019 at 1:38 PM EDT (5.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Anderson & Kreiger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott P. Lewis - PHV +1 617 621 6500 +1 617 621 6600 lewis@andersonkreiger.com
Space David S Mackey +1 617 621 6531

Represented by Givens Pursley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Preston N Carter +1 208 388 1200 +1 208 388 1300 prestoncarter@givenspursley.com
Space Amber N. Dina +1 208 388 1200 amberdina@givenspursley.com
Space Debora Kathleen Kristensen +1 208 388 1200 dkk@givenspursley.com
Space Kelsey Jae Nunez +1 208 388 1205 kelseynunez@givenspursley.com
v.
No Logo Bonner County, Defendant

Represented by bcpros.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D Scott Bauer +1 208 263 6714 sbauer@bcpros.org

Represented by Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Joel Brower +1 949 760 1121 +1 949 720 0182 sbrower@buchalter.com
Space Shawn E Cowles scowles@buchalter.com
Space Paul J Fraidenburgh +1 949 760 1121 +1 949 720 0182 pfraidenburgh@buchalter.com
Space Barbara E Lichman +1 949 224 6292 blichman@buchalter.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (158) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Supplement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Reply (generic)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None USCA Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None USCA Case Number
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bill of Costs
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bond
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Objection to Bill of Costs
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Costs Taxed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Reply (generic)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Response (Generic)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Memorandum/Brief (generic)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None USCA Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None USCA Case Number
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER VACATING the 4/29/2014 jury trial and related filing deadlines contained in 13 Scheduling Order. The case will be RESET, if necessary, after the Court has issued a ruling on the pending motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dmc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 98 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Shawn E Cowles for Bonner County. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Shawn E. Cowles. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1132158.)D Scott Bauer appearing for Defendant Bonner County. Responses due by 4/7/2014 (Bauer, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 96 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney David S Mackey for Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David S. Mackey. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1126485.)Debora K Kristensen appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Responses due by 3/24/2014 (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT ORDER finding as MOOT 29 Motion to Quash based on the notification by counsel that the parties have otherwise resolved this Motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 86 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC Non-Opposition to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice [Dkt. 86-6]. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 92 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Paul J Fraidenburgh for Bonner County. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Paul J. Fraidenburgh. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1100573.)D Scott Bauer appearing for Defendant Bonner County. Responses due by 1/17/2014 (Bauer, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER VACATING referral to United States Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle. This case will no longer be referred to Judge Boyle. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dmc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER denying as moot 74 Motion to Expedite: In light of 75 the parties stipulation regarding amended pleadings, Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite is DENIED as MOOT.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re 86 -6 Bonner County's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice: Plaintiff shall have until Monday, December 30, 2013, in which to file a response to Bonner County's Supplemental Request. Bonner County shall not file a reply brief. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. ((bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 84 Motion to Withdraw: Defendant's 82 Motion to Compel is WITHDRAWN.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 81 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Bonner County.(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bonner County. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Objections to McKeown Affidavit, # 2 Appendix B - Objections to Mileski Affidavit, # 3 Appendix C - Objections to Kristensen Affidavit, # 4 Declaration of Barbara Lichman in Support of Reply, # 5 Exhibits A and B to Declaration of Barbara Lichman, # 6 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, # 7 Exhibit 8 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, # 8 Response to Statement of Material Facts, # 9 Reply to Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Replies due by 12/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Affidavit of John McKeown, # 4 Affidavit of Michael Mileski, # 5 Affidavit of Debora K. Kristensen, # 6 Exhibit 1-2 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 8 Exhibit 4-5 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 9 Exhibit 6-10 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit 11-12 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit 13-14 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 15-16 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 17 Part 1 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit 17 Part 2 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit 17 Part 3 to Kristensen Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit 18-19 to Kristensen Affidavit)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw 82 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Panhandle State Bank's Appraisal Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 12/19/2013 (Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 81 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Replies due by 12/12/2013.(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
WITHDRAWN - MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Panhandle State Bank's Appraisal Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman)(Lichman, Barbara) Modified on 12/16/2013 to reflect withdrawn per Motion 84 and Order docket 88 (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Bifurcate Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County. Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Separate Statement, # 3 Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman, # 4 Exhibits A-F to Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman, # 5 Exhibits G-H to Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman, # 6 Request for Judicial Notice, # 7 RJN Exhibit 1, # 8 RJN Exhibit 2, # 9 RJN Exhibits 3 and 4, # 10 RJN Exhibit 5 Part 1, # 11 RJN Exhibit 5 Part 2, # 12 RJN Exhibit 5 Part 3, # 13 RJN Exhibit 5 Part 4, # 14 RJN Exhibit 5 Part 5, # 15 RJN Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 16 RJN Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 17 RJN Exhibit 6 Part 3, # 18 RJN Exhibit 6 Part 4, # 19 RJN Exhibit 6 Part 5, # 20 RJN Exhibit 6 Part 6, # 21 RJN Exhibit 7)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 77 Amended Complaint by Bonner County.(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Bonner County.(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bonner County, filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Defendants may file an Amended Answer, as previously filed in Docket 59-1, on or before Friday, 10/18/13; Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint, as previously filed in Exhibit A to Docket 73 , on or before Friday, 10/18/13; Defendant is granted leave to file a Second Amended Answer, if any, to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and District of Idaho Local Rules; Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer (Dkt. 59 ) isWITHDRAWN; and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Dkt. 73 ) is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Complaint, 73 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. (Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Debora K Kristensen appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 11/4/2013 (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Debora K Kristensen appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 11/4/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Complaint Defendant Bonner County's Reply to Plaintiff Silverwing At Sandpoint, LLC's Opposition [DKT. 69] to Defendant Bonner County's Motionn for Leave to File Amended Answer [Dkt.59] filed by Bonner County.(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 71 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION incorporating and adopting 53 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 58 Request for Judicial Notice; denying 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Reconsideration re 52 Order, re: Denial of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Replies due by 10/7/2013.(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Complaint filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Replies due by 10/7/2013.(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2013 re 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. (Court Reporter/ESR S. O'Larey.) (so) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Bonner County filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.(Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All pre-trial motions shall be filed on or before November 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: A Telephonic Motion Hearing before Judge Larry M. Boyle is set for 9/11/2013, at 10:00 AM. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the call to the Court at 208-334-9010 once all parties are on the line.. (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 61 Motion to Expedite: A telephonic motion hearing regarding 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time will take place September 11, 2013, at 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amber N. Dina in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Rebuttal Experts)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts, 61 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Rebuttal Experts filed by Bonner County. Replies due by 9/16/2013.(Brower, Steven)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Rebuttal Experts Amber N. Dina appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 9/23/2013 (Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts Amber N. Dina appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 9/23/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit)(Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Complaint Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 9/23/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Answer to Complaint)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration re 52 Order, re: Denial of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 9/23/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Affidavit of Barbara Lichman, # 3 Exhibits to Affidavit of Barbara Lichman)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 53 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff SilverWing at Sandpoint, LLC. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 53 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Bonner County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 - Part 7)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Steven Brower for Bonner County Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Steven Brower. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1052475.)D Scott Bauer appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 9/16/2013 (Bauer, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Bonner County Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2013. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Bonner County, 26 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Bonner County. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/6/2013 before Judge Larry M Boyle. Court Reporter/Transcriber NW Transcripts, LLC, Telephone number 208-989-3455. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed. Redaction Request due 9/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2013.(krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2013 re 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Bonner County. (Court Reporter/ESR Zach Springer.) (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing is set for 8/6/2013 10:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom [TBA] before Judge Larry M. Boyle. (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Appearance by Amber N. Dina, Counsel for Plaintiff and Barbara E. Lichman & Scott Bauer, Counsel for Defendants. Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2013 re 42 MOTION for Protective Order re: Notice of Deposition of John McKeown filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order as stated on the record. The deposition of John McKeown, now scheduled for 6/14/2013 is VACATED and will be rescheduled at the convenience of the Defendant Bonner County during the period of time of 7/22/2013 through 7/31/2013. No other changes to the scheduling order were made for completion of discovery, Motion filing deadline or the date of trial now set for 4/29/2014. (Court Reporter/ESR Sunny Trumbull.) (so)THESE MINUTES SHALL STAND AS THE ORDER OF THE COURT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION for Protective Order re: Notice of Deposition of John McKeown filed by Bonner County. Replies due by 6/27/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Barbara E. Lichman)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 42 MOTION for Protective Order: A Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2013, at 11:00 AM (MDT) before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to the Court, at 208-334-9010, once all parties are on the line.(bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 43 Motion to Expedite: Good cause appearing, Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time(Dkt. 43) is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants shall have until Monday, June 10, 2013, at 5:00 PM (MDT) in which to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. 42). The Court will not consider any reply briefs. A telephonic hearing on that matter will be scheduled separately.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Expedite re: Motion for Protective Order re: Notice of Deposition of John McKeown Amber N. Dina appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 7/1/2013 (Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order re: Notice of Deposition of John McKeown Amber N. Dina appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 7/1/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Affidavit of Debora K. Kristensen in Support of Motion for Protective Order, # 3 Affidavit of Amber N. Dina in Support of Motion for Protective Order)(Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mikel H. Williams: The parties advised the Court on May 3, 2013, that an agreement could not be reached and requested the Court's guidance. Counsel and the Court participated in a conference call on May 8, 2013. After receiving a status report from counsel for both parties, it was decided that further settlement discussions at this point would not be productive. Accordingly, the case will proceed pursuant to the Scheduling Order. (so) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mikel H. Williams: Settlement Conference held on 4/30/2013. Settlement conference adjourned with the agreement of the parties to confer following the County's May 1, 2013 meeting with the FAA in an effort to reach a stipulation to stay the case. The parties are to report back to the Court regarding the status of their negotiations. Time in Court 6 hrs 45 min. (so) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Reply to Opposition to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed by Bonner County.(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 31 Motion for Protective Order: Upon agreement of the parties and their counsel, Defendant's Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED and the deposition scheduled for 4/19/2013 is cancelled. It is further ORDERED that the 30(b)(6) depositions take place on May 22, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. in Boise, Idaho. Defendant shall notify Plaintiff of all 30(b)(6) witnesses by May 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2013 re 31 Expedited MOTION for Protective Order Re: Notice of Deposition of Bonner County filed by Bonner County. (Court Reporter/ESR Sunny Trumbull.) (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 31 Expedited MOTION for Protective Order: The Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 4/18/2013, at 11:00 AM. Counsel for Bonner County shall phone into the Court at 208-334-9010 with all the parties on the line.(bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 31 Expedited MOTION for Protective Order: A telephonic motion hearing is set for 4/19/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Counsel for Defendant Bonner County shall call into the Court at 208-334-9010 once all parties are on the line.(bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 31 Expedited MOTION for Protective Order Re: Notice of Deposition of Bonner County filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Replies due by 5/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit ISO Opposition to Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Affidavit)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 32 Motion to Expedite: Good cause appearing, Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Response is due by Wednesday, April 17, 2013, at noon (MDT). The Court will not consider a Reply.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Expedite /Motion for Order Shortening Time Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 5/9/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
Expedited MOTION for Protective Order Re: Notice of Deposition of Bonner County Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 5/9/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Barbara E. Lichman, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Lichman Declaration)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 26 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC Attachment #2 - Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash Objection to Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises to J-U-B Engineers and Motion to Quash Subpoena to Extent Subpoena Seeks Protected Materials Charles Thomas Arkoosh appearing for Movant J-U-B Engineers, Inc.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 4/29/2013 (Arkoosh, Charles)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Preston N Carter on behalf of Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC (Carter, Preston)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Amber N. Dina on behalf of Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC (Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Request for Judicial Notice filed by Bonner County. (Attachments: # 1 Reply to Opposition re Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Exhibits 4 and 5 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 3, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 4, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 3, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Part 4, # 12 Documents Referenced But Not Attached to Complaint, # 13 Exhibits A through D to Documents Referenced But Not Attached to Complaint)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 4/30/2013 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge Mikel H. Williams. All terms and conditions of the settlement conference order entered on 2/5/2013, docket #17 remain the same.(so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 23 Motion to Continue: Plaintiff has requested to continue the scheduled settlement conference for at least six weeks in order to conduct additional discovery. After considering the request, the Court finds good cause to grant the continuance. Accordingly, 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue is GRANTED. The Settlement Conference currently set for March 7, 2013, and all associated deadlines are VACATED. The 13 Scheduling Order is AMENDED to reflect an April 30, 2013, deadline for participation in a settlement conference. Plaintiff's Counsel shall contact Claire Dwyer in Judge Williams' Chambers, at 208-334-1365, to reschedule.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference Debora K Kristensen appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 3/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. Replies due by 3/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time regarding 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: Good Cause appearing, Defendant Bonner County's is GRANTED: Its Reply Brief is now due by 3/18/2013.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 3/8/2013 (Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Responses due by 2/21/2013. SilverWings responsive pleadings are now due by February 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Debora K Kristensen appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 3/4/2013 (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER, ( Settlement Conference set for 3/7/2013 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge Mikel H. Williams.). Signed by Judge Mikel H. Williams. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Barbara E Lichman appearing for Defendant Bonner County.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 2/11/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Scott P Lewis for Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Scott P. Lewis. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-921225.)Debora K Kristensen appearing for Plaintiff Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC.Motions referred to Larry M. Boyle. Responses due by 9/17/2012 (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER, referred to Judge Mikel H. Williams for for settlement conference. Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2013. Discovery due by 9/20/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 2/6/2013. Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference shall be held by 4/1/2013. Motions due by 10/18/2013. Jury Trial set for 4/29/2014 09:30 AM in Coeur d Alene - District Courtroom before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability will be sent out. (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Bonner County re 1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: # 1 Order of Reassignment)(Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bonner County. (Lichman, Barbara)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle, referred for All Matters. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
LITIGATION ORDER- Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2012 09:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bonner County, Silverwing at Sandpoint, LLC Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/9/2012. (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Barbara E. Lichman. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Barbara E. Lichman. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-891747.)D Scott Bauer appearing for Defendant Bonner County. Responses due by 7/2/2012 (Bauer, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 1st Judicial District, case number CV2012-0840.(Filing fee $350 receipt number0976-891740.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 State Court Complaint, # 3 Summons, # 4 Answer to Complaint, # 5 State Court Service Documents, # 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 7 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 8 Disqualification, # 9 State Court Docket Sheet, # 10 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court to All Adverse Parties)(Bauer, D)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 235 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?