St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company v. Durkin et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10096
District Judge Rya W. Zobel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 3:20 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo St. Paul Fire And Marine Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford R. Carver +1 617 213 7002 +1 617 213 7001 bcarver@hinshawlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Grossbaum +7510 751 751 0842 +2738 273 273 8543 dgrossbaum@hinshawlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ranen S Schechner +7510 751 751 0842 +1 617 213 7001 rschechner@hinshawlaw.com
v.
No Logo Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Thomas P Durkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Connelly +1 617 378 4228 +1 617 345 9020 jconnelly@haslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Conroy +1 617 951 2079 +1 617 951 2125 cconroy@peabodyarnold.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC. (Conroy, Christopher) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. 30 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
      MOTION for Leave to File Eight (8) Additional Interrogatories by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connelly, John) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
        Defendants' Amended ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC.(Connelly, John) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
          Opposition re 24 MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint adding ratification as an affirmative defense (Limited) filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM in Support re 24 MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint adding ratification as an affirmative defense filed by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC. (Connelly, John) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
              MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint adding ratification as an affirmative defense by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A)(Connelly, John) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to July 2008 by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC.(Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Christopher R. Conroy (Conroy, Christopher) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Conroy on behalf of Thomas P Durkin (Conroy, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 3, 2008 to Extend Phase One Discovery Deadline and to Continue December 18, 2007 Status Conference by Thomas P Durkin.(Connelly, John) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John P. Connelly (Connelly, John) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John P. Connelly (Connelly, John) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                          Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 Joint MOTION for Clarification re Scheduling Conference, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 Joint MOTION for Clarification re Scheduling Conference, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 Joint MOTION for Clarification re Scheduling Conference, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Clarification re Scheduling Conference, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.(Schechner, Ranen) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2007 (Johnson, Jay). (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
                                  Initial Disclosure Statement by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC.(Connelly, John) Modified on 5/18/2007 (Johnson, Jay). (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                                    JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.(Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.(Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATE of Compliance pursuant to Local Rule 15.1(b) Local Rule 16 Certificate by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC. (Connelly, John) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                            Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC.(Connelly, John) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas P Durkin served on 2/16/2007, answer due 3/8/2007. (Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Connelly on behalf of Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC (Connelly, John) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC served on 2/8/2007, answer due 2/28/2007. (Schechner, Ranen) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT against St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Carver, Bradford) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                      COMPLAINT against Thomas P Durkin, Durkin & Devries Insurance Agency, LLC , filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(York, Steve) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 380 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?