Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. v. AAR Aircraft Services, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-20560

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 6, 2017 at 11:30 PM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony U. Battista +1 212 490 1900 +1 212 370 4453 abattista@condonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Christensen +1 212 490 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan M. Kwarta +1 212 490 9100 ekwarta@condonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole M. Smith +1 212 490 9100 nsmith@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert C. Owens

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Owens +1 305 245 6813 +1 305 245 6403 bobowens@avlaw.com
v.
No Logo AAR Aircraft Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jose Alfredo Avila +1 305 789 8930
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Murphy +1 214 978 3053 +1 214 965 5976 John.p.murphy@bakermckenzie.com
No Logo Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Whitelaw Middleton +1 904 770 3911 +1 904 770 3917 jwmlawfirm@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana G. Bradford, II +1 904 598 6100 +1 904 598 6203 dgbradford@sgrlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Harvey Cummings +1 904 598 6109 +1 904 598 6227 jcummings@sgrlaw.com
  Entries (241) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 231 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Costs (Cummings, James) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER of Dismissal of USCA, the parties' joint motion to dismiss the appeal with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own fees and costs, is GRANTED as to 229 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., USCA # 16-11536-HH (hh) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER denying as moot 237 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/13/2016. (dkn) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Any Further Filing of Motions to Recover Costs and Fees 236 . All further motions to recover costs and fees are STAYED until resolution of Plaintiff's appeal. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/13/2016. (dkn) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Expedite
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bill of Costs
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 229 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Date received by USCA: 4/5/2016. USCA Case Number: 16-11536-HH. (amb) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING Motion for Bill of Costs 231 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the Motion for Bill of Costs 231 is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley to issue a report and recommendation. Motions referred to Judge Chris M. McAliley Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/7/2016. (dkn) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 231 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Costs by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of James W. Middleton)(Middleton, James) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 229 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice of Appeal of DE 228 and DE 226 by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 226 Order; 228 Final Judgment. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-8622216. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Final Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Owens, Robert) Text Modified on 4/5/2016 (amb). (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    PRETRIAL STIPULATION (JOINT) by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 222 MOTION to Strike 220 Notice of Compliance -Witness from Plaintiff's Trial Witness List filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 3/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Robert Mann's December 1, 2015 Expert Report)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Exhibit List by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC.. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Compliance with Local Rule 16.1(d) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(3) by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Witness List by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC.. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC of Withdrawing Untimeliness Argument (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 190 MOTION in Limine and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 214 Reply to Response to Motion, 215 Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Leslie Biggs, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Aubrey Carter, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Peter Dietz, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 22 from deposition of Paul Hart, # 5 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Mira Kim, # 6 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Marc Kup, # 7 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Phong Lai, # 8 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Ramses Perez, # 9 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 6 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha, # 11 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Daniel Smith, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 5 from deposition of Michael Sundquist, # 13 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Yesso Tekerian, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 35 from deposition of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward) (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Statement of: Rule 56.1 Statement in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 191 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 191 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 189 MOTION Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC's Daubert Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Settlement Agreement filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Buenconsejo Depo, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Sunquist Depo, # 3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Lai Depo, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Smith Depo, # 5 Exhibit E - Email chain in HAL Depo Ex. 35)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 193 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of James Lufrano filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 205 Statement, Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41.HAL Dep. Ex. 108., # 2 Exhibit 42.Excerpts from deposition of Leslie Biggs., # 3 Exhibit 43.HAL Dep. Ex. 30., # 4 Exhibit 44.HAL Dep. Ex. 35., # 5 Exhibit 45.Buenconsejo Dep. Ex. 24., # 6 Exhibit 46.Knoepfel Dep. Ex. 38., # 7 Exhibit 47.Knoepfel Dep. Ex. 39.) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 205 Statement, Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32.HAL Dep. Ex. 77., # 2 Exhibit 33.Excerpts from deposition of Christopher Jessup., # 3 Exhibit 34.Excerpts from deposition of Michael Sundquist, Vol. II., # 4 Exhibit 35.HAL Dep. Ex. 11., # 5 Exhibit 36.Declaration of Michael Sundquist., # 6 Exhibit 37.Declaration of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward., # 7 Exhibit 38.Declaration of Mira Kim., # 8 Exhibit 39.Excerpts from deposition of Aubrey Carter., # 9 Exhibit 40.HAL Dep. Ex. 5.) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sardinha Dep. Ex. 10 (Part I), # 2 Exhibit Sardinha Dep. Ex. 10 (Part II), # 3 Exhibit 29.HAL000311-HAL000313., # 4 Exhibit 30.Excerpts from deposition of Ramses Perez., # 5 Exhibit 31.HAL Dep. Ex. 74.) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 205 Statement, Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17.HAL Dep. Ex. 6., # 2 Exhibit 18.HAL Dep. Ex. 7., # 3 Exhibit 19.HAL Dep. Ex. 8., # 4 Exhibit 20.HAL Dep. Ex. 51., # 5 Exhibit 21.Carter Dep. Ex. 5., # 6 Exhibit 22.Smith Dep. Ex. 18., # 7 Exhibit 23.Excerpts from deposition of Brian Loomer, Vol. I., # 8 Exhibit 24.M0206-M0212., # 9 Exhibit 25.Sardinha Dep. Ex. 8., # 10 Exhibit 26.Perez Dep. Ex. 54., # 11 Exhibit 27.HAL Dep. Ex. 84.) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 205 Statement, Exhibits to Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1.Excerpts from deposition of Marc Kup., # 2 Exhibit 2.HAL Dep. Ex. 92., # 3 Exhibit 3.Excerpts from deposition of Phong Lai., # 4 Exhibit 4.Excerpts from deposition of Mira Kim, # 5 Exhibit 5.Excerpts from deposition of Michael Sundquist, Vol. I., # 6 Exhibit 6.Declaration of Scott Marshall., # 7 Exhibit 7.HAL Dep. Ex. 83., # 8 Exhibit 8.Excerpts from deposition of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, Vol. I., # 9 Exhibit 9.HAL Dep. Ex. 42., # 10 Exhibit 10.Excerpts from deposition of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, Vol. II., # 11 Exhibit 11.Excerpts from deposition of Peter Dietz., # 12 Exhibit 12.Excerpts from deposition of Daniel Smith., # 13 Exhibit 13.HAL Dep. Ex. 81., # 14 Exhibit 14.HAL Dep. Ex. 82., # 15 Exhibit 15.M002006-M002011., # 16 Exhibit 16.HAL Dep. Ex. 56.) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Statement of: Material Facts in Opposition to Mankiewicz' Motion for Summary Judgment by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 204 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Appendix List of Exhibits Referenced in HAL's Statement of Material Facts In Opposition to Mankiewicz' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 191 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 2/1/2016. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 202 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, (filing exhibits 14 - 20 to HAL's Opposition) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 14 Mankiewicz PowerPoint, # 2 Exhibit 15 - Email Chain between HAL and Mankiewicz, # 3 Exhibit 16 Email Chain between Mankiewicz and Boeing, # 4 Exhibit 17 Email within Boeing, # 5 Exhibit 18 Boeing PowerPoint, # 6 Exhibit 19 Excerpts of Depo of Randle Cameron, # 7 Exhibit 20 - Excerpts of Depo of Aubrey Carter) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 189 MOTION Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC's Daubert Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 2/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Steven Chealander, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael Sundquist, # 3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, # 4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Mira Kim, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of HAL expert Scott Marshall, # 6 Exhibit 6 Chealander Report, # 7 Exhibit 7 Excerpts of Depo of Michael Sundquist, # 8 Exhibit DMS 2104, # 9 Exhibit 9 Excerpts of Depo of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of Depo of Mira Kim, # 11 Exhibit 11 Email Chain between HAL and Mankiewicz, # 12 Exhibit 12 Excerpts of Depo of Phong Lai, # 13 Exhibit 13 Excerpts of Depo of Daniel Smith)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 190 MOTION in Limine and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 2/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Chealander Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Chealander Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Sunquist Depo, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of Sunquist Depo, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Carter Depo, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Supplemental Carter Report, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Kim Depo, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Kim Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt of Smith Depo)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 193 Plaintiff's MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of James Lufrano filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 2/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of James Lufrano, # 3 Exhibit 11 from deposition of Michael Sundquist, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 6 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 194 Plaintiff's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Settlement Agreement filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 2/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Brian Loomer, # 3 Exhibit 3 from deposition of Brian Loomer, # 4 Exhibit Transcript of 1/21/15 Hearing before Judge McAliley)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2015 before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley, 1-19 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 11/19/2015 before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley, 1-66 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Statement of: Rule 56.1 by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 195 Reply to Response to Motion,,, (Owens, Robert) Modified Text on 1/11/2016 (ls). (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 171 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Final) filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OO - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Phong Lai, # 2 Exhibit PP - HAL Dep. Ex, 92, # 3 Exhibit QQ - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Peter Dietz, # 4 Exhibit RR - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Daniel Smith, # 5 Exhibit SS - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Brian Loomer, # 6 Exhibit TT - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Christopher Jessup, # 7 Exhibit UU - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Michael Sundquist, # 8 Exhibit VV - Expert Report of L. Scott Marshall, P.E., # 9 Exhibit WW - Excerpts of Deposition Transcript of Michael Sundquist, # 10 Exhibit XX - Expert Report of L. Scott Marshall, P.E., Encl. 1, # 11 Exhibit YY - Maintenance Services Agreement)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Statement of: Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 191 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Michael Sundquist, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 11 from deposition of Michael Sundquist, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Peter Dietz, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 74 and 77 from deposition of Peter Dietz, # 6 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Daniel Smith, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits 18, 19 and 21 from deposition of Daniel Smith Part 1 of 2, # 8 Exhibit Exhibits 18, 19 and 21 from deposition of Daniel Smith Part 2 of 2, # 9 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Phong Lai, # 10 Exhibit Exhibits 81, 82 and 92 from deposition of Phong Lai Part 1 of 2, # 11 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, # 12 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha, # 13 Exhibit Exhibits 6 and 10 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha Part 1 of 2, # 14 Exhibit Exhibits 6 and 10 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha Part 2 of 2, # 15 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Bruce Gamon, # 16 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Mira Kim, # 17 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Leslie Biggs, # 18 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Brian K. Loomer, # 19 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Ramses Perez, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 55 from deposition of Ramses Perez, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 30 from deposition of Jeanne Warren, # 22 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Leon Scott Marshall, P.E., # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 5 from deposition of Aubrey Carter., # 24 Exhibit HALs Answers to Mankiewiczs First Interrogatories)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 12/29/2015 re 174 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Keith Andrew McMinn filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc is hereby DENIED. Evan M. Kwarta Esq. Nicole M. Smith Esq., on behalf of the Pltf. James H. Cummings Esq., Dana G. Bradford II Esq., and James W. Middleton Esq., on behalf of Deft., Mankiewiez Coatings, LLC. Order to follow. (Digital 10:03:59.) (nf) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Statement of: Material Facts in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 185 Response in Opposition to Motion, 171 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Final), 172 Statement,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix in Support of Mankiewicz's Memo in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Rule 56.1 Statement, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Michael Sundquist, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 11 from deposition of Michael Sundquist, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Peter Dietz, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 74 and 77 from deposition of Peter Dietz, # 6 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Daniel Smith, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits 18 and 19 from deposition of Daniel Smith Part 1 of 4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibits 18 and 19 from deposition of Daniel Smith Part 2 of 4, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits 18 and 19 from deposition of Daniel Smith Part 3 of 4, # 10 Exhibit Exhibits 18 and 19 from deposition of Daniel Smith Part 4 of 4, # 11 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Phong Lai, # 12 Exhibit Exhibits 81 and 92 from deposition of Phong Lai Part 1 of 3, # 13 Exhibit Exhibits 81 and 92 from deposition of Phong Lai Part 2 of 3, # 14 Exhibit Exhibits 81 and 92 from deposition of Phong Lai Part 3 of 3, # 15 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 2 from deposition of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, # 17 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha, # 18 Exhibit Exhibits 6 and 10 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha 1 of 4, # 19 Exhibit Exhibits 6 and 10 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha 2 of 4, # 20 Exhibit Exhibits 6 and 10 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha 3 of 4, # 21 Exhibit Exhibits 6 and 10 from deposition of Lorrin Sardinha 4 of 4, # 22 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Marc Kup, # 23 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Brian Loomer, # 24 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Ramses Perez, # 25 Exhibit Exhibits 53 from deposition of Ramses Perez Part 1 of 2, # 26 Exhibit Exhibits 53 from deposition of Ramses Perez Part 2 of 2, # 27 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Mira Kim, # 28 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Leslie Biggs, # 29 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Paul Hart, Jr., # 30 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Aubrey Carter, # 31 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 11 from deposition of Aubrey Carter, # 32 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Randy Cameron, # 33 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Bruce Gamon, # 34 Exhibit Docket entry 71-1 Affidavit of Peter Dietz, # 35 Exhibit Docket entry 174-1 Report of Keith A. McMinn 10/26/15, # 36 Exhibit Docket entry 180-2 Report of Keith A. McMinn 12/15/15, # 37 Exhibit Docket entry 184-2 Report of Robert Mann Jr.)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 171 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Final) filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 1/4/2016. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 171 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Final) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert W. Mann, Jr., # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robert W. Mann, Jr.) (Cummings, James) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting 181 Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Mankiewicz's Response to Hawaiian's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Hawaiian Airlines has until January 8, 2015, to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/21/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 171 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Final) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Keith A. McMinn, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1 of Declaration of Keith A. McMinn, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2 of Declaration of Keith A. McMinn, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 3 of Declaration of Keith A. McMinn, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 4 of Declaration of Keith A. McMinn) (Cummings, James) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part 178 Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC has until December 22, 2015, to respond, and Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. has until December 29, 2015, to reply. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/17/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 174 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Keith Andrew McMinn and to Extend the Time for Filing a Daubert Challenge to His Testimony (DE 174) filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 12/28/2015. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS Order Requiring Response to 174 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Keith Andrew McMinn by 12/16/2015. The Honorable K. Michael Moore shall address the portion of the motion seeking an extension of time to file a Daubert motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 12/11/2015. (rms) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 171 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Final) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Peter Dietz (2/6/2015), # 2 Exhibit B - HAL Dep. Exs. 74 and 77 (Template Purchase and Confirmation Orders), # 3 Exhibit C - HAL Dep. Ex. 5, # 4 Exhibit D - HAL Dep. Ex. 108, # 5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Michael T. Sundquist (1/13/2015), # 6 Exhibit F - Buenconsejo Dep. Ex. 28, # 7 Exhibit Buenconsejo Dep. Ex. 24, # 8 Exhibit H - Knoepfel Dep. Exs. 38 and 39, # 9 Exhibit I - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Phong Lai (2/5/2015), # 10 Exhibit J - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, Vol. II (1/14/2015), # 11 Exhibit K - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, Vol. I (1/13/2015), # 12 Exhibit L - HAL Dep. Ex. 42, # 13 Exhibit M - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Mira Kim (1/15/2015), # 14 Exhibit N - HAL Dep. Exs. 6, 7, 8 and 51, # 15 Exhibit O - HAL Dep. Ex. 49, # 16 Exhibit P - Mankiewicz PowerPoint (2009), # 17 Exhibit Q - HAL Dep. Ex. 56, # 18 Exhibit R - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Jeanne Warren (1/29/2015), # 19 Exhibit S - HAL Dep. Exs. 22 and 35, # 20 Exhibit T - HAL Dep. Ex. 83, # 21 Exhibit U - HAL Dep. Ex. 80, 81 and 82, # 22 Exhibit V - HAL Dep. Exs. 49 and 58, # 23 Exhibit W - HAL Dep. Ex. 57, # 24 Exhibit X - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Daniel C. Smith (2/25/2015), # 25 Exhibit Y - HAL Dep. Ex. 84, # 26 Exhibit Z - HAL000311-313, # 27 Exhibit AA - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Leslie Biggs (2/4/2015), # 28 Exhibit BB - Purchase and Confirmation Orders, # 29 Exhibit CC - HAL Dep. Ex. 101, # 30 Exhibit DD - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Marc Kup (4/30/2015), # 31 Exhibit EE - M002006-M002011, # 32 Exhibit FF - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Ramses Perez (6/5/2015), # 33 Exhibit GG - AAR Dep. Ex. 7, # 34 Exhibit HH - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Brian Loomer, Vol. I (6/3/2015), # 35 Exhibit II - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Michael Sundquist, Vol. II (10/15/2015), # 36 Exhibit JJ - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Paul Hart, Jr. (10/16/2015), # 37 Exhibit KK - HAL Dep. Ex. 22, # 38 Exhibit LL - Excerpts from the Draft Dep. Tr. of Randy Cameron (11/20/2015), # 39 Exhibit MM - HAL032284, # 40 Exhibit NN - Perez Dep. Ex. 54)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley:Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 11/19/2015, Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2015 re 164 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Four Interrogatories filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC, 159 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order as to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions and to Quash Corresponding Notice for Deposition filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC, 160 MOTION for Protective Order regarding Mankiewicz 30(B)(6) Deposition Notices filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. Anthony U. Battista Esq., Nicole M. Smith Esq., Evan M. Kwarta Esq. and Robert C. Owens Esq., for pltf. Dana G. Bradford, II Esq., James H. Cummings Esq., and James W. Middleton Esq. appeared for deft., Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Proposed Order to follow with details. (Digital 10:04:33/11:30:52.) (nf) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to 164 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Four Interrogatories by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Cummings, James) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 164 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Four Interrogatories filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 11/27/2015. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference on 164 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Four Interrogatories, for 11/19/2015 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley. The response to the motion is due at 2:00 p.m. on 11/18/2015. See DE 162 for call-in procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 11/16/2015. (rms) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 160 MOTION for Protective Order regarding Mankiewicz 30(B)(6) Deposition Notices filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Middleton, James) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 160 MOTION for Protective Order regarding Mankiewicz 30(B)(6) Deposition Notices and Requessts for Admissions filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - HAL's 1st Req for Admissions, # 2 Exhibit B - HAL's 2nd Req for Admissions, # 3 Exhibit C- HAL's 3rd Req for Admissions, # 4 Exhibit D - HAL's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, # 5 Exhibit E - Email from Battista to Mank's attorneys)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER. This cause is before the Court on 157 the Motion to Allow Evan M. Kwarta to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Upon consideration of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ordered and adjudged that the 157 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Evan M. Kwarta, Esq., may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mr. Kwarta at ekwarta@condonlaw.com. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/1/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Allow Evan M. Kwarta to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 109027. (ksa) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 9/14/2015 before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley, 1-44 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis, 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing on #146 Motion for discovery expert conference and Order Sequencing Expert Discovery held on 9/15/2015. Anthony U. Battista Esq., and Robert C. Owens Esq., appeared on behalf of the pltf. James W. Middleton Esq., appeared on behalf of the deft., Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC., & James H. Cummings appeared by phone on behalf deft Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Order to follow with details. (Digital 14:33:30.) (nf) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 146 MOTION for Discovery (Expert) Conference and Order Sequencing Expert Discovery filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - HAL's 2d Req for Prod of Docs and Things, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Mank's Response to HAL's 2d Req for Prod, # 3 Exhibit 3 - HAL's 3d Req for Prod of Docs and Things, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Communications between counsel re agreement to produce expert reports in 90 days, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Mank's prior expert witness disclosure)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Removing [125-3] Exhibit C pursuant to 149 Paperless Order. (nc) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on 147 Plaintiff's Motion to Place Under Seal a Certain Exhibit Previously Filed in Support of its Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Spoliation and Sanctions. Upon consideration of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ordered and adjudged that Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file Exhibit C [125-3] under seal and remove it from the public docket. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/25/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerks Notice to Filer re 147 MOTION for Leave to File /Place filed HAL Opposition Exhibit C under seal. ; ERROR - The Filer failed to file a Motion to Seal in the conventional paper format. It is not necessary to refile the document but future sealed filings must be filed in the conventional paper format in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (nc) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Striking 142 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC (Middleton, James) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer Re: 142 Reply to Response to Motion. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ar2) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION For Spoliation and MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Middleton, James) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STRICKEN. REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION For Spoliation and MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Middleton, James) Modified text per DE 145 Notice on 8/14/2015 (ar2). (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Mankiewicz's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 140 . Upon consideration of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion for Extension of Time 140 is GRANTED. Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC has until August 14, 2015, to reply to Plaintiff's response to the Motion for Spoliation of Evidence and Sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/7/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Nicole M. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing 138 . Upon consideration of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 138 is GRANTED. Nicole M. Smith, Esq., may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Ms. Smith at nsmith@condonlaw.com. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/6/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Allow Nicole M. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 105604. (ksa) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Spoliation of Evidence and Sanctions [ 121]. Upon consideration of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits 121 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/31/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing held on 7/21/2015 before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley, 1-21 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis,R.P.R., 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits to Opposition Under Seal filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 121 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits to Opposition Under Seal filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 8/6/2015. (Middleton, James) (Entered: 07/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel , of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DDD, # 2 Exhibit EEE, # 3 Exhibit FFF) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel , of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit YY, # 2 Exhibit ZZ, # 3 Exhibit AAA, # 4 Exhibit BBB, # 5 Exhibit CCC) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel , of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit HH, # 2 Exhibit II, # 3 Exhibit JJ, # 4 Exhibit KK, # 5 Exhibit LL) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel , of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FF, # 2 Exhibit GG) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel Of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Exhibit CC, # 4 Exhibit DD, # 5 Exhibit EE) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel Of FIling Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O, # 2 Exhibit P, # 3 Exhibit Q, # 4 Exhibit R, # 5 Exhibit S, # 6 Exhibit T, # 7 Exhibit X, # 8 Exhibit Y, # 9 Exhibit Z) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit J, # 8 Exhibit K, # 9 Exhibit L, # 10 Exhibit M, # 11 Exhibit N) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion, 124 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant and its counsel of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Owens, Robert) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/25/2015) (nc). Modified by Removing [125-3] Exhibit C pursuant to 149 Paperless Order on 8/25/2015 (nc). (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION For Spoliation and MOTION for Sanctions filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 8/3/2015. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Spoliation of Evidence and Sanctions 121 . Plaintiff seeks leave to file certain exhibits under seal. Defendant opposes such relief -- despite having stipulated to a Protective Order Regarding Protection of Confidential Documents and Information 31 . Accordingly, Defendant is ORDERED to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits by Monday, July 27, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. EST. Plaintiff may file a reply within one (1) day. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/24/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2015 re 109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order (to prohibit inspections of HAL's B767's) filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. Order to follow. Appearances (telephonic): Anthony Battista, Esq; Robert Owens, Esq; James Cummings, Esq; James Middleton, Esq. Order to Follow. (Digital 15:29:43.) (mno) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order (to prohibit inspections of HAL's B767's), 117 Reply to Response to Motion, Filing Supplemental Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Photographs of HAL's aircraft) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order (to prohibit inspections of HAL's B767's) filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Third Request for Production to Plaintiff)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 115 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Plaintiff shall file its reply no later than 5 p.m. July 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/20/2015. (rms) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS Order: The discovery hearing scheduled for 7/21/2015 at 3:30 p.m. on Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order [DE 109], shall take place telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information:Telephone number: 1-888-684-8852, Access code: 9675400, Security code: 5890. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/17/2015. (rms) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Discovery Conference on 109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order for 7/21/2015 at 3:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley, at the C. Clyde Atkins Courthouse, 301 North Miami Avenue, Sixth Floor, Miami, Florida 33128. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/16/2015. (rms) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order (to prohibit inspections of HAL's B767's) filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 7/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Middleton, James) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting 110 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/16/2015. (rms) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant Mankiewicz' Motion for Spoliation and Sanctions 107 . Upon consideration of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time 8 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until July 24, 2015, to respond to Defendant's Motion for Spoliation and Sanctions 106 , and Defendant has until August 7, 2015, to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/26/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon Defendant's Motion for Relief from Order Finding Good Cause to Extend the Discovery Deadline to December 1, 2015, and Continue Trial to March 21, 2016 88 . Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC's motion for reconsideration is governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b), which provides: On motion and just terms, the court may relieve a party or its legal representative from a final judgment, order, or proceeding for the following reasons: (1) mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect; (2) newly discovered evidence that, with reasonably diligence, could not have been discovered in time to move for new trial under Rule 59(b); (3) fraud (whether previously called intrinsic or extrinsic), misrepresentation, or misconduct by an opposing party; (4) the judgment is void; (5) the judgment has been satisfied, released or discharged; it is based on an earlier judgment that has been reversed or vacated; or applying it prospectively is no longer equitable; or (6) any other reason that justifies relief. To prevail on a motion for reconsideration, a party generally must present at least one of three major grounds which justify reconsideration: (1) an intervening change in controlling law; (2) the availability of new evidence; and (3) the need to correct clear error or prevent manifest injustice. Burger King Corp. v. Ashland Equities, Inc., 181 F. Supp. 2d 1366, 1369 (S.D. Fla.2002) (citation omitted); see also Arthur v. King, 500 F.3d 1335, 1343 (11th Cir. 2007). The moving party must set forth facts or law of a strongly convincing nature to induce the court to reverse its prior decision. A motion for reconsideration should not be used to reiterate arguments previously made. It is an improper use of the motion to reconsider to ask the Court to rethink what the Court already thought throughrightly or wrongly. Z.K. Marine Inc. v. M/V Archigetis, 808 F.Supp. 1561, 1563 (S.D. Fla.1992) (citations omitted). The decision whether to grant or deny a motion to reconsider is within the courts discretion. See Am. Home Assurance Co. v. Glenn Estess & Assoc., 763 F.2d 1237, 123839 (11th Cir. 1985). Defendant Mankiewicz claims that the Court erred in granting Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Amend the Expert Discovery and Mediation Schedule 43 . In support, however, Mankiewicz reasserts essentially the same arguments it advanced in its opposition to Hawaiian's motion, failing to offer facts or law of a sufficiently convincing nature to induce the Court to reverse its prior decision. Accordingly, upon consideration of the Motion 88 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant's Motion for Relief from Order Finding Good Cause to Extend the Discovery Deadline to December 1, 2015, and Continue Trial to March 21, 2016 88 is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Parties shall conduct mediation in accordance with this Court's April, 3, 2015, Order 84 . Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/3/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to 103 Reply to Response to Motion, by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Vacate Order Finding Good Cause To Extend The Discovery Deadline To December 1, 2015 And Continue The Trial To March 21, 2016 filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Middleton, James) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 90 Motion to Compel, pursuant to Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal [DE 101]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/11/2015. (rms) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 90 MOTION to Compel Former Defendant AAR Corporate Representative Deposition (Middleton, James) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS Order Cancelling Discovery Conference set for May 8, 2015, pursuant to Defendant's notice that it will be withdrawing it's motion to compel [DE 90]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/7/2015. (rms) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 90 MOTION to Compel Former Defendant AAR Corporate Representative Deposition filed by AAR Aircraft Services, Inc.. Attorney Jose Alfredo Avila added to party AAR Aircraft Services, Inc.(pty:dft). Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Avila, Jose) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 90 MOTION to Compel Former Defendant AAR Corporate Representative Deposition filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email Chain)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.s Motion And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law To File Under Seal Certain Exhibits From Its Opposition To Defendants Motion For Relief From Order Finding Good Cause To Extend The Discovery Deadline 94 . The Motion is unopposed. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion 94 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 94 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file the exhibits under seal. The exhibits shall remain under seal until the completion of this action. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/4/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 93 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Filing Certain Exhibits (less those to be filed under seal) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - HAL Dep. Ex. 48, # 2 Exhibit D - Hawaiians First Request for Production of Documents, # 3 Exhibit E - Dep. Tr. of Leslie Biggs, # 4 Exhibit F - Dep. Tr. of Phong Lai, # 5 Exhibit G - April 1, 2015 Hearing Transcript, # 6 Exhibit P - Notice of Service of Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports, # 7 Exhibit R - Dep. Tr. of Yesso Tekerian, # 8 Exhibit U - HAL Dep. Ex. 59, # 9 Exhibit W - Letter from Mankiewicz to Hawaiian (9/12/2014), # 10 Exhibit X - Email between Hawaiian and Boeing, # 11 Exhibit Y - Email between Hawaiian, Mankiewicz, and Boeing, # 12 Exhibit CC - HAL000001-HAL000002, # 13 Exhibit FF - Dep. Tr. of Daniel Smith) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION to Vacate Order Finding Good Cause To Extend The Discovery Deadline To December 1, 2015 And Continue The Trial To March 21, 2016 filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 5/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Exhibits to Motion (exhibits filed separately))(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 91 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Middleton, James) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to 88 MOTION to Vacate Order Finding Good Cause To Extend The Discovery Deadline To December 1, 2015 And Continue The Trial To March 21, 2016 by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Middleton, James) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Discovery Hearing held on 4/1/2015, Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2015 re 52 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Wet Paint Samples from Defendant, Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Order to follow. (Digital 15:30:52.) (nf) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Expert Discovery Deadline and Mediation Schedule 43 . On April 3, 2015, this Court granted in part and denied in part Plaintiff's motion to extend the discovery deadline to December 1, 2015. See ECF No. 82 . Accordingly, pursuant to this Court's April 3, 2015, Paperless Order Rescheduling Trial in Miami 82 , all pending motions are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. The Parties are free to re-file these motions in accordance with the schedule set forth in the Court's April 3, 2015, Order 82 . Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/6/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trial having been set in this matter for 9:00 a.m. on March 21, 2016, pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. A place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties shall be established. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/3/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER RESCHEDULING TRIAL IN MIAMI. This case is now set for trial commencing the two week trial period of March 21, 2016, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 13-1, (thirteenth floor) United States Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on March 17, 2016, at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for March 8, 2016, at 11 a.m. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/3/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Expert Discovery Deadline and Mediation Schedule 43 . Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. moves this Court for an order (1) extending the discovery deadline to December 1, 2015, in order to allow its corrosion/metallurgical experts to complete a multi-phase test protocol on representative samples of Defendant Mankiewicz Coating, LLCs paint products; and 2) compelling the parties to conduct the Court-ordered mediation before the parties begin expert discovery. See ECF No. 43 . Plaintiff maintains that to properly conduct and complete a corrosion investigation and testing program could take up to eleven (11) months from the time Mankiewicz provides a sufficient supply of paint to be tested and analyzed. ECF No. 43 . Defendant, however, argues that Plaintiffs request for an extension of the discovery deadline should be denied because Plaintiff has not been diligent in conducing expert discovery. See ECF No. 45 . In particular, Defendant claims that Plaintiff has failed to adequately investigate the causes of the corrosion to its aircraft prior to filing suit, and then failed to timely retain necessary expert assistance, or otherwise conduct expert discovery even after filing suit. ECF No. 45 . Alternatively, Defendant requests that the Court order the Parties to conduct a new scheduling conference and submit a fully revised scheduling report providing addition time for discovery and amendment to the pleadings. ECF No. 45 .Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b) requires a court to enter a scheduling order dictating the time within which the parties must meet certain pretrial deadlines. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(3). The scheduling order may also include a date for trial. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(3)(B). The scheduling order may be modified only for good cause and with the judges consent. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see also S.D. Fla. L. R. 7.6. To establish good cause, the movant has the burden of proving that the scheduling deadline could not have been met despite the movants diligent efforts to do so. John Morrell & Co. v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., 243 F.R.D. 699, 701 (S.D. Fla. 2007) (Altonaga, J.); see also Sosa v. Airprint Sys. Inc., 133 F.3d 1417, 1419 (11th Cir. 1998). The Court finds that Plaintiff was reasonably diligent in conducting discovery. According to Plaintiff, it was not until December 2, 2014, and January 13-15, 2015, when Boeing produced documents and three employees for deposition testimony pursuant to a non-party subpoena, that Plaintiff acquired critical information necessary to conduct expert testing of Defendants paint system. See ECF No. 46 . Within weeks of obtaining this information, and before the expiration of the discovery deadline, Plaintiff retained the necessary experts and moved to amend the discovery deadline. ECF No. 46 . While Plaintiffs Motion 43 comes about a month before the expiration of the discovery deadline, Plaintiff asserts that prior to receiving the Boeing documents and employee testimony, it did not have essential data to conduct expert testing. See ECF No. 43 (Hawaiian cannot be expected to begin scientific testing without having essential data for [Defendants] paint system.) Even today, Plaintiff maintains, Hawaiian cannot begin its expert testing because Mankiewicz refuses to provide paint samples. ECF No. 46 . On April 2, 2015, however, United States Magistrate Judge Chris McAliley ordered Defendant to turn over these paint samples. See ECF No. 80 . Presumably, then, Plaintiff is now (or soon will be) in a position to begin expert testing of Defendant's paint system. Notably, the Parties do not dispute the relevance of this testing to Plaintiff's claim. Under these circumstances, the Court finds good cause to extend the discovery deadline to December 1, 2015. Going forward, however, this Court will not entertain any motions for extensions of time absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion 43 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Expert Discovery Deadline and Mediation Schedule 43 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: (1) the deadline to complete discovery is extended to December 1, 2015; and (2) Plaintiffs request that the Court compel the Parties to mediate before the beginning of expert discovery is DENIED AS MOOT, as the Parties conducted the Court-ordered mediation on March 11, 2015, see ECF No. 55 . It is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants request for a new scheduling conference and a revised scheduling report providing additional time for discovery and amendment to the pleadings 45 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Briefing 79 pending the Court's adjudication of its Motion to Amend the Expert Discovery Deadline 43 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court will enter a separate Paperless Order Rescheduling Trial in Miami. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/3/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of discovery hearing held on 4-1-2015 before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley, 1-61 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Whitmarsh, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Whitmarsh@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2015. (dwh) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 77 Response to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Cummings, James) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 52 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Wet Paint Samples from Defendant, Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 4/9/2015. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX to 74 MOTION in Limine and/or Daubert to Exclude by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Buneconsejo Dep Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 2. Sardinha Dep Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 3. Sardinha Dep Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 4. Dietz Dep Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 5. Biggs Dep Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 6. Smith Dep Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit Part 1 - 7. Smith Dep Exhibits, # 8 Exhibit Part 2 - 7. Smith Dep Exhibits, # 9 Exhibit Part 3 - 7. Smith Dep Exhibits, # 10 Exhibit Part 1 - 8. Sundquist Dep Excerpts, # 11 Exhibit Part 2 - 8. Sundquist Dep Excerpts, # 12 Exhibit Part 3 - 8. Sundquist Dep Excerpts, # 13 Exhibit 9. Sundquist Dep Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit Part 1 - 10. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 15 Exhibit Part 2 - 10. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 16 Exhibit Part 3 - 10. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 17 Exhibit Part 4 - 10. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 18 Exhibit Part 1 - 11. Kim Dep Excerpts, # 19 Exhibit Part 2 - 11. Kim Dep Excerpts, # 20 Exhibit Part 1 - 12. Woodward Dep Excerpt, # 21 Exhibit Part 2 - 12. Woodward Dep Excerpt, # 22 Exhibit 13. Woodward Dep Exhibit)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX to 72 Statement, 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Sundquist Dep Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 2. Sundquist Dep Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit 3. Dietz Dep Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 4. Dietz Dep Exhibits, # 5 Exhibit 5. Smith Dep Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit Part 1 - 6. Smith Dep Exhibits, # 7 Exhibit Part 2 - 6. Smith Dep Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit Part 3 - 6. Smith Depo Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit 7. Lai Dep Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit Part 1 - 8. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 11 Exhibit Part 2 - 8. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 12 Exhibit Part 3 - 8. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 13 Exhibit Part 4 - 8. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 14 Exhibit Part 5 - 8. Lai Dep Exhibits, # 15 Exhibit 9. Woodward Dep Excerpts, # 16 Exhibit 10. Sardinha Dep Excerpts, # 17 Exhibit Part 1 - 11. Sardinha Dep Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit Part 2 - 11. Sardinha Dep Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit Part 3 - 11. Sardinha Dep Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit 12. Buneconsejo Dep Excerpts, # 21 Exhibit 13. Kim Dep Excerpts)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of: Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Peter Dietz)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 58 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DD - Expert Report of L. Scott Marshall, P.E., Part 2) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 58 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DD - Expert Report of L. Scott Marshall, P.E., Part 1) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Leslie Biggs, # 2 Exhibit BB - Purchase and Confirmation Orders, # 3 Exhibit CC - HAL Dep. Ex. 101) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Y - HAL Dep. Ex. 84, # 2 Exhibit Z - HAL000311-313) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U - HAL Dep. Ex. 83, # 2 Exhibit V - HAL Dep. Exs. 49 and 58, # 3 Exhibit W - HAL Dep. Ex. 57, # 4 Exhibit X - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Daniel C. Smith) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S - HAL Dep. Exs. 22 and 35, # 2 Exhibit T - HAL Dep. Ex. 83) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P - Mankiewicz PowerPoint (March 2009), # 2 Exhibit Q - HAL Dep. Ex. 56, # 3 Exhibit R - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Jeanne Warren) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N - HAL Dep. Exs. 6, 7, 8 and 51, # 2 Exhibit O - HAL Dep. Ex. 49) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Phong Lai, # 2 Exhibit J - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, Vol. II, # 3 Exhibit K - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Mary Ann Forrest-Woodward, Vol. I, # 4 Exhibit L - HAL Dep. Ex. 42, # 5 Exhibit M - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Mira Kim) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F - Buenconsejo Dep. Ex. 28, # 2 Exhibit G - Buenconsejo Dep. Ex. 24, # 3 Exhibit H - Knoepfel Dep. Exs. 38 and 39) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 59 Statement Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Peter Dietz, # 2 Exhibit B - HAL Dep. Exs. 74 and 77 (Template Purchase and Confirmation Orders), # 3 Exhibit C - HAL Dep. Ex. 5, # 4 Exhibit D - HAL Dep. Ex. 108, # 5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from the Dep. Tr. of Michael T. Sundquist) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 58 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Joseph Farina. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Farina, Joseph) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC re 53 Order to Show Cause,,, Joint Response to Paperless Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 53) (Cummings, James) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Amend the Expert Discovery and Mediation Schedule 43 . Plaintiff moves this Court for (1) an Order extending the deadline for expert discovery until December 1, 2015; and (2) an Order compelling the parties to conduct Court-ordered mediation before the Parties begin expert discovery. See ECF No. 43 . In its Opposition 45 to Plaintiff's Motion, however, Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC states that mediation was scheduled for March 11, 2015. See ECF No. 45 . The Parties are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by March 20, 2015, as to whether the mediation was conducted on March 11, 2015, and if not, when mediation will be conducted. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/19/2015. (mg00) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. re 48 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order with Certificate of Emergency (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected with Mankiewicz's and HAL's Notices of Deposition and Subpoenas) (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerks Notice to Filer Re: 48 Emergency Motion for a Protective Order. Emergency Document Filed Electronically; ERROR - Emergency matters may not be filed electronically, they must be filed in the conventional paper format in the division where the judge is chambered. The Clerk contacted Chambers and corrected the docket text to indicate the document is an emergency matter. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules. (ar2) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Depo of Mira Kim, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Depo of, # 3 Exhibit C - Hawaiian's First Request for Production To Mankiewicz)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Expert Discovery and other Pre-trial and Trial Deadlines filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Depo of Daniel Crane Smith, # 2 Exhibit B - Hawaiian's 2d Requst for Production and Mankiewicz's Responses, # 3 Exhibit C - - Excerpts of Depo of Mira Kim, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Depo of Phong Lai, # 5 Exhibit E - Excerpts of Depo of Michael T. Sunquist)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Expert Discovery and other Pre-trial and Trial Deadlines filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 3/2/2015. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Replies due by 3/2/2015. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings 40 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 40 is GRANTED. John M. Murphy may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to john.murphy@bakermckenzie.com.. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/5/2015. (dht) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Consent to Designation for John M. Murphy. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 93814. (ksa) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2015 re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. filed by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC is hereby GRANTED. Telephonic app., by Anthony U. Battista Esq., appeared on behalf of the pltf., Robert C. Owens Esq., appeared on behalf of the pltf. James H. Cummings Esq., appeared on behalf of deft. Telephonic appearance by Dana G. Bradford, II Esq., and James Middleton Esq. Order to follow. (Digital 15:32:40.) (nf) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal 35 , which is unopposed. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 35 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file the Settlement Agreement with the Clerk of Court under seal on or before December 26, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/23/2014. (dht) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File the Settlement Agreement Under Seal (ra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2014: SEALED # 1 Attachments) (ra). Modified on 12/22/2014 (ra). (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Replies due by 12/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Email Chain, # 2 Exhibit B - Redacted Settlment Agreement (soon to be filed under seal), # 3 Exhibit C - Email chain)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC (Cummings, James) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc..(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Joseph P. Farina selected.(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for 9:00 A.M. on June 15, 2015, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 and Southern District Local Rule 16.2, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators, which designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. A place, date and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties shall be established. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may move the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The appearance of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of these summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by the filing of a notice of settlement signed by counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Mediation Deadline 3/27/2015. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/2/2014. (dht) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN MIAMI. This case is now set for trial commencing the two week trial period of June 15, 2015, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 13-1, (thirteenth floor) United States Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on June 11, 2015, at 2 p.m. at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for June 2, 2015, at 11 a.m. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. All discovery shall be completed one-hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2015 11:00 AM before Judge K. Michael Moore. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2015 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge K. Michael Moore. Calendar Call set for 6/11/2015 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge K. Michael Moore. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/2/2014. (dht) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dana Gibson Bradford, II on behalf of Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Attorney Dana Gibson Bradford, II added to party Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC(pty:dft). (Bradford, Dana) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 18 as to Defendant AAR Aircraft Services, Inc. only. UPON CONSIDERATION of the Notice, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the claims against Defendant AAR Aircraft Services, Inc. only are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The claims against Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC are not affected by this Order. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/22/2014. (dht) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (Cummings, James) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant AAR Aircraft Services, Inc., Only by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 16 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 16 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC may file its Response to the Complaint on or before May 21, 2014. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/15/2014. (dht) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint by Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. Attorney James Harvey Cummings added to party Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cummings, James) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings 12 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 12 is GRANTED. Anthony U. Battista, Esq. may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to abattista@condonlaw.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/5/2014. (dht) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings 11 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 11 is GRANTED. Christopher R. Christensen, Esq. may appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to cchristensen@condonlaw.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/5/2014. (dht) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference, to File Joint Scheduling Report, and for Defendants to Answer the Complaint 10 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 10 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (1) The Parties are instructed to hold a joint scheduling conference on or before May 23, 2014. (2) The Parties are further instructed to file their Joint Scheduling Report on or before May 30, 2014. (3) Defendant AAR may respond to the Complaint on or before May 30, 2014. (4) Defendant Mankiewicz Coatings' response deadline is NOT EXTENDED and remains May 16, 2014. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/2/2014. (dht) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Allow Anthony U. Battista to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 78562. (ksa) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Allow Christopher R. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 78563. (ksa) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time OF TIME TO HOLD SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, TO FILE JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT, AND FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Responses due by 5/19/2014 (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference 8 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 8 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Parties are instructed to hold a joint scheduling conference on or before April 25, 2014. The Parties are further instructed to file their Joint Scheduling Report on or before May 5, 2014. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/15/2014. (dht) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference re 4 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,, by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Responses due by 4/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2013-63 to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres no longer assigned to case. (vp) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to AAR Aircraft Services, Inc. and Mankiewicz Coatings, LLC. (ar2) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE EDWIN G. TORRES. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/18/2014. (nhl) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 120 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of or a description by category and location of all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and / or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.M. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 2/18/2014. (nhl) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. for Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. (Owens, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore (ar2) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6488300, filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Owens, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 236 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?