Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF MERGED MAGISTRATE CASE as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga; All future filings related to Juan Antonio Lizarraga must be e-filed in criminal case 14CR1594-CAB. (no document attached) (aje) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s), re 9 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1: Preliminary Hearing set for 05/22/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is vacated. (no document attached) (mkz) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER OF DETENTION ON DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF BAIL PENDING TRIAL as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/14/14. (dls) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(McFadden, Gerald)(dlg). (Entered: 05/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Detention Hearing as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga not held on 5/13/2014. Defendant stipulates to detention pending trial without prejudice. The Court finds the 5 Motion to Detain as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga moot. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA. (CD# 5/13/2014 MDD:1:45-1:48). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Artemis Spryridonidis, S/A for Gerald McFadden, CJA). (no document attached) (mkz) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (tkl) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Oral MOTION to Detain (flight) by USA as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga held on 5/9/2014. Attorney Gerald T McFadden (n/a) appointed for Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Financial Affidavit filed. Bond set as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (1) No Bail. Detention Hearing (flight) set for 5/13/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Preliminary Hearing set for 05/22/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Arraignment set for 06/05/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 5/9/2014 MDD 14:2:39-3:09). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Morgan Stewart, FD-S/A). (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (n/a) held on 5/8/2014. Initial Appearance continued to 5/9/2014 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Defendant's Rule 5 objection denied without prejudice. (CD# 5/8/2014 MDD 14:3:14-3:15). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Rory McHale, FD-S/A). (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga: Initial Appearance set for 5/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
COMPLAINT as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (Attachments: # 1 Info Sheet)(mtb) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |