USA v. Lizarraga

Federal Court Proceeding California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:14-mj-01656
Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 6:49 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Juan Antonio Lizarraga, Defendant (1)

Represented by Galvin & Mlawski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Gerald T McFadden +1 619 338 0507 +1 619 239 5872 gtmcfadden@hotmail.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MERGED MAGISTRATE CASE as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga; All future filings related to Juan Antonio Lizarraga must be e-filed in criminal case 14CR1594-CAB. (no document attached) (aje) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s), re 9 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1: Preliminary Hearing set for 05/22/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is vacated. (no document attached) (mkz) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION ON DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF BAIL PENDING TRIAL as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/14/14. (dls) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(McFadden, Gerald)(dlg). (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Detention Hearing as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga not held on 5/13/2014. Defendant stipulates to detention pending trial without prejudice. The Court finds the 5 Motion to Detain as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga moot. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA. (CD# 5/13/2014 MDD:1:45-1:48). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Artemis Spryridonidis, S/A for Gerald McFadden, CJA). (no document attached) (mkz) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (tkl) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
Oral MOTION to Detain (flight) by USA as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga held on 5/9/2014. Attorney Gerald T McFadden (n/a) appointed for Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Financial Affidavit filed. Bond set as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (1) No Bail. Detention Hearing (flight) set for 5/13/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Preliminary Hearing set for 05/22/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Arraignment set for 06/05/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 5/9/2014 MDD 14:2:39-3:09). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Morgan Stewart, FD-S/A). (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (n/a) held on 5/8/2014. Initial Appearance continued to 5/9/2014 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Defendant's Rule 5 objection denied without prejudice. (CD# 5/8/2014 MDD 14:3:14-3:15). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Rory McHale, FD-S/A). (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga: Initial Appearance set for 5/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (lao) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (Attachments: # 1 Info Sheet)(mtb) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 38 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?